Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 722 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 2008 Week
» 29482 Month
» 326496 Year
» 403083 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

02 0-4-0


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D2850 06/10/1960 YE Bank Hall 20/06/1970 9.67 Cut Hesslewoods (Attercliffe) 01/06/1971 10.66
D2851 02001 03/10/1960 YE Bank Hall 01/06/1975 14.67 Cut Arnott Young (Dudley Hill) 31/12/1975 15.25
D2852 02002 14/10/1960 YE Bank Hall 01/10/1973 13 Cut Avon Transmissions (at Allerton MPD) 01/03/1976 15.39
D2853 02003 25/10/1960 YE Bank Hall 01/06/1975 Allerton 14.67 Prs Preserved 56.47
D2854 04/11/1960 YE Bank Hall 28/02/1970 9.25 Prs Preserved 56.44
D2855 21/11/1960 YE Bank Hall 04/10/1970 9.92 Cut Hesslewoods (Attercliffe) 01/06/1971 10.53
D2856 02004 02/12/1960 YE Bank Hall 01/06/1975 14.5 Cut Redland (Mountsorrel) 31/10/1978 17.92
D2857 04/12/1960 YE Bank Hall 18/04/1971 10.33 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/06/1992 31.51
D2858 21/12/1960 YE Newton Heath 28/02/1970 9.17 Prs Preserved 56.31
D2859 30/12/1960 YE Burton 15/03/1970 9.25 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/04/1971 10.26
D2860 13/09/1961 YE Fleetwood 13/12/1970 9.25 Prs Preserved 55.58
D2861 03/10/1961 YE Fleetwood 31/12/1969 8.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/05/1971 9.58
D2862 14/10/1961 YE Fleetwood 31/12/1969 8.17 Cut National Coal Board (Norton Colliery) 01/04/1979 17.47
D2863 18/10/1961 YE Fleetwood 31/12/1969 8.17 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 01/08/1971 9.79
D2864 25/10/1961 YE Warrington Dallam 28/02/1970 8.33 Cut Hesslewoods (Attercliffe) 01/04/1971 9.44
D2865 01/11/1961 YE Warrington Dallam 15/03/1970 8.33 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/05/1985 23.51
D2866 10/11/1961 YE Bank Hall 28/02/1970 8.25 Prs Preserved 55.42
D2867 17/11/1961 YE Bank Hall 12/09/1970 8.83 Prs Preserved 55.40
D2868 27/11/1961 YE Bank Hall 31/12/1969 8.08 Prs Preserved 55.38
D2869 04/12/1961 YE Bank Hall 31/12/1969 8 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 01/08/1971 9.66