Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 722 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 2008 Week
» 29482 Month
» 326496 Year
» 403083 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Yorkshire Eng Co & BTH Ltd 15 Bo-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Dept) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D8200 10/11/1957 BT Devons Road (Bow) 27/03/1971 13.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/03/1972 14.32
D8201 17/02/1958 BT Devons Road (Bow) 27/03/1971 13.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/02/1972 13.96
D8202 03/02/1958 BT Devons Road (Bow) 30/09/1968 10.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/04/1969 11.16
D8203 ADB968003 24/02/1958 BT Devons Road (Bow) 20/03/1969 11.08 Cut Vic Berry (at Colchester MPD) 01/10/1981 23.62
D8204 17/04/1958 BT Devons Road (Bow) 27/03/1971 12.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/04/1972 13.97
D8205 28/04/1958 BT Devons Road (Bow) 30/09/1968 10.42 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/04/1969 10.93
D8206 19/05/1958 BT Devons Road (Bow) 30/09/1968 10.33 Cut Woodham Brothers (Barry, South Glamorgan) 01/02/1970 11.72
D8207 16/06/1958 BT Devons Road (Bow) 27/03/1971 12.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/04/1972 13.80
D8208 07/07/1958 BT Devons Road (Bow) 30/09/1968 10.17 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/04/1969 10.74
D8209 07/10/1958 BT Devons Road (Bow) 27/03/1971 12.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/03/1972 13.41
D8210 05/11/1959 BT Stratford 27/03/1971 11.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/03/1972 12.33
D8211 12/11/1959 BT Stratford 27/03/1971 11.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/12/1971 12.06
D8212 27/11/1959 BT March 30/09/1968 8.83 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/04/1969 9.35
D8213 09/12/1959 BT March 22/12/1968 9 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/04/1969 9.32
D8214 09/12/1959 BT March 06/12/1970 11 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/12/1971 11.99
D8215 31/12/1959 BT March 06/12/1970 11 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/11/1971 11.84
D8216 31/12/1959 BT March 27/03/1971 11.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/01/1972 12.01
D8217 19/01/1960 BT March 31/03/1968 Stratford 8.17 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/01/1969 8.96
D8218 01/02/1960 BT March 27/03/1971 11.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/11/1971 11.76
D8219 29/02/1960 BT March 30/09/1968 8.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/04/1969 9.09
D8220 10/03/1960 BT Stratford 27/03/1971 11 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/11/1971 11.65
D8221 21/03/1960 BT Stratford 27/03/1971 11 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/12/1971 11.70
D8222 30/03/1960 BT Stratford 27/03/1971 11 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/12/1971 11.68
D8223 08/04/1960 BT Ipswich 22/12/1968 8.67 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/06/1969 9.15
D8224 29/04/1960 BT Ipswich 27/03/1971 10.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/12/1971 11.60
D8225 11/05/1960 BT Ipswich 27/03/1971 10.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/12/1971 11.56
D8226 03/05/1960 BT Ipswich 27/03/1971 10.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/12/1971 11.59
D8227 27/05/1960 BT Ipswich 30/09/1968 8.33 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/04/1969 8.85
D8228 14/06/1960 BT Ipswich 27/03/1971 10.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/12/1971 11.47
D8229 29/06/1960 BT Norwich Thorpe 27/03/1971 10.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/01/1972 11.52
D8230 07/07/1960 BT Norwich Thorpe 27/03/1971 10.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/11/1971 11.33
D8231 18/07/1960 BT Norwich Thorpe 27/03/1971 10.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/01/1972 11.46
D8232 23/08/1960 BT Norwich Thorpe 27/03/1971 10.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/11/1971 11.20
D8233 ADB968001 31/08/1960 BT Stratford 16/02/1969 8.5 Prs Preserved 56.63
D8234 21/09/1960 BT Stratford 27/03/1971 10.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/01/1971 10.28
D8235 30/09/1960 BT Ipswich 06/10/1968 8.08 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/04/1969 8.51
D8236 07/10/1960 BT Ipswich 06/10/1968 8 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/04/1969 8.49
D8237 ADB968002 17/11/1960 BT Finsbury Park 20/03/1969 8.33 Cut Marples and Gillot (Sheffield) 01/04/1985 24.39
D8238 21/12/1960 BT Finsbury Park 30/09/1968 7.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/04/1969 8.28
D8239 23/01/1961 BT Finsbury Park 27/03/1971 10.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/01/1972 10.95
D8240 23/01/1961 BT Finsbury Park 06/10/1968 7.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/04/1969 8.19
D8241 01/02/1961 BT Sheffield Darnall 14/04/1968 Stratford 7.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/08/1968 7.50
D8242 10/02/1961 BT Finsbury Park 27/03/1971 10.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/11/1971 10.73
D8243 ADB968000 24/02/1961 BT Finsbury Park 16/02/1969 8 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/02/1991 29.96