Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 356 Today
» 1023 Yesterday
» 4970 Week
» 15105 Month
» 331336 Year
» 842438 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NB 21 Bo-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D6100 02/12/1958 NB Hornsey 06/10/1971 12/1967
to 29
Eastfield 12.83 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/11/1972 13.93
D6101 09/12/1958 NB Hornsey 03/08/1971 12/1965
to 29
Eastfield 12.67 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/10/1972 13.82
D6102 23/12/1958 NB Hornsey 06/10/1971 05/1966
to 29
Eastfield 12.83 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/08/1972 13.62
D6103 05/05/1959 NB Hornsey 05/10/1971 10/1965
to 29
Eastfield 12.42 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/11/1972 13.50
D6104 26/02/1959 NB Hornsey 30/12/1967 Eastfield 8.83 Cut Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) 01/04/1968 9.10
D6105 17/03/1959 NB Hornsey 08/06/1968 Eastfield 9.25 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 08/1968 9.42
D6106 24/03/1959 NB Hornsey 18/07/1971 10/1965
to 29
Eastfield 12.33 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/07/1972 13.28
D6107 24/03/1959 NB Hornsey 05/10/1971 06/1967
to 29
Eastfield 12.58 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/10/1972 13.53
D6108 14/04/1959 NB Hornsey 01/05/1969 09/1967
to 29
Eastfield 10.08 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1971 12.18
D6109 07/04/1959 NB Hornsey 06/04/1968 Eastfield 9 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 01/1969 9.78
D6110 20/05/1959 NB Stratford 14/04/1968 Eastfield 8.92 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 01/1969 9.67
D6111 12/05/1959 NB Stratford 16/08/1968 Eastfield 9.25 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 09/1969 10.35
D6112 20/05/1959 NB Stratford 31/12/1971 09/1966
to 29
Eastfield 12.58 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/06/1972 13.04
D6113 27/05/1959 NB Stratford 06/10/1971 12/1966
to 29
Eastfield 12.42 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/01/1972 12.61
D6114 27/05/1959 NB Stratford 05/10/1971 03/1966
to 29
Eastfield 12.42 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/09/1972 13.28
D6115 02/06/1959 NB Stratford 08/06/1968 Eastfield 9 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 08/1968 9.21
D6116 09/06/1959 NB Stratford 31/12/1971 07/1966
to 29
Eastfield 12.5 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/05/1972 12.90
D6117 16/06/1959 NB Stratford 16/08/1968 Eastfield 9.17 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 11/1968 9.42
D6118 24/06/1959 NB Stratford 30/12/1967 Eastfield 8.5 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1968 8.90
D6119 30/06/1959 NB Stratford 31/12/1971 12/1967
to 29
Eastfield 12.5 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/08/1972 13.10
D6120 07/07/1959 NB Ipswich 30/12/1967 Eastfield 8.42 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 08/1968 9.12
D6121 18/08/1959 NB Ipswich 06/10/1971 03/1966
to 29
Eastfield 12.17 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/09/1972 13.05
D6122 15/09/1959 NB Ipswich 30/12/1967 Eastfield 8.25 Cut Woodham Brothers (Barry, South Glamorgan) 01/06/1980 20.73
D6123 22/09/1959 NB Ipswich 21/09/1971 05/1963
to 29
Eastfield 12 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/10/1972 13.04
D6124 29/09/1959 NB Ipswich 06/10/1971 12/1967
to 29
Eastfield 12.08 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/09/1972 12.93
D6125 29/09/1959 NB Ipswich 30/12/1967 Eastfield 8.25 Cut Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) 01/04/1968 8.51
D6126 06/10/1959 NB Ipswich 06/04/1968 Eastfield 8.5 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 02/1969 9.37
D6127 06/10/1959 NB Ipswich 30/12/1967 Eastfield 8.17 Cut Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) 01/04/1968 8.49
D6128 13/10/1959 NB Ipswich 30/12/1967 Eastfield 8.17 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1968 8.59
D6129 27/10/1959 NB Ipswich 06/10/1971 11/1967
to 29
Eastfield 12 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/06/1972 12.61
D6130 27/10/1959 NB Ipswich 05/10/1971 09/04/1966
to 29
Eastfield 12 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/10/1972 12.94
D6131 03/11/1959 NB Ipswich 30/12/1967 Eastfield 8.08 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1968 8.62
D6132 17/11/1959 NB Ipswich 06/10/1971 12/1966
to 29
Eastfield 11.92 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/09/1972 12.80
D6133 24/11/1959 NB Ipswich 31/12/1971 05/1966
to 29
Eastfield 12.08 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/07/1972 12.61
D6134 01/12/1959 NB Ipswich 30/12/1967 Eastfield 8 Cut Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) 01/06/1968 8.51
D6135 08/12/1959 NB Ipswich 30/12/1967 Eastfield 8 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1968 8.44
D6136 17/12/1959 NB Ipswich 30/12/1967 Eastfield 8 Cut Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) 01/04/1968 8.30
D6137 22/12/1959 NB Ipswich 24/04/1971 11/1967
to 29
Eastfield 11.33 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/08/1972 12.62
D6138 02/02/1960 NB Kittybrewster 30/12/1967 Aberdeen Ferryhill 7.83 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1968 8.29
D6139 16/02/1960 NB Kittybrewster 30/12/1967 Aberdeen Ferryhill 7.83 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1968 8.33
D6140 24/02/1960 NB Kittybrewster 30/12/1967 Eastfield 7.83 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1968 8.23
D6141 15/03/1960 NB Kittybrewster 30/12/1967 Aberdeen Ferryhill 7.75 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 08/1968 8.42
D6142 22/03/1960 NB Kittybrewster 30/12/1967 Aberdeen Ferryhill 7.75 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1968 8.24
D6143 30/03/1960 NB Kittybrewster 30/12/1967 Aberdeen Ferryhill 7.75 Cut Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) 01/06/1968 8.18
D6144 05/04/1960 NB Kittybrewster 30/12/1967 Aberdeen Ferryhill 7.67 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1968 8.12
D6145 15/04/1960 NB Kittybrewster 30/12/1967 Aberdeen Ferryhill 7.67 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1968 8.17
D6146 29/04/1960 NB Kittybrewster 30/12/1967 Aberdeen Ferryhill 7.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 09/1968 8.39
D6147 05/05/1960 NB Kittybrewster 30/12/1967 Aberdeen Ferryhill 7.58 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1968 8.12
D6148 15/05/1960 NB Kittybrewster 30/12/1967 Aberdeen Ferryhill 7.58 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1968 8.09
D6149 30/05/1960 NB Kittybrewster 30/12/1967 Aberdeen Ferryhill 7.58 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1968 7.96
D6150 06/06/1960 NB Kittybrewster 30/12/1967 Aberdeen Ferryhill 7.5 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1968 8.03
D6151 13/06/1960 NB Kittybrewster 30/12/1967 Aberdeen Ferryhill 7.5 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1968 7.93
D6152 24/06/1960 NB Kittybrewster 16/08/1968 Eastfield 8.17 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 02/1969 8.65
D6153 06/07/1960 NB Kittybrewster 30/12/1967 Aberdeen Ferryhill 7.42 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1968 7.86
D6154 14/07/1960 NB Kittybrewster 30/12/1967 Aberdeen Ferryhill 7.42 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1968 7.84
D6155 16/08/1960 NB Kittybrewster 30/12/1967 Aberdeen Ferryhill 7.33 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1968 7.84
D6156 15/09/1960 NB Kittybrewster 30/12/1967 Aberdeen Ferryhill 7.25 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1968 7.67
D6157 07/12/1960 NB Kittybrewster 30/12/1967 Aberdeen Ferryhill 7 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1968 7.53