Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 14 Today
» 772 Yesterday
» 3436 Week
» 15214 Month
» 304606 Year
» 815708 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Whitelegg "Tilbury Tanks" Class 4-4-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2113     13C Tilbury  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2115     13C Tilbury  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2116     13C Tilbury  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2119     13C Tilbury  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2123     13C Tilbury  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2132     13C Tilbury  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2133     13C Tilbury  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2136     13A Plaistow  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2137     13A Plaistow  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2139     13A Plaistow  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2146     13A Plaistow  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2147     13A Plaistow  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2149     13A Plaistow  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2150     13A Plaistow  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2151     13A Plaistow  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2153     13A Plaistow  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 2160     13C Tilbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2110     13C Tilbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2111     13C Tilbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2112     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2113 13C Tilbury 13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2114     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2115 13C Tilbury 13C Tilbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2116 13C Tilbury 13D Northwich  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2117     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2118     13C Tilbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2119 13C Tilbury 13D Northwich  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2120     15C Leicester Midland  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2121     13C Tilbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2122     16D Mansfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2123 13C Tilbury 13D Northwich  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2124     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2125     16D Mansfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2126     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2127     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2128     13C Tilbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2129     16D Mansfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2130     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2131     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2132 13C Tilbury 13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2133 13C Tilbury 13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2134     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2135     13C Tilbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2136 13A Plaistow 13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2137 13A Plaistow 13C Tilbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2138     13C Tilbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2139 13A Plaistow 13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2140     19C Canklow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2141     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2142     13C Tilbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2143     16D Mansfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2144     19C Canklow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2145     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2146 13A Plaistow 13C Tilbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2147 13A Plaistow 13C Tilbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2148     13C Tilbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2149 13A Plaistow 13D Northwich  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2150 13A Plaistow 13D Northwich  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2151 13A Plaistow 13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2152     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2153 13A Plaistow 13D Northwich  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2154     29C Dundee West  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2155     29C Dundee West  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2156     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2157     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2158     13A Plaistow  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2159     13C Tilbury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2160 13C Tilbury 13D Northwich  
02/1951 Condemned 41955 13C Tilbury   COND  
02/1951 Condemned 41960 13C Tilbury   COND  
02/1951 Condemned 41962 19C Canklow   COND  
02/1951 Condemned 41963 13A Plaistow   COND  
02/1951 Condemned 41964 13C Tilbury   COND  
02/1951 Condemned 41965 13C Tilbury   COND  
02/1951 Condemned 41968 13D Northwich   COND  
24/02/1951 Reallocation 41938 15C Leicester Midland 16D Mansfield  
03/1951 Condemned 41931 13A Plaistow   COND  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 41938 16D Mansfield 15C Leicester Midland  
21/04/1951 Reallocation 41967 13D Northwich 33B Tilbury  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 41930 13A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 41934 13D Northwich 33A Plaistow  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 41944 13A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 41945 13A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 41951 13A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 41953 13C Tilbury 33A Plaistow  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 41959 13A Plaistow 33C Shoeburyness  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 41969 13A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 41970 13A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 41978 13D Northwich 33B Tilbury  
08/1951 Condemned 41933 13C Tilbury   COND  
08/1951 Condemned 41953 33A Plaistow   COND  
08/1951 Condemned 41954 13A Plaistow   COND  
09/1951 Condemned 41929 13C Tilbury   COND  
09/1951 Condemned 41932 13A Plaistow   COND  
09/1951 Condemned 41934 33A Plaistow   COND  
09/1951 Condemned 41935 13A Plaistow   COND  
09/1951 Condemned 41956 13C Tilbury   COND  
09/1951 Condemned 41957 13A Plaistow   COND  
09/1951 Condemned 41959 33C Shoeburyness   COND  
20/10/1951 Reallocation 41944 33B Tilbury 33C Shoeburyness  
20/10/1951 Reallocation 41949 13A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
12/1951 Condemned 41958 19C Canklow   COND  
03/1952 Condemned 41937 13D Northwich   COND  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 41930 33B Tilbury 33A Plaistow  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 41936 13C Tilbury 33B Tilbury  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 41950 13A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 41951 33B Tilbury 33A Plaistow  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 41978 33B Tilbury 33A Plaistow  
08/1952 Condemned 41930 33A Plaistow   COND  
10/1952 Condemned 41961 16D Mansfield   COND  
11/1952 Condemned 41967 33B Tilbury   COND  
17/01/1953 Reallocation 41975 13A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
21/02/1953 Reallocation 41966 13C Tilbury 18A Toton  
19/12/1953 Reallocation 41952 13A Plaistow 30A Stratford  
19/12/1953 Reallocation 41975 33B Tilbury 30A Stratford  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 41944 33C Shoeburyness 30A Stratford  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 41949 33B Tilbury 30A Stratford  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 41950 33B Tilbury 33A Plaistow  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 41969 33B Tilbury 33A Plaistow  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 41970 33B Tilbury 30A Stratford  
20/02/1954 Reallocation 41936 33B Tilbury 30A Stratford  
20/02/1954 Reallocation 41951 33A Plaistow 30A Stratford  
20/02/1954 Reallocation 41976 13A Plaistow 30A Stratford  
02/1955 Condemned 41938 15C Leicester Midland   COND  
02/1955 Condemned 41971 13D Northwich   COND  
02/1955 Condemned 41972 29C Dundee West   COND  
02/1955 Condemned 41973 29C Dundee West   COND  
02/1955 Condemned 41974 13A Plaistow   COND  
02/1956 Condemned 41943 16D Mansfield   COND  
18/02/1956 Reallocation 41949 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
25/02/1956 Reallocation 41947 16D Mansfield 18A Toton  
04/1956 Condemned 41940 16D Mansfield   COND  
25/05/1956 Reallocation 41936 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
06/1956 Condemned 41966 18A Toton   COND  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 41975 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
12/1956 Condemned 41942 13A Plaistow   COND  
12/1956 Condemned 41944 30A Stratford   COND  
12/1956 Condemned 41951 30A Stratford   COND  
12/1956 Condemned 41952 30A Stratford   COND  
12/1956 Condemned 41970 30A Stratford   COND  
12/1956 Condemned 41976 30A Stratford   COND  
15/12/1956 Reallocation 41945 33B Tilbury 33A Plaistow  
15/12/1956 Reallocation 41946 13C Tilbury 33A Plaistow  
15/12/1956 Reallocation 41969 33A Plaistow 33C Shoeburyness  
15/06/1957 Reallocation 41936 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
15/06/1957 Reallocation 41949 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
15/06/1957 Reallocation 41975 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
08/03/1958 Reallocation 41949 30A Stratford 35C Spital Bridge  
08/03/1958 Reallocation 41975 30A Stratford 35C Spital Bridge  
09/1958 Condemned 41936 30A Stratford   COND  
15/11/1958 Reallocation 41969 33C Shoeburyness 33A Plaistow  
31/01/1959 Reallocation 41969 33A Plaistow 31F Spital Bridge  
02/1959 Condemned 41928 13C Tilbury   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 41939 13C Tilbury   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 41941 13D Northwich   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 41945 33A Plaistow   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 41946 33A Plaistow   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 41948 13A Plaistow   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 41950 33A Plaistow   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 41977 13C Tilbury   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 41978 33A Plaistow   COND  
01/08/1959 Reallocation 41949 35C Spital Bridge 31C Kings Lynn  
01/08/1959 Reallocation 41969 31F Spital Bridge 31C Kings Lynn  
15/08/1959 Reallocation 41949 31C Kings Lynn 31B March  
15/08/1959 Reallocation 41969 31C Kings Lynn 31B March  
24/10/1959 Reallocation 41949 31B March 31F Spital Bridge  
11/1959 Condemned 41975 35C Spital Bridge   COND  
06/02/1960 Reallocation 41949 31F Spital Bridge 31B March  
04/1960 Condemned 41949 31B March   COND  
04/1960 Condemned 41969 31B March   COND  
03/12/1960 Condemned 41947 18A Toton   COND