14 0-6-0
BR (Pre Tops) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D9500 | 24/07/1964 | SW | Bristol Bath Road | 03/05/1969 | 4.83 | Prs | Preserved | 59.47 | |||
D9501 | 27/07/1964 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 31/03/1968 | Worcester | 3.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 06/1968 | 3.89 | |
D9502 | 27/07/1964 | SW | Bristol Bath Road | 03/05/1969 | 4.83 | Prs | Preserved | 59.46 | |||
D9503 | 30/07/1964 | SW | Bristol Bath Road | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 3.75 | Cut | British Steel Corporation (at Corby) | 09/1980 | 16.14 | |
D9504 | 08/08/1964 | SW | Bristol Bath Road | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 3.67 | Prs | Preserved | 4.40 | ||
D9505 | 12/08/1964 | SW | Bristol Bath Road | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 3.67 | Cut | Unknown (Belgium) | 0000 | ||
D9506 | 31/08/1964 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 10/03/1968 | 3.58 | Cut | Arnott Young (Parkgate) | 05/1968 | 3.71 | ||
D9507 | 28/08/1964 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 3.67 | Cut | British Steel Corporation (at Corby) | 09/1982 | 18.06 | |
D9508 | 07/09/1964 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 05/10/1968 | 4.08 | Cut | National Coal Board (Ashington) | 01/1984 | 19.37 | ||
D9509 | 08/09/1964 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 05/10/1968 | 4.08 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 11/1970 | 6.19 | ||
D9510 | 18/09/1964 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 3.58 | Cut | British Steel Corporation (at Corby) | 08/1982 | 17.92 | |
D9511 | 17/09/1964 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 3.58 | Cut | National Coal Board (Ashington) | 07/1979 | 14.83 | |
D9512 | 29/09/1964 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 3.58 | Cut | British Steel Corporation (at Corby) | 02/1982 | 17.39 | |
D9513 | 06/10/1964 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 10/03/1968 | 3.42 | Prs | Preserved | 59.27 | |||
D9514 | 06/10/1964 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 03/05/1969 | 4.58 | Cut | National Coal Board (Ashington) | 12/1985 | 21.21 | ||
D9515 | 17/10/1964 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 3.5 | Cut | Unknown (Spain) | 0000 | ||
D9516 | 21/10/1964 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 3.5 | Prs | Preserved | 59.22 | ||
D9517 | 12/11/1964 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 05/10/1968 | 3.92 | Cut | National Coal Board (Ashington) | 01/1984 | 19.19 | ||
D9518 | 30/10/1964 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 03/05/1969 | 4.58 | Prs | Preserved | 59.20 | |||
D9519 | 30/10/1964 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 05/10/1968 | 4 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 11/1970 | 6.05 | ||
D9520 | 12/11/1964 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 3.42 | Prs | Preserved | 59.16 | ||
D9521 | 20/11/1964 | SW | Old Oak Common | 03/05/1969 | 4.5 | Prs | Preserved | 59.14 | |||
D9522 | 25/11/1964 | SW | Old Oak Common | 31/12/1967 | 3.08 | Cut | Arnott Young (Parkgate) | 05/1968 | 3.47 | ||
D9523 | 01/12/1964 | SW | Old Oak Common | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 3.33 | Prs | Preserved | 59.11 | ||
D9524 | 11/12/1964 | SW | Old Oak Common | 03/05/1969 | 4.42 | Prs | Preserved | 59.08 | |||
D9525 | 13/01/1965 | SW | Bristol Bath Road | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 3.25 | Prs | Preserved | 3.96 | ||
D9526 | 06/01/1965 | SW | Bristol Bath Road | 30/11/1968 | 3.83 | Prs | Preserved | 59.01 | |||
D9527 | 18/01/1965 | SW | Bristol Bath Road | 03/05/1969 | 4.33 | Cut | National Coal Board (Ashington) | 01/1984 | 19.00 | ||
D9528 | 21/01/1965 | SW | Bristol Bath Road | 02/03/1969 | 4.17 | Cut | National Coal Board (Ashington) | 12/1981 | 16.91 | ||
D9529 | 26/01/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 3.25 | Prs | Preserved | 58.96 | ||
D9530 | 02/02/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 05/10/1968 | 3.67 | Cut | National Coal Board (Tower Colliery) | 08/1982 | 17.54 | ||
D9531 | 02/02/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 30/12/1967 | 2.83 | Prs | Preserved | 58.94 | |||
D9532 | 18/02/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 3.17 | Cut | British Steel Corporation (at Corby) | 02/1982 | 17.00 | |
D9533 | 19/02/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 3.17 | Cut | British Steel Corporation (at Corby) | 09/1982 | 17.58 | |
D9534 | 02/03/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 3.08 | Cut | Unknown (Bruges, Belgium) | 58.86 | ||
D9535 | 08/03/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 21/12/1968 | 3.75 | Cut | National Coal Board (Ashington) | 01/1984 | 18.87 | ||
D9536 | 16/03/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 03/05/1969 | 4.17 | Cut | National Coal Board (Ashington) | 12/1985 | 20.76 | ||
D9537 | 16/03/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 3.08 | Prs | Preserved | 58.82 | ||
D9538 | 26/03/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 03/05/1969 | 4.17 | Cut | British Steel Corporation (at Corby) | 09/1982 | 17.48 | ||
D9539 | 09/04/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 3 | Prs | Preserved | 58.76 | ||
D9540 | 22/04/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 3 | Cut | National Coal Board (Ashington) | 01/1984 | 18.75 | |
D9541 | 27/04/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 3 | Cut | British Steel Corporation (at Corby) | 08/1982 | 17.31 | |
D9542 | 06/05/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 2.92 | Cut | British Steel Corporation (at Corby) | 08/1982 | 17.29 | |
D9543 | 28/06/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 2.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 11/1968 | 3.39 | |
D9544 | 29/05/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 2.92 | Cut | British Steel Corporation (at Corby) | 09/1980 | 15.31 | |
D9545 | 08/06/1965 | SW | Landore | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 2.83 | Cut | National Coal Board (Ashington) | 07/1979 | 14.11 | |
D9546 | 28/06/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 2.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 11/1968 | 3.39 | |
D9547 | 20/07/1965 | SW | Severn Tunnel Junction | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 2.75 | Cut | British Steel Corporation (at Corby) | 08/1982 | 17.08 | |
D9548 | 26/07/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 2.75 | Cut | Unknown (Spain) | 0000 | ||
D9549 | 19/08/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 2.67 | Cut | Unknown (Terragona, Spain) | 03/2007 | 41.60 | |
D9550 | 27/08/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 2.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 11/1968 | 3.22 | |
D9551 | 02/09/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 2.58 | Prs | Preserved | 58.36 | ||
D9552 | 06/09/1965 | SW | Cardiff Canton | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 2.58 | Cut | British Steel Corporation (at Corby) | 09/1980 | 15.04 | |
D9553 | 16/09/1965 | SW | Bristol Bath Road | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 2.58 | Prs | Preserved | 58.32 | ||
D9554 | 06/10/1965 | SW | Bristol Bath Road | 01/04/1968 | Hull Dairycoates | 2.5 | Cut | British Steel Corporation (at Corby) | 08/1982 | 16.87 | |
D9555 | 22/10/1965 | SW | Bristol Bath Road | 03/05/1969 | 3.58 | Prs | Preserved | 58.22 |