Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 14 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 4936 Week
» 27917 Month
» 391162 Year
» 467749 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

EE Vulcan Foundry 23 Bo-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D5900 22/05/1959 EE Hornsey 30/12/1968 9.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/06/1969 10.04
D5901 22/05/1959 EE Hornsey 07/12/1969 10.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/02/1977 17.71
D5902 01/05/1959 EE Hornsey 23/11/1969 10.5 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/08/1970 11.26
D5903 17/04/1959 EE Hornsey 30/12/1968 9.67 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/06/1969 10.13
D5904 24/04/1959 EE Hornsey 20/01/1969 9.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/06/1969 10.11
D5905 08/05/1959 EE Hornsey 14/02/1971 11.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/08/1973 14.24
D5906 08/05/1959 EE Hornsey 30/09/1968 9.33 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 07/1971 12.19
D5907 15/05/1959 EE Hornsey 20/10/1968 9.42 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/07/1969 10.14
D5908 29/05/1959 EE Hornsey 09/03/1969 9.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1970 10.73
D5909 19/06/1959 EE Hornsey 17/03/1971 11.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/08/1973 14.13