Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 209 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 2769 Week
» 15802 Month
» 238203 Year
» 1122584 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

107


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
03/12/1960 To Service 51985   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
03/12/1960 To Service 51986   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
03/12/1960 To Service 52011   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
03/12/1960 To Service 52012   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
09/12/1960 To Service 51987   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
09/12/1960 To Service 52013   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
17/12/1960 To Service 51988   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
17/12/1960 To Service 51989   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
17/12/1960 To Service 52014   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
17/12/1960 To Service 52015   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
23/12/1960 To Service 51990   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
23/12/1960 To Service 51991   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
23/12/1960 To Service 52016   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
23/12/1960 To Service 52017   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
31/12/1960 To Service 51992   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
31/12/1960 To Service 52018   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
07/01/1961 To Service 51993   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
07/01/1961 To Service 52019   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
14/01/1961 To Service 51994   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
14/01/1961 To Service 51995   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
14/01/1961 To Service 52020   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
14/01/1961 To Service 52021   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
18/02/1961 To Service 52002   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
18/02/1961 To Service 52029   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
25/02/1961 To Service 52003   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
10/03/1961 To Service 52004   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)
10/03/1961 To Service 52034   NEW 66C Hamilton (West)