Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 1057 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 7113 Week
» 21690 Month
» 384935 Year
» 461522 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

12 0-6-0


BR (1955 Num) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
15211 30/04/1949 AS 31/12/1971 22.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/11/1972 23.52
15212 30/04/1949 AS 31/12/1971 22.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/11/1972 23.52
15213 30/04/1949 AS 03/11/1968 19.58 Cut British Rail (at Hither Green MPD) 01/03/1970 20.85
15214 05/1949 AS Norwood Junction 10/1971 22.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1972 23.02
15215 05/1949 AS Norwood Junction 03/1968 Hither Green 18.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/1968 19.27
15216 06/1949 AS Norwood Junction 28/04/1969 19.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 02/1970 20.68
15217 06/1949 AS Norwood Junction 08/1970 21.17 Cut British Rail (at Selhurst MPD) 07/1971 22.10
15218 30/06/1949 AS 31/01/1970 20.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/08/1970 21.10
15219 31/07/1949 AS 31/10/1971 22.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/05/1972 22.77
15220 31/07/1949 AS 31/10/1971 22.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/11/1972 23.27
15221 31/08/1949 AS 31/10/1971 22.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/05/1972 22.68
15222 30/09/1949 AS 31/10/1971 22.08 Cut John Williams Ltd (Kidwelly) 01/09/1978 28.94
15223 31/10/1949 AS Hither Green 09/06/1969 19.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/07/1970 20.68
15224 31/10/1949 AS Hither Green 31/10/1971 22 Prs Preserved 67.46
15225 30/11/1949 AS 31/10/1971 21.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/04/1972 22.35
15226 31/12/1950 AS Hither Green 28/04/1969 18.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/11/1969 18.85
15227 12/05/1951 AS Hither Green 30/04/1970 18.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) 01/06/1970 19.07
15228 12/05/1951 AS Hither Green 06/01/1969 17.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/07/1969 18.15
15229 27/07/1951 AS Hither Green 31/10/1971 20.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/05/1972 20.78
15230 06/10/1951 AS Hither Green 31/10/1971 20 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/11/1972 21.09
15231 06/12/1951 AS 31/10/1971 19.83 Cut Tilcon (Grassington) 01/02/1984 32.18
15232 06/12/1951 AS 30/04/1971 19.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1972 20.17
15233 06/12/1951 AS 07/05/1969 17.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/11/1969 17.92
15234 21/01/1952 AS Hither Green 22/12/1968 16.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1970 18.04
15235 21/01/1952 AS Norwood Junction 31/05/1971 19.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/11/1972 20.79
15236 21/01/1952 AS Hither Green 22/12/1968 16.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1972 20.04