Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 358 Today
» 1023 Yesterday
» 4972 Week
» 15107 Month
» 331338 Year
» 842440 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NBL 22 B-B


BR (Pre Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D6300 12/01/1959 NB Swindon 26/05/1968 Exmouth Junction 9.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1968 9.93
D6301 19/02/1959 NB Laira 30/12/1967 Laira 8.83 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 08/1968 9.49
D6302 19/02/1959 NB Laira 26/05/1968 Exmouth Junction 9.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1968 9.75
D6303 22/05/1959 NB Laira 26/05/1968 Exmouth Junction 9 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1968 9.58
D6304 23/06/1959 NB Laira 26/05/1968 Exmouth Junction 8.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1968 9.41
D6305 11/01/1960 NB Laira 26/05/1968 Exmouth Junction 8.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1968 8.85
D6306 12/10/1959 NB Laira 21/12/1968 Exmouth Junction 9.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1969 9.60
D6307 12/10/1959 NB Laira 27/03/1971 Exmouth Junction 11.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 12/1971 12.18
D6308 07/01/1960 NB Laira 11/09/1971 Laira 11.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 05/1972 12.36
D6309 12/01/1960 NB Laira 22/05/1971 Exmouth Junction 11.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 12/1971 11.93
D6310 05/01/1960 NB Laira 27/03/1971 Bristol Bath Road 11.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 05/1972 12.37
D6311 07/01/1960 NB Laira 23/09/1968 Laira 8.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1969 9.36
D6312 14/01/1960 NB Laira 22/05/1971 Bristol Bath Road 11.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/1972 12.01
D6313 12/01/1960 NB Laira 03/08/1968 Laira 8.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1968 8.85
D6314 25/01/1960 NB Laira 03/05/1969 Laira 9.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1969 9.31
D6315 25/01/1960 NB Laira 22/05/1971 Laira 11.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/1972 11.98
D6316 01/03/1960 NB Laira 31/03/1968 Bristol Bath Road 8 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1968 8.80
D6317 01/03/1960 NB Laira 23/09/1968 Laira 8.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1969 9.30
D6318 14/03/1960 NB Laira 22/05/1971 Laira 11.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 24/03/1972 12.04
D6319 11/04/1960 NB Laira 11/09/1971 Laira 11.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 11/1972 12.61
D6320 23/03/1960 NB Laira 22/05/1971 Bristol Bath Road 11.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 06/1972 12.24 LISTER
D6321 07/04/1960 NB Laira 03/08/1968 Bristol Bath Road 8.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1969 9.19
D6322 07/04/1960 NB Laira 03/10/1971 Laira 11.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 05/1972 12.11
D6323 25/04/1960 NB Laira 22/05/1971 Laira 11.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/1972 12.32
D6324 01/06/1960 NB Laira 14/09/1968 Bristol Bath Road 8.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1969 8.96
D6325 14/06/1960 NB Laira 05/10/1968 Bristol Bath Road 8.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1969 8.92
D6326 16/05/1960 NB Laira 03/10/1971 Laira 11.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 03/1972 11.84
D6327 30/06/1960 NB Laira 22/05/1971 Bristol Bath Road 10.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 07/1972 12.05
D6328 18/06/1960 NB Laira 17/07/1971 Laira 11.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 05/1972 11.92
D6329 18/06/1960 NB Laira 30/11/1968 Newton Abbot 8.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1969 8.91
D6330 26/07/1960 NB Laira 23/09/1971 Laira 11.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 06/1972 11.90
D6331 26/07/1960 NB Laira 27/03/1971 Bristol Bath Road 10.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 03/1972 11.64
D6332 28/07/1960 NB Laira 22/05/1971 Old Oak Common 10.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 12/1971 11.39
D6333 03/08/1960 NB Laira 01/01/1972 Laira 11.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/1972 12.04
D6334 01/12/1960 NB Laira 03/10/1971 Laira 10.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 04/1972 11.38
D6335 22/02/1961 NB Laira 14/09/1968 Old Oak Common 7.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1969 8.23
D6336 03/07/1961 NB Newton Abbot 01/01/1972 Laira 10.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 06/1972 10.96
D6337 13/03/1962 NB Newton Abbot 21/10/1971 Laira 9.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 05/1972 10.18
D6338 29/03/1962 NB Laira 01/01/1972 Laira 9.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 02/1972 9.89
D6339 02/04/1962 NB Laira 01/01/1972 Laira 9.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 06/1972 10.21
D6340 03/04/1962 NB Laira 22/05/1971 Laira 9.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 04/1972 10.04
D6341 12/05/1962 NB Laira 30/11/1968 Old Oak Common 6.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1969 7.01
D6342 11/05/1962 NB Laira 21/12/1968 Bristol Bath Road 6.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1969 7.02
D6343 10/05/1962 NB Laira 03/10/1971 Laira 9.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/1972 9.69
D6344 18/05/1962 NB Laira 14/09/1968 Old Oak Common 6.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1969 7.00
D6345 19/05/1962 NB Laira 14/09/1968 Old Oak Common 6.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1969 7.16
D6346 08/06/1962 NB Laira 03/05/1969 Old Oak Common 6.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 08/1969 7.19
D6347 02/06/1962 NB Bristol Bath Road 31/03/1968 Old Oak Common 5.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1968 6.46
D6348 14/06/1962 NB Laira 24/07/1971 Laira 9.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 05/1972 9.93
D6349 14/06/1962 NB Laira 14/09/1968 Bristol Bath Road 6.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 10/1971 9.34
D6350 27/06/1962 NB Laira 14/09/1968 Old Oak Common 6.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1969 6.89
D6351 27/06/1962 NB Laira 30/11/1969 Old Oak Common 7.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1969 6.89
D6352 12/07/1962 NB Laira 02/05/1971 Bristol Bath Road 8.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 11/1971 9.35
D6353 12/07/1962 NB Laira 23/09/1968 Old Oak Common 6.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1969 7.01
D6354 02/08/1962 NB Bristol Bath Road 22/05/1971 Bristol Bath Road 8.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 02/1972 9.55
D6355 24/08/1962 NB Bristol Bath Road 14/09/1968 Old Oak Common 6.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1969 6.73
D6356 27/09/1962 NB Bristol Bath Road 03/10/1971 Laira 9.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/1972 9.31
D6357 13/11/1962 NB Bristol Bath Road 21/12/1968 Old Oak Common 6.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1969 6.51