Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 177 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1085 Week
» 22067 Month
» 164021 Year
» 1048402 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

107


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
51985 03/12/1960 Hamilton (West) 58.60
51986 03/12/1960 Hamilton (West) 58.60
51987 09/12/1960 Hamilton (West) 58.58
51988 17/12/1960 Hamilton (West) 58.56
51989 17/12/1960 Hamilton (West) 58.56
51990 23/12/1960 Hamilton (West) 58.54
51991 23/12/1960 Hamilton (West) 58.54
51992 31/12/1960 Hamilton (West) 58.52
51993 07/01/1961 Hamilton (West) 58.50
51994 14/01/1961 Hamilton (West) 58.48
51995 14/01/1961 Hamilton (West) 58.48
51996
51997
51998
51999
52000
52001
52002 18/02/1961 Hamilton (West) 58.39
52003 25/02/1961 Hamilton (West) 58.37
52004 10/03/1961 Hamilton (West) 58.33
52005
52006
52007
52008
52009
52010
52011 03/12/1960 Hamilton (West) 58.60
52012 03/12/1960 Hamilton (West) 58.60
52013 09/12/1960 Hamilton (West) 58.58
52014 17/12/1960 Hamilton (West) 58.56
52015 17/12/1960 Hamilton (West) 58.56
52016 23/12/1960 Hamilton (West) 58.54
52017 23/12/1960 Hamilton (West) 58.54
52018 31/12/1960 Hamilton (West) 58.52
52019 07/01/1961 Hamilton (West) 58.50
52020 14/01/1961 Hamilton (West) 58.48
52021 14/01/1961 Hamilton (West) 58.48
52022
52023
52024
52025
52026
52027
52028
52029 18/02/1961 Hamilton (West) 58.39
52030
52031
52032
52033
52034 10/03/1961 Hamilton (West) 58.33
52035
52036