08 0-6-0
BR (1955 Num) | BR (Pre Tops) | BR (Class 13) | BR (Tops) | BR (08/9) | BR (09/1) | BR (09/2) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
13000 | D3000 | 01/11/1952 | SW | Tyseley | 19/11/1972 | Bristol Bath Road | 20 | Prs | Preserved | 71.19 | ||||||||
13001 | D3001 | 21/10/1952 | SW | Tyseley | 19/11/1972 | Stratford | 20.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 11/1975 | 23.08 | |||||||
13002 | D3002 | 24/10/1952 | SW | Tyseley | 17/07/1972 | Bristol Bath Road | 19.75 | Prs | Preserved | 71.22 | ||||||||
13003 | D3003 | 31/10/1952 | SW | Tyseley | 17/07/1972 | Bristol Bath Road | 19.75 | Prs | Preserved | 35.81 | ||||||||
13004 | D3004 | 08001 | 14/11/1952 | SW | Tyseley | 30/06/1978 | Gateshead | 25.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1979 | 26.35 | ||||||
13005 | D3005 | 08002 | 14/11/1952 | DE | Ayr | 04/09/1977 | Doncaster | 24.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 01/1978 | 25.19 | ||||||
13006 | D3006 | 27/12/1952 | DE | Ayr | 26/11/1972 | Immingham | 19.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 08/1979 | 26.65 | |||||||
13007 | D3007 | 08003 | 27/12/1952 | DE | Hurlford | 12/12/1977 | Darlington | 25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 07/1979 | 26.56 | ||||||
13008 | D3008 | 08004 | 27/12/1952 | DE | Hurlford | 21/08/1983 | Thornaby | 30.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/09/1986 | 33.78 | ||||||
13009 | D3009 | 08005 | 27/12/1952 | DE | Hurlford | 15/10/1978 | Bescot | 25.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 12/1979 | 26.98 | ||||||
13010 | D3010 | 08006 | 17/12/1952 | DE | Hither Green | 24/02/1980 | Darlington | 27.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/04/1980 | 27.39 | ||||||
13011 | D3011 | 19/12/1952 | DE | Hither Green | 01/10/1972 | 19.83 | Cut | Marples and Gillot (Sheffield) | 12/1985 | 33.01 | ||||||||
13012 | D3012 | 08007 | 23/12/1952 | DE | Hither Green | 28/01/1973 | Eastleigh | 20.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1973 | 20.82 | ||||||
13013 | D3013 | 23/12/1952 | DE | Hither Green | 01/10/1972 | 19.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 10/1973 | 20.82 | ||||||||
13014 | D3014 | 24/12/1952 | DE | Hither Green | 01/10/1972 | 19.83 | Prs | Preserved | 71.05 | |||||||||
13015 | D3015 | 08008 | 24/01/1953 | DE | Willesden | 27/11/1983 | Gateshead | 30.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/09/1986 | 33.70 | ||||||
13016 | D3016 | 08009 | 24/01/1953 | DE | Willesden | 30/11/1975 | Ashford Chart Leacon | 22.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/06/1976 | 23.45 | ||||||
13017 | D3017 | 08010 | 21/03/1953 | DE | Willesden | 18/12/1977 | Willesden | 24.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) | 28/02/1978 | 24.96 | ||||||
13018 | D3018 | 08011 | 21/03/1953 | DE | Willesden | 13/12/1991 | Reading (W.R.) | 38.75 | Prs | Preserved | 39.16 | |||||||
13019 | D3019 | 08012 | 21/03/1953 | DE | Willesden | 10/06/1973 | Allerton | 20.25 | Prs | Preserved | 70.81 | |||||||
13020 | D3020 | 08013 | 18/04/1953 | DE | Aston | 01/12/1973 | 20.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 04/1975 | 22.01 | |||||||
13021 | D3021 | 08014 | 16/05/1953 | DE | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 18/05/1980 | Bury | 27 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 30/11/1981 | 28.56 | ||||||
13022 | D3022 | 08015 | 16/05/1953 | DE | Cricklewood East | 21/09/1980 | Tinsley | 27.33 | Prs | Preserved | 70.66 | |||||||
13023 | D3023 | 08016 | 13/06/1953 | DE | Cricklewood East | 18/05/1980 | Newton Heath | 26.92 | Prs | Preserved | 70.58 | |||||||
13024 | D3024 | 08017 | 13/06/1953 | DE | Cricklewood East | 26/08/1973 | Newton Heath | 20.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 10/1974 | 21.35 | ||||||
13025 | D3025 | 08018 | 05/09/1953 | SW | Tyseley | 17/07/1983 | Allerton | 29.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 14/09/1985 | 32.05 | ||||||
13026 | D3026 | 03/10/1953 | SW | Tyseley | 12/11/1972 | Tinsley | 19.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/1973 | 19.55 | |||||||
13027 | D3027 | 08019 | 03/10/1953 | SW | Tyseley | 25/09/1983 | Bletchley | 29.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1986 | 32.64 | ||||||
13028 | D3028 | 08020 | 03/10/1953 | SW | Tyseley | 26/08/1973 | Crewe Diesel | 19.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 11/1975 | 22.13 | ||||||
13029 | D3029 | 08021 | 03/10/1953 | SW | Tyseley | 07/12/1986 | Toton | 33.17 | Prs | Preserved | 70.27 | |||||||
13030 | D3030 | 08022 | 03/10/1953 | SW | Old Oak Common | 17/03/1985 | Tinsley | 31.42 | Prs | Preserved | 31.76 | |||||||
13031 | D3031 | 08023 | 31/10/1953 | SW | Old Oak Common | 25/09/1983 | Chester West | 29.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1987 | 33.39 | ||||||
13032 | D3032 | 08024 | 31/10/1953 | SW | Old Oak Common | 26/12/1982 | Tinsley | 29.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 08/1983 | 29.81 | ||||||
13033 | D3033 | 08025 | 31/10/1953 | SW | Old Oak Common | 18/12/1977 | Bescot | 24.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 02/1978 | 24.31 | ||||||
13034 | D3034 | 28/11/1953 | SW | Oxley | 19/11/1972 | Tinsley | 19 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 11/1973 | 19.98 | |||||||
13035 | D3035 | 28/11/1953 | SW | Oxley | 17/12/1972 | Tinsley | 19.08 | Prs | Preserved | 25.48 | ||||||||
13036 | D3036 | 08026 | 28/11/1953 | SW | Oxley | 04/07/1982 | Cambridge | 28.67 | Prs | Preserved | 32.40 | |||||||
13037 | D3037 | 28/11/1953 | SW | Oxley | 17/12/1972 | Tinsley | 19.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 03/1979 | 25.31 | |||||||
13038 | D3038 | 28/11/1953 | SW | Oxley | 30/12/1972 | Longsight | 19.08 | Cut | National Coal Board (Bates Colliery) | 05/1980 | 26.48 | |||||||
13039 | D3039 | 08027 | 28/11/1953 | SW | Oxley | 02/11/1980 | Toton | 27 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/1982 | 28.40 | ||||||
13040 | D3040 | 08028 | 22/01/1954 | DE | Feltham | 05/04/1981 | Bury | 27.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/1982 | 28.25 | ||||||
13041 | D3041 | 08029 | 27/01/1954 | DE | Feltham | 05/03/1978 | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 24.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1978 | 24.31 | ||||||
13042 | D3042 | 08030 | 03/02/1954 | DE | Feltham | 10/07/1982 | Eastleigh | 28.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 13/10/1984 | 30.71 | ||||||
13043 | D3043 | 08031 | 20/02/1954 | DE | Hither Green | 04/07/1982 | Eastleigh | 28.42 | Cut | British Rail (at Immingham MPD) | 30/03/1988 | 34.13 | ||||||
13044 | D3044 | 08032 | 17/03/1954 | DE | Norwood Junction | 25/08/1974 | Toton | 20.42 | Prs | Preserved | 69.82 | |||||||
13045 | D3045 | 26/03/1954 | DE | Hither Green | 05/11/1972 | 18.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 04/1976 | 22.07 | ||||||||
13046 | D3046 | 08033 | 09/04/1954 | DE | Norwood Junction | 06/01/1985 | Tinsley | 30.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 28/02/1986 | 31.91 | ||||||
13047 | D3047 | 08034 | 14/04/1954 | DE | Hither Green | 15/07/1973 | 19.25 | 69.75 | ||||||||||
13048 | D3048 | 08035 | 23/04/1954 | DE | Norwood Junction | 30/09/1979 | Landore | 25.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 01/1980 | 25.75 | ||||||
13049 | D3049 | 08036 | 23/04/1954 | DE | Norwood Junction | 07/09/1981 | Willesden | 27.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 26/03/1983 | 28.94 | ||||||
13050 | D3050 | 08037 | 22/05/1954 | DE | Crewe South | 03/02/1980 | Bury | 25.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1980 | 26.42 | ||||||
13051 | D3051 | 08038 | 19/06/1954 | DE | Crewe South | 03/06/1973 | Willesden | 19 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 08/1973 | 19.17 | ||||||
13052 | D3052 | 08039 | 19/06/1954 | DE | Crewe South | 01/12/1973 | 19.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 08/1974 | 20.17 | |||||||
13053 | D3053 | 08040 | 19/06/1954 | DE | Crewe South | 10/06/1973 | Bletchley | 19 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 10/1975 | 21.34 | ||||||
13054 | D3054 | 08041 | 17/07/1954 | DE | Crewe South | 08/08/1978 | Bescot | 24.08 | Prs | Preserved | 24.76 | |||||||
13055 | D3055 | 08042 | 17/07/1954 | DE | Crewe South | 11/03/1979 | York (North) | 24.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 05/1979 | 24.84 | ||||||
13056 | D3056 | 08043 | 14/08/1954 | DE | Toton | 18/12/1977 | Bury | 23.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/1978 | 23.68 | ||||||
13057 | D3057 | 08044 | 14/08/1954 | DE | Wellingborough | 04/01/1978 | Gateshead | 23.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 01/1979 | 24.44 | ||||||
13058 | D3058 | 08045 | 11/09/1954 | DE | Wellingborough | 04/07/1982 | Toton | 27.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 15/12/1984 | 30.28 | ||||||
13059 | D3059 | 08046 | 11/09/1954 | DE | Wellingborough | 18/05/1980 | Bury | 25.67 | Prs | Preserved | 69.33 | |||||||
13060 | D3060 | 08047 | 22/08/1953 | DA | Mexborough | 28/10/1979 | Wath | 26.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/1980 | 26.83 | ||||||
13061 | D3061 | 08048 | 22/08/1953 | DA | Mexborough | 12/12/1977 | Wath | 24.33 | Prs | Preserved | 24.66 | |||||||
13062 | D3062 | 08049 | 10/09/1953 | DA | Mexborough | 17/05/1981 | Wath | 27.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1985 | 31.70 | ||||||
13063 | D3063 | 08050 | 24/10/1953 | DA | Mexborough | 25/10/1981 | Wath | 28 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 01/1983 | 29.25 | ||||||
13064 | D3064 | 08051 | 09/09/1953 | DA | Mexborough | 11/07/1982 | Wath | 28.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1986 | 32.53 | ||||||
13065 | D3065 | 08052 | 24/10/1953 | DA | Woodford Halse | 25/01/1981 | Cambridge | 27.25 | Cut | C F Booth (at March MPD) | 01/1982 | 28.25 | ||||||
13066 | D3066 | 08053 | 24/10/1953 | DA | Woodford Halse | 01/03/1981 | Thornaby | 27.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/1981 | 27.66 | ||||||
13067 | D3067 | 08054 | 21/11/1953 | DA | Woodford Halse | 16/02/1980 | Gateshead | 26.25 | Prs | Preserved | 70.14 | |||||||
13068 | D3068 | 08055 | 21/11/1953 | DA | Woodford Halse | 02/11/1980 | Crewe Diesel | 27 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1983 | 29.50 | ||||||
13069 | D3069 | 21/11/1953 | DA | Woodford Halse | 07/01/1973 | Stratford | 19.17 | Cut | British Rail (at Thornaby MPD) | 03/1980 | 26.33 | |||||||
13070 | D3070 | 08056 | 21/11/1953 | DA | Hull Springhead | 03/08/1986 | Knottingley | 32.75 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 09/05/1989 | 35.49 | ||||||
13071 | D3071 | 08057 | 21/11/1953 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 28/07/1976 | Healey Mills | 22.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 05/1977 | 23.50 | ||||||
13072 | D3072 | 08058 | 19/12/1953 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 04/04/1982 | Thornaby | 28.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 21/05/1983 | 29.44 | ||||||
13073 | D3073 | 08059 | 19/12/1953 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 21/09/1980 | Thornaby | 26.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/04/1985 | 31.32 | ||||||
13074 | D3074 | 08060 | 19/12/1953 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 24/06/1984 | Lincoln | 30.5 | Prs | Preserved | 31.55 | |||||||
13075 | D3075 | 08061 | 23/01/1954 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 06/05/1984 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 30.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 20/04/1985 | 31.26 | ||||||
13076 | D3076 | 08062 | 23/01/1954 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 30/09/1984 | 30.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 23/03/1985 | 31.18 | |||||||
13077 | D3077 | 08063 | 23/01/1954 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 08/07/1984 | Thornaby | 30.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 06/04/1985 | 31.22 | ||||||
13078 | D3078 | 23/01/1954 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 30/11/1972 | Thornaby | 18.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 02/1979 | 25.08 | |||||||
13079 | D3079 | 08064 | 23/01/1954 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 23/12/1984 | 30.92 | Prs | Preserved | 31.16 | ||||||||
13080 | D3080 | 08065 | 20/02/1954 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 04/09/1977 | Immingham | 23.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 11/1978 | 24.75 | ||||||
13081 | D3081 | 08066 | 20/02/1954 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 04/09/1977 | Immingham | 23.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 11/1978 | 24.75 | ||||||
13082 | D3082 | 08067 | 09/10/1954 | DE | Saltley | 17/07/1983 | Tyseley | 28.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1986 | 32.04 | ||||||
13083 | D3083 | 08068 | 09/10/1954 | DE | Nottingham | 17/07/1983 | Tyseley | 28.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1986 | 32.04 | ||||||
13084 | D3084 | 08069 | 09/10/1954 | DE | Nottingham | 27/02/1983 | Carlisle Kingmoor | 28.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 03/03/1984 | 29.42 | ||||||
13085 | D3085 | 08070 | 06/11/1954 | DE | Nottingham | 18/12/1977 | Chester West | 23.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 04/1980 | 25.46 | ||||||
13086 | D3086 | 08071 | 06/11/1954 | DE | Nottingham | 14/02/1978 | Darlington | 23.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 07/1978 | 23.70 | ||||||
13087 | D3087 | 08072 | 06/11/1954 | DE | Speke Junction | 10/06/1973 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 18.58 | Cut | T W Ward (at Birchills PS) | 05/1983 | 28.54 | ||||||
13088 | D3088 | 08073 | 06/11/1954 | DE | Speke Junction | 01/12/1973 | 19.08 | Cut | National Coal Board (Bates Colliery) | 10/1985 | 30.96 | |||||||
13089 | D3089 | 08074 | 04/12/1954 | DE | Speke Junction | 09/12/1973 | 19 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 06/1977 | 22.55 | |||||||
13090 | D3090 | 08075 | 04/12/1954 | DE | Bushbury | 13/12/1981 | Shirebrook | 27 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/1982 | 27.38 | ||||||
13091 | D3091 | 08076 | 04/12/1954 | DE | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 21/09/1980 | Immingham | 25.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/1982 | 27.38 | ||||||
13092 | D3092 | 27/11/1954 | DE | Norwood Junction | 01/10/1972 | 17.92 | 69.12 | |||||||||||
13093 | D3093 | 04/12/1954 | DE | Norwood Junction | 31/05/1972 | 17.42 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 01/1974 | 19.13 | ||||||||
13094 | D3094 | 11/12/1954 | DE | Norwood Junction | 01/10/1972 | 17.83 | 69.08 | |||||||||||
13095 | D3095 | 18/12/1954 | DE | Norwood Junction | 31/05/1972 | 17.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/1973 | 19.01 | ||||||||
13096 | D3096 | 25/12/1954 | DE | Norwood Junction | 31/05/1972 | 17.42 | Cut | British Rail (at Selhurst MPD) | 09/1972 | 17.74 | ||||||||
13097 | D3097 | 15/01/1955 | DE | Norwood Junction | 31/05/1972 | 17.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/1973 | 18.93 | ||||||||
13098 | D3098 | 22/01/1955 | DE | Norwood Junction | 01/10/1972 | 17.75 | 68.97 | |||||||||||
13099 | D3099 | 22/01/1955 | DE | Norwood Junction | 08/10/1972 | 17.75 | Cut | P Woods (Shipbreaking) (Queenborough) | 08/1973 | 18.58 | ||||||||
13100 | D3100 | 29/01/1955 | DE | Norwood Junction | 01/10/1972 | 17.75 | 68.95 | |||||||||||
13101 | D3101 | 05/02/1955 | DE | Norwood Junction | 31/05/1972 | 17.25 | Prs | Preserved | 68.93 | |||||||||
13102 | D3102 | 08077 | 11/02/1955 | DE | Severn Tunnel Junction | 27/11/1977 | Cambridge | 22.75 | 68.92 | |||||||||
13103 | D3103 | 08078 | 16/02/1955 | DE | Severn Tunnel Junction | 14/08/1983 | Carlisle Kingmoor | 28.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/11/1986 | 31.81 | ||||||
13104 | D3104 | 08079 | 23/02/1955 | DE | Severn Tunnel Junction | 04/12/1983 | Chester West | 28.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1986 | 31.24 | ||||||
13105 | D3105 | 08080 | 23/02/1955 | DE | Banbury | 02/11/1980 | Crewe Diesel | 25.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1981 | 26.24 | ||||||
13106 | D3106 | 08081 | 04/03/1955 | DE | Banbury | 06/04/1980 | Gateshead | 25.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/1980 | 25.38 | ||||||
13107 | D3107 | 08082 | 11/03/1955 | DE | Banbury | 02/11/1980 | Bletchley | 25.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 02/1982 | 26.95 | ||||||
13108 | D3108 | 08083 | 11/03/1955 | DE | Banbury | 08/07/1984 | Cambridge | 29.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 10/02/1985 | 29.94 | ||||||
13109 | D3109 | 08084 | 16/03/1955 | DE | Banbury | 02/11/1980 | Newton Heath | 25.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 02/1982 | 26.94 | ||||||
13110 | D3110 | 08085 | 22/03/1955 | DE | Banbury | 23/03/1986 | Gateshead | 31 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 16/04/1993 | 38.10 | ||||||
13111 | D3111 | 08086 | 25/03/1955 | DE | Shrewsbury | 03/08/1980 | Healey Mills | 25.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 01/1981 | 25.83 | ||||||
13112 | D3112 | 08087 | 01/04/1955 | DE | Stourbridge Junction | 16/11/1979 | Gateshead | 24.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1980 | 25.14 | ||||||
13113 | D3113 | 08088 | 13/04/1955 | DE | Stourbridge Junction | 25/09/1983 | Crewe Diesel | 28.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/11/1986 | 31.65 | ||||||
13114 | D3114 | 08089 | 19/04/1955 | DE | Shrewsbury | 21/09/1980 | Cambridge | 25.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/1980 | 25.68 | ||||||
13115 | D3115 | 08090 | 25/04/1955 | DE | Shrewsbury | 27/11/1977 | Cambridge | 22.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 11/1978 | 23.58 | ||||||
13116 | D3116 | 08091 | 29/04/1955 | DE | Shrewsbury | 14/11/1982 | Healey Mills | 27.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 21/01/1984 | 28.75 | ||||||
13127 | D3127 | 08092 | 24/07/1954 | DA | New England | 30/11/1978 | March | 24.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 02/1979 | 24.58 | ||||||
13128 | D3128 | 08093 | 31/08/1954 | DA | New England | 26/07/1981 | York (North) | 26.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1982 | 27.56 | ||||||
13129 | D3129 | 08094 | 31/08/1954 | DA | New England | 19/06/1983 | Cambridge | 28.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 26/01/1985 | 30.43 | ||||||
13130 | D3130 | 08095 | 31/08/1954 | DA | New England | 27/02/1983 | March | 28.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1986 | 32.06 | ||||||
13131 | D3131 | 08096 | 31/08/1954 | DA | New England | 09/09/1984 | 30.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 20/04/1985 | 30.66 | |||||||
13132 | D3132 | 08097 | 30/10/1954 | DA | Grangemouth | 11/03/1981 | Healey Mills | 26.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/1981 | 26.64 | ||||||
13133 | D3133 | 08098 | 30/10/1954 | DA | Grangemouth | 30/11/1980 | Healey Mills | 26.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 01/1981 | 26.23 | ||||||
13134 | D3134 | 08099 | 30/10/1954 | DA | Grangemouth | 12/09/1982 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 27.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 15/10/1983 | 28.98 | ||||||
13135 | D3135 | 08100 | 27/11/1954 | DA | Grangemouth | 19/12/1982 | Cambridge | 28.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 09/03/1985 | 30.30 | ||||||
13136 | D3136 | 08101 | 25/12/1954 | DA | Grangemouth | 17/07/1983 | Lincoln | 28.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 03/11/1984 | 29.88 | ||||||
13167 | D3167 | 08102 | 24/08/1955 | DE | Saltley | 14/03/1988 | Doncaster | 32.58 | Prs | Preserved | 68.38 | |||||||
13168 | D3168 | 08103 | 26/08/1955 | DE | Saltley | 25/09/1983 | Derby | 28.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/1985 | 30.33 | ||||||
13169 | D3169 | 08104 | 02/09/1955 | DE | Rugby | 04/07/1982 | Carlisle Kingmoor | 26.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 17/03/1984 | 28.56 | ||||||
13170 | D3170 | 08105 | 02/09/1955 | DE | Carlisle Upperby | 17/07/1983 | Carlisle Kingmoor | 27.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 11/08/1984 | 28.96 | ||||||
13171 | D3171 | 08106 | 07/09/1955 | DE | Carlisle Upperby | 24/01/1982 | Carlisle Kingmoor | 26.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 01/1983 | 27.38 | ||||||
13172 | D3172 | 07/09/1955 | DE | Crewe South | 07/05/1972 | Carlisle Kingmoor | 16.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 07/1972 | 16.87 | |||||||
13173 | D3173 | 08107 | 20/09/1955 | DE | Crewe South | 19/12/1982 | Carlisle Kingmoor | 27.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 03/03/1984 | 28.47 | ||||||
13174 | D3174 | 08108 | 23/09/1955 | DE | Crewe South | 08/07/1984 | Cambridge | 28.83 | Prs | Preserved | 68.30 | |||||||
13175 | D3175 | 08109 | 29/09/1955 | DE | Crewe South | 05/04/1981 | Darlington | 25.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1981 | 26.06 | ||||||
13176 | D3176 | 08110 | 30/09/1955 | DE | Crewe South | 21/10/1979 | Landore | 24.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/1980 | 24.56 | ||||||
13177 | D3177 | 08111 | 30/09/1955 | DE | Chester (MR) | 01/04/1979 | Frodingham | 23.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 04/1979 | 23.56 | ||||||
13178 | D3178 | 08112 | 06/10/1955 | DE | Chester (MR) | 04/07/1982 | Crewe Diesel | 26.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/04/1984 | 28.52 | ||||||
13179 | D3179 | 08113 | 07/10/1955 | DE | Derby | 18/03/1984 | Cardiff Canton | 28.42 | Cut | Morley Waste Traders (Leeds) | 30/04/2007 | 51.60 | ||||||
13180 | D3180 | 08114 | 18/10/1955 | DE | Derby | 06/11/1983 | Doncaster | 28.08 | Prs | Preserved | 28.85 | |||||||
13181 | D3181 | 08115 | 18/10/1955 | DE | Derby | 08/07/1984 | Doncaster | 28.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 14/12/1985 | 30.18 | ||||||
13182 | D3182 | 08116 | 18/10/1955 | DE | St Philips Marsh | 15/08/1982 | Gateshead | 26.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 06/08/1983 | 27.82 | ||||||
13183 | D3183 | 24/10/1955 | DE | St Philips Marsh | 30/12/1972 | Swindon | 17.17 | Cut | National Coal Board (Merthyr Vale Colliery) | 12/1987 | 32.16 | |||||||
13184 | D3184 | 08117 | 27/10/1955 | DE | St Philips Marsh | 01/01/1979 | Tinsley | 23.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 03/1979 | 23.40 | ||||||
13185 | D3185 | 08118 | 04/11/1955 | DE | St Philips Marsh | 23/03/1980 | Landore | 24.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1980 | 24.80 | ||||||
13186 | D3186 | 08119 | 04/11/1955 | DE | St Philips Marsh | 01/06/1979 | Wath | 23.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 02/1980 | 24.30 | ||||||
13187 | D3187 | 08120 | 04/11/1955 | DE | St Philips Marsh | 25/10/1981 | Darlington | 25.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1982 | 26.80 | ||||||
13188 | D3188 | 08121 | 09/11/1955 | DE | Tondu | 10/06/1984 | Allerton | 28.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 16/11/1985 | 30.04 | ||||||
13189 | D3189 | 08122 | 10/11/1955 | DE | Tondu | 02/06/1977 | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 21.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 11/1977 | 22.03 | ||||||
13190 | D3190 | 08123 | 15/11/1955 | DE | Tondu | 20/03/1984 | Crewe Diesel | 28.33 | Prs | Preserved | 29.64 | |||||||
13191 | D3191 | 08124 | 15/11/1955 | DE | Oxley | 01/03/1981 | Norwich Thorpe | 25.33 | Prs | Preserved | 26.27 | |||||||
13192 | D3192 | 08125 | 18/11/1955 | DE | Shrewsbury | 31/12/1981 | Crewe Diesel | 26.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 25/02/1984 | 28.29 | ||||||
13193 | D3193 | 22/11/1955 | DE | Shrewsbury | 16/09/1967 | 11.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 09/1967 | 11.82 | ||||||||
13194 | D3194 | 08126 | 24/11/1955 | DE | Shrewsbury | 02/11/1980 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/1981 | 26.08 | ||||||
13195 | D3195 | 08127 | 25/11/1955 | DE | Reading (W.R.) | 03/08/1980 | Gateshead | 24.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/1980 | 25.07 | ||||||
13196 | D3196 | 08128 | 02/12/1955 | DE | Reading (W.R.) | 06/08/1980 | Doncaster | 24.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 18/02/1984 | 28.23 | ||||||
13197 | D3197 | 08129 | 30/12/1955 | DE | Polmadie | 17/07/1983 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 27.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 21/04/1984 | 28.33 | ||||||
13198 | D3198 | 08130 | 08/12/1955 | DE | Polmadie | 19/12/1982 | Allerton | 27 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 25/05/1985 | 29.48 | ||||||
13199 | D3199 | 08131 | 08/12/1955 | DE | Polmadie | 15/03/1981 | Doncaster | 25.25 | Prs | Preserved | 25.70 | |||||||
13200 | D3200 | 08132 | 13/12/1955 | DE | Polmadie | 29/01/1986 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 30.08 | Cut | Birds (Long Marston) | 07/1988 | 32.61 | ||||||
13201 | D3201 | 08133 | 16/12/1955 | DE | Polmadie | 21/09/1980 | Lincoln | 24.75 | Prs | Preserved | 68.07 | |||||||
13202 | D3202 | 08134 | 16/12/1955 | DE | Motherwell | 20/08/1981 | Saltley | 25.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/1986 | 31.02 | ||||||
13203 | D3203 | 08135 | 21/12/1955 | DE | Motherwell | 12/02/1977 | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 21.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1977 | 21.25 | ||||||
13204 | D3204 | 08136 | 21/12/1955 | DE | Motherwell | 07/08/1983 | York (North) | 27.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 12/1984 | 29.01 | ||||||
13205 | D3205 | 08137 | 23/12/1955 | DE | Motherwell | 28/11/1982 | Lincoln | 26.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 14/09/1985 | 29.75 | ||||||
13206 | D3206 | 08138 | 30/12/1955 | DE | Hamilton (West) | 14/01/1978 | Norwich Thorpe | 22.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1978 | 22.39 | ||||||
13207 | D3207 | 08139 | 26/01/1956 | DE | Eastfield | 21/09/1980 | March | 24.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/1982 | 26.24 | ||||||
13208 | D3208 | 08140 | 03/02/1956 | DE | Eastfield | 02/06/1977 | Bristol Bath Road | 21.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/1977 | 21.38 | ||||||
13209 | D3209 | 08141 | 09/02/1956 | DE | Eastfield | 25/01/1988 | Tinsley | 31.92 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 16/09/1994 | 38.63 | ||||||
13210 | D3210 | 08142 | 16/02/1956 | DE | Thornton Junction | 13/11/1983 | York (North) | 27.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1987 | 31.10 | ||||||
13211 | D3211 | 08143 | 24/02/1956 | DE | Thornton Junction | 16/03/1976 | Eastfield | 20.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 02/1977 | 20.99 | ||||||
13212 | D3212 | 08144 | 29/02/1956 | DE | Parkhead | 12/12/1977 | Ayr | 21.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 10/1979 | 23.64 | ||||||
13213 | D3213 | 08145 | 05/03/1956 | DE | Parkhead | 12/12/1977 | Dunfermline Townhill | 21.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 08/1978 | 22.46 | ||||||
13214 | D3214 | 08146 | 13/03/1956 | DE | Parkhead | 01/12/1980 | Doncaster | 24.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1981 | 25.19 | ||||||
13215 | D3215 | 08147 | 16/03/1956 | DE | St Rollox (Balornock) | 17/07/1983 | Gateshead | 27.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 08/12/1984 | 28.75 | ||||||
13216 | D3216 | 08148 | 23/03/1956 | DE | St Rollox (Balornock) | 31/03/1984 | Gateshead | 28 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 22/09/1984 | 28.52 | ||||||
13217 | D3217 | 08149 | 02/04/1955 | DA | Norwood Junction | 05/04/1981 | Darlington | 26 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 18/02/1984 | 28.90 | ||||||
13218 | D3218 | 08150 | 09/04/1955 | DA | Norwood Junction | 14/10/1984 | Thornaby | 29.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1986 | 31.46 | ||||||
13219 | D3219 | 08151 | 16/04/1955 | DA | Norwood Junction | 02/01/1979 | Eastleigh | 23.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) | 04/1980 | 25.02 | ||||||
13220 | D3220 | 08152 | 22/04/1955 | DA | Norwood Junction | 18/07/1980 | Selhurst | 25.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 11/1980 | 25.59 | ||||||
13221 | D3221 | 08153 | 22/04/1955 | DA | Norwood Junction | 19/12/1982 | Chester West | 27.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/1986 | 31.67 | ||||||
13222 | D3222 | 08154 | 08/06/1955 | DA | Norwood Junction | 13/10/1979 | Selhurst | 24.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1980 | 24.79 | ||||||
13223 | D3223 | 08155 | 02/07/1955 | DA | Norwood Junction | 02/01/1979 | Ashford Chart Leacon | 23.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1980 | 24.72 | ||||||
13224 | D3224 | 08156 | 25/06/1955 | DA | Norwood Junction | 02/01/1979 | Ashford Chart Leacon | 23.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 02/1980 | 24.66 | ||||||
13225 | D3225 | 08157 | 02/07/1955 | DA | Norwood Junction | 09/04/1977 | Ashford Chart Leacon | 21.75 | Cut | EMR (Attercliffe) | 17/06/1996 | 40.99 | ||||||
13226 | D3226 | 08158 | 02/07/1955 | DA | Norwood Junction | 02/01/1979 | Selhurst | 23.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1979 | 24.30 | ||||||
13227 | D3227 | 08159 | 13/12/1955 | DA | Newport (Teeside) | 24/11/1985 | Gateshead | 29.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 06/1986 | 30.53 | ||||||
13228 | D3228 | 08160 | 15/12/1955 | DA | Middlesbrough | 24/12/1985 | Bletchley | 30 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 09/1986 | 30.77 | ||||||
13229 | D3229 | 08161 | 21/12/1955 | DA | Darlington | 24/11/1985 | Thornaby | 29.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 03/1986 | 30.25 | ||||||
13230 | D3230 | 08162 | 29/12/1955 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 20/07/1980 | Healey Mills | 24.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 01/1981 | 25.07 | ||||||
13231 | D3231 | 08163 | 30/12/1955 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 19/12/1982 | Healey Mills | 27 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 25/02/1984 | 28.18 | ||||||
13232 | D3232 | 08164 | 12/01/1956 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 23/03/1986 | Gateshead | 30.17 | Prs | Preserved | 33.33 | |||||||
13233 | D3233 | 08165 | 18/01/1956 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 27/07/1980 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 24.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/1980 | 24.93 | ||||||
13234 | D3234 | 08166 | 25/01/1956 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 04/07/1982 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 26.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 17/09/1983 | 27.66 | ||||||
13235 | D3235 | 08167 | 02/02/1956 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 15/09/1977 | Darlington | 21.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 07/1979 | 23.46 | ||||||
13236 | D3236 | 08168 | 07/02/1956 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 14/03/1988 | York (North) | 32.08 | Prs | Preserved | 67.93 | |||||||
13237 | D3237 | 08169 | 09/02/1956 | DA | York (North) | 15/03/1981 | York (North) | 25.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1981 | 25.70 | ||||||
13238 | D3238 | 08170 | 15/02/1956 | DA | York (North) | 23/03/1986 | Gateshead | 30.08 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/05/1989 | 33.24 | ||||||
13239 | D3239 | 08171 | 17/02/1956 | DA | York (North) | 24/04/1983 | York (North) | 27.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 10/09/1983 | 27.58 | ||||||
13240 | D3240 | 08172 | 24/02/1956 | DA | York (North) | 04/08/1985 | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 29.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 09/11/1985 | 29.73 | ||||||
13241 | D3241 | 08173 | 02/03/1956 | DA | York (North) | 11/12/1978 | Eastfield | 22.75 | Cut | Vic Berry (at Thornton Yard) | 03/1987 | 31.05 | ||||||
13242 | D3242 | 08174 | 06/03/1956 | DA | York (North) | 29/08/1981 | Thornaby | 25.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1982 | 26.04 | ||||||
13243 | D3243 | 08175 | 09/03/1956 | DA | York (North) | 11/12/1978 | Grangemouth | 22.75 | Cut | J R Adams (Glasgow) | 12/1985 | 29.79 | ||||||
13244 | D3244 | 08176 | 15/03/1956 | DA | York (North) | 24/11/1985 | Gateshead | 29.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 05/1986 | 30.19 | ||||||
13245 | D3245 | 08177 | 14/05/1956 | DE | Crewe South | 30/10/1988 | York (North) | 32.42 | Cut | MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) | 08/1996 | 40.28 | ||||||
13246 | D3246 | 08178 | 14/05/1956 | DE | Nottingham | 01/05/1982 | Derby | 26 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/03/1984 | 27.84 | ||||||
13247 | D3247 | 08179 | 14/05/1956 | DE | Nottingham | 22/06/1975 | Crewe Diesel | 19.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1976 | 20.27 | ||||||
13248 | D3248 | 08180 | 18/05/1956 | DE | Derby | 03/05/1981 | Shirebrook | 25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1981 | 25.26 | ||||||
13249 | D3249 | 08181 | 18/05/1956 | DE | Derby | 04/07/1982 | Derby | 26.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 24/11/1984 | 28.54 | ||||||
13250 | D3250 | 08182 | 25/05/1955 | DE | Derby | 15/03/1981 | Saltley | 25.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1982 | 26.82 | ||||||
13251 | D3251 | 08183 | 25/05/1955 | DE | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 31/03/1984 | Lincoln | 28.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 10/11/1984 | 29.48 | ||||||
13252 | D3252 | 08184 | 01/06/1955 | DE | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 21/06/1981 | Doncaster | 26 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/1982 | 26.89 | ||||||
13253 | D3253 | 08185 | 01/06/1955 | DE | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 14/02/1982 | Thornaby | 26.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1982 | 27.39 | ||||||
13254 | D3254 | 08186 | 01/06/1955 | DE | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 17/03/1985 | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 29.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/09/1986 | 31.35 | ||||||
13255 | D3255 | 08/06/1955 | DE | St Philips Marsh | 30/12/1972 | Gloucester Horton Road | 17.5 | Prs | Preserved | 68.59 | ||||||||
13256 | D3256 | 08187 | 08/06/1955 | DE | St Philips Marsh | 24/07/1983 | Cardiff Canton | 28.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/09/1986 | 31.33 | ||||||
13257 | D3257 | 08188 | 13/06/1955 | DE | St Philips Marsh | 24/04/1983 | Cardiff Canton | 27.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/09/1986 | 31.32 | ||||||
13258 | D3258 | 08189 | 20/06/1956 | DE | Llanelli | 06/12/1981 | Gloucester Horton Road | 25.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 17/03/1984 | 27.76 | ||||||
13259 | D3259 | 08190 | 22/06/1956 | DE | Llanelli | 12/10/1980 | Cardiff Canton | 24.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/1980 | 24.50 | ||||||
13260 | D3260 | 08191 | 29/06/1956 | DE | Llanelli | 20/01/1988 | Landore | 31.58 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 06/11/1990 | 34.38 | ||||||
13261 | D3261 | 05/07/1956 | DE | Llanelli | 30/12/1972 | Cardiff Canton | 16.42 | Prs | Preserved | 67.52 | ||||||||
13262 | D3262 | 08192 | 12/07/1956 | DE | Llanelli | 09/07/1982 | Haymarket | 26 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/02/1985 | 28.60 | ||||||
13263 | D3263 | 08193 | 10/08/1956 | DE | Llanelli | 10/07/1983 | Cardiff Canton | 26.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1986 | 29.78 | ||||||
13264 | D3264 | 08194 | 20/08/1956 | DE | Duffryn Yard | 09/11/1980 | Cardiff Canton | 24.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 29/10/1983 | 27.21 | ||||||
13265 | D3265 | 08195 | 23/08/1956 | DE | Duffryn Yard | 25/09/1983 | Cardiff Canton | 27.08 | Prs | Preserved | 67.38 | |||||||
13266 | D3266 | 08196 | 24/08/1956 | DE | Duffryn Yard | 01/11/1983 | Grangemouth | 27.25 | Cut | J R Adams (Glasgow) | 12/1985 | 29.33 | ||||||
13267 | D3267 | 08197 | 31/08/1956 | DE | Duffryn Yard | 25/04/1982 | York (North) | 25.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 11/02/1984 | 27.47 | ||||||
13268 | D3268 | 08198 | 07/09/1956 | DE | Reading (W.R.) | 01/12/1980 | Swindon | 24.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 11/1981 | 25.21 | ||||||
13269 | D3269 | 08199 | 14/09/1956 | DE | Reading (W.R.) | 25/01/1983 | Derby | 26.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 14/07/1984 | 27.85 | ||||||
13270 | D3270 | 08200 | 29/09/1956 | DE | Hither Green | 13/04/1986 | Thornaby | 29.58 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 14/09/1992 | 35.98 | ||||||
13271 | D3271 | 08201 | 29/09/1956 | DE | Hither Green | 19/12/1982 | Willesden | 26.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 19/05/1984 | 27.65 | ||||||
13272 | D3272 | 08202 | 06/10/1956 | DE | Hither Green | 23/05/1989 | Cardiff Canton | 32.58 | Prs | Preserved | 33.45 | |||||||
13273 | D3273 | 08203 | 08991 | 11/10/1956 | DE | Hither Green | 01/07/1987 | 30.75 | Cut | Vic Berry (at Swansea Maliphant) | 09/1989 | 32.95 | ||||||
13274 | D3274 | 08204 | 17/10/1956 | DE | Hither Green | 21/08/1983 | Eastleigh | 26.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 15/09/1984 | 27.93 | ||||||
13275 | D3275 | 08205 | 22/10/1956 | DE | Eastfield | 13/11/1983 | Norwich Thorpe | 27.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 22/08/1984 | 27.85 | ||||||
13276 | D3276 | 08206 | 26/10/1956 | DE | Eastfield | 19/02/1988 | Holbeck (MR) | 31.33 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 09/05/1989 | 32.56 | ||||||
13277 | D3277 | 08207 | 26/10/1956 | DE | Parkhead | 28/09/1980 | Cambridge | 23.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 21/05/1983 | 26.58 | ||||||
13278 | D3278 | 08208 | 02/11/1956 | DE | St Rollox (Balornock) | 07/10/1984 | Tinsley | 27.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 16/11/1985 | 29.06 | ||||||
13279 | D3279 | 08209 | 02/11/1956 | DE | St Rollox (Balornock) | 27/02/1983 | Tinsley | 26.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 08/1983 | 26.80 | ||||||
13280 | D3280 | 08210 | 09/11/1956 | DE | St Rollox (Balornock) | 26/09/1988 | Tinsley | 31.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 03/11/1989 | 33.01 | ||||||
13281 | D3281 | 08211 | 10/11/1956 | DE | Grangemouth | 03/03/1985 | Thornaby | 28.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 03/1986 | 29.36 | ||||||
13282 | D3282 | 08212 | 16/11/1956 | DE | Motherwell | 06/09/1981 | Thornaby | 24.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 02/1982 | 25.27 | ||||||
13283 | D3283 | 08213 | 16/11/1956 | DE | Motherwell | 02/11/1980 | Allerton | 24 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1981 | 24.76 | ||||||
13284 | D3284 | 08214 | 23/11/1956 | DE | Motherwell | 19/02/1984 | Gateshead | 27.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 21/12/1985 | 29.10 | ||||||
13285 | D3285 | 08215 | 23/11/1956 | DE | Motherwell | 26/09/1982 | Thornaby | 25.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 05/1983 | 26.49 | ||||||
13286 | D3286 | 08216 | 30/11/1956 | DE | Motherwell | 02/11/1980 | Derby | 24 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Barrow Hill) | 30/04/2001 | 44.44 | ||||||
13287 | D3287 | 08217 | 30/11/1956 | DE | Motherwell | 25/04/1982 | Gateshead | 25.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 14/05/1983 | 26.47 | ||||||
13288 | D3288 | 08218 | 10/12/1956 | DE | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 20/07/1980 | Bristol Bath Road | 23.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1981 | 24.70 | ||||||
13289 | D3289 | 08219 | 10/12/1956 | DE | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 20/03/1983 | Tinsley | 26.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 08/1983 | 26.70 | ||||||
13290 | D3290 | 08220 | 14/12/1956 | DE | Nottingham | 30/03/1986 | Crewe Diesel | 29.25 | Prs | Preserved | 33.88 | |||||||
13291 | D3291 | 08221 | 21/12/1956 | DE | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 01/03/1981 | Bletchley | 24.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/11/1981 | 24.96 | ||||||
13292 | D3292 | 08222 | 27/12/1956 | DE | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 23/12/1984 | Bounds Green | 28 | Cut | MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) | 29/08/1997 | 40.70 | ||||||
13293 | D3293 | 08223 | 28/12/1956 | DE | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 24/06/1979 | Tinsley | 22.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 02/1980 | 23.15 | ||||||
13294 | D3294 | 08224 | 28/12/1956 | DE | 27/07/1988 | Doncaster | 31.58 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 03/12/1993 | 36.96 | |||||||
13295 | D3295 | 08225 | 14/01/1957 | DE | 06/10/1985 | Thornaby | 28.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 03/1986 | 29.18 | |||||||
13296 | D3296 | 08226 | 17/01/1957 | DE | 24/11/1985 | Doncaster | 28.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 05/1986 | 29.34 | |||||||
13297 | D3297 | 08227 | 04/02/1957 | DE | Stourton | 01/11/1983 | Dunfermline Townhill | 26.75 | Cut | J R Adams (Glasgow) | 12/1985 | 28.88 | ||||||
13298 | D3298 | 08228 | 28/03/1956 | DA | Stratford | 07/04/1985 | Norwich Thorpe | 29.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 28/02/1986 | 29.94 | ||||||
13299 | D3299 | 08229 | 05/04/1956 | DA | Stratford | 04/12/1977 | Frodingham | 21.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 12/1978 | 22.71 | ||||||
13300 | D3300 | 08230 | 12/04/1956 | DA | Stratford | 28/09/1980 | March | 24.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1983 | 27.11 | ||||||
13301 | D3301 | 08231 | 13/04/1956 | DA | Stratford | 21/06/1981 | Thornaby | 25.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1981 | 25.52 | ||||||
13302 | D3302 | 08232 | 20/04/1956 | DA | Stratford | 26/09/1982 | Thornaby | 26.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 07/1983 | 27.25 | ||||||
13303 | D3303 | 08233 | 25/05/1956 | DA | Stratford | 10/05/1981 | Stratford | 25 | Cut | G Morris (at Stratford MPD) | 03/1982 | 25.82 | ||||||
13304 | D3304 | 08234 | 02/05/1956 | DA | Neasden | 19/09/1982 | Cricklewood East | 26.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 01/1983 | 26.72 | ||||||
13305 | D3305 | 08235 | 08/05/1956 | DA | Neasden | 10/07/1983 | Bletchley | 27.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 08/09/1984 | 28.36 | ||||||
13306 | D3306 | 08236 | 11/05/1956 | DA | Neasden | 07/09/1975 | Willesden | 19.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1976 | 20.36 | ||||||
13307 | D3307 | 08237 | 16/05/1956 | DA | Kings Cross | 07/10/1984 | Bounds Green | 28.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 10/1986 | 30.44 | ||||||
13308 | D3308 | 08238 | 20/05/1956 | DA | Kings Cross | 18/03/1984 | Gloucester Horton Road | 27.83 | Prs | Preserved | 67.64 | |||||||
13309 | D3309 | 08239 | 30/06/1956 | DA | Kings Cross | 08/07/1984 | Neville Hill | 28.08 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) | 03/1996 | 39.73 | ||||||
13310 | D3310 | 08240 | 06/06/1956 | DA | Kings Cross | 04/07/1982 | Cambridge | 26.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/02/1985 | 28.70 | ||||||
13311 | D3311 | 08241 | 12/06/1956 | DA | Kings Cross | 25/10/1981 | Stratford | 25.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1982 | 25.94 | ||||||
13312 | D3312 | 08242 | 15/06/1956 | DA | Kings Cross | 14/12/1986 | Lincoln | 30.5 | Cut | Vic Berry (at Lincoln MPD) | 04/1990 | 33.85 | ||||||
13313 | D3313 | 08243 | 25/06/1956 | DA | York (North) | 18/02/1986 | Willesden | 29.67 | Cut | Birds (Long Marston) | 01/1988 | 31.58 | ||||||
13314 | D3314 | 08244 | 03/07/1956 | DA | York (North) | 04/05/1986 | Tinsley | 29.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 19/11/1989 | 33.40 | ||||||
13315 | D3315 | 08245 | 05/07/1956 | DA | York (North) | 20/05/1984 | Neville Hill | 27.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 03/1986 | 29.71 | ||||||
13316 | D3316 | 08246 | 20/09/1956 | DA | Percy Main | 08/08/1982 | Grangemouth | 25.92 | Cut | D Christie (Camlackie) | 04/1987 | 30.59 | ||||||
13317 | D3317 | 08247 | 27/10/1956 | DA | Percy Main | 15/03/1981 | Doncaster | 24.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 11/1981 | 25.07 | ||||||
13318 | D3318 | 08248 | 09/10/1956 | DA | York (North) | 23/09/1984 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 27.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 13/07/1985 | 28.78 | ||||||
13319 | D3319 | 08249 | 11/10/1956 | DA | York (North) | 19/05/1985 | Lincoln | 28.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1987 | 30.44 | ||||||
13320 | D3320 | 08250 | 16/10/1956 | DA | York (North) | 30/11/1988 | Norwich Thorpe | 32.08 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 07/08/1991 | 34.83 | ||||||
13321 | D3321 | 08251 | 23/10/1956 | DA | Percy Main | 14/09/1980 | Thornaby | 23.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 01/1981 | 24.25 | ||||||
13322 | D3322 | 08252 | 08/11/1956 | DA | Percy Main | 02/08/1981 | York (North) | 24.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/1982 | 25.45 | ||||||
13323 | D3323 | 08253 | 13/11/1956 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 25/02/1987 | York (North) | 30.25 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 07/1988 | 31.69 | ||||||
13324 | D3324 | 08254 | 19/11/1956 | DA | Percy Main | 02/11/1986 | Gateshead | 30 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 13/05/1994 | 37.50 | ||||||
13325 | D3325 | 08255 | 23/11/1956 | DA | Kings Cross | 07/10/1984 | Gateshead | 27.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 03/1986 | 29.33 | ||||||
13326 | D3326 | 08256 | 28/11/1956 | DA | New England | 19/02/1984 | Colchester | 27.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 05/01/1985 | 28.12 | ||||||
13327 | D3327 | 08257 | 03/12/1956 | DA | March | 20/10/1985 | Norwich Thorpe | 28.83 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 03/1989 | 32.30 | ||||||
13328 | D3328 | 08258 | 06/12/1956 | DA | Mexborough | 30/11/1988 | Cambridge | 31.92 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 09/1989 | 32.80 | ||||||
13329 | D3329 | 08259 | 08992 | 14/12/1956 | DA | Mexborough | 01/07/1987 | 30.58 | Cut | Vic Berry (at Swansea Maliphant) | 10/1989 | 32.86 | ||||||
13330 | D3330 | 08260 | 21/12/1956 | DA | Mexborough | 21/08/1983 | Shirebrook | 26.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 22/10/1983 | 26.85 | ||||||
13331 | D3331 | 08261 | 28/11/1956 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 04/12/1983 | Colchester | 27.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 29/12/1984 | 28.10 | ||||||
13332 | D3332 | 08262 | 04/01/1957 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 29/01/1984 | Old Oak Common | 27 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 24/11/1984 | 27.91 | ||||||
13333 | D3333 | 08263 | 16/01/1957 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 31/03/1984 | Gateshead | 27.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 18/08/1984 | 27.61 | ||||||
13334 | D3334 | 08264 | 21/01/1957 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 08/07/1984 | Healey Mills | 27.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 24/11/1984 | 27.86 | ||||||
13335 | D3335 | 08265 | 30/01/1957 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 31/12/1981 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 24.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/04/1987 | 30.27 | ||||||
13336 | D3336 | 08266 | 20/02/1957 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 17/03/1985 | Shirebrook | 28.08 | Prs | Preserved | 28.84 | |||||||
13337 | D3337 | 08267 | 20/03/1957 | DE | Thornton Junction | 17/12/1977 | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 20.75 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 08/1985 | 28.42 | ||||||
13338 | D3338 | 08268 | 23/03/1957 | DE | Thornton Junction | 14/07/1985 | Gateshead | 28.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 08/1986 | 29.42 | ||||||
13339 | D3339 | 08269 | 29/03/1957 | DE | Thornton Junction | 08/07/1984 | Healey Mills | 27.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 06/1985 | 28.23 | ||||||
13340 | D3340 | 08270 | 30/03/1957 | DE | Thornton Junction | 19/12/1982 | Allerton | 25.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 07/01/1984 | 26.79 | ||||||
13341 | D3341 | 08271 | 05/04/1957 | DE | Thornton Junction | 22/07/1981 | Dunfermline Townhill | 24.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/1983 | 26.04 | ||||||
13342 | D3342 | 08272 | 12/04/1957 | DE | Dunfermline Upper | 06/07/1987 | Tinsley | 30.25 | Cut | RFS Engineering Ltd (Doncaster Works) | 01/1991 | 33.78 | ||||||
13343 | D3343 | 08273 | 12/04/1957 | DE | Dunfermline Upper | 19/12/1982 | Allerton | 25.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 24/03/1984 | 26.97 | ||||||
13344 | D3344 | 08274 | 18/04/1957 | DE | Dunfermline Upper | 23/12/1984 | Gateshead | 27.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 20/07/1985 | 28.27 | ||||||
13345 | D3345 | 08275 | 26/04/1957 | DE | Dunfermline Upper | 22/02/1983 | Toton | 25.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 14/07/1984 | 27.24 | ||||||
13346 | D3346 | 08276 | 26/04/1957 | DE | Dunfermline Upper | 21/06/1977 | Dundee West | 20.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 11/1977 | 20.57 | ||||||
13347 | D3347 | 08277 | 03/05/1957 | DE | Dundee Tay Bridge | 22/11/1981 | Lincoln | 24.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 30/07/1983 | 26.26 | ||||||
13348 | D3348 | 08278 | 03/05/1957 | DE | Motherwell | 21/06/1977 | Hamilton (West) | 20.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 12/1977 | 20.63 | ||||||
13349 | D3349 | 08279 | 10/05/1957 | DE | Motherwell | 12/04/1981 | Dunfermline Townhill | 23.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/1983 | 25.95 | ||||||
13350 | D3350 | 08280 | 10/05/1957 | DE | Motherwell | 27/10/1980 | Motherwell | 23.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 02/1982 | 24.79 | ||||||
13351 | D3351 | 08281 | 17/05/1957 | DE | Motherwell | 01/12/1980 | Newton Abbot | 23.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 26/01/1985 | 27.72 | ||||||
13352 | D3352 | 08282 | 07/06/1957 | DE | Llanelli | 02/11/1980 | Allerton | 23.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1981 | 24.21 | ||||||
13353 | D3353 | 08283 | 11/06/1957 | DE | Llanelli | 24/02/1986 | Longsight | 28.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 16/11/1987 | 30.45 | ||||||
13354 | D3354 | 08284 | 14/06/1957 | DE | Llanelli | 01/05/1985 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 27.92 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 12/1987 | 30.52 | ||||||
13355 | D3355 | 08285 | 19/06/1957 | DE | Llanelli | 12/09/1988 | Doncaster | 31.25 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 12/11/1993 | 36.42 | ||||||
13356 | D3356 | 08286 | 21/06/1957 | DE | Llanelli | 25/04/1982 | Motherwell | 24.83 | Cut | H Ralston (at Polmadie MPD) | 01/1986 | 28.59 | ||||||
13357 | D3357 | 08287 | 27/06/1957 | DE | Llanelli | 27/02/1983 | Tinsley | 25.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 03/09/1983 | 26.20 | ||||||
D3358 | 08288 | 28/06/1957 | DE | Llanelli | 21/01/1983 | Swindon | 25.58 | Prs | Preserved | 66.54 | ||||||||
D3359 | 08289 | 28/06/1957 | DE | Llanelli | 22/12/1985 | Derby | 28.5 | Cut | Birds (Long Marston) | 11/1987 | 30.40 | |||||||
D3360 | 08290 | 05/07/1957 | DE | Llanelli | 25/04/1982 | Allerton | 24.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/03/1984 | 26.70 | |||||||
D3361 | 08291 | 05/07/1957 | DE | Llanelli | 04/01/1983 | Allerton | 25.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 24/12/1983 | 26.49 | |||||||
13362 | D3362 | 08292 | 17/05/1957 | DE | Swindon | 01/05/1984 | Eastfield | 27 | Cut | Deanside Transit Ltd (Glasgow) | 11/1994 | 37.52 | ||||||
13363 | D3363 | 08293 | 24/05/1957 | DE | Cardiff East Dock | 24/12/1985 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 28.58 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 10/1987 | 30.41 | ||||||
13364 | D3364 | 08294 | 24/05/1957 | DE | Cardiff East Dock | 02/11/1980 | Bescot | 23.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/1981 | 24.58 | ||||||
13365 | D3365 | 08295 | 31/05/1957 | DE | Cardiff East Dock | 23/05/1988 | Thornaby | 31 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 03/12/1993 | 36.53 | ||||||
13366 | D3366 | 08296 | 31/05/1957 | DE | Cardiff East Dock | 30/10/1988 | York (North) | 31.42 | Prs | Preserved | 66.61 | |||||||
D3367 | 08297 | 11/07/1957 | DE | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 16/08/1988 | Doncaster | 31.08 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 27/02/1990 | 32.65 | |||||||
D3368 | 08298 | 11/07/1957 | DE | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 08/03/1981 | Longsight | 23.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/1981 | 24.03 | |||||||
D3369 | 08299 | 26/07/1957 | DE | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 19/07/1981 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 24 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1982 | 25.24 | |||||||
D3370 | 08300 | 02/08/1957 | DE | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 17/07/1983 | Allerton | 25.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 07/04/1984 | 26.70 | |||||||
D3371 | 08301 | 07/08/1957 | DE | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 31/12/1981 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 24.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 22/06/1985 | 27.89 | |||||||
D3372 | 08302 | 10/08/1957 | DE | Newton Heath | 29/06/1981 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 23.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 02/1982 | 24.53 | |||||||
D3373 | 08303 | 15/08/1957 | DE | Newton Heath | 31/12/1981 | Derby | 24.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1987 | 29.60 | |||||||
D3374 | 08304 | 16/08/1957 | DE | Newton Heath | 19/05/1985 | Lincoln | 27.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/1986 | 29.35 | |||||||
D3375 | 08305 | 22/08/1957 | DE | Royston | 30/10/1988 | Holbeck (MR) | 31.17 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 16/02/1995 | 37.51 | |||||||
D3376 | 08306 | 23/08/1957 | DE | Royston | 21/12/1977 | Healey Mills | 20.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1978 | 21.16 | |||||||
D3377 | 08307 | 30/08/1957 | DE | Royston | 21/12/1977 | Healey Mills | 20.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/1978 | 20.81 | |||||||
D3378 | 08308 | 30/08/1957 | DE | Royston | 21/02/1992 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 34.5 | 66.36 | ||||||||||
D3379 | 08309 | 05/09/1957 | DE | Royston | 17/07/1992 | Knottingley | 34.83 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 03/03/1995 | 37.52 | |||||||
D3380 | 08310 | 06/09/1957 | DE | Royston | 04/09/1977 | Thornaby | 20 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 10/1978 | 21.12 | |||||||
D3381 | 08311 | 12/09/1957 | DE | Normanton | 19/12/1982 | Healey Mills | 25.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 18/02/1984 | 26.45 | |||||||
D3382 | 08312 | 13/09/1957 | DE | Motherwell | 09/05/1983 | Motherwell | 25.67 | Cut | J R Adams (Glasgow) | 12/1985 | 28.27 | |||||||
D3383 | 08313 | 27/09/1957 | DE | Motherwell | 23/05/1982 | Gateshead | 24.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 14/05/1983 | 25.64 | |||||||
D3384 | 08314 | 20/09/1957 | DE | Motherwell | 22/02/1981 | Motherwell | 23.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 09/1981 | 24.00 | |||||||
D3385 | 08315 | 27/09/1957 | DE | Motherwell | 12/02/1979 | March | 21.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 01/1980 | 22.32 | |||||||
D3386 | 08316 | 27/09/1957 | DE | Eastfield | 09/03/1976 | Hamilton (West) | 18.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 02/1977 | 19.40 | |||||||
D3387 | 08317 | 27/09/1957 | DE | Eastfield | 31/10/1982 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 25.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 08/10/1983 | 26.05 | |||||||
D3388 | 08318 | 04/10/1957 | DE | Eastfield | 03/10/1976 | Hamilton (West) | 19 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) | 12/1977 | 20.21 | |||||||
D3389 | 08319 | 11/10/1957 | DE | Eastfield | 25/04/1983 | Motherwell | 25.5 | Cut | J R Adams (Glasgow) | 12/1985 | 28.20 | |||||||
D3390 | 08320 | 16/10/1957 | DE | Eastfield | 19/12/1982 | Toton | 25.17 | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 66.24 | ||||||||
D3391 | 08321 | 18/10/1957 | DE | Eastfield | 01/06/1984 | Motherwell | 26.67 | Cut | J R Adams (Glasgow) | 12/1985 | 28.18 | |||||||
D3392 | 08322 | 18/10/1957 | DE | Eastfield | 18/09/1983 | Cardiff Canton | 25.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/09/1986 | 28.97 | |||||||
D3393 | 08323 | 25/10/1957 | DE | Eastfield | 11/07/1981 | Selhurst | 23.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 02/1982 | 24.33 | |||||||
D3394 | 08324 | 29/10/1957 | DE | Eastfield | 23/12/1984 | March | 27.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 30/11/1985 | 28.11 | |||||||
D3395 | 08325 | 01/11/1957 | DE | Eastfield | 08/07/1984 | Gateshead | 26.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 02/11/1985 | 28.02 | |||||||
D3396 | 08326 | 08/11/1957 | DE | Eastfield | 01/11/1983 | Motherwell | 26 | Cut | J R Adams (Glasgow) | 12/1985 | 28.12 | |||||||
D3397 | 08327 | 08/11/1957 | DE | Cardiff East Dock | 28/02/1983 | Bescot | 25.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 28/02/1987 | 29.33 | |||||||
D3398 | 08328 | 15/11/1957 | DE | Cardiff East Dock | 31/12/1981 | Allerton | 24.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 01/1987 | 29.19 | |||||||
D3399 | 08329 | 15/11/1957 | DE | Cardiff East Dock | 24/06/1984 | Leicester Midland | 26.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1986 | 28.35 | |||||||
D3400 | 08330 | 23/11/1957 | DE | Cardiff East Dock | 02/12/1984 | Healey Mills | 27.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 21/09/1985 | 27.85 | |||||||
D3401 | 08331 | 23/11/1957 | DE | Cardiff East Dock | 14/03/1988 | 30.33 | 31.47 | |||||||||||
D3402 | 08332 | 29/11/1957 | DE | Cardiff East Dock | 16/09/1984 | Healey Mills | 26.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 11/05/1985 | 27.47 | |||||||
D3403 | 08333 | 29/11/1957 | DE | Cardiff East Dock | 19/12/1982 | Derby | 25.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1986 | 28.48 | |||||||
D3404 | 08334 | 06/12/1957 | DE | Cardiff East Dock | 03/09/1987 | Thornaby | 29.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 16/09/1994 | 36.80 | |||||||
D3405 | 08335 | 13/12/1957 | DE | Cardiff East Dock | 16/01/1987 | Tinsley | 29.08 | Cut | Thomas Hill Ltd (Kilnhurst) | 07/1989 | 31.61 | |||||||
D3406 | 08336 | 19/12/1957 | DE | Cardiff East Dock | 05/04/1981 | York (North) | 23.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1982 | 24.25 | |||||||
D3407 | 08337 | 27/12/1957 | DE | Cardiff East Dock | 06/02/1987 | Doncaster | 29.17 | Cut | RFS Engineering Ltd (Doncaster Works) | 04/05/1989 | 31.37 | |||||||
D3408 | 08338 | 01/01/1958 | DE | Kipps | 15/07/1985 | Margam | 27.5 | Cut | Vic Berry (at Swansea Maliphant) | 06/11/1990 | 32.87 | |||||||
D3409 | 08339 | 08/01/1958 | DE | Kipps | 07/10/1984 | 26.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 20/04/1985 | 27.30 | ||||||||
D3410 | 08340 | 16/01/1958 | DE | Parkhead | 16/08/1981 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 23.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1982 | 24.18 | |||||||
D3411 | 08341 | 22/01/1958 | DE | Parkhead | 01/11/1983 | Dunfermline Townhill | 25.83 | Cut | J R Adams (Glasgow) | 12/1985 | 27.92 | |||||||
D3412 | 08342 | 24/01/1958 | DE | Yoker | 04/07/1982 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 24.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/11/1983 | 25.80 | |||||||
D3413 | 08343 | 31/01/1958 | DE | Yoker | 01/11/1983 | Eastfield | 25.83 | Cut | H Ralston (at Eastfield MPD) | 01/1986 | 27.98 | |||||||
D3414 | 08344 | 07/02/1958 | DE | Yoker | 01/05/1984 | Ayr | 26.25 | Cut | J R Adams (Glasgow) | 12/1985 | 27.87 | |||||||
D3415 | 08345 | 14/02/1958 | DE | Yoker | 01/11/1983 | Ayr | 25.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 30/06/1985 | 27.39 | |||||||
D3416 | 08346 | 21/02/1958 | DE | St Rollox (Balornock) | 01/03/1984 | Dunfermline Townhill | 26.08 | Cut | J R Adams (Glasgow) | 12/1985 | 27.83 | |||||||
D3417 | 08347 | 28/02/1958 | DE | St Rollox (Balornock) | 01/11/1983 | Grangemouth | 25.75 | Cut | J R Adams (Glasgow) | 12/1985 | 27.81 | |||||||
D3418 | 08348 | 12/03/1958 | DE | St Rollox (Balornock) | 09/07/1982 | Eastfield | 24.33 | Cut | H Ralston (at Eastfield MPD) | 01/1986 | 27.87 | |||||||
D3419 | 08349 | 16/11/1957 | CW | Cardiff East Dock | 31/07/1983 | Cardiff Canton | 25.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/1986 | 28.60 | |||||||
D3420 | 08350 | 07/12/1957 | CW | Cardiff East Dock | 17/01/1984 | Cardiff Canton | 26.08 | Prs | Preserved | 66.09 | ||||||||
D3421 | 08351 | 20/12/1957 | CW | Cardiff East Dock | 17/01/1984 | Cardiff Canton | 26.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/1986 | 28.34 | |||||||
D3422 | 08352 | 31/12/1957 | CW | Cardiff East Dock | 10/07/1983 | Cardiff Canton | 25.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/09/1986 | 28.77 | |||||||
D3423 | 08353 | 18/01/1958 | CW | Cardiff East Dock | 05/07/1981 | Cardiff Canton | 23.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1982 | 24.17 | |||||||
D3424 | 08354 | 05/02/1958 | CW | Cardiff East Dock | 10/07/1986 | Cardiff Canton | 28.42 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 17/04/1991 | 33.22 | |||||||
D3425 | 08355 | 20/02/1958 | CW | Cardiff East Dock | 09/05/1983 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 25.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 10/03/1984 | 26.07 | |||||||
D3426 | 08356 | 26/03/1958 | CW | Cardiff East Dock | 01/11/1982 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 24.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 24/12/1983 | 25.76 | |||||||
D3427 | 08357 | 10/03/1958 | CW | Cardiff East Dock | 04/09/1977 | Immingham | 19.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/1979 | 21.11 | |||||||
D3428 | 08358 | 21/03/1958 | CW | Cardiff East Dock | 06/10/1977 | Immingham | 19.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 11/1977 | 19.67 | |||||||
D3429 | 08359 | 28/03/1958 | CW | St Philips Marsh | 22/01/1984 | Cardiff Canton | 25.83 | Prs | Preserved | 65.79 | ||||||||
D3430 | 08360 | 08/04/1958 | CW | St Philips Marsh | 24/01/1983 | Margam | 24.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1987 | 28.95 | |||||||
D3431 | 08361 | 17/04/1958 | CW | Oxley | 23/02/1988 | Ashford Chart Leacon | 29.83 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 22/04/1991 | 33.04 | |||||||
D3432 | 08362 | 22/04/1958 | CW | Duffryn Yard | 28/03/1982 | Margam | 23.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/1983 | 25.00 | |||||||
D3433 | 08363 | 30/04/1958 | CW | Duffryn Yard | 01/08/1982 | Reading (W.R.) | 24.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1983 | 24.89 | |||||||
D3434 | 08364 | 08/05/1958 | CW | Duffryn Yard | 21/01/1983 | Cardiff Canton | 24.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 29/10/1983 | 25.49 | |||||||
D3435 | 08365 | 24/05/1958 | CW | Duffryn Yard | 07/09/1980 | Margam | 22.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/04/1981 | 22.95 | |||||||
D3436 | 08366 | 24/05/1958 | CW | Duffryn Yard | 08/12/1980 | Margam | 22.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1982 | 23.82 | |||||||
D3437 | 08367 | 16/06/1958 | CW | Duffryn Yard | 12/09/1988 | Landore | 30.25 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 29/03/1994 | 35.81 | |||||||
D3438 | 08368 | 18/06/1958 | CW | Duffryn Yard | 08/12/1980 | Margam | 22.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/10/1984 | 26.32 | |||||||
D3454 | 08369 | 27/05/1957 | DA | Bradford Hammerton Street | 31/03/1985 | 27.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 15/06/1985 | 28.07 | ||||||||
D3455 | 08370 | 23/05/1957 | DA | Bradford Hammerton Street | 04/03/1984 | Gateshead | 26.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 01/1986 | 28.67 | |||||||
D3456 | 08371 | 31/05/1957 | DA | Bradford Hammerton Street | 16/10/1983 | Healey Mills | 26.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 18/05/1985 | 27.98 | |||||||
D3457 | 08372 | 06/06/1957 | DA | Stourton | 02/12/1984 | Healey Mills | 27.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 04/05/1985 | 27.93 | |||||||
D3458 | 08373 | 12/06/1957 | DA | Royston | 26/05/1985 | Gateshead | 27.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 03/1986 | 28.78 | |||||||
D3459 | 08374 | 17/06/1957 | DA | Hither Green | 06/12/1982 | Bletchley | 25.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 09/1984 | 27.27 | |||||||
D3460 | 08375 | 21/06/1957 | DA | Hither Green | 08/11/1991 | Cardiff Canton | 34.42 | 66.56 | ||||||||||
D3461 | 08376 | 24/06/1957 | DA | Hither Green | 17/07/1983 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 26.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 14/04/1984 | 26.82 | |||||||
D3462 | 08377 | 27/06/1957 | DA | Hither Green | 26/06/1983 | Laira | 26 | Prs | Preserved | 66.54 | ||||||||
D3463 | 08378 | 01/07/1957 | DA | Hither Green | 11/07/1981 | Selhurst | 24 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1982 | 24.72 | |||||||
D3464 | 08379 | 05/07/1957 | DA | Hither Green | 27/12/1980 | Selhurst | 23.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1981 | 23.71 | |||||||
D3465 | 08380 | 09/07/1957 | DA | Hither Green | 01/08/1982 | Eastfield | 25.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 21/05/1983 | 25.88 | |||||||
D3466 | 08381 | 10/07/1957 | DA | Hither Green | 19/12/1982 | Willesden | 25.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 28/07/1984 | 27.07 | |||||||
D3467 | 08382 | 07/08/1957 | DA | Hither Green | 08/03/1985 | Leicester Midland | 27.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 08/1986 | 29.04 | |||||||
D3468 | 08383 | 12/08/1957 | DA | Hither Green | 17/03/1985 | Thornaby | 27.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 10/1986 | 29.19 | |||||||
D3469 | 08384 | 19/08/1957 | DA | Ashford | 19/01/1986 | Gateshead | 28.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 03/1986 | 28.59 | |||||||
D3470 | 08385 | 26/08/1957 | DA | Ashford | 12/09/1988 | Doncaster | 31.08 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 12/11/1993 | 36.24 | |||||||
D3471 | 08386 | 28/08/1957 | DA | Hither Green | 06/01/1987 | Lincoln | 29.42 | Cut | Vic Berry (at Lincoln MPD) | 04/1990 | 32.65 | |||||||
D3472 | 08387 | 30/08/1957 | DA | Hither Green | 28/05/1982 | Selhurst | 24.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1986 | 28.56 | |||||||
D3503 | 08388 | 14/04/1958 | DE | St Philips Marsh | 20/07/2001 | 43.25 | Prs | Preserved | 65.74 | |||||||||
D3504 | 08389 | 17/04/1958 | DE | St Philips Marsh | 65.73 | |||||||||||||
D3505 | 08390 | 18/04/1958 | DE | St Philips Marsh | 19/03/1993 | Cardiff Canton | 34.92 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Barrow Hill) | 03/2004 | 45.94 | |||||||
D3506 | 08391 | 18/04/1958 | DE | St Philips Marsh | 04/08/1985 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 27.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 03/1986 | 27.93 | |||||||
D3507 | 08392 | 25/04/1958 | DE | St Philips Marsh | 01/12/1984 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 26.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 07/09/1985 | 27.39 | |||||||
D3508 | 08393 | 25/04/1958 | DE | St Philips Marsh | 65.71 | |||||||||||||
D3509 | 08394 | 02/05/1958 | DE | Laira | 20/11/1987 | Landore | 29.5 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 06/11/1990 | 32.54 | |||||||
D3510 | 08395 | 02/05/1958 | DE | Laira | 27/07/1988 | Doncaster | 30.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 30/04/1989 | 31.02 | |||||||
D3511 | 08396 | 09/05/1958 | DE | Laira | 13/03/1986 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 27.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 30/11/1987 | 29.58 | |||||||
D3512 | 08397 | 09/05/1958 | DE | Laira | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 65.67 | |||||||||||
D3513 | 08398 | 16/05/1958 | DE | Laira | 15/07/1985 | Bristol Bath Road | 27.17 | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 30/11/1985 | 27.56 | |||||||
D3514 | 08399 | 16/05/1958 | DE | Laira | 13/11/1992 | Crewe Diesel | 34.5 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 30/04/1993 | 34.98 | |||||||
D3515 | 08400 | 23/05/1958 | DE | Laira | 21/12/1987 | Landore | 29.58 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 06/11/1990 | 32.48 | |||||||
D3516 | 08401 | 23/05/1958 | DE | Laira | Prs | Preserved | 65.64 | |||||||||||
D3517 | 08402 | 23/05/1958 | DE | Laira | 30/09/2008 | 50.33 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 65.64 | |||||||||
D3518 | 08403 | 30/05/1958 | DE | Laira | 18/10/1981 | Bletchley | 23.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/04/1986 | 27.94 | |||||||
D3519 | 08404 | 30/05/1958 | DE | Newton Abbot | 27/07/1978 | Frodingham | 20.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 01/1979 | 20.64 | |||||||
D3520 | 08405 | 06/06/1958 | DE | Newton Abbot | 65.60 | |||||||||||||
D3521 | 08406 | 06/06/1958 | DE | Newton Abbot | 20/04/1988 | Cambridge | 29.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 10/1992 | 34.38 | |||||||
D3522 | 08407 | 06/06/1958 | DE | Newton Abbot | 01/02/1993 | Stratford | 34.67 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 03/12/1993 | 35.52 | |||||||
D3523 | 08408 | 13/06/1958 | DE | Newton Abbot | 29/04/1988 | Stratford | 29.83 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 06/10/1991 | 33.34 | |||||||
D3524 | 08409 | 13/06/1958 | DE | Newton Abbot | 15/06/1986 | Stratford | 28 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 10/1986 | 28.36 | |||||||
D3525 | 08410 | 20/06/1958 | DE | Newton Abbot | 65.56 | |||||||||||||
D3526 | 08411 | 20/06/1958 | DE | Truro | 28/02/2007 | 48.67 | 65.56 | |||||||||||
D3527 | 08412 | 20/06/1958 | DE | Truro | 24/11/1985 | March | 27.42 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 30/10/1992 | 34.39 | |||||||
D3528 | 08413 | 27/06/1958 | DE | Motherwell | 30/06/2004 | 46 | Cut | Morley Waste Traders (Leeds) | 30/04/2007 | 48.87 | ||||||||
D3529 | 08414 | 27/06/1958 | DE | Hamilton (West) | 28/02/2007 | 48.67 | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 08/2007 | 49.17 | ||||||||
D3530 | 08415 | 04/07/1958 | DE | Yoker | 30/09/1996 | 38.17 | Cut | EMR (Sheffield) | 10/1995 | 37.31 | ||||||||
D3531 | 08416 | 04/07/1958 | DE | Yoker | 14/02/1992 | Toton | 33.58 | Cut | C F Booth (at RFS Kilnhurst) | 08/1993 | 35.14 | |||||||
D3532 | 08417 | 04/07/1958 | DE | Beattock | 65.52 | |||||||||||||
D3533 | 08418 | 10/07/1958 | DE | Balloch | Prs | Preserved | 65.50 | |||||||||||
D3534 | 08419 | 11/07/1958 | DE | Balloch | 23/04/1993 | 34.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 27/11/2004 | 46.41 | ||||||||
D3535 | 08420 | 11/07/1958 | DE | Stirling | 12/09/1988 | Doncaster | 30.17 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 03/03/1995 | 36.67 | |||||||
D3536 | 08421 | 09201 | 08/08/1958 | DE | Stirling | 22/09/1992 to 09 |
65.42 | |||||||||||
D3537 | 08422 | 08/08/1958 | DE | Stirling | 09/12/1985 | Bletchley | 27.33 | Cut | Birds (Long Marston) | 07/1988 | 29.96 | |||||||
D3538 | 08423 | 15/08/1958 | DE | Stirling | 24/11/1988 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 30.25 | Prs | Preserved | 65.41 | ||||||||
D3539 | 08424 | 15/08/1958 | DE | Stirling | 10/06/1985 | Thornton Junction | 26.83 | Cut | J R Adams (Glasgow) | 12/1985 | 27.35 | |||||||
D3540 | 08425 | 22/08/1958 | DE | Stirling | 09/09/1985 | Thornton Junction | 27.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/1986 | 27.92 | |||||||
D3541 | 08426 | 22/08/1958 | DE | Perth South | 02/07/1976 | Dundee West | 17.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 05/1977 | 18.74 | |||||||
D3542 | 08427 | 29/08/1958 | DE | Perth South | 14/11/1986 | March | 28.25 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 25/03/1994 | 35.59 | |||||||
D3543 | 08428 | 29/08/1958 | DE | Perth South | 65.37 | |||||||||||||
D3544 | 08429 | 05/09/1958 | DE | Perth South | 01/10/1983 | Shirebrook | 25.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 29/10/1983 | 25.16 | |||||||
D3545 | 08430 | 05/09/1958 | DE | Perth South | 18/12/1985 | Eastfield | 27.25 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 05/1986 | 27.71 | |||||||
D3546 | 08431 | 12/09/1958 | DE | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 04/07/1985 | Allerton | 26.83 | Cut | Texas Metals (at Allerton MPD) | 09/1987 | 29.03 | |||||||
D3547 | 08432 | 19/09/1958 | DE | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 16/10/1983 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 25.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 28/01/1984 | 25.38 | |||||||
D3548 | 08433 | 26/09/1958 | DE | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 17/03/1986 | Thornton Junction | 27.5 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 05/1986 | 27.65 | |||||||
D3549 | 08434 | 26/09/1958 | DE | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 10/02/1992 | Derby | 33.42 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 30/03/1994 | 35.53 | |||||||
D3550 | 08435 | 03/10/1958 | DE | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 30/11/1980 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 22.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 21/05/1983 | 24.65 | |||||||
D3551 | 08436 | 03/10/1958 | DE | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 10/01/1992 | Doncaster | 33.25 | Prs | Preserved | 65.27 | ||||||||
D3552 | 08437 | 10/10/1958 | DE | Kittybrewster | 01/12/1984 | Motherwell | 26.17 | Cut | J R Adams (Glasgow) | 12/1985 | 27.20 | |||||||
D3553 | 08438 | 17/10/1958 | DE | Kittybrewster | 23/03/1986 | March | 27.42 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 30/10/1992 | 34.06 | |||||||
D3554 | 08439 | 24/10/1958 | DE | Bathgate | 17/10/1988 | Immingham | 30 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 30/09/1994 | 35.96 | |||||||
D3555 | 08440 | 24/10/1958 | DE | Bathgate | 03/05/1990 | Stratford | 31.58 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 28/06/1991 | 32.70 | |||||||
D3556 | 08441 | 30/10/1958 | DE | Bathgate | 65.20 | |||||||||||||
D3557 | 08442 | 03/11/1958 | DE | Bathgate | Prs | Preserved | 65.19 | |||||||||||
D3558 | 08443 | 07/11/1958 | DE | Polmont | 07/07/1985 | Thornton Junction | 26.67 | Prs | Preserved | 65.18 | ||||||||
D3559 | 08444 | 07/11/1958 | DE | Polmont | 02/11/1986 | Cardiff Canton | 28 | Prs | Preserved | 65.18 | ||||||||
D3560 | 08445 | 14/11/1958 | DE | Haymarket | 20/07/2001 | 42.67 | Prs | Preserved | 65.16 | |||||||||
D3561 | 08446 | 21/11/1958 | DE | Haymarket | 02/12/1985 | Thornton Junction | 27.08 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 05/1986 | 27.50 | |||||||
D3562 | 08447 | 28/11/1958 | DE | Parkhead | 11/11/1994 | 36 | Prs | Preserved | 36.05 | |||||||||
D3563 | 08448 | 28/11/1958 | DE | Ayr | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) | 28/02/2007 | 48.28 | ||||||||||
D3564 | 08449 | 28/11/1958 | DE | Ayr | 31/01/2003 | 44.17 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) | 01/2007 | 48.16 | ||||||||
D3565 | 08450 | 05/12/1958 | DE | Carlisle Kingmoor | 02/05/1986 | Crewe Diesel | 27.42 | Cut | Birds (Long Marston) | 01/1988 | 29.13 | |||||||
D3566 | 08451 | 05/12/1958 | DE | Carlisle Kingmoor | 65.10 | |||||||||||||
D3567 | 08452 | 12/12/1958 | DE | Carlisle Kingmoor | 10/06/1985 | Thornton Junction | 26.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/04/1987 | 28.40 | |||||||
D3568 | 08453 | 12/12/1958 | DE | Burton | 05/10/1980 | York (North) | 21.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1982 | 23.69 | |||||||
D3569 | 08454 | 19/12/1958 | DE | Burton | 12/10/1981 | 22.83 | 65.06 | |||||||||||
D3570 | 08455 | 24/12/1958 | DE | Burton | 01/09/1985 | Swindon Works | 26.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1987 | 28.24 | |||||||
D3571 | 08456 | 03/01/1959 | DE | Burton | 29/04/1988 | Doncaster | 29.25 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 30/06/1989 | 30.51 | |||||||
D3572 | 08457 | 03/01/1959 | DE | Burton | 01/09/1985 | Swindon Works | 26.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1986 | 27.38 | |||||||
D3573 | 08458 | 12/07/1958 | CW | Neasden | 16/08/1988 | Stratford | 30.08 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 16/08/1991 | 33.12 | |||||||
D3574 | 08459 | 01/08/1958 | CW | Toton | 30/10/1988 | Doncaster | 30.17 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 09/1989 | 31.15 | |||||||
D3575 | 08460 | 13/08/1958 | CW | Toton | 65.41 | |||||||||||||
D3576 | 08461 | 20/08/1958 | CW | Edge Hill | 23/02/1988 | Stratford | 29.5 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 09/08/1991 | 32.99 | |||||||
D3577 | 08462 | 28/08/1958 | CW | Crewe South | 65.37 | |||||||||||||
D3578 | 08463 | 22/09/1958 | CW | Edge Hill | 16/03/1989 | Derby | 30.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 12/05/1992 | 33.66 | |||||||
D3579 | 08464 | 25/09/1958 | CW | Preston | 01/09/1985 | Swindon Works | 27 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1987 | 28.49 | |||||||
D3580 | 08465 | 01/10/1958 | CW | Preston | 09/08/1985 | Derby | 26.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 08/1986 | 27.89 | |||||||
D3581 | 08466 | 07/10/1958 | CW | Preston | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 65.26 | |||||||||||
D3582 | 08467 | 16/10/1958 | CW | Saltley | 29/11/1981 | Saltley | 23.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 01/1983 | 24.27 | |||||||
D3583 | 08468 | 03/11/1958 | CW | Saltley | 23/11/1988 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 30 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 06/1995 | 36.64 | |||||||
D3584 | 08469 | 07/11/1958 | CW | Saltley | 01/09/1985 | Swindon Works | 26.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/1986 | 27.70 | |||||||
D3585 | 08470 | 07/11/1958 | CW | Burton | 23/03/1986 | Crewe Diesel | 27.33 | Cut | MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) | 08/1996 | 37.80 | |||||||
D3586 | 08471 | 13/11/1958 | CW | Burton | 09/09/1985 | Leicester Midland | 26.83 | Prs | Preserved | 65.16 | ||||||||
D3587 | 08472 | 20/11/1958 | CW | Burton | 65.14 | |||||||||||||
D3588 | 08473 | 28/11/1958 | CW | Newton Heath | 17/03/1986 | Crewe Diesel | 27.33 | Prs | Preserved | 35.04 | ||||||||
D3589 | 08474 | 02/12/1958 | CW | Newton Heath | 07/09/1986 | Leicester Midland | 27.75 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 07/1988 | 29.64 | |||||||
D3590 | 08475 | 10/12/1958 | CW | Newton Heath | 09/03/1987 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 28.25 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 30/11/1987 | 28.99 | |||||||
D3591 | 08476 | 17/12/1958 | CW | Newton Heath | 09/09/1985 | Thornton Junction | 26.75 | Prs | Preserved | 65.07 | ||||||||
D3592 | 08477 | 03/01/1959 | CW | Newton Heath | 07/12/1986 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 27.92 | Cut | Vic Berry (at Allerton MPD) | 03/1990 | 31.22 | |||||||
D3593 | 08478 | 20/08/1958 | HO | St Blazey | 27/04/1988 | Immingham | 29.67 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 18/11/1994 | 36.27 | |||||||
D3594 | 08479 | 01/09/1958 | HO | St Blazey | 08/11/1991 | Cardiff Canton | 33.17 | Prs | Preserved | 65.36 | ||||||||
D3595 | 08480 | 12/09/1958 | HO | St Blazey | 65.33 | |||||||||||||
D3596 | 08481 | 19/09/1958 | HO | Penzance | 31/08/2005 | 46.92 | Prs | Preserved | 65.31 | |||||||||
D3597 | 08482 | 26/09/1958 | HO | Penzance | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 65.29 | |||||||||||
D3598 | 08483 | 03/10/1958 | HO | Exeter | 65.27 | |||||||||||||
D3599 | 08484 | 10/10/1958 | HO | Old Oak Common | 65.25 | |||||||||||||
D3600 | 08485 | 20/10/1958 | HO | Old Oak Common | Prs | Preserved | 65.22 | |||||||||||
D3601 | 08486 | 24/10/1958 | HO | Old Oak Common | 27/11/1986 | Cardiff Canton | 28.08 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 18/04/1991 | 32.50 | |||||||
D3602 | 08487 | 29/10/1958 | HO | Old Oak Common | 23/02/1988 | Stratford | 29.33 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 25/06/1991 | 32.68 | |||||||
D3603 | 08488 | 31/10/1958 | HO | Old Oak Common | 16/02/1986 | Cardiff Canton | 27.33 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 21/04/1991 | 32.49 | |||||||
D3604 | 08489 | 07/11/1958 | HO | Old Oak Common | 30/09/2008 | 49.83 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 05/2009 | 50.55 | ||||||||
D3605 | 08490 | 14/11/1958 | HO | Old Oak Common | 18/12/1985 | Thornton Junction | 27.08 | Prs | Preserved | 65.16 | ||||||||
D3606 | 08491 | 19/11/1958 | HO | Old Oak Common | 29/09/1985 | Cardiff Canton | 26.83 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 10/04/1991 | 32.41 | |||||||
D3607 | 08492 | 26/11/1958 | HO | Old Oak Common | 65.12 | |||||||||||||
D3608 | 08493 | 28/02/1958 | DO | Stratford | 30/06/2008 | 50.33 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/2008 | 50.50 | ||||||||
D3609 | 08494 | 01/03/1958 | DO | Stratford | 16/08/1988 | Stratford | 30.42 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 28/08/1991 | 33.52 | |||||||
D3610 | 08495 | 08/03/1958 | DO | Stratford | 65.84 | |||||||||||||
D3611 | 08496 | 12/03/1958 | DO | Cambridge | 14/06/1990 | Cambridge | 32.25 | Cut | Birds (Long Marston) | 11/1994 | 36.70 | |||||||
D3652 | 08497 | 19/03/1958 | DO | Stourton | 06/10/1985 | Neville Hill | 27.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 28/02/1986 | 27.97 | |||||||
D3653 | 08498 | 22/03/1958 | DO | Stourton | 07/01/1994 | Stratford | 35.83 | Cut | Birds (at Stratford MPD) | 03/1994 | 36.01 | |||||||
D3654 | 08499 | 29/03/1958 | DO | Stourton | 01/06/2004 | 46.25 | Prs | Preserved | 65.79 | |||||||||
D3655 | 08500 | 18/04/1958 | DO | Stourton | 65.73 | |||||||||||||
D3656 | 08501 | 29/04/1958 | DO | Stourton | 15/07/1985 | Cardiff Canton | 27.25 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 11/08/1991 | 33.31 | |||||||
D3657 | 08502 | 06/05/1958 | DO | Stourton | 30/10/1988 | Thornaby | 30.42 | 65.68 | ||||||||||
D3658 | 08503 | 15/05/1958 | DO | Stourton | 20/09/1988 | Holbeck (MR) | 30.33 | 65.66 | ||||||||||
D3659 | 08504 | 24/05/1958 | DO | Sheffield Darnall | 30/10/1988 | Thornaby | 30.42 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 23/09/1992 | 34.36 | |||||||
D3660 | 08505 | 31/05/1958 | DO | Sheffield Darnall | 22/02/1981 | Grangemouth | 22.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 26/03/1983 | 24.84 | |||||||
D3661 | 08506 | 06/06/1958 | DO | Sheffield Darnall | 28/02/2007 | 48.67 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 07/2007 | 49.14 | ||||||||
D3662 | 08507 | 20/06/1958 | DO | Sheffield Darnall | 13/08/1993 | Reading (W.R.) | 35.17 | 65.56 | ||||||||||
D3663 | 08508 | 20/06/1958 | DO | Sheffield Darnall | 01/10/1991 | Immingham | 33.33 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 01/1994 | 35.60 | |||||||
D3664 | 08509 | 11/07/1958 | DO | Sheffield Darnall | 30/09/2008 | 50.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/2009 | 50.80 | ||||||||
D3672 | 08510 | 20/05/1958 | DA | Darlington | 30/09/2008 | 50.33 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 07/2009 | 51.19 | ||||||||
D3673 | 08511 | 21/05/1958 | DA | Percy Main | 65.64 | |||||||||||||
D3674 | 08512 | 28/05/1958 | DA | Percy Main | 03/12/1977 | 19.58 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 65.62 | |||||||||
D3675 | 08513 | 05/06/1958 | DA | Hull Springhead | 22/03/1978 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 19.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 10/1978 | 20.38 | |||||||
D3676 | 08514 | 12/06/1958 | DA | Hull Springhead | 65.58 | |||||||||||||
D3677 | 08515 | 18/06/1958 | DA | Darlington | 20/01/1992 | 33.58 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (at Gateshead MPD) | 13/02/2001 | 42.69 | ||||||||
D3678 | 08516 | 11/08/1958 | DA | Percy Main | Prs | Preserved | 65.42 | |||||||||||
D3679 | 08517 | 15/08/1958 | DA | Percy Main | 20/07/2001 | 42.92 | 65.41 | |||||||||||
D3680 | 08518 | 19/07/1958 | DO | Stratford | 22/06/1986 | Stratford | 27.92 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 25/03/1994 | 35.71 | |||||||
D3681 | 08519 | 31/07/1958 | DO | Stratford | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 09/2000 | 42.16 | ||||||||||
D3682 | 08520 | 13/08/1958 | DO | Stratford | 12/01/1986 | Stratford | 27.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 28/02/1986 | 27.56 | |||||||
D3683 | 08521 | 27/08/1958 | DO | Stratford | 22/06/1993 | Allerton | 34.83 | Cut | Coopers Metals (at Allerton MPD) | 03/1994 | 35.57 | |||||||
D3684 | 08522 | 02/09/1958 | DO | Stratford | 04/08/1985 | Cambridge | 26.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 26/10/1985 | 27.17 | |||||||
D3685 | 08523 | 06/09/1958 | DO | Sheffield Darnall | 65.35 | |||||||||||||
D3686 | 08524 | 18/09/1958 | DO | Sheffield Darnall | 06/01/1986 | Longsight | 27.33 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 12/1987 | 29.26 | |||||||
D3687 | 08525 | 24/02/1959 | DA | Hornsey | 64.88 | |||||||||||||
D3688 | 08526 | 27/02/1959 | DA | Hornsey | 28/02/2007 | 48 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 03/2008 | 49.08 | ||||||||
D3689 | 08527 | 04/03/1959 | DA | Kings Cross | 64.85 | |||||||||||||
D3690 | 08528 | 09/03/1959 | DA | Hornsey | Prs | Preserved | 64.84 | |||||||||||
D3691 | 08529 | 12/03/1959 | DA | Hornsey | 30/06/2005 | 46.25 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/2008 | 49.46 | ||||||||
D3692 | 08530 | 19/03/1959 | DA | Hornsey | 64.81 | |||||||||||||
D3693 | 08531 | 01/04/1959 | DA | Hornsey | 64.78 | |||||||||||||
D3694 | 08532 | 09/04/1959 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 23/04/1993 | Allerton | 34 | Cut | Coopers Metals (at Allerton MPD) | 03/1994 | 34.96 | |||||||
D3695 | 08533 | 28/04/1959 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 16/10/1992 | Stratford | 33.5 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 01/1994 | 34.74 | |||||||
D3696 | 08534 | 28/04/1959 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 31/08/2005 | 46.33 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 05/2007 | 48.08 | ||||||||
01/05/1959 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 08/1965 to 13 |
64.70 | ||||||||||||||
D3698 | D4500 | 13003 | 07/05/1959 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 06/1965 to 13 |
64.68 | |||||||||||
D3699 | 08535 | 07/05/1959 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 01/10/2000 | 41.42 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 09/2009 | 50.39 | ||||||||
D3700 | 08536 | 13/05/1959 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 64.66 | |||||||||||||
D3701 | 08537 | 22/05/1959 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 25/05/1990 | Immingham | 31 | Cut | Coopers Metals (at Bescot MPD) | 04/11/1994 | 35.48 | |||||||
D3702 | 08538 | 27/05/1959 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 64.62 | |||||||||||||
D3703 | 08539 | 03/06/1959 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 31/03/1992 | Ipswich | 32.75 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 05/10/1993 | 34.36 | |||||||
D3704 | 08540 | 03/06/1959 | DA | Hornsey | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 64.61 | |||||||||||
D3705 | 08541 | 08/06/1959 | DA | Hornsey | 31/08/2005 | 46.17 | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 05/2008 | 48.97 | ||||||||
D3706 | 08542 | 15/06/1959 | DA | Hornsey | 31/08/2005 | 46.17 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) | 30/04/2006 | 46.91 | ||||||||
D3707 | 08543 | 23/06/1959 | DA | Immingham | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 64.55 | |||||||||||
D3708 | 08544 | 30/06/1959 | DA | Immingham | 17/07/1992 | 33.08 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 30/09/1994 | 35.28 | ||||||||
D3709 | 08545 | 10/07/1959 | DA | Immingham | 28/09/1980 | Finsbury Park | 21.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/11/1983 | 24.34 | |||||||
D3710 | 08546 | 06/08/1959 | DA | New England | 28/07/1985 | Stratford | 25.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 28/02/1986 | 26.58 | |||||||
D3711 | 08547 | 14/08/1959 | DA | New England | 20/12/1981 | Stratford | 22.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1982 | 22.77 | |||||||
D3712 | 08548 | 21/08/1959 | DA | Hornsey | 19/12/1982 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 23.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 10/12/1983 | 24.32 | |||||||
D3713 | 08549 | 03/09/1959 | DA | Hornsey | 24/11/1985 | March | 26.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 16/10/1992 | 33.14 | |||||||
D3714 | 08550 | 17/09/1959 | DA | Mexborough | 06/03/1983 | Stratford | 23.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1986 | 26.68 | |||||||
D3715 | 08551 | 17/09/1959 | DA | Mexborough | 31/10/1982 | Finsbury Park | 23.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 26/11/1983 | 24.21 | |||||||
D3716 | 08552 | 28/09/1959 | DA | Doncaster | 15/08/1982 | Stratford | 22.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 01/1983 | 23.32 | |||||||
D3717 | 08553 | 13/10/1959 | DA | Doncaster | 31/05/1981 | Cambridge | 21.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1983 | 23.44 | |||||||
D3718 | 08554 | 20/10/1959 | DA | Doncaster | 15/08/1982 | Stratford | 22.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 03/1983 | 23.42 | |||||||
D3722 | 08555 | 23/10/1959 | DA | Kings Cross | 15/08/1982 | Finsbury Park | 22.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 12/11/1983 | 24.07 | |||||||
D3723 | 08556 | 30/10/1959 | DA | Kings Cross | 03/07/1990 | Willesden | 30.75 | Prs | Preserved | 34.01 | ||||||||
D3724 | 08557 | 13/11/1959 | DA | Kings Cross | 19/12/1982 | Finsbury Park | 23.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 03/12/1983 | 24.07 | |||||||
D3725 | 08558 | 26/11/1959 | DA | Kings Cross | 26/01/1986 | March | 26.17 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 05/1989 | 29.49 | |||||||
D3726 | 08559 | 18/12/1959 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 20/12/1981 | York (North) | 22 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 29/10/1983 | 23.88 | |||||||
D3727 | 08560 | 22/12/1959 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 31/05/1981 | Shirebrook | 21.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1982 | 22.24 | |||||||
D3728 | 08561 | 24/01/1959 | CW | St Margarets | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 64.96 | |||||||||||
D3729 | 08562 | 24/01/1959 | CW | St Margarets | 31/01/1994 | Doncaster | 35 | Cut | MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) | 29/08/1997 | 38.62 | |||||||
D3730 | 08563 | 27/01/1959 | CW | St Margarets | 25/04/1982 | Motherwell | 23.25 | Cut | D Christie (Camlackie) | 04/1987 | 28.23 | |||||||
D3731 | 08564 | 04/02/1959 | CW | St Margarets | 02/12/1985 | Thornton Junction | 26.83 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 05/1986 | 27.29 | |||||||
D3732 | 08565 | 26/02/1959 | CW | St Margarets | 23/07/1993 | Motherwell | 34.42 | Cut | MC Metals (at Motherwell MPD) | 05/1997 | 38.24 | |||||||
D3733 | 08566 | 02/04/1959 | CW | St Margarets | 19/10/1975 | Eastfield | 16.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 30/11/1977 | 18.68 | |||||||
D3734 | 08567 | 17/04/1959 | CW | St Margarets | 64.73 | |||||||||||||
D3735 | 08568 | 24/04/1959 | CW | St Margarets | 64.72 | |||||||||||||
D3736 | 08569 | 01/05/1959 | CW | Haymarket | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 64.70 | |||||||||||
D3737 | 08570 | 08/05/1959 | CW | Dalry Road | 18/01/1992 | Eastfield | 32.67 | Cut | MC Metals (at Motherwell MPD) | 09/09/1993 | 34.36 | |||||||
D3738 | 08571 | 05/06/1959 | CW | Dalry Road | 64.60 | |||||||||||||
D3739 | 08572 | 27/05/1959 | CW | Dalry Road | 22/02/1981 | Haymarket | 21.75 | Cut | J W Ransome (Frome) | 15/10/1983 | 24.40 | |||||||
D3740 | 08573 | 05/06/1959 | CW | Dalry Road | 64.60 | |||||||||||||
D3741 | 08574 | 05/06/1959 | CW | Dalry Road | 01/03/1981 | Healey Mills | 21.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1986 | 27.21 | |||||||
D3742 | 08575 | 13/06/1959 | CW | Dalry Road | 64.58 | |||||||||||||
D3743 | 08576 | 20/06/1959 | CW | Newport Pill | 30/04/2006 | 46.83 | Prs | Preserved | 47.93 | |||||||||
D3744 | 08577 | 20/06/1959 | CW | Newport Pill | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 64.56 | |||||||||||
D3745 | 08578 | 26/06/1959 | CW | Newport Pill | 64.54 | |||||||||||||
D3746 | 08579 | 02/07/1959 | CW | Newport Pill | 07/11/1988 | Holbeck (MR) | 29.33 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 16/02/1995 | 35.65 | |||||||
D3747 | 08580 | 04/07/1959 | CW | Newport Pill | 64.52 | |||||||||||||
D3748 | 08581 | 29/07/1959 | CW | Newport Pill | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 09/2000 | 41.16 | ||||||||||
D3749 | 08582 | 04/08/1959 | CW | Newport Pill | 30/09/2008 | 49.08 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 07/2009 | 49.98 | ||||||||
D3750 | 08583 | 10/08/1959 | CW | Danygraig | 23/07/1993 | Knottingley | 33.92 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 18/10/1995 | 36.21 | |||||||
D3751 | 08584 | 18/08/1959 | CW | Danygraig | 23/08/1991 | Laira | 32 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 29/10/1993 | 34.22 | |||||||
D3752 | 08585 | 22/08/1959 | CW | Danygraig | 05/10/1981 | Bescot | 22.17 | 64.39 | ||||||||||
D3753 | 08586 | 07/09/1959 | CW | Danygraig | 01/03/1996 | 36.5 | Cut | EMR (at Ayr MPD) | 05/2000 | 40.72 | ||||||||
D3754 | 08587 | 14/09/1959 | CW | Danygraig | 30/09/2008 | 49 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 12/2009 | 50.29 | ||||||||
D3755 | 08588 | 22/09/1959 | CW | Danygraig | 64.30 | |||||||||||||
D3756 | 08589 | 05/10/1959 | CW | Danygraig | 24/11/1992 | Cardiff Canton | 33.08 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 02/02/1994 | 34.35 | |||||||
D3757 | 08590 | 05/10/1959 | CW | Danygraig | 27/09/1993 | 33.92 | Prs | Preserved | 64.27 | |||||||||
D3758 | 08591 | 21/10/1959 | CW | Danygraig | 26/02/1993 | Ayr | 33.33 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 02/11/1993 | 34.06 | |||||||
D3759 | 08592 | 08993 | 27/10/1959 | CW | Danygraig | 64.21 | ||||||||||||
D3760 | 08593 | 12/11/1959 | CW | Danygraig | 64.16 | |||||||||||||
D3761 | 08594 | 13/11/1959 | CW | Danygraig | 20/07/2001 | 41.67 | Prs | Preserved | 64.16 | |||||||||
D3762 | 08595 | 25/11/1959 | CW | Danygraig | 23/07/1993 | Doncaster | 33.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 18/10/1995 | 35.92 | |||||||
D3763 | 08596 | 18/04/1959 | DE | Preston | 12/03/1977 | Old Oak Common | 17.92 | 64.73 | ||||||||||
D3764 | 08597 | 25/04/1959 | DE | Chester (MR) | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 64.71 | |||||||||||
D3765 | 08598 | 02/05/1959 | DE | Longsight | 10/11/1986 | Crewe Diesel | 27.5 | Prs | Preserved | 64.69 | ||||||||
D3766 | 08599 | 09/05/1959 | DE | Longsight | 31/12/2007 | 48.58 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 03/2008 | 48.88 | ||||||||
D3767 | 08600 | 16/05/1959 | DE | Longsight | 30/07/1999 | 40.17 | Prs | Preserved | 64.65 | |||||||||
D3768 | 08601 | 16/05/1959 | DE | Longsight | 31/05/2004 | 45 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Bryn Engineering, Wigan) | 12/2005 | 46.62 | ||||||||
D3769 | 08602 | 30/05/1959 | DE | Longsight | 30/03/1986 | Carlisle Kingmoor | 26.83 | Prs | Preserved | 64.62 | ||||||||
D3770 | 08603 | 30/05/1959 | DE | Longsight | 31/01/1994 | Bescot | 34.67 | Cut | Birds (Long Marston) | 08/1994 | 35.24 | |||||||
D3771 | 08604 | 13/06/1959 | DE | Longsight | 16/07/1993 | Derby | 34.08 | Prs | Preserved | 64.58 | ||||||||
D3772 | 08605 | 13/06/1959 | DE | Stockport Edgeley | 64.58 | |||||||||||||
D3773 | 08606 | 27/06/1959 | DE | Stockport Edgeley | 29/02/1988 | Stratford | 28.67 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 09/1989 | 30.24 | |||||||
D3774 | 08607 | 04/07/1959 | DE | Burton | 31/01/2003 | 43.5 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) | 28/02/2007 | 47.69 | ||||||||
D3775 | 08608 | 11/07/1959 | DE | Rowsley | 07/11/1988 | Gateshead | 29.33 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 13/05/1994 | 34.86 | |||||||
D3776 | 08609 | 11/07/1959 | DE | Rowsley | 08/11/1993 | Willesden | 34.33 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 09/2000 | 41.21 | |||||||
D3777 | 08610 | 25/07/1959 | DE | Kettering | 26/06/1998 | 38.92 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 30/10/2004 | 45.30 | ||||||||
D3778 | 08611 | 08/08/1959 | DE | Kettering | 64.42 | |||||||||||||
D3779 | 08612 | 15/08/1959 | DE | Kettering | 21/09/1990 | Old Oak Common | 31.08 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 28/03/1991 | 31.64 | |||||||
D3780 | 08613 | 22/08/1959 | DE | Lower Darwen | 01/12/1993 | 34.33 | Prs | Preserved | 64.39 | |||||||||
D3781 | 08614 | 29/08/1959 | DE | Lower Darwen | 05/02/1993 | Willesden | 33.5 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 14/01/1994 | 34.40 | |||||||
D3782 | 08615 | 05/09/1959 | DE | Rose Grove | 01/12/1993 | Allerton | 34.25 | 64.35 | ||||||||||
D3783 | 08616 | 05/09/1959 | DE | Rose Grove | 64.35 | |||||||||||||
D3784 | 08617 | 12/09/1959 | DE | Newton Heath | 12/10/1981 | 22.08 | 64.33 | |||||||||||
D3785 | 08618 | 19/09/1959 | DE | Newton Heath | 14/09/1990 | 31 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (at Gateshead MPD) | 13/02/2001 | 41.43 | ||||||||
D3786 | 08619 | 26/09/1959 | DE | Leicester Midland | 12/10/1981 | 22.08 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/2001 | 41.66 | ||||||||
D3787 | 08620 | 09205 | 26/09/1959 | DE | Leicester Midland | 10/12/1992 to 09 |
64.29 | |||||||||||
D3788 | 08621 | 10/10/1959 | DE | Leicester Midland | 20/06/1988 | Landore | 28.67 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 06/11/1990 | 31.10 | |||||||
D3789 | 08622 | 17/10/1959 | DE | Leicester Midland | Prs | Preserved | 64.23 | |||||||||||
D3790 | 08623 | 24/10/1959 | DE | Leicester Midland | 64.21 | |||||||||||||
D3791 | 08624 | 24/10/1959 | DE | Leicester Midland | 64.21 | |||||||||||||
D3792 | 08625 | 31/10/1959 | DE | Hasland | 31/01/2004 | 44.25 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) | 26/02/2004 | 44.35 | ||||||||
D3793 | 08626 | 31/10/1959 | DE | Widnes | 27/04/1988 | Doncaster | 28.5 | Cut | Coopers Metals (at Allerton MPD) | 03/1994 | 34.39 | |||||||
D3794 | 08627 | 07/11/1959 | DE | Widnes | 31/01/1994 | Stratford | 34.17 | Cut | Birds (at Ipswich MPD) | 10/02/1997 | 37.29 | |||||||
D3795 | 08628 | 21/11/1959 | DE | Warrington Dallam | 12/10/1981 | 21.92 | Prs | Preserved | 64.14 | |||||||||
D3796 | 08629 | 21/11/1959 | DE | Warrington Dallam | 64.14 | |||||||||||||
D3797 | 08630 | 28/11/1959 | DE | Warrington Dallam | 64.12 | |||||||||||||
D3798 | 08631 | 05/12/1959 | DE | Stoke | 11/12/1992 | March | 33 | Prs | Preserved | 64.10 | ||||||||
D3799 | 08632 | 05/12/1959 | DE | Stoke | 64.10 | |||||||||||||
D3800 | 08633 | 12/12/1959 | DE | Stoke | 64.08 | |||||||||||||
D3801 | 08634 | 19/12/1959 | DE | Stoke | 01/02/1993 | Stratford | 33.17 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth) | 20/08/2005 | 45.70 | |||||||
D3802 | 08635 | 26/12/1959 | DE | Stoke | 28/02/2007 | 47.17 | Prs | Preserved | 64.04 | |||||||||
D3803 | 08636 | 05/12/1958 | HO | St Philips Marsh | 27/07/1980 | Landore | 21.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/06/1983 | 24.51 | |||||||
D3804 | 08637 | 11/12/1958 | HO | St Philips Marsh | 09/08/1991 | Ashford Chart Leacon | 32.67 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 04/04/1993 | 34.34 | |||||||
D3805 | 08638 | 18/12/1958 | HO | St Philips Marsh | 11/12/1992 | Reading (W.R.) | 34 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 24/03/1994 | 35.29 | |||||||
D3806 | 08639 | 23/12/1958 | HO | St Philips Marsh | 30/10/1988 | Landore | 29.83 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 09/1989 | 30.75 | |||||||
D3807 | 08640 | 29/12/1958 | HO | St Philips Marsh | 14/11/1988 | Reading (W.R.) | 29.92 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 29/03/1991 | 32.27 | |||||||
D3808 | 08641 | 16/01/1959 | HO | St Philips Marsh | 64.98 | |||||||||||||
D3809 | 08642 | 23/01/1959 | HO | St Philips Marsh | 31/05/2006 | 47.33 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 28/06/2006 | 47.46 | ||||||||
D3810 | 08643 | 30/01/1959 | HO | Newport Pill | 2001 | 41.92 | Prs | Preserved | 64.95 | |||||||||
D3811 | 08644 | 04/02/1959 | HO | Newport Pill | 64.93 | |||||||||||||
D3812 | 08645 | 13/02/1959 | HO | Newport Pill | 64.91 | |||||||||||||
D3813 | 08646 | 20/02/1959 | HO | Newport Pill | 64.89 | |||||||||||||
D3814 | 08647 | 26/02/1959 | HO | Newport Pill | 02/04/1997 | 38.17 | Cut | South Yorkshire Preservation Society (Meadowhall) | 08/1997 | 38.49 | ||||||||
D3815 | 08648 | 04/03/1959 | HO | Newport Pill | 64.85 | |||||||||||||
D3816 | 08649 | 10/03/1959 | HO | Newport Pill | 64.84 | |||||||||||||
D3817 | 08650 | 18/03/1959 | HO | Newport Pill | 01/08/1989 | Eastleigh | 30.42 | Prs | Preserved | 64.82 | ||||||||
D3818 | 08651 | 20/03/1959 | HO | Newport Pill | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 64.81 | |||||||||||
D3819 | 08652 | 26/03/1959 | HO | Newport Pill | 20/06/1992 | Cardiff Canton | 33.25 | Prs | Preserved | 64.79 | ||||||||
D3820 | 08653 | 02/04/1959 | HO | Newport Pill | 64.78 | |||||||||||||
D3821 | 08654 | 08/04/1959 | HO | Newport Pill | 25/10/1991 | Cardiff Canton | 32.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 13/05/1994 | 35.12 | |||||||
D3822 | 08655 | 15/04/1959 | HO | Newport Pill | 31/08/2005 | 46.33 | Cut | Donald Ward (at LHGS, Barton under Needwood) | 30/04/2007 | 48.07 | ||||||||
D3823 | 08656 | 24/04/1959 | HO | Newport Pill | 05/02/1993 | Bletchley | 33.83 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 03/09/1994 | 35.39 | |||||||
D3824 | 08657 | 30/04/1959 | HO | Newport Pill | 22/11/1991 | Knottingley | 32.58 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 07/01/1994 | 34.72 | |||||||
D3825 | 08658 | 05/05/1959 | HO | Danygraig | 05/02/1993 | Norwich Thorpe | 33.75 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 14/01/1994 | 34.72 | |||||||
D3826 | 08659 | 13/05/1959 | HO | Danygraig | 24/06/1991 | Knottingley | 32.08 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 03/03/1995 | 35.83 | |||||||
D3827 | 08660 | 19/05/1959 | HO | Danygraig | 08/11/1991 | Cardiff Canton | 32.5 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 07/01/1994 | 34.66 | |||||||
D3828 | 08661 | 22/05/1959 | HO | Danygraig | 31/01/2003 | 43.67 | Cut | English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) | 26/02/2003 | 43.80 | ||||||||
D3829 | 08662 | 29/05/1959 | HO | Danygraig | 64.62 | |||||||||||||
D3830 | 08663 | 05/06/1959 | HO | Danygraig | 64.60 | |||||||||||||
D3831 | 08664 | 12/06/1959 | HO | Danygraig | 64.58 | |||||||||||||
D3832 | 08665 | 01/01/1960 | CW | Mold Junction | 30/09/2008 | 48.67 | 64.02 | |||||||||||
D3833 | 08666 | 01/01/1960 | CW | Mold Junction | 16/01/1995 | Allerton | 35 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) | 30/06/2006 | 46.53 | |||||||
D3834 | 08667 | 02/01/1960 | CW | Warrington Dallam | 11/11/1992 | Neville Hill | 32.83 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 03/03/1995 | 35.19 | |||||||
D3835 | 08668 | 02/01/1960 | CW | Warrington Dallam | 02/04/1997 | 37.25 | 64.02 | |||||||||||
D3836 | 08669 | 02/01/1960 | CW | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 23/05/1989 | Longsight | 29.33 | Prs | Preserved | 64.02 | ||||||||
D3837 | 08670 | 02/01/1960 | CW | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 12/10/1981 | 21.75 | 64.02 | |||||||||||
D3838 | 08671 | 02/01/1960 | CW | Carnforth | 07/11/1988 | Gateshead | 28.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 13/05/1994 | 34.38 | |||||||
D3839 | 08672 | 02/01/1960 | CW | Carnforth | 21/09/1992 | 32.67 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 15/01/1994 | 34.06 | ||||||||
D3840 | 08673 | 16/01/1960 | CW | Carnforth | 16/01/1995 | Allerton | 35 | Cut | S Norton (Liverpool) | 04/2003 | 43.27 | |||||||
D3841 | 08674 | 06/02/1960 | CW | Carnforth | 05/07/1981 | Bescot | 21.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 23/07/1983 | 23.47 | |||||||
D3842 | 08675 | 27/06/1959 | HO | Patricroft | 31/08/2005 | 46.17 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 30/06/2007 | 48.04 | ||||||||
D3843 | 08676 | 04/07/1959 | HO | Patricroft | 64.52 | |||||||||||||
D3844 | 08677 | 11/07/1959 | HO | Patricroft | 10/06/1993 | Willesden | 33.92 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 06/2000 | 40.96 | |||||||
D3845 | 08678 | 01/08/1959 | HO | Patricroft | 30/10/1988 | Tinsley | 29.17 | Prs | Preserved | 64.44 | ||||||||
D3846 | 08679 | 08/08/1959 | HO | Patricroft | 19/06/1976 | Allerton | 16.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1986 | 26.70 | |||||||
D3847 | 08680 | 15/08/1959 | HO | Trafford Park (LMS) | 06/07/1992 | Eastfield | 32.92 | Cut | MC Metals (at Motherwell MPD) | 10/09/1993 | 34.10 | |||||||
D3848 | 08681 | 22/08/1959 | HO | Trafford Park (LMS) | 29/10/1985 | Swindon Works | 26.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 09/1986 | 27.08 | |||||||
D3849 | 08682 | 29/08/1959 | HO | Trafford Park (LMS) | 64.37 | |||||||||||||
D3850 | 08683 | 05/09/1959 | HO | Trafford Park (LMS) | 64.35 | |||||||||||||
D3851 | 08684 | 12/09/1959 | HO | Trafford Park (LMS) | 07/12/1986 | Bletchley | 27.25 | Cut | MRJ Philips (at Bicester) | 06/1995 | 35.78 | |||||||
D3852 | 08685 | 19/09/1959 | HO | Heaton Mersey | 64.31 | |||||||||||||
D3853 | 08686 | 26/09/1959 | HO | Heaton Mersey | 22/11/1991 | Allerton | 32.17 | Cut | Coopers Metals (at Allerton MPD) | 03/1994 | 34.49 | |||||||
D3854 | 08687 | 03/10/1959 | HO | Heaton Mersey | 64.27 | |||||||||||||
D3855 | 08688 | 10/10/1959 | HO | Brunswick | 01/03/1991 | Allerton | 31.42 | Cut | Coopers Metals (at Allerton MPD) | 03/1994 | 34.45 | |||||||
D3856 | 08689 | 17/10/1959 | HO | Brunswick | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 64.23 | |||||||||||
D3857 | 08690 | 24/10/1959 | HO | Brunswick | 12/10/1981 | 22 | 64.21 | |||||||||||
D3858 | 08691 | 31/10/1959 | HO | Walton on the Hill | 64.19 | |||||||||||||
D3859 | 08692 | 07/11/1959 | HO | Annesley | 31/01/1994 | Crewe Diesel | 34.17 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth) | 03/2005 | 45.38 | |||||||
D3860 | 08693 | 14/11/1959 | HO | Annesley | 16/06/2000 | 40.58 | Cut | English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) | 25/05/2000 | 40.56 | ||||||||
D3861 | 08694 | 21/11/1959 | HO | Derby | 30/09/2008 | 48.83 | Prs | Preserved | 64.14 | |||||||||
D3862 | 08695 | 28/11/1959 | HO | Derby | 28/02/2007 | 47.25 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 12/2009 | 50.08 | ||||||||
D3863 | 08696 | 05/12/1959 | HO | Derby | 64.10 | |||||||||||||
D3864 | 08697 | 19/12/1959 | HO | Derby | 64.06 | |||||||||||||
D3865 | 08698 | 19/12/1959 | HO | Derby | 04/10/1981 | Stratford | 21.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 64.06 | ||||||||
D3866 | 08699 | 14/01/1960 | HO | Stoke | 22/10/1993 | Crewe Diesel | 33.75 | 63.99 | ||||||||||
D3867 | 08700 | 20/01/1960 | HO | Lancaster Green Ayre | 29/06/2001 | 41.42 | Prs | Preserved | 44.52 | |||||||||
D3868 | 08701 | 05/02/1960 | HO | Newton Heath | 63.93 | |||||||||||||
D3869 | 08702 | 12/02/1960 | HO | Cricklewood East | 28/02/2004 | 44 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 02/2004 | 44.04 | ||||||||
D3870 | 08703 | 17/02/1960 | HO | Stoke | 63.90 | |||||||||||||
D3871 | 08704 | 29/02/1960 | HO | Lancaster Green Ayre | 05/11/1990 | Bletchley | 30.75 | Prs | Preserved | 30.71 | ||||||||
D3872 | 08705 | 12/03/1960 | CW | York (North) | 07/01/1994 | March | 33.83 | Cut | Birds (at Stratford MPD) | 03/1994 | 34.03 | |||||||
D3873 | 08706 | 19/03/1960 | CW | Thornaby | 63.81 | |||||||||||||
D3874 | 08707 | 19/03/1960 | CW | York (North) | 23/07/1993 | Knottingley | 33.33 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth) | 28/02/2005 | 44.98 | |||||||
D3875 | 08708 | 26/03/1960 | CW | Thornaby | 09/10/1992 | Stratford | 32.58 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 02/1994 | 33.92 | |||||||
D3876 | 08709 | 01/04/1960 | CW | Thornaby | 63.78 | |||||||||||||
D3877 | 08710 | 21/04/1960 | CW | St Margarets | 25/01/1993 | 32.75 | Cut | MC Metals (at Motherwell MPD) | 14/09/1993 | 33.42 | ||||||||
D3878 | 08711 | 28/04/1960 | CW | St Margarets | 63.70 | |||||||||||||
D3879 | 08712 | 28/04/1960 | CW | St Margarets | 11/12/1992 | Motherwell | 32.67 | Cut | MC Metals (at Motherwell MPD) | 15/09/1993 | 33.41 | |||||||
D3880 | 08713 | 29/04/1960 | CW | St Margarets | 26/06/1998 | 38.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 14/06/2000 | 40.15 | ||||||||
D3881 | 08714 | 04/05/1960 | CW | St Margarets | 63.68 | |||||||||||||
D3882 | 08715 | 04/05/1960 | CW | St Margarets | 30/09/2008 | 48.33 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 02/2009 | 48.82 | ||||||||
D3883 | 08716 | 18/05/1960 | CW | St Margarets | 30/11/1988 | Cambridge | 28.5 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 04/1990 | 29.93 | |||||||
D3884 | 08717 | 09204 | 19/05/1960 | CW | St Margarets | 23/10/1992 to 09 |
Prs | Preserved | 63.64 | |||||||||
D3885 | 23/05/1960 | CW | St Margarets | 04/02/1972 | Leith Central | 11.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 03/1972 | 11.82 | ||||||||
D3886 | 08718 | 25/05/1960 | CW | St Margarets | Cut | EMR (at Ayr MPD) | 05/2000 | 40.00 | ||||||||||
D3887 | 08719 | 31/05/1960 | CW | St Margarets | 22/11/1991 | Bletchley | 31.5 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 03/09/1994 | 34.28 | |||||||
D3888 | 08720 | 10/06/1960 | CW | St Margarets | 28/02/2007 | 46.67 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 30/11/2007 | 47.50 | ||||||||
D3889 | 08721 | 15/06/1960 | CW | St Margarets | 63.57 | |||||||||||||
D3890 | 08722 | 22/06/1960 | CW | St Margarets | 12/03/1987 | Gateshead | 26.75 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 07/1988 | 28.08 | |||||||
D3891 | 08723 | 27/06/1960 | CW | St Margarets | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) | 07/2002 | 42.08 | ||||||||||
D3892 | 08724 | 01/07/1960 | CW | St Margarets | 63.53 | |||||||||||||
D3893 | 08725 | 22/07/1960 | CW | Hawick | 14/08/1992 | Eastfield | 32.08 | Cut | MC Metals (at Motherwell MPD) | 25/09/1993 | 33.20 | |||||||
D3894 | 08726 | 27/07/1960 | CW | Parkhead | 26/01/1987 | Haymarket | 26.5 | Cut | Vic Berry (at Thornton Yard) | 05/1987 | 26.82 | |||||||
D3895 | 08727 | 03/08/1960 | CW | Parkhead | 03/03/1993 | Ayr | 32.58 | Cut | MC Metals (at Motherwell MPD) | 03/10/1993 | 33.19 | |||||||
D3896 | 08728 | 12/08/1960 | CW | Parkhead | 12/10/1987 | Motherwell | 27.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 11/2009 | 49.29 | |||||||
D3897 | 08729 | 17/08/1960 | CW | Ayr | 22/02/1990 | Doncaster | 29.5 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 28/03/1994 | 33.63 | |||||||
D3898 | 08730 | 23/08/1960 | CW | Parkhead | 63.38 | |||||||||||||
D3899 | 08731 | 01/09/1960 | CW | Parkhead | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 21/06/2002 | 41.83 | ||||||||||
D3900 | 08732 | 09202 | 08/09/1960 | CW | Parkhead | 24/11/1992 to 09 |
63.34 | |||||||||||
D3901 | 08733 | 15/09/1960 | CW | Parkhead | 23/07/1993 | Motherwell | 32.83 | Cut | English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) | 09/2000 | 40.03 | |||||||
D3902 | 08734 | 20/09/1960 | CW | Kipps | Prs | Preserved | 63.30 | |||||||||||
D3903 | 08735 | 24/09/1960 | CW | Kipps | 63.29 | |||||||||||||
D3904 | 08736 | 24/09/1960 | CW | Kipps | 12/10/1987 | Motherwell | 27.08 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 11/2009 | 49.18 | |||||||
D3905 | 08737 | 08/10/1960 | CW | Polmadie | 63.25 | |||||||||||||
D3906 | 08738 | 14/10/1960 | CW | Polmadie | 63.24 | |||||||||||||
D3907 | 08739 | 18/10/1960 | CW | Polmadie | 30/09/2005 | 44.92 | Cut | S Norton (Liverpool) | 29/10/2005 | 45.06 | ||||||||
D3908 | 08740 | 20/10/1960 | CW | Polmadie | 31/08/2005 | 44.83 | Cut | Donald Ward (at LHGS, Barton under Needwood) | 30/04/2007 | 46.56 | ||||||||
D3909 | 08741 | 27/10/1960 | CW | Polmadie | 16/04/1991 | Derby | 30.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 13/05/1994 | 33.56 | |||||||
D3910 | 08742 | 01/11/1960 | CW | Polmadie | 63.19 | |||||||||||||
D3911 | 08743 | 09/11/1960 | CW | Polmadie | 03/03/1993 | Neville Hill | 32.33 | 63.17 | ||||||||||
D3912 | 08744 | 18/11/1960 | CW | Polmadie | 31/03/1992 | Longsight | 31.33 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 04/10/1993 | 32.90 | |||||||
D3913 | 08745 | 22/11/1960 | CW | Polmadie | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 14/11/2012 | 52.01 | ||||||||||
D3914 | 08746 | 26/11/1960 | CW | Polmadie | 31/08/2003 | 42.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/2004 | 43.16 | ||||||||
D3915 | 08747 | 02/12/1960 | CW | Polmadie | 11/07/1990 | Gateshead | 29.58 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 05/11/1993 | 32.95 | |||||||
D3916 | 08748 | 10/12/1960 | CW | Polmadie | 21/01/1994 | 33.08 | Cut | Birds (at Ipswich MPD) | 10/02/1997 | 36.19 | ||||||||
D3917 | 08749 | 09104 | 12/12/1960 | CW | Polmadie | 05/01/1993 to 09 |
63.08 | |||||||||||
D3918 | 08750 | 20/12/1960 | CW | Greenock Ladyburn | 63.05 | |||||||||||||
D3919 | 08751 | 28/12/1960 | CW | Greenock Ladyburn | 28/02/2004 | 43.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/09/2004 | 43.72 | ||||||||
D3920 | 08752 | 30/12/1960 | CW | Greenock Ladyburn | 63.03 | |||||||||||||
D3921 | 08753 | 31/12/1960 | CW | Greenock Ladyburn | 26/03/1993 | Motherwell | 32.25 | Cut | MC Metals (at Motherwell MPD) | 03/10/1993 | 32.78 | |||||||
D3922 | 08754 | 12/01/1961 | HO | Corkerhill | 62.99 | |||||||||||||
D3923 | 08755 | 20/01/1961 | HO | Corkerhill | 10/09/1993 | Motherwell | 32.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 09/06/2000 | 39.41 | |||||||
D3924 | 08756 | 27/01/1961 | HO | Corkerhill | 62.95 | |||||||||||||
D3925 | 08757 | 01/02/1961 | HO | Corkerhill | 62.94 | |||||||||||||
D3926 | 08758 | 08/02/1961 | HO | Corkerhill | 30/06/2005 | 44.33 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 08/2005 | 44.55 | ||||||||
D3927 | 08759 | 09106 | 16/02/1961 | HO | Ardrossan | 09/06/1993 to 09 |
62.90 | |||||||||||
D3928 | 08760 | 22/02/1961 | HO | Ardrossan | 14/02/1992 | Eastleigh | 31 | Cut | MRJ Philips (at Eastleigh Works) | 05/05/1997 | 36.22 | |||||||
D3929 | 08761 | 01/03/1961 | HO | Ardrossan | 20/03/1992 | Eastfield | 31 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 03/10/1993 | 32.61 | |||||||
D3930 | 08762 | 06/03/1961 | HO | Kittybrewster | 62.85 | |||||||||||||
D3931 | 08763 | 10/03/1961 | HO | Kittybrewster | 06/10/1989 | Haymarket | 28.58 | Cut | MC Metals (at Eastfield MPD) | 10/1990 | 29.62 | |||||||
D3932 | 08764 | 17/03/1961 | HO | Kittybrewster | 06/05/1988 | Haymarket | 27.17 | Prs | Preserved | 27.35 | ||||||||
D3933 | 08765 | 23/03/1961 | HO | Kittybrewster | 62.80 | |||||||||||||
D3934 | 08766 | 09103 | 28/03/1961 | HO | Kittybrewster | 05/01/1993 to 09 |
62.79 | |||||||||||
D3935 | 08767 | 06/04/1961 | HO | Kittybrewster | 31/01/1994 | Stratford | 32.75 | Prs | Preserved | 62.76 | ||||||||
D3936 | 08768 | 13/04/1961 | HO | Kittybrewster | 31/08/2005 | 44.33 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 30/06/2007 | 46.24 | ||||||||
D3937 | 08769 | 04/03/1960 | DE | Royston | 23/05/1989 | Landore | 29.17 | Prs | Preserved | 40.06 | ||||||||
D3938 | 08770 | 04/03/1960 | DE | Percy Main | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 63.85 | |||||||||||
D3939 | 08771 | 10/03/1960 | DE | Percy Main | 20/03/1992 | 32 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 30/09/1994 | 34.58 | ||||||||
D3940 | 08772 | 16/03/1960 | DE | York (North) | 14/01/1994 | 33.83 | Prs | Preserved | 63.82 | |||||||||
D3941 | 08773 | 19/03/1960 | DE | Royston | 20/07/2001 | 41.33 | Prs | Preserved | 63.81 | |||||||||
D3942 | 08774 | 26/03/1960 | DE | Percy Main | 20/09/1988 | Thornaby | 28.5 | Prs | Preserved | 63.79 | ||||||||
D3943 | 08775 | 26/03/1960 | DE | Percy Main | 30/09/2008 | 48.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 06/2009 | 49.25 | ||||||||
D3944 | 08776 | 31/03/1960 | DE | Hull Dairycoates | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 63.78 | |||||||||||
D3945 | 08777 | 31/03/1960 | DE | Hull Dairycoates | 22/11/1991 | Knottingley | 31.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 15/03/1997 | 36.98 | |||||||
D3946 | 08778 | 02/04/1960 | DE | York (North) | 25/09/1992 | Cardiff Canton | 32.42 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 07/01/1994 | 33.79 | |||||||
D3947 | 08779 | 02/04/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 23/02/1988 | Ashford Chart Leacon | 27.83 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 04/10/1991 | 31.53 | |||||||
D3948 | 08780 | 18/04/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 01/03/2005 | 44.92 | Prs | Preserved | 63.73 | |||||||||
D3949 | 08781 | 09203 | 09/04/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 02/10/1992 to 09 |
63.75 | |||||||||||
D3950 | 08782 | 08/04/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 63.76 | |||||||||||||
D3951 | 08783 | 09/04/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 63.75 | |||||||||||||
D3952 | 08784 | 23/04/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 63.72 | |||||||||||||
D3953 | 08785 | 23/04/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 63.72 | |||||||||||||
D3954 | 08786 | 29/04/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 63.70 | |||||||||||||
D3955 | 08787 | 23/04/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 14/02/1991 | Cardiff Canton | 30.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 13/05/1994 | 34.08 | |||||||
D3956 | 08788 | 07/05/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 14/01/1994 | 33.67 | 63.68 | |||||||||||
D3957 | 08789 | 30/04/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 23/04/1993 | 33 | Cut | MRJ Philips (at Bicester) | 06/1995 | 35.15 | ||||||||
D3958 | 08790 | 14/05/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 63.66 | |||||||||||||
D3959 | 08791 | 07/05/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 01/10/1994 | Motherwell | 34.42 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 15/11/1993 | 33.55 | |||||||
D3960 | 08792 | 07/05/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 28/02/2007 | 46.75 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 30/09/2007 | 47.43 | ||||||||
D3961 | 08793 | 21/05/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 23/07/1993 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 33.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 11/2000 | 40.52 | |||||||
D3962 | 08794 | 21/05/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 13/11/1992 | Neville Hill | 32.5 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 03/03/1995 | 34.81 | |||||||
D3963 | 08795 | 21/05/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 63.64 | |||||||||||||
D3964 | 08796 | 21/05/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 04/05/1990 | Immingham | 30 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 27/04/1993 | 32.96 | |||||||
D3965 | 08797 | 28/05/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 12/11/1990 | Gateshead | 30.5 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 10/01/1994 | 33.64 | |||||||
D3966 | 08798 | 28/05/1960 | DE | Tyseley | 63.62 | |||||||||||||
D3967 | 08799 | 04/06/1960 | DE | St Blazey | 63.60 | |||||||||||||
D3968 | 08800 | 04/06/1960 | DE | St Blazey | 25/01/1993 | 32.58 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 07/01/1994 | 33.62 | ||||||||
D3969 | 08801 | 11/06/1960 | DE | St Blazey | 31/01/2004 | 43.58 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 03/2004 | 43.79 | ||||||||
D3970 | 08802 | 11/06/1960 | DE | St Blazey | 63.58 | |||||||||||||
D3971 | 08803 | 18/06/1960 | DE | St Blazey | 11/12/1992 | Reading (W.R.) | 32.5 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 01/1994 | 33.60 | |||||||
D3972 | 08804 | 18/06/1960 | DE | St Blazey | 63.56 | |||||||||||||
D3973 | 08805 | 25/06/1960 | DE | Tyseley | 63.54 | |||||||||||||
D3974 | 08806 | 25/06/1960 | DE | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 31/08/2005 | 45.17 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 30/06/2007 | 47.04 | ||||||||
D3975 | 08807 | 25/06/1960 | DE | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 28/02/2007 | 46.67 | 63.54 | |||||||||||
D3976 | 08808 | 02/07/1960 | DE | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 15/05/1990 | 29.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 27/03/1992 | 31.76 | ||||||||
D3977 | 08809 | 09/07/1960 | DE | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 01/12/1993 | Allerton | 33.42 | Prs | Preserved | 63.50 | ||||||||
D3978 | 08810 | 09/07/1960 | DE | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 63.50 | |||||||||||||
D3979 | 08811 | 16/07/1960 | DE | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 29/08/1997 | Stratford | 37.08 | Cut | MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) | 29/08/1997 | 37.15 | |||||||
D3980 | 08812 | 09/07/1960 | DE | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 06/02/1978 | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 17.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1978 | 17.69 | |||||||
D3981 | 08813 | 25/07/1960 | DE | Tyseley | 13/09/1981 | Tinsley | 21.17 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 63.46 | ||||||||
D3982 | 08814 | 25/07/1960 | DE | Tyseley | 20/11/1992 | Derby | 32.33 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 02/1994 | 33.58 | |||||||
D3983 | 08815 | 13/08/1960 | DE | Tyseley | 01/04/1996 | 35.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 09/2005 | 45.12 | ||||||||
D3984 | 08816 | 05/08/1960 | DE | Tyseley | 01/02/1986 | Thornaby | 25.5 | Cut | Wabtec (Doncaster Works) | 08/1999 | 39.05 | |||||||
D3985 | 08817 | 13/08/1960 | DE | Tyseley | 31/05/2004 | 43.75 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Bryn Engineering, Wigan) | 12/2005 | 45.37 | ||||||||
D3986 | 08818 | 13/08/1960 | DE | Tyseley | 02/04/1997 | 36.67 | 63.41 | |||||||||||
D3987 | 08819 | 20/08/1960 | DE | Tyseley | 30/06/2008 | 47.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/2008 | 48.02 | ||||||||
D3988 | 08820 | 27/08/1960 | DE | Tyseley | 22/02/1990 | Longsight | 29.5 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 07/10/1991 | 31.13 | |||||||
D3989 | 08821 | 03/09/1960 | DE | Tyseley | 11/12/1992 | Laira | 32.25 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 19/11/1993 | 33.23 | |||||||
D3990 | 08822 | 09/09/1960 | DE | Tyseley | 63.33 | |||||||||||||
D3991 | 08823 | 09/09/1960 | DE | Tyseley | Prs | Preserved | 63.33 | |||||||||||
D3992 | 08824 | 22/09/1960 | DE | Tyseley | 63.30 | |||||||||||||
D3993 | 08825 | 22/09/1960 | DE | Tyseley | 30/06/2005 | 44.75 | 63.30 | |||||||||||
D3994 | 08826 | 01/10/1960 | DE | Tyseley | Cut | Raxstar (at Eastleigh Works) | 13/07/2002 | 41.81 | ||||||||||
D3995 | 08827 | 08/10/1960 | DE | Tyseley | 63.25 | |||||||||||||
D3996 | 08828 | 01/10/1960 | DE | Tyseley | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 63.27 | |||||||||||
D3997 | 08829 | 08/10/1960 | DE | Tyseley | 16/06/1993 | Toton | 32.67 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth) | 28/02/2005 | 44.42 | |||||||
D3998 | 08830 | 15/10/1960 | DE | Tyseley | 63.24 | |||||||||||||
D3999 | 08831 | 22/10/1960 | DE | Tyseley | 07/04/1993 | Eastleigh | 32.5 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 29/03/1994 | 33.45 | |||||||
D4000 | 08832 | 09102 | 29/10/1960 | DE | Tyseley | 22/09/1992 to 09 |
63.20 | |||||||||||
D4001 | 08833 | 09101 | 05/11/1960 | DE | Tyseley | 17/08/1992 to 09 |
63.18 | |||||||||||
D4002 | 08834 | 12/11/1960 | DE | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 63.16 | |||||||||||||
D4003 | 08835 | 09105 | 12/11/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 15/03/1993 to 09 |
63.16 | |||||||||||
D4004 | 08836 | 12/11/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 63.16 | |||||||||||||
D4005 | 08837 | 26/11/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 30/11/2005 | 45 | Cut | S Norton (Liverpool) | 12/2005 | 45.08 | ||||||||
D4006 | 08838 | 03/12/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 09/05/1990 | Derby | 29.42 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 02/02/1994 | 33.19 | |||||||
D4007 | 08839 | 10/12/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 10/01/1992 | Laira | 31.08 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 19/11/1993 | 32.96 | |||||||
D4008 | 08840 | 17/12/1960 | DE | Old Oak Common | 24/06/1991 | Allerton | 30.5 | Cut | Coopers Metals (at Allerton MPD) | 03/1994 | 33.26 | |||||||
D4009 | 08841 | 23/12/1960 | DE | Southall | 14/06/1990 | Bescot | 29.5 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 29/10/1993 | 32.87 | |||||||
D4010 | 08842 | 31/12/1960 | DE | Slough | 63.02 | |||||||||||||
D4011 | 08843 | 20/04/1961 | HO | Danygraig | 22/02/1990 | Longsight | 28.83 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 17/09/1991 | 30.43 | |||||||
D4012 | 08844 | 26/04/1961 | HO | Danygraig | 62.71 | |||||||||||||
D4013 | 08845 | 09107 | 02/05/1961 | HO | Laira | 23/07/1993 to 09 |
62.69 | |||||||||||
D4014 | 08846 | 16/05/1961 | HO | Newton Abbot | 13/10/1989 | Allerton | 28.42 | Prs | Preserved | 62.65 | ||||||||
D4015 | 08847 | 17/05/1961 | HO | St Philips Marsh | 62.65 | |||||||||||||
D4016 | 08848 | 18/05/1961 | HO | St Philips Marsh | 15/05/1992 | Cardiff Canton | 31 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 24/03/1994 | 32.87 | |||||||
D4017 | 08849 | 14/05/1961 | HO | St Philips Marsh | 01/10/1993 | Laira | 32.42 | Cut | MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) | 02/09/1997 | 36.33 | |||||||
D4018 | 08850 | 01/06/1961 | HO | St Philips Marsh | 11/12/1992 | Reading (W.R.) | 31.5 | Prs | Preserved | 62.61 | ||||||||
D4019 | 08851 | 05/06/1961 | HO | St Philips Marsh | 07/02/1990 | Motherwell | 28.67 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 14/08/1991 | 30.21 | |||||||
D4020 | 08852 | 12/06/1961 | HO | St Philips Marsh | 03/08/1988 | Motherwell | 27.17 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 16/11/1989 | 28.45 | |||||||
D4021 | 08853 | 19/06/1960 | HO | St Philips Marsh | 63.56 | |||||||||||||
D4022 | 08854 | 21/06/1960 | HO | St Philips Marsh | 63.55 | |||||||||||||
D4023 | 08855 | 26/06/1960 | HO | St Philips Marsh | 23/07/1993 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 33.08 | Cut | Wabtec (Doncaster Works) | 0000 | ||||||||
D4024 | 08856 | 04/07/1960 | HO | St Philips Marsh | 63.52 | |||||||||||||
D4025 | 08857 | 10/07/1961 | HO | St Philips Marsh | 21/10/1991 | Bescot | 30.25 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 02/11/1993 | 32.34 | |||||||
D4026 | 08858 | 09/08/1961 | HO | St Philips Marsh | 01/10/1994 | Allerton | 33.17 | Cut | Coopers Metals (at Allerton MPD) | 04/1994 | 32.70 | |||||||
D4027 | 08859 | 15/08/1961 | HO | St Philips Marsh | 11/12/1992 | March | 31.33 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 30/03/1994 | 32.64 | |||||||
D4028 | 08860 | 27/05/1960 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 01/03/1981 | Thornaby | 20.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/1981 | 21.07 | |||||||
D4029 | 08861 | 03/06/1960 | DA | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 11/10/1981 | Tinsley | 21.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1982 | 21.79 | |||||||
D4030 | 08862 | 08/07/1960 | DA | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 28/09/1980 | Cambridge | 20.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1981 | 21.28 | |||||||
D4031 | 08863 | 06/08/1960 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 28/09/1980 | Cambridge | 20.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1981 | 21.21 | |||||||
D4032 | 08864 | 15/08/1960 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 23/08/1981 | Thornaby | 21 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1982 | 21.59 | |||||||
D4033 | 08865 | 09/09/1960 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 63.33 | |||||||||||||
D4034 | 08866 | 23/09/1960 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 63.30 | |||||||||||||
D4035 | 08867 | 17/10/1960 | DA | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 31/08/2005 | 44.83 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 30/06/2007 | 46.73 | ||||||||
D4036 | 08868 | 26/10/1960 | DA | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 11/12/1992 | March | 32.17 | 63.21 | ||||||||||
D4037 | 08869 | 29/10/1960 | DA | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 1997 | 36.17 | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 14/01/2011 | 50.24 | ||||||||
D4038 | 08870 | 05/11/1960 | DA | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 07/05/1993 | Knottingley | 32.5 | 63.18 | ||||||||||
D4039 | 08871 | 17/11/1960 | DA | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 27/10/1990 | Tinsley | 29.92 | Prs | Preserved | 63.15 | ||||||||
D4040 | 08872 | 19/11/1960 | DA | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 63.14 | |||||||||||||
D4041 | 08873 | 25/11/1960 | DA | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 01/12/2006 | 46.08 | Prs | Preserved | 63.12 | |||||||||
D4042 | 08874 | 26/11/1960 | DA | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 14/02/1992 | Doncaster | 31.25 | 63.12 | ||||||||||
D4043 | 08875 | 03/12/1960 | DA | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 03/05/1991 | Thornaby | 30.42 | Cut | C F Booth (at RFS Kilnhurst) | 08/1993 | 32.72 | |||||||
D4044 | 08876 | 09/12/1960 | DA | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 27/09/1991 | Doncaster | 30.75 | Cut | Hudsons of Telford (at RFS Doncaster) | 07/1992 | 31.62 | |||||||
D4045 | 08877 | 15/12/1960 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 63.07 | |||||||||||||
D4046 | 08878 | 17/12/1960 | DA | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 29/08/1997 | Stratford | 36.67 | Cut | MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) | 29/08/1997 | 36.72 | |||||||
D4047 | 08879 | 22/12/1960 | DA | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 63.05 | |||||||||||||
D4048 | 08880 | 30/12/1960 | DA | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 23/07/1996 | 35.58 | Cut | S Norton (Liverpool) | 11/2005 | 44.91 | ||||||||
D4095 | 08881 | 23/08/1961 | HO | Fort William | 01/02/2004 | 42.5 | Prs | Preserved | 62.38 | |||||||||
D4096 | 08882 | 30/08/1961 | HO | Eastfield | 30/06/2005 | 43.83 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 08/2005 | 43.99 | ||||||||
D4097 | 08883 | 08/09/1961 | HO | Perth South | 28/02/2007 | 45.42 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 12/2007 | 46.30 | ||||||||
D4098 | 08884 | 11/09/1961 | HO | Perth South | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 62.33 | |||||||||||
D4115 | 08885 | 18/01/1962 | HO | Lostock Hall | 07/05/1993 | Doncaster | 31.33 | Prs | Preserved | 61.98 | ||||||||
D4116 | 08886 | 26/01/1962 | HO | Cricklewood East | 61.95 | |||||||||||||
D4117 | 08887 | 02/02/1962 | HO | Cricklewood East | 61.93 | |||||||||||||
D4118 | 08888 | 16/02/1962 | HO | Swindon | 61.90 | |||||||||||||
D4119 | 08889 | 22/02/1962 | HO | Swindon | 06/03/1992 | 30.08 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 29/03/1994 | 32.12 | ||||||||
D4120 | 08890 | 28/02/1962 | HO | Swindon | 30/09/2008 | 46.58 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 07/2009 | 47.41 | ||||||||
D4121 | 08891 | 07/03/1962 | HO | Swindon | 61.84 | |||||||||||||
D4122 | 08892 | 16/03/1962 | HO | Swindon | 61.82 | |||||||||||||
D4123 | 08893 | 20/03/1962 | HO | Swindon | 26/06/1998 | 36.25 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 08/2005 | 43.44 | ||||||||
D4124 | 08894 | 29/03/1962 | HO | Swindon | 28/02/2007 | 44.92 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 30/09/2007 | 45.54 | ||||||||
D4125 | 08895 | 05/04/1962 | HO | Swindon | 10/09/1993 | Cardiff Canton | 31.42 | Cut | Raxstar (at Margam MPD) | 07/2000 | 38.30 | |||||||
D4126 | 08896 | 12/04/1962 | HO | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 01/02/2004 | 41.83 | Prs | Preserved | 61.75 | |||||||||
D4127 | 08897 | 19/04/1962 | HO | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 61.73 | |||||||||||
D4128 | 08898 | 30/04/1962 | HO | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 07/12/1988 | Landore | 26.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Doncaster) | 03/1998 | 35.90 | |||||||
D4129 | 08899 | 07/05/1962 | HO | Exeter | 61.68 | |||||||||||||
D4130 | 08900 | 14/05/1962 | HO | Exeter | 30/09/2008 | 46.33 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 02/2009 | 46.79 | ||||||||
D4131 | 08901 | 18/05/1962 | HO | Cricklewood East | 26/06/1998 | 36.08 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 08/2005 | 43.27 | ||||||||
D4132 | 08902 | 28/05/1962 | HO | Cricklewood East | 28/02/2007 | 44.75 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 07/2007 | 45.16 | ||||||||
D4133 | 08903 | 01/06/1962 | HO | Cricklewood East | 61.61 | |||||||||||||
D4134 | 08904 | 07/06/1962 | HO | Bedford | 61.59 | |||||||||||||
D4135 | 08905 | 18/06/1962 | HO | Bedford | 61.56 | |||||||||||||
D4136 | 08906 | 22/06/1962 | HO | Cricklewood East | 31/08/2005 | 43.17 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 30/06/2006 | 44.05 | ||||||||
D4137 | 08907 | 29/06/1962 | HO | Burton | 61.53 | |||||||||||||
D4138 | 08908 | 05/07/1962 | HO | Cricklewood East | 61.52 | |||||||||||||
D4139 | 08909 | 11/07/1962 | HO | Carnforth | 61.50 | |||||||||||||
D4140 | 08910 | 02/08/1962 | HO | Carnforth | 28/02/2007 | 44.5 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 12/2007 | 45.40 | ||||||||
D4141 | 08911 | 08/08/1962 | HO | Carnforth | 01/05/2004 | 41.75 | Prs | Preserved | 61.42 | |||||||||
D4142 | 08912 | 17/08/1962 | HO | Carnforth | 28/02/2007 | 44.5 | 61.40 | |||||||||||
D4143 | 08913 | 23/08/1962 | HO | Crewe South | 01/11/2005 | 43.25 | Prs | Preserved | 61.38 | |||||||||
D4144 | 08914 | 31/08/1962 | HO | Nuneaton | 30/06/2005 | 42.83 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 08/2005 | 42.99 | ||||||||
D4145 | 08915 | 11/09/1962 | HO | Stockport Edgeley | 01/02/2004 | 41.42 | Prs | Preserved | 61.33 | |||||||||
D4146 | 08916 | 19/09/1962 | HO | Speke Junction | 29/10/1992 | Allerton | 30.08 | Cut | Coopers Metals (at Allerton MPD) | 03/1994 | 31.51 | |||||||
D4147 | 08917 | 25/09/1962 | HO | Speke Junction | 22/11/1991 | Allerton | 29.17 | Cut | Coopers Metals (at Allerton MPD) | 03/1994 | 31.49 | |||||||
D4148 | 08918 | 25/09/1962 | HO | Speke Junction | 61.29 | |||||||||||||
D4149 | 08919 | 15/10/1962 | HO | Burton | 30/09/2008 | 45.92 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 06/2009 | 46.70 | ||||||||
D4150 | 08920 | 22/10/1962 | HO | Burton | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 61.22 | |||||||||||
D4151 | 08921 | 26/10/1962 | HO | Burton | 61.21 | |||||||||||||
D4152 | 08922 | 02/11/1962 | HO | Speke Junction | 61.19 | |||||||||||||
D4153 | 08923 | 13/11/1962 | HO | Speke Junction | 10/06/1993 | Stratford | 30.58 | Cut | Birds (at Stratford MPD) | 03/1994 | 31.36 | |||||||
D4154 | 08924 | 13/12/1962 | HO | Edge Hill | 61.07 | |||||||||||||
D4155 | 08925 | 14/12/1962 | HO | Edge Hill | 61.07 | |||||||||||||
D4156 | 08926 | 21/12/1962 | HO | Lancaster Green Ayre | 28/02/2007 | 44.17 | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 13/08/2007 | 44.67 | ||||||||
D4157 | 08927 | 28/12/1962 | HO | Lancaster Green Ayre | 01/06/2005 | 42.5 | Prs | Preserved | 61.03 | |||||||||
D4158 | 08928 | 16/04/1962 | DA | St Blazey | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 61.73 | |||||||||||
D4159 | 08929 | 16/04/1962 | DA | Laira | 09/12/1991 | Old Oak Common | 29.67 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 03/02/1994 | 31.82 | |||||||
D4160 | 08930 | 24/04/1962 | DA | Newton Abbot | 19/02/1990 | Stratford | 27.83 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 28/06/1991 | 29.20 | |||||||
D4161 | 08931 | 26/04/1962 | DA | Penzance | 30/06/2005 | 43.17 | Cut | Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) | 08/2005 | 43.33 | ||||||||
D4162 | 08932 | 04/05/1962 | DA | Exeter | 31/08/2005 | 43.25 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Crewe DMD) | 12/2005 | 43.65 | ||||||||
D4163 | 08933 | 05/05/1962 | DA | Taunton | 30/09/2008 | 46.33 | Prs | Preserved | 61.68 | |||||||||
D4164 | 08934 | 09/05/1962 | DA | Taunton | 61.67 | |||||||||||||
D4165 | 08935 | 14/05/1962 | DA | Taunton | 30/04/1993 | Bristol Bath Road | 30.92 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 03/09/1994 | 32.33 | |||||||
D4166 | 08936 | 17/05/1962 | DA | St Blazey | 11/12/1992 | March | 30.58 | Prs | Preserved | 61.65 | ||||||||
D4167 | 08937 | 24/05/1962 | DA | Laira | 23/12/1993 | Laira | 31.58 | Prs | Preserved | 61.63 | ||||||||
D4168 | 08938 | 25/05/1962 | DA | Swindon | 14/07/2000 | 38.17 | Cut | English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) | 06/2000 | 38.08 | ||||||||
D4169 | 08939 | 29/05/1962 | DA | Bristol Bath Road | 61.62 | |||||||||||||
D4170 | 08940 | 02/06/1962 | DA | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 31/01/2003 | 40.58 | Cut | S Norton (Liverpool) | 07/03/2003 | 40.79 | ||||||||
D4171 | 08941 | 05/06/1962 | DA | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 61.60 | |||||||||||
D4172 | 08942 | 07/06/1962 | DA | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 28/02/2007 | 44.67 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 30/11/2007 | 45.51 | ||||||||
D4173 | 08943 | 19/06/1962 | DA | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 20/07/1988 | Willesden | 26.08 | Prs | Preserved | 61.56 | ||||||||
D4174 | 08944 | 20/06/1962 | DA | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | Prs | Preserved | 61.56 | |||||||||||
D4175 | 08945 | 22/06/1962 | DA | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 05/02/1993 | Laira | 30.67 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 19/11/1993 | 31.43 | |||||||
D4176 | 08946 | 22/08/1962 | DA | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 28/02/2007 | 44.5 | Cut | Goodman's (Sutton Coldfield) | 05/2008 | 45.76 | ||||||||
D4177 | 08947 | 28/08/1962 | DA | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 28/02/2007 | 44.5 | Prs | Preserved | 61.37 | |||||||||
D4178 | 08948 | 31/08/1962 | DA | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 61.36 | |||||||||||||
D4179 | 08949 | 05/09/1962 | DA | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 17/05/1993 | 30.67 | Cut | Gwent Demolition (Margam) | 03/09/1994 | 32.02 | ||||||||
D4180 | 08950 | 12/09/1962 | DA | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 61.33 | |||||||||||||
D4181 | 08951 | 20/09/1962 | DA | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 61.30 | |||||||||||||
D4182 | 08952 | 27/09/1962 | DA | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 14/07/2000 | 37.83 | Cut | English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) | 07/2000 | 37.82 | ||||||||
D4183 | 08953 | 17/10/1962 | DA | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 61.23 | |||||||||||||
D4184 | 08954 | 23/10/1962 | DA | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 61.21 | |||||||||||||
D4185 | 08955 | 02/11/1962 | DA | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 30/09/2008 | 45.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 07/2009 | 46.73 | ||||||||
D4186 | 08956 | 27/06/1962 | DA | Stratford | 61.54 | |||||||||||||
06/07/1962 | DA | Stratford | 08/1965 to 13 |
61.51 | ||||||||||||||
D4188 | D4500 | 13003 | 11/07/1962 | DA | Stratford | 06/1965 to 13 |
61.50 | |||||||||||
D4189 | D4501 | 13001 | 31/07/1962 | DA | Stratford | 26/06/1965 to 13 |
61.44 | |||||||||||
02/08/1962 | DA | Stratford | 26/06/1965 to 13 |
61.44 | ||||||||||||||
D4191 | 08957 | 14/08/1962 | DA | Stratford | 28/02/2004 | 41.5 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) | 18/02/2004 | 41.54 | ||||||||
D4192 | 08958 | 17/08/1962 | DA | Stratford | 22/06/2001 | 38.83 | Cut | English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) | 06/2001 | 38.85 |