Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 177 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1085 Week
» 22067 Month
» 164021 Year
» 1048402 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

107


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
51985 03/12/1960 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 03/12/1960
51986 03/12/1960 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 03/12/1960
51987 09/12/1960 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 09/12/1960
51988 17/12/1960 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 17/12/1960
51989 17/12/1960 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 17/12/1960
51990 23/12/1960 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 23/12/1960
51991 23/12/1960 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 23/12/1960
51992 31/12/1960 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 31/12/1960
51993 07/01/1961 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 07/01/1961
51994 14/01/1961 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 14/01/1961
51995 14/01/1961 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 14/01/1961
51996
51997
51998
51999
52000
52001
52002 18/02/1961 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 18/02/1961
52003 25/02/1961 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 25/02/1961
52004 10/03/1961 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 10/03/1961
52005
52006
52007
52008
52009
52010
52011 03/12/1960 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 03/12/1960
52012 03/12/1960 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 03/12/1960
52013 09/12/1960 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 09/12/1960
52014 17/12/1960 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 17/12/1960
52015 17/12/1960 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 17/12/1960
52016 23/12/1960 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 23/12/1960
52017 23/12/1960 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 23/12/1960
52018 31/12/1960 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 31/12/1960
52019 07/01/1961 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 07/01/1961
52020 14/01/1961 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 14/01/1961
52021 14/01/1961 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 14/01/1961
52022
52023
52024
52025
52026
52027
52028
52029 18/02/1961 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 18/02/1961
52030
52031
52032
52033
52034 10/03/1961 66C Hamilton (West) (New) 10/03/1961
52035      
52036