Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 1059 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 7115 Week
» 21692 Month
» 384937 Year
» 461524 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Clayton 17 Bo-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D8500 10/09/1962 CL Polmadie 27/03/1971 8.5 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 11/1971 9.19
D8501 10/10/1962 CL Polmadie 12/10/1968 6 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 12/1971 9.19
D8502 06/10/1962 CL Polmadie 05/10/1971 9 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 03/1973 10.45
D8503 10/10/1962 CL Polmadie 06/10/1971 9 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 06/1972 9.69
D8504 17/10/1962 CL Polmadie 07/11/1971 9.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1975 12.92
D8505 17/10/1962 CL Polmadie 06/10/1971 9 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 05/1974 11.58
D8506 24/10/1962 CL Polmadie 21/09/1971 8.92 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 12/1971 9.15
D8507 30/10/1962 CL Polmadie 31/12/1971 9.17 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 09/1975 12.88
D8508 30/10/1962 CL Polmadie 31/12/1971 9.17 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 09/1975 12.88
D8509 13/11/1962 CL Polmadie 12/10/1968 5.92 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/1972 9.18
D8510 13/11/1962 CL Polmadie 27/03/1971 8.33 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 11/1971 9.01
D8511 22/11/1962 CL Polmadie 12/10/1968 5.92 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 08/1970 7.73
D8512 07/12/1962 CL Polmadie 28/12/1968 6 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/1973 10.12
D8513 07/12/1962 CL Polmadie 21/09/1971 8.75 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 12/1971 9.03
D8514 09/07/1963 CL Polmadie 02/11/1968 5.33 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 12/1971 8.44
D8515 03/08/1963 CL Polmadie 05/10/1971 8.17 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 09/1972 9.13
D8516 19/04/1963 CL Polmadie 06/10/1971 8.5 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 09/1975 12.42
D8517 29/06/1963 CL Polmadie 12/10/1968 5.33 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 08/1970 7.13
D8518 19/04/1963 CL Polmadie 12/10/1968 5.5 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 02/1972 8.83
D8519 18/07/1963 CL Polmadie 12/10/1968 5.25 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 05/1972 8.83
D8520 17/05/1963 CL Polmadie 12/10/1968 5.42 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 05/1972 9.00
D8521 23/07/1963 CL Polmadie 12/10/1968 5.25 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 10/1978 15.24
D8522 03/07/1963 CL Polmadie 12/10/1968 5.25 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 05/1972 8.87
D8523 09/07/1963 CL Polmadie 12/10/1968 5.25 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 06/1972 8.94
D8524 16/07/1963 CL Polmadie 12/10/1968 5.25 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 08/1970 7.09
D8525 14/08/1963 CL Polmadie 06/10/1971 8.17 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 09/1975 12.10
D8526 20/08/1963 CL Polmadie 12/10/1968 5.17 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 05/1972 8.74
D8527 29/08/1963 CL Polmadie 28/12/1968 5.33 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 06/1972 8.80
D8528 23/07/1963 CL Polmadie 05/10/1971 8.25 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 07/1973 9.99
D8529 17/05/1963 CL Polmadie 31/12/1971 8.58 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 09/1975 12.34
D8530 26/04/1963 CL Polmadie 03/03/1971 7.92 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 10/1971 8.48
D8531 08/05/1963 CL Polmadie 21/09/1971 8.33 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 09/1975 12.36
D8532 29/07/1963 CL Polmadie 28/12/1968 5.42 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 06/1972 8.89
D8533 03/08/1963 CL Polmadie 12/10/1968 5.17 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 01/1972 8.46
D8534 12/06/1963 CL Polmadie 12/10/1968 5.33 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 02/1973 9.69
D8535 18/07/1963 CL Polmadie 27/03/1971 7.67 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 11/1971 8.33
D8536 29/08/1963 CL Polmadie 31/12/1971 8.33 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 09/1975 12.05
D8537 12/06/1963 CL Polmadie 21/07/1968 5.08 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 09/1968 5.27
D8538 21/06/1963 CL Polmadie 06/10/1971 8.33 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 12/1972 9.49
D8539 12/06/1963 CL Polmadie 06/10/1971 8.33 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 12/1975 12.52
D8540 20/08/1963 CL Polmadie 05/10/1971 8.17 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/1973 9.41
D8541 29/06/1963 CL Polmadie 05/10/1971 8.33 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 02/1973 9.64
D8542 06/09/1963 CL Polmadie 06/10/1971 8.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1975 12.03
D8543 10/09/1963 CL Polmadie 21/09/1971 8 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 06/1972 8.77
D8544 10/09/1963 CL Polmadie 28/06/1969 5.75 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 01/1971 7.35
D8545 17/09/1963 CL Polmadie 06/10/1971 8.08 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 11/1973 10.17
D8546 17/09/1963 CL Polmadie 06/10/1971 8.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1975 12.00
D8547 27/09/1963 CL Polmadie 02/1969 5.42 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 05/1969 5.64
D8548 27/09/1963 CL Polmadie 31/12/1971 8.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1975 11.98
D8549 08/10/1963 CL Polmadie 21/09/1971 7.92 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 06/1972 8.69
D8550 08/11/1963 CL Polmadie 05/10/1971 7.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1975 11.86
D8551 08/10/1963 CL Polmadie 05/10/1971 8 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1975 11.95
D8552 17/10/1963 CL Polmadie 31/12/1971 8.17 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 09/1975 11.92
D8553 17/10/1963 CL Polmadie 27/10/1968 5 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 01/1969 5.25
D8554 24/10/1963 CL Haymarket 28/06/1969 5.67 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 04/1971 7.48
D8555 29/10/1963 CL Haymarket 21/09/1971 7.92 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 05/1972 8.55
D8556 29/10/1963 CL Haymarket 02/1969 5.33 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 05/1969 5.55
D8557 08/11/1963 CL Haymarket 21/09/1971 7.83 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 08/1975 11.78
D8558 08/11/1963 CL Haymarket 31/12/1971 8.08 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 02/1973 9.28
D8559 12/11/1963 CL Haymarket 06/10/1971 7.92 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 03/1974 10.35
D8560 12/11/1963 CL Haymarket 02/1969 5.25 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 05/1969 5.51
D8561 22/11/1963 CL Haymarket 07/11/1971 8 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 07/1973 9.65
D8562 22/11/1963 CL Haymarket 06/10/1971 7.92 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 07/1973 9.65
D8563 20/12/1963 CL Haymarket 31/12/1971 8 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1975 11.75
D8564 20/12/1963 CL Haymarket 16/02/1969 5.17 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 05/1969 5.41
D8565 21/12/1963 CL Haymarket 01/11/1971 7.92 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 05/1973 9.41
D8566 21/12/1963 CL Haymarket 04/12/1968 5 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 04/1969 5.32
D8567 06/01/1964 CL Haymarket 06/10/1971 7.75 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/1973 9.03
D8568 06/01/1964 CL Haymarket 06/10/1971 7.75 Prs Preserved 53.27
D8569 10/01/1964 CL Haymarket 04/12/1968 4.92 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 04/1969 5.27
D8570 10/01/1964 CL Haymarket 24/11/1968 4.83 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 05/1969 5.35
D8571 20/01/1964 CL Haymarket 28/06/1969 5.42 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1971 7.41
D8572 20/01/1964 CL Haymarket 28/06/1969 5.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1970 6.41
D8573 30/01/1964 CL Haymarket 06/10/1971 7.75 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 08/1975 11.55
D8574 30/01/1964 CL Haymarket 31/12/1971 7.92 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 09/1975 11.63
D8575 12/02/1964 CL Haymarket 27/10/1968 4.67 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 03/1969 5.09
D8576 12/02/1964 CL Haymarket 28/02/1969 5 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 05/1969 5.26
D8577 18/02/1964 CL Haymarket 02/1969 5 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 05/1969 5.24
D8578 03/03/1964 CL Haymarket 28/06/1969 5.25 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 03/1971 7.04
D8579 03/03/1964 CL Haymarket 04/10/1971 7.58 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/1973 8.88
D8580 11/03/1964 CL Haymarket 06/10/1971 7.58 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 09/1975 11.52
D8581 24/03/1964 CL Haymarket 06/10/1971 7.58 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 05/1974 10.15
D8582 31/03/1964 CL Haymarket 25/01/1969 4.83 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1969 5.13
D8583 17/04/1964 CL Haymarket 21/09/1971 7.42 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 08/1973 9.33
D8584 28/05/1964 CL Haymarket 29/10/1968 4.42 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1969 4.97
D8585 14/05/1964 CL Haymarket 29/10/1968 4.42 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 04/1969 4.92
D8586 11/12/1964 CL Haymarket 21/09/1971 6.75 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 07/1973 8.60
D8587 05/02/1965 CL Haymarket 06/10/1971 6.67 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 02/1974 9.03
D8588 20/03/1964 BP Thornaby 04/10/1971 7.58 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 07/1973 9.33
D8589 04/05/1964 BP Thornaby 06/07/1970 6.17 Cut W Willoughby (at Gateshead MPD) 04/1971 6.95
D8590 12/05/1964 BP Thornaby 27/03/1971 6.83 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 12/1971 7.60
D8591 08/07/1964 BP Thornaby 22/12/1968 4.42 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1969 4.94
D8592 12/05/1964 BP Gateshead 21/09/1971 7.33 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 03/1972 7.85
D8593 28/05/1964 BP Gateshead 04/10/1971 7.42 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 09/1973 9.31
D8594 03/07/1964 BP Gateshead 21/09/1971 7.17 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 03/1972 7.70
D8595 21/07/1964 BP Gateshead 22/12/1968 4.42 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1969 4.82
D8596 28/07/1964 BP Gateshead 22/12/1968 4.42 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1969 4.80
D8597 21/07/1964 BP Gateshead 06/10/1971 7.25 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 07/1973 8.99
D8598 06/08/1964 BP Gateshead 31/12/1971 7.33 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 03/1979 14.61
D8599 28/08/1964 BP Gateshead 05/10/1971 7.17 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 11/1971 7.22
D8600 06/08/1964 BP Gateshead 06/10/1971 7.17 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 04/1973 8.70
D8601 02/09/1964 BP Gateshead 06/10/1971 7.08 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 11/1973 9.21
D8602 09/09/1964 BP Gateshead 06/10/1971 7.08 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 04/1972 7.60
D8603 07/09/1964 BP Gateshead 06/10/1971 7.08 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 04/1972 7.61
D8604 15/09/1964 BP Tinsley 04/10/1971 7.08 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 04/1972 7.59
D8605 01/10/1964 BP Tinsley 28/10/1968 4 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/1969 4.62
D8606 05/10/1964 BP Tinsley 27/03/1971 6.42 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 04/1972 7.53
D8607 16/10/1964 BP Tinsley 05/10/1971 7 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 08/1975 10.84
D8608 27/10/1964 BP Tinsley 05/10/1971 7 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 08/1975 10.81
D8609 23/11/1964 BP Tinsley 13/10/1968 3.92 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1969 4.56
D8610 07/12/1964 BP Tinsley 05/10/1971 6.83 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 08/1973 8.69
D8611 17/12/1964 BP Tinsley 13/10/1968 3.83 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1969 4.41
D8612 27/01/1965 BP Tinsley 05/10/1971 6.75 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 08/1975 10.55
D8613 22/01/1965 BP Tinsley 06/10/1971 6.75 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 08/1975 10.57
D8614 11/02/1965 BP Tinsley 05/10/1971 6.67 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 12/1972 7.85
D8615 10/03/1965 BP Tinsley 05/10/1971 6.58 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 11/1973 8.69
D8616 23/04/1965 BP Staveley (Barrow Hill) 21/09/1971 6.42 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 08/1975 10.32