Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 105 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 3560 Week
» 14853 Month
» 279486 Year
» 1501051 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Drummond "3F" Class 0-6-0


Class LMS BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
3F 134 17693 57693 02/1900 30A
W
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1949
06/1949
3F 135 17694 57694 02/1900 30A
W
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1950
02/1950
3F 136 17695 57695 02/1900 W Withdrawn 25/01/1952 25/01/1952
3F 138 17697 57697 02/1900 W Withdrawn 17/02/1951 17/02/1951
3F 139 17698 57698 02/1900 W Withdrawn 06/12/1951 06/12/1951
3F 18 17699 57699 08/1902 30A
W
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1949
02/1949
3F 21 17702 57702 08/1902 30A
W
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1949
10/1949