Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 116 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1402 Week
» 28876 Month
» 325890 Year
» 402477 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

EE & RSH Ltd 20 Bo-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D8000 20050 18/06/1957 EE Devons Road (Bow) 14/12/1980 23.5 Prs Preserved 59.82
D8001 20001 08/07/1957 EE Devons Road (Bow) 20/04/1988 Toton 30.75 Prs Preserved 59.77
D8002 20002 25/07/1957 EE Devons Road (Bow) 19/02/1988 30.58 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 24/09/1990 33.19
D8003 20003 23/08/1957 EE Devons Road (Bow) 16/08/1981 24 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 04/02/1984 26.47
D8004 20004 09/08/1957 EE Devons Road (Bow) 11/10/1990 33.17 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 27/08/1991 34.07
D8005 20005 09/09/1957 EE Devons Road (Bow) 27/07/1989 31.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 05/12/1990 33.26
D8006 20006 16/09/1957 EE Devons Road (Bow) 02/10/1990 33.08 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 26/06/1991 33.80
D8007 20007 19/09/1957 EE Devons Road (Bow) 01/07/1993 35.83 Prs Preserved 59.57
D8008 20008 01/10/1957 EE Devons Road (Bow) 20/02/1989 31.33 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 15/11/1993 36.15
D8009 20009 08/10/1957 EE Devons Road (Bow) 19/07/1989 31.75 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 18/11/1993 36.14
D8010 20010 16/10/1957 EE Devons Road (Bow) 09/12/1991 34.17 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 19/01/1994 36.28
D8011 20011 29/10/1957 EE Devons Road (Bow) 02/02/1987 29.33 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 20/01/1994 36.25
D8012 20012 11/11/1957 EE Devons Road (Bow) 27/03/1976 18.33 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 31/01/1977 19.24
D8013 20013 26/11/1957 EE Devons Road (Bow) 13/12/1991 34.08 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 29/09/1993 35.87
D8014 20014 16/12/1957 EE Devons Road (Bow) 27/03/1976 18.25 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 31/01/1977 19.14
D8015 20015 20/12/1957 EE Devons Road (Bow) 13/07/1987 29.58 Cut Vic Berry (at Thornaby MPD) 31/10/1988 30.88
D8016 20016 30/12/1957 EE Devons Road (Bow) 59.29
D8017 20017 10/01/1958 EE Devons Road (Bow) 05/12/1982 24.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 04/02/1984 26.08
D8018 20018 07/02/1958 EE Devons Road (Bow) 04/12/1976 18.83 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 31/05/1978 20.32
D8019 20019 04/03/1958 EE Devons Road (Bow) 15/11/1991 33.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 19/01/1994 35.90
D8020 20020 03/10/1959 RS Hornsey 01/10/1990 31 Prs Preserved 57.53
D8021 20021 20/10/1959 RS Hornsey 08/03/1991 31.42 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 16/03/1992 32.43
D8022 20022 29/10/1959 RS Hornsey 16/08/1988 28.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 21/05/1990 30.58
D8023 20023 13/11/1959 RS Hornsey 17/05/1991 31.5 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 09/04/1992 32.43
D8024 20024 25/11/1959 RS Hornsey 02/05/1977 17.5 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 31/03/1978 18.36
D8025 20025 27/11/1959 RS Hornsey 19/09/1991 31.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 17/03/1995 35.33
D8026 20026 04/12/1959 RS Hornsey 10/10/1990 30.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 02/09/1991 31.77
D8027 20027 11/12/1959 RS Hornsey 19/12/1982 23 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 31/08/1986 26.74
D8028 20028 18/12/1959 RS Leith Central 15/11/1991 31.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 08/03/1995 35.24
D8029 20029 28/12/1959 RS Leith Central 05/07/1991 31.58 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 03/09/1993 33.71
D8030 20030 31/12/1959 RS Leith Central 01/10/1990 30.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 27/08/1991 31.68
D8031 20031 20/01/1960 RS Kittybrewster 14/09/1990 30.67 Prs Preserved 31.68
D8032 20032 18/02/1960 RS Inverness 04/1993 33.17 57.15
D8033 20033 18/02/1960 RS Inverness 23/11/1977 17.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 31/01/1980 19.96
D8034 20034 12/03/1960 RS Inverness 01/10/1990 30.58 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 05/07/1991 31.33
D8035 20035 18/09/1959 EE Norwich Thorpe 01/05/1991 31.67 Prs Preserved 57.57
D8036 20036 03/10/1959 EE Norwich Thorpe 11/06/1984 24.67 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 31/08/1986 26.93
D8037 20037 09/10/1959 EE Norwich Thorpe 21/01/1987 27.25 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/05/1988 28.66
D8038 20038 17/10/1959 EE Norwich Thorpe 27/03/1976 16.42 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 30/06/1977 17.72
D8039 20039 24/10/1959 EE Norwich Thorpe 23/09/1986 26.92 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/06/1988 28.70
D8040 20040 30/10/1959 EE Norwich Thorpe 13/09/1991 31.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 03/02/1992 32.28
D8041 20041 06/11/1959 EE Norwich Thorpe 57.44
D8042 20042 11/11/1959 EE Norwich Thorpe 57.42
D8043 20043 14/11/1959 EE Norwich Thorpe 27/06/1991 31.58 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 28/04/1995 35.48
D8044 20044 24/11/1959 EE Norwich Thorpe 11/09/1989 29.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 26/09/1991 31.86
D8045 20045 04/12/1959 EE Hornsey 10/10/1990 30.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 14/10/1991 31.88
D8046 20046 12/12/1959 EE Hornsey 09/06/1993 33.5 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 02/09/1993 33.75
D8047 20047 18/12/1959 EE Hornsey 57.32
D8048 20048 31/12/1959 EE Hornsey 01/11/1990 30.92 Prs Preserved 57.29
D8049 20049 31/12/1959 EE Hornsey 01/05/1987 27.42 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/07/1988 28.60
D8050 20128 02/03/1961 RS Sheffield Darnall 56.12
D8051 20051 10/03/1961 RS Sheffield Darnall 04/02/1991 29.92 Cut C F Booth (at RFS Kilnhurst) 30/09/1993 32.58
D8052 20052 24/03/1961 RS Sheffield Darnall 17/11/1990 29.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 05/07/1991 30.30
D8053 20053 06/04/1961 RS Sheffield Darnall 10/10/1990 29.5 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 09/09/1991 30.45
D8054 20054 12/06/1961 RS Sheffield Darnall 11/09/1989 28.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 14/10/1991 30.36
D8055 20055 14/04/1961 RS Sheffield Darnall 23/07/1993 32.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 27/03/1995 33.97
D8056 20056 26/04/1961 RS Sheffield Darnall 55.97
D8057 20057 01/05/1961 RS Sheffield Darnall 10/1994 33.42 55.95
D8058 20058 08/05/1961 RS Sheffield Darnall 28/02/1992 30.75 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 09/08/1994 33.28
D8059 20059 12/05/1961 RS Sheffield Darnall 05/1993 32 Prs Preserved 55.92
D8060 20060 24/05/1961 RS Sheffield Darnall 55.89
D8061 20061 24/05/1961 RS Sheffield Darnall 21/01/1991 29.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 20/01/1994 32.68
D8062 20062 29/05/1961 RS Sheffield Darnall 18/09/1976 15.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 31/08/1979 18.27
D8063 20063 05/06/1961 RS Sheffield Darnall 01/05/1991 29.92 Prs Preserved 55.86
D8064 20064 12/06/1961 RS Sheffield Darnall 14/09/1990 29.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 09/10/1991 30.35
D8065 20065 19/06/1961 RS Sheffield Darnall 08/01/1991 29.58 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 31/01/1991 29.64
D8066 20066 19/06/1961 RS Sheffield Darnall 55.82
D8067 20067 26/06/1961 RS Sheffield Darnall 21/01/1987 25.58 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/06/1988 27.03
D8068 20068 26/06/1961 RS Sheffield Darnall 16/06/1987 26 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 07/12/1993 32.47
D8069 20069 30/06/1961 RS Sheffield Darnall 20/05/1991 29.92 Prs Preserved 55.79
D8070 20070 30/06/1961 RS Eastfield 11/04/1991 29.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 07/12/1992 31.46
D8071 20071 10/07/1961 RS Eastfield 23/07/1993 32 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 22/03/1995 33.72
D8072 20072 10/07/1961 RS Eastfield 01/1992 30.5 55.76
D8073 20073 19/07/1961 RS Eastfield 23/12/1993 32.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 14/04/2006 44.77
D8074 20074 19/07/1961 RS Eastfield 31/01/1976 14.5 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 30/11/1976 15.38
D8075 20075 26/07/1961 RS Eastfield 55.72
D8076 20076 26/07/1961 RS Eastfield 04/05/1988 Immingham 26.83 Cut Vic Berry (at Thornaby MPD) 31/10/1988 27.28
D8077 20077 28/07/1961 RS Eastfield 16/05/1988 26.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 21/05/1990 28.83
D8078 20078 28/07/1961 RS Eastfield 10/01/1992 30.5 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 12/10/1993 32.23
D8079 20079 28/08/1961 RS Eastfield 25/04/1977 15.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 30/11/1978 17.27
D8080 20080 28/08/1961 RS Eastfield 10/07/1990 28.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 10/09/1993 32.06
D8081 20081 31/08/1961 RS Eastfield 55.62
D8082 20082 31/08/1961 RS Eastfield 23/07/1993 31.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 23/03/1995 33.58
D8083 20083 12/09/1961 RS Eastfield 55.59
D8084 20084 12/09/1961 RS Eastfield 55.59
D8085 20085 18/09/1961 RS Eastfield 08/03/1991 29.5 Cut Central Electricty Generating Board (at Castle Donington Power Station) 01/11/1994 33.14
D8086 20086 18/09/1961 RS Eastfield 01/09/1988 27 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 26/02/1991 29.46
D8087 20087 26/09/1961 RS Eastfield 04/1995 33.58 Prs Preserved 55.55
D8088 20088 26/09/1961 RS Eastfield 55.55
D8089 20089 03/10/1961 RS Eastfield 27/04/1987 25.5 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 16/12/1993 32.22
D8090 20090 29/09/1961 RS Eastfield 06/07/1993 31.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 28/03/1995 33.52
D8091 20091 10/10/1961 RS Eastfield 04/09/1978 16.92 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 30/11/1978 17.15
D8092 20092 10/10/1961 RS Eastfield 55.51
D8093 20093 17/10/1961 RS Eastfield 20/05/1991 29.58 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 06/05/1992 30.57
D8094 20094 17/10/1961 RS Eastfield 09/06/1993 31.67 Cut Cymru Metals (Llanelli) 01/05/2004 42.57
D8095 20095 26/10/1961 RS Eastfield 55.47
D8096 20096 26/10/1961 RS Eastfield 01/06/1992 30.67 Prs Preserved 55.47
D8097 20097 08/11/1961 RS Eastfield 11/09/1989 27.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 14/10/1991 29.95
D8098 20098 08/11/1961 RS Eastfield 24/06/1991 29.58 Prs Preserved 55.43
D8099 20099 15/11/1961 RS Eastfield 04/02/1991 29.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 18/08/1993 31.78
D8100 20100 22/11/1961 RS Eastfield 05/05/1989 27.5 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 27/02/1991 29.28
D8101 20101 22/11/1961 RS Eastfield 55.39
D8102 20102 01/12/1961 RS Eastfield 55.37
D8103 20103 01/12/1961 RS Eastfield 08/03/1991 29.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 12/06/1992 30.55
D8104 20104 08/12/1961 RS Eastfield 55.35
D8105 20105 08/12/1961 RS Eastfield Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 55.35
D8106 20106 12/12/1961 RS Eastfield 13/10/1993 31.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 28/01/1994 32.15
D8107 20107 20/12/1961 RS Eastfield 21/01/1991 29.08 55.32
D8108 20108 20/12/1961 RS Eastfield 13/09/1991 29.75 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 31/10/2005 43.89
D8109 20109 29/12/1961 RS Eastfield 14/02/1982 20.17 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 02/04/1983 21.27
D8110 20110 10/01/1962 RS Eastfield 14/09/1990 28.67 Prs Preserved 29.70
D8111 20111 18/01/1962 RS Eastfield 22/04/1987 25.25 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/03/1988 26.21
D8112 20112 26/01/1962 RS Eastfield 21/01/1991 29 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 06/09/1993 31.63
D8113 20113 01/02/1962 RS Eastfield 13/09/1991 29.58 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carlisle Kingmoor (Etterby Road Industrail Estate)) 31/12/2003 41.94
D8114 20114 08/02/1962 RS Eastfield 31/01/1990 27.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 09/07/1991 29.43
D8115 20115 08/02/1962 RS Eastfield 11/01/1987 24.92 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/05/1988 26.32
D8116 20116 15/02/1962 RS Eastfield 16/01/1987 24.92 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/05/1988 26.31
D8117 20117 23/02/1962 RS Polmadie 55.14
D8118 20118 08/03/1962 RS Polmadie 03/03/2000 38 Prs Preserved 55.10
D8119 20119 08/03/1962 RS Polmadie 01/06/1992 30.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/02/2009 46.94
D8120 20120 16/03/1962 RS Polmadie 55.08
D8121 20121 16/03/1962 RS Polmadie 55.08
D8122 20122 22/03/1962 RS Polmadie 05/07/1991 29.33 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 15/10/1993 31.59
D8123 20123 29/03/1962 RS Polmadie 30/04/1987 25.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/07/1988 26.36
D8124 20124 13/04/1962 RS Polmadie 07/06/1991 29.17 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 15/10/1993 31.53
D8125 20125 25/04/1962 RS Polmadie 23/09/1986 24.42 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/10/1988 26.54
D8126 20126 15/05/1962 RS Polmadie 18/09/1989 27.33 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 07/06/1992 30.08
D8127 20127 16/07/1962 RS Polmadie 54.75
D8128 20228 12/01/1966 EE Tinsley 01/05/1991 25.33 Prs Preserved 51.25
D8129 20129 12/02/1966 EE Tinsley 10/10/1990 24.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 08/09/1991 25.59
D8130 20130 17/02/1966 EE Tinsley 10/10/1990 24.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 14/10/1991 25.67
D8131 20131 26/02/1966 EE Tinsley 51.13
D8132 20132 05/03/1966 EE Tinsley 51.11
D8133 20133 17/03/1966 EE Tinsley 13/09/1991 25.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 28/10/2002 36.64
D8134 20134 18/03/1966 EE Bescot 19/07/1989 23.33 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 14/08/1991 25.42
D8135 20135 26/03/1966 EE Bescot 23/07/1993 27.33 Cut J T Lanscapes (at MoD Caerwent) 01/07/2004 38.29
D8136 20136 31/03/1966 EE 02/10/1990 24.58 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 09/10/1991 25.54
D8137 20137 12/04/1966 EE 01/12/1992 26.67 Prs Preserved 51.00
D8138 20138 23/04/1966 EE Birmingham Division Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 50.97
D8139 20139 26/04/1966 EE Birmingham Division 01/05/1991 25.08 Prs Preserved 50.96
D8140 20140 21/05/1966 EE Birmingham Division 28/04/1993 26.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 15/05/1994 28.00
D8141 20141 21/05/1966 EE Birmingham Division 15/11/1991 25.5 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 02/11/1993 27.47
D8142 20142 21/05/1966 EE Birmingham Division 50.90
D8143 20143 06/07/1966 EE Birmingham Division 10/01/1992 25.5 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 23/08/1993 27.15
D8144 20144 28/06/1966 EE Nottingham Division 08/01/1990 23.58 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 23/08/1993 27.17
D8145 20145 10/06/1966 EE Nottingham Division 19/05/1991 24.92 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/08/2009 43.17
D8146 20146 10/06/1966 EE Nottingham Division 07/12/1988 22.5 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 04/04/1989 22.83
D8147 20147 23/06/1966 EE Nottingham Division 18/05/1989 22.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 10/10/1991 25.32
D8148 20148 27/06/1966 EE Nottingham Division 15/11/1991 25.42 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 24/05/1994 27.93
D8149 20149 05/07/1966 EE Nottingham Division 09/11/1987 21.33 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/09/1988 22.25
D8150 20150 05/07/1966 EE Nottingham Division 09/11/1987 21.33 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/05/1990 23.84
D8151 20151 12/07/1966 EE Nottingham Division 23/07/1993 27 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 07/03/1995 28.67
D8152 20152 15/08/1966 EE Nottingham Division 14/04/1988 21.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 29/08/1988 22.05
D8153 20153 15/08/1966 EE Nottingham Division 09/11/1987 21.25 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/03/1988 21.64
D8154 20154 15/08/1966 EE Nottingham Division 01/04/1993 26.67 Prs Preserved 50.66
D8155 20155 23/08/1966 EE Nottingham Division 09/11/1987 21.25 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/11/1987 21.28
D8156 20156 26/08/1966 EE Nottingham Division 05/07/1991 24.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 11/10/1993 27.15
D8157 20157 02/09/1966 EE Nottingham Division 10/10/1990 24.08 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 26/06/1992 25.83
D8158 20158 02/09/1966 EE Nottingham Division 18/05/1989 22.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 01/03/1991 24.51
D8159 20159 09/09/1966 EE Nottingham Division 13/09/1991 25 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 29/08/2005 39.00
D8160 20160 19/09/1966 EE Nottingham Division 17/12/1990 24.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 04/05/1994 27.64
D8161 20161 19/09/1966 EE Nottingham Division 02/02/1988 21.42 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/05/1990 23.63
D8162 20162 19/09/1966 EE Nottingham Division 09/11/1987 21.17 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/11/1987 21.21
D8163 20163 23/09/1966 EE Nottingham Division 25/09/1992 26 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 19/05/1994 27.67
D8164 20164 05/10/1966 EE Nottingham Division 09/11/1987 21.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/07/1988 21.84
D8165 20165 05/10/1966 EE Nottingham Division Cut Michael Douglas Ltd (Carlisle) 01/12/2001 35.18
D8166 20166 10/10/1966 EE Nottingham Division 50.51
D8167 20167 17/10/1966 EE Nottingham Division 09/11/1987 21.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/11/1988 22.06
D8168 20168 19/10/1966 EE Nottingham Division 01/05/1993 26.58 Prs Preserved 50.48
D8169 20169 25/10/1966 EE Nottingham Division 07/12/2001 35.17 Prs Preserved 50.47
D8170 20170 25/10/1966 EE Nottingham Division 15/11/1991 25.08 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 12/09/1993 26.90
D8171 20171 27/10/1966 EE Nottingham Division 08/12/1989 23.17 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 08/08/1991 24.80
D8172 20172 28/10/1966 EE Nottingham Division 11/10/1990 24 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 29/03/1995 28.44
D8173 20173 08/12/1966 EE Nottingham Division 04/02/1991 24.17 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 19/02/1992 25.22
D8174 20174 04/11/1966 EE Nottingham Division 06/04/1988 21.42 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 01/11/1993 27.01
D8175 20175 08/11/1966 EE Nottingham Division 13/09/1991 24.83 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carlisle Kingmoor (Etterby Road Industrail Estate)) 31/12/2003 37.17
D8176 20176 16/11/1966 EE Nottingham Division 21/10/1991 24.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 18/01/1994 27.19
D8177 20177 18/11/1966 EE Nottingham Division 23/07/1993 26.67 Prs Preserved 35.64
D8178 20178 16/12/1966 EE Nottingham Division 18/12/1989 23 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 25/06/1992 25.54
D8179 20179 16/12/1966 EE Nottingham Division 28/02/1989 22.17 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 20/02/1991 24.20
D8180 20180 16/12/1966 EE Nottingham Division 28/02/1989 22.17 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 21/05/1990 23.44
D8181 20181 19/12/1966 EE Nottingham Division 12/11/1987 20.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 05/05/1994 27.39
D8182 20182 16/12/1966 EE Nottingham Division 08/03/1991 24.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 10/09/1993 26.75
D8183 20183 16/12/1966 EE Nottingham Division 26/01/1990 23.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/05/1990 23.39
D8184 20184 19/12/1966 EE Nottingham Division 26/10/1986 19.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/07/1988 21.63
D8185 20185 25/02/1967 EE Nottingham Division 02/10/1992 25.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 16/08/1994 27.49
D8186 20186 21/01/1967 EE Nottingham Division 23/07/1993 26.5 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 31/03/1995 28.21
D8187 20187 21/01/1967 EE Nottingham Division 50.22
D8188 20188 21/01/1967 EE Nottingham Division 01/01/1990 23 Prs Preserved 50.22
D8189 20189 21/01/1967 EE Nottingham Division 01/09/1990 23.67 Prs Preserved 50.22
D8190 20190 28/01/1967 EE Nottingham Division 50.21
D8191 20191 25/02/1967 EE Nottingham Division 09/11/1987 20.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/11/1987 20.78
D8192 20192 25/02/1967 EE Nottingham Division 11/09/1989 22.58 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 09/10/1991 24.64
D8193 20193 25/02/1967 EE Nottingham Division 19/07/1989 22.42 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 31/01/1991 23.95
D8194 20194 25/02/1967 EE Nottingham Division 50.13
D8195 20195 25/02/1967 EE Nottingham Division 23/07/1993 26.42 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 07/03/1995 28.05
D8196 20196 25/02/1967 EE Nottingham Division 28/04/1993 26.17 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 30/09/1993 26.61
D8197 20197 25/02/1967 EE Nottingham Division 50.13
D8198 20198 22/04/1967 EE Nottingham Division 05/07/1991 24.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 11/10/1993 26.49
D8199 20199 22/04/1967 EE Nottingham Division 18/06/1990 23.17 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 11/10/1993 26.49
D8300 20200 22/04/1967 EE York (North) 06/08/1979 12.33 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/09/1979 12.37
D8301 20201 22/04/1967 EE York (North) 02/09/1988 21.42 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/05/1990 23.04
D8302 20202 22/04/1967 EE York (North) 08/12/1989 22.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 20/07/1993 26.26
D8303 20203 22/04/1967 EE York (North) 07/12/1988 21.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 21/02/1992 24.85
D8304 20204 22/04/1967 EE York (North) 10/05/1989 22.08 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 16/11/1989 22.59
D8305 20205 22/04/1967 EE York (North) 18/12/1989 22.67 Prs Preserved 49.98
D8306 20206 22/04/1967 EE York (North) 12/04/1991 24 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/07/2002 35.30
D8307 20207 20/05/1967 EE York (North) 11/07/1983 16.17 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 31/08/1986 19.30
D8308 20208 20/05/1967 EE York (North) 04/02/1991 23.75 Cut Central Electricty Generating Board (at Castle Donington Power Station) 01/11/1994 27.47
D8309 20209 20/05/1967 EE York (North) 24/02/1989 21.75 Cut Michael Douglas Ltd (Carlisle) 01/12/2001 34.56
D8310 20210 20/05/1967 EE Thornaby 28/04/1993 25.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 03/11/1993 26.48
D8311 20211 20/05/1967 EE Thornaby 05/07/1991 24.17 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 13/10/1993 26.42
D8312 20212 20/05/1967 EE Thornaby 05/07/1991 24.17 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 01/10/1993 26.39
D8313 20213 20/05/1967 EE Thornaby 12/04/1991 23.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 21/10/1992 25.44
D8314 20214 20/05/1967 EE Thornaby 09/06/1993 26.08 Prs Preserved 26.50
D8315 20215 20/05/1967 EE Thornaby 01/03/1992 24.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/11/2009 42.48
D8316 20216 26/05/1967 EE Haymarket 09/11/1987 20.5 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/09/1988 21.36
D8317 20217 25/11/1967 EE Haymarket 31/07/1989 21.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 11/02/1991 23.23
D8318 20218 25/11/1967 EE Haymarket 04/10/1989 21.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 31/07/1991 23.70
D8319 20219 27/01/1968 EE Haymarket 49.21
D8320 20220 25/11/1967 EE Polmadie 10/11/1987 20 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 18/05/1994 26.50
D8321 20221 30/12/1967 EE Polmadie 10/11/1987 19.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 17/05/1994 26.40
D8322 20222 30/12/1967 EE Polmadie 15/12/1987 20 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 29/10/1988 20.85
D8323 20223 20/10/1967 EE Haymarket 10/11/1987 20.08 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 09/12/1993 26.16
D8324 20224 07/02/1968 EE Polmadie 26/01/1990 21.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 11/03/1991 23.10
D8325 20225 07/02/1968 EE Polmadie 49.18
D8326 20226 07/02/1968 EE Polmadie 26/09/1988 20.58 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 09/06/1992 24.35
D8327 20227 07/02/1968 EE Polmadie 49.18