Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

108


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
50599 11/07/1958 Darlington 59.31
50600 23/05/1958 Hull Springhead 10/08/1970 Neville Hill 12.25 59.45
50601 23/05/1958 Hull Springhead 59.45
50602 30/05/1958 Hull Springhead 59.43
50603 11/07/1958 Darlington 59.31
50604 11/07/1958 Darlington 59.31
50605 27/06/1958 Darlington 59.35
50606 04/07/1958 Hull Springhead 59.33
50607 27/06/1958 Darlington 59.35
50608 04/07/1958 Hull Springhead 59.33
50609 14/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 59.22
50610 06/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 59.24
50611 07/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 59.24
50612 14/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 59.22
50613 07/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 59.24
50614 28/07/1958 Darlington 59.27
50615 04/09/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 03/09/1968 10 59.16
50616 04/09/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 59.16
50617 19/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 59.21
50618 14/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 59.22
50619 19/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 59.21
50620 28/10/1958 Hull Springhead 59.01
50621 28/10/1958 Hull Springhead 59.01
50622 11/11/1958 Hull Springhead 58.98
50623 14/11/1958 Hull Springhead 58.97
50624 28/11/1958 Hull Botanic Gardens 58.93
50625 13/11/1958 Stoke 58.97
50626 27/12/1958 Toton 58.85
50627 13/11/1958 Stoke 58.97
50628 13/11/1958 Stoke 58.97
50629 21/02/1959 58.70
50630 02/10/1958 59.08
50631 02/10/1958 59.08
50632 01/10/1958 Hull Springhead 59.09
50633 01/10/1958 Hull Springhead 59.09
50634 01/10/1958 Hull Springhead 59.09
50635 01/10/1958 Hull Springhead 59.09
50636 02/10/1958 59.08
50637 02/10/1958 59.08
50638 08/10/1958 59.07
50639 08/10/1958 59.07
50640 16/10/1958 59.05
50641 16/10/1958 59.05
50642 28/10/1958 Hull Springhead 59.01
50643 28/10/1958 Hull Springhead 59.01
50644 11/11/1958 Hull Springhead 58.98
50645 14/11/1958 Hull Springhead 58.97
50646 28/11/1958 Hull Botanic Gardens 58.93
50924 24/10/1959 58.02
50925 26/12/1959 57.85
50926 14/11/1959 57.97
50927 21/11/1959 Llandudno Junction 57.95
50928 28/11/1959 Llandudno Junction 57.93
50929 28/11/1959 Llandudno Junction 57.93
50930 19/12/1959 Llandudno Junction 57.87
50931 19/12/1959 Llandudno Junction 57.87
50932 26/12/1959 57.85
50933 09/01/1960 Chester Northgate 57.81
50934 09/01/1960 Chester Northgate 57.81
50935 23/01/1960 Chester Northgate 57.78
50938 03/01/1959 Llandudno Junction 58.83
50939 27/12/1958 Llandudno Junction 58.85
50940 27/12/1958 Llandudno Junction 58.85
50941 10/01/1959 Llandudno Junction 58.81
50942 17/01/1959 Coventry 58.79
50943 24/01/1959 Coventry 58.77
50944 24/01/1959 Coventry 58.77
50945 31/01/1959 Rhyl 58.75
50946 31/01/1959 Rhyl 58.75
50947 21/02/1959 58.70
50948 21/02/1959 58.70
50949 28/02/1959 58.68
50950 28/02/1959 58.68
50951 21/02/1959 58.70
50952 21/02/1959 58.70
50953 28/02/1959 58.68
50954 28/02/1959 Crewe South 58.68
50955 14/03/1959 Crewe South 58.64
50956 14/03/1959 Crewe South 58.64
50957 28/03/1959 Rhyl 58.60
50958 04/04/1959 Rhyl 58.58
50959 04/04/1959 Rhyl 58.58
50960 18/04/1959 58.54
50961 18/04/1959 06/01/1974 Carlisle Kingmoor 14.75 58.54
50962 25/04/1959 58.52
50963
50964 09/05/1959 Trafford Park (LMS) 58.48
50965 23/05/1959 Trafford Park (LMS) 58.45
50966 23/05/1959 Trafford Park (LMS) 58.45
50967
50968 30/05/1959 Fleetwood 58.43
50969
50970
50971
50972
50973
50974
50975
50976
50977
50978
50979
50980
50981
50982
50983
50984 02/11/1969 Accrington
50985
50986
50987
51416 20/02/1960 Ryecroft (Walsall) 57.70
51417 20/02/1960 Ryecroft (Walsall) 57.70
51418 20/02/1960 Monument Lane 57.70
51419 27/02/1960 Monument Lane 57.68
51420 27/02/1960 Cricklewood East 57.68
51421 26/03/1960 Cricklewood East 57.60
51422 26/03/1960 Cricklewood East 57.60
51423 12/03/1960 Newton Heath 57.64
51424
51901 26/03/1960 57.60
51902 26/03/1960 57.60
51903 26/03/1960 57.60
51904 26/03/1960 57.60
51905
51906
51907
51908
51909
51910
51911
51912
51913
51914
51915 29/11/1969 Allerton
51916
51917
51918 31/03/1985 Newton Heath
51919
51920
51921 10/10/1970 Chester (MR)
51922
51923
51924
51925
51926
51927
51928
51929 09/12/1984 Longsight
51930
51931
51932
51933
51934
51935 05/11/1960 Newton Heath 56.99
51936 05/11/1960 Newton Heath 56.99
51937
51938
51939 05/11/1960 Newton Heath 56.99
51940 26/11/1960 Newton Heath 56.93
51941 26/11/1960 Newton Heath 56.93
51942 21/01/1961 Newton Heath 56.78
51943 10/12/1960 Newton Heath 56.89
51944 17/12/1960 Trafford Park (LMS) 14/11/1964 3.92 56.87
51945 21/01/1961 Newton Heath 56.78
51946 28/01/1961 Newton Heath 27/01/1974 Newton Heath 13 56.76
51947 04/02/1961 Newton Heath 56.74
51948
51949
51950
52037
52038
52039
52040
52041
52042
52043
52044
52045
52046
52047
52048
52049
52050 05/11/1960 Newton Heath 56.99
52051 05/11/1960 Newton Heath 56.99
52052
52053
52054 05/11/1960 Newton Heath 56.99
52055 26/11/1960 Newton Heath 56.93
52056 26/11/1960 Newton Heath 56.93
52057 21/01/1961 Newton Heath 56.78
52058 10/12/1960 Newton Heath 56.89
52059 17/12/1960 Trafford Park (LMS) 56.87
52060 21/01/1961 Newton Heath 56.78
52061 28/01/1961 Newton Heath 56.76
52062
52063
52064
52065