Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 722 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 2008 Week
» 29482 Month
» 326496 Year
» 403083 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

01 0-4-0


BR (1955 Num) BR (Dept) BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
11503 D2953 24/01/1956 AB Stratford 19/06/1966 10.42 Prs Preserved 61.24
11504 D2954 01001 19/02/1956 AB Stratford 14/09/1979 23.58 Cut O R Davies (at Holyhead Breakwater) 28/02/1982 26.04
11505 D2955 01002 19/02/1956 AB Stratford 15/03/1981 25.08 Cut O R Davies (at Holyhead Breakwater) 28/02/1982 26.04
11506 D2956 30/03/1956 AB Stratford 29/05/1966 10.17 Prs Preserved 61.05
81 D2956 01/01/1958 AB 01/11/1967 9.83 Cut British Steel Corporation (at Briton Ferry) 01/08/1969 11.59