Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 13 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 4935 Week
» 27916 Month
» 391161 Year
» 467748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

25 Bo-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D5151 25001 15/04/1961 DA Thornaby 28/09/1980 19.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1980 19.64
D5152 25002 01/05/1961 DA Thornaby 01/12/1980 19.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1981 19.93
D5153 25003 10/05/1961 DA Thornaby 18/08/1976 15.25 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/01/1978 16.66
D5154 25004 20/05/1961 DA Thornaby 15/09/1976 15.33 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/09/1977 16.30
D5155 25005 03/06/1961 DA Thornaby 01/12/1980 19.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1981 20.18
D5156 25006 17/06/1961 DA Thornaby 01/12/1980 19.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1983 21.88
D5157 25007 07/07/1961 DA Thornaby 01/12/1980 19.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1982 21.17
D5158 25008 10/07/1961 DA Thornaby 09/06/1980 18.92 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/06/1980 18.91
D5159 25009 27/07/1961 DA Thornaby 07/07/1980 19 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/09/1980 19.11
D5160 25010 19/08/1961 DA Thornaby 11/02/1981 19.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1981 19.71
D5161 25011 02/09/1961 DA Thornaby 01/12/1980 19.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1981 19.51
D5162 25012 09/09/1961 DA Thornaby 04/02/1977 15.42 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/09/1977 15.99
D5163 25013 29/09/1961 DA Thornaby 28/09/1980 19 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1983 21.94
D5164 25014 07/10/1961 DA Thornaby 20/07/1977 15.75 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/09/1977 15.91
D5165 25015 19/10/1961 DA Thornaby 18/12/1975 14.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/01/1977 15.21
D5166 25016 02/11/1961 DA Thornaby 25/01/1976 14.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1976 15.09
D5167 25017 25/11/1961 DA Thornaby 25/01/1976 14.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/07/1976 14.61
D5168 25018 01/12/1961 DA Thornaby 22/11/1976 14.92 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/08/1978 16.68
D5169 25019 15/12/1961 DA Thornaby 03/09/1980 18.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1983 21.73
D5170 25020 29/12/1961 DA Thornaby 25/01/1976 14.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1976 14.60
D5171 25021 03/02/1962 DA Thornaby 03/09/1980 18.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1980 18.84
D5172 25022 17/02/1962 DA Thornaby 25/01/1976 13.92 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/01/1978 15.88
D5173 25023 17/03/1962 DA Thornaby 28/09/1980 18.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 02/04/1983 21.06
D5174 25024 30/03/1962 DA Thornaby 25/01/1976 13.83 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/09/1976 14.44
D5175 25025 21/04/1962 DA Thornaby 15/04/1977 15 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/04/1978 15.96
D5176 25026 08/01/1963 DA Holbeck (MR) 02/11/1980 17.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1981 18.16
D5177 25027 04/02/1963 DA Holbeck (MR) 08/05/1983 20.25 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/09/1987 24.59
D5178 25028 08/02/1963 DA Holbeck (MR) 01/12/1980 17.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/06/1987 24.33
D5179 25029 11/02/1963 DA Gateshead 07/08/1977 14.5 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 31/03/1978 15.14
D5180 25030 19/02/1963 DA Gateshead 21/08/1976 13.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/04/1980 17.13
D5181 25031 04/03/1963 DA Gateshead 31/12/1977 14.75 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/05/1978 15.17
D5182 25032 19/03/1963 DA Gateshead 10/03/1986 23 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/12/1988 25.81
D5183 25033 08/04/1963 DA Toton 24/04/1983 20 Cut Vic Berry (at Derby Etches Park) 31/03/1986 22.99
D5184 25034 30/04/1963 DA Toton 22/12/1986 23.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 29/02/1988 24.85
D5185 25035 22/05/1963 DA Toton 15/03/1987 23.83 Prs Preserved 53.89
D5186 25036 19/03/1963 DE Toton 19/12/1982 19.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 25/05/1985 22.20
D5187 25037 22/03/1963 DE Toton 19/01/1987 23.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/06/1987 24.29
D5188 25038 23/03/1963 DE Toton 31/05/1981 18.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/09/1982 19.46
D5189 25039 27/03/1963 DE Toton 31/05/1981 18.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1981 18.70
D5190 25040 04/04/1963 DE Toton 16/11/1980 17.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1982 18.84
D5191 25041 30/04/1963 DE Toton 31/05/1981 18.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1983 20.02
D5192 25042 29/04/1963 DE Toton 08/05/1986 23.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/10/1987 24.52
D5193 25043 29/04/1963 DE Toton 01/02/1981 17.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/08/1981 18.27
D5194 25044 30/04/1963 DE Toton 08/07/1985 22.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/07/1986 23.27
D5195 25045 30/04/1963 DE Toton 04/10/1975 12.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/08/1979 16.27
D5196 25046 10/05/1963 DE Toton 01/02/1981 17.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/07/1987 24.24
D5197 25047 09/05/1963 DE Toton 07/09/1980 17.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1983 20.33
D5198 25048 16/05/1963 DE Toton 20/02/1986 22.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/04/1987 23.97
D5199 25049 17/05/1963 DE Toton 08/01/1984 20.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 17/08/1985 22.27
D5200 25050 31/05/1963 DE Toton 24/04/1983 19.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 06/04/1985 21.87
D5201 25051 20/05/1963 DE Toton 18/09/1985 22.33 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/04/1987 23.88
D5202 25052 28/05/1963 DE Toton 05/10/1980 17.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1980 17.44
D5203 25053 29/05/1963 DE Toton 01/12/1980 17.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1981 18.44
D5204 25054 07/06/1963 DE Toton 13/05/1985 21.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 30/09/1986 23.33
D5205 25055 14/06/1963 DE Toton 02/11/1980 17.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1981 18.48
D5206 25056 19/06/1963 DE Toton 01/08/1982 19.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 09/03/1985 21.74
D5207 25057 21/06/1963 DE Toton 15/03/1987 23.75 Prs Preserved 53.81
D5208 25058 21/06/1963 DE Toton 03/02/1987 23.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/12/1988 25.55
D5209 25059 21/06/1963 DE Toton 20/03/1987 23.75 Prs Preserved 53.81
D5210 25060 21/06/1963 DE Toton 09/12/1985 22.5 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/04/1987 23.79
D5211 25061 24/06/1963 DE Toton 02/11/1980 17.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 19/03/1983 19.75
D5212 25062 28/06/1963 DE Toton 19/12/1982 19.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 29/06/1985 22.02
D5213 25063 05/07/1963 DE Toton 02/11/1980 17.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 19/03/1983 19.72
D5214 25064 05/07/1963 DE Toton 09/12/1985 22.42 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 28/02/1987 23.67
D5215 25065 15/07/1963 DE Toton 01/02/1981 17.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1982 18.56
D5216 25066 11/07/1963 DE Toton 21/06/1981 17.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/01/1983 19.49
D5217 25067 02/08/1963 DE Toton 12/12/1982 19.33 Prs Preserved 21.76
D5218 25068 02/08/1963 DE Cricklewood East 14/07/1980 16.92 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/08/1981 18.01
D5219 25069 09/08/1963 DE Toton 19/12/1983 20.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/06/1986 22.91
D5220 25070 17/09/1963 DE Cricklewood East 02/11/1980 17.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1983 19.63
D5221 25071 31/08/1963 DE Cricklewood East 21/06/1981 17.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/01/1983 19.35
D5222 25072 17/09/1963 DE Cricklewood East 05/12/1985 22.25 Prs Preserved 53.57
D5223 25073 04/07/1963 DA Toton 08/09/1981 18.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1982 19.09
D5224 25074 19/07/1963 DA Toton 07/09/1980 17.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1982 18.80
D5225 25075 26/07/1963 DA Toton 27/03/1983 19.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/06/1987 23.95
D5226 25076 23/08/1963 DA Toton 12/11/1984 21.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/08/1986 23.04
D5227 25077 02/09/1963 DA Toton 06/05/1978 14.67 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/09/1978 15.01
D5228 25078 13/09/1963 DA Toton 23/09/1985 22 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/05/1987 23.73
D5229 25079 29/09/1963 DA Cricklewood East 28/08/1983 19.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 07/01/1984 20.29
D5230 25080 19/10/1963 DA Cricklewood East 02/09/1985 21.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 28/05/1993 29.63
D5231 25081 14/12/1963 DA Toton 07/02/1982 18.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/07/1982 18.56
D5232 25082 06/11/1963 DA Toton 10/05/1981 17.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1982 19.08
D5233 25083 19/12/1963 DE Toton 01/07/1984 20.58 Prs Preserved 53.32
D5234 25084 11/12/1963 DE Toton 18/12/1983 20 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/07/1986 22.65
D5235 25085 19/12/1963 DE Toton 21/03/1982 18.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 28/05/1983 19.45
D5236 25086 19/12/1963 DE Toton 09/10/1983 19.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/06/1986 22.55
D5237 25087 19/12/1963 DE Toton 28/09/1980 16.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1981 17.30
D5238 25088 19/12/1963 DE Toton 16/08/1981 17.67 Cut Vic Berry (at Derby Etches Park) 31/03/1986 22.30
D5239 25089 20/12/1963 DE Toton 24/02/1986 22.17 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/10/1987 23.88
D5240 25090 31/12/1963 DE Toton 22/05/1983 19.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 02/03/1985 21.18
D5241 25091 31/12/1963 DE Toton 15/10/1978 14.83 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/10/1979 15.76
D5242 25092 30/12/1963 DE Toton 11/05/1980 16.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/06/1982 18.43
D5243 25093 08/01/1964 DE Toton 07/11/1982 18.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 29/02/1988 24.16
D5244 25094 20/01/1964 DE Toton 01/02/1981 17.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/04/1982 18.21
D5245 25095 21/01/1964 DE Toton 23/07/1986 22.5 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/06/1987 23.38
D5246 25096 24/01/1964 DE Toton 31/12/1977 13.92 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/05/1978 14.28
D5247 25097 31/01/1964 DE Toton 13/11/1983 19.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 12/01/1985 20.96
D5248 25098 06/02/1964 DE Toton 15/10/1978 14.67 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/05/1979 15.24
D5249 25099 07/02/1964 DE Toton 01/12/1980 16.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1981 17.00
D5250 25100 14/02/1964 DE Toton 01/02/1981 17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 14/12/1985 21.85
D5251 25101 19/02/1964 DE Toton 16/01/1983 18.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1983 18.96
D5252 25102 21/02/1964 DE Toton 11/05/1980 16.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1980 16.62
D5253 25103 26/02/1964 DE Toton 07/09/1980 16.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 02/04/1983 19.11
D5254 25104 28/02/1964 DE Toton 26/09/1982 18.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/12/1986 22.85
D5255 25105 06/03/1964 DE Toton 04/04/1982 18.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 21/12/1985 21.81
D5256 25106 13/03/1964 DE Toton 09/10/1983 19.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 04/02/1984 19.91
D5257 25107 17/03/1964 DE Toton 03/05/1981 17.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1981 17.47
D5258 25108 20/03/1964 DE Toton 14/07/1990 26.33 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/02/1981 16.88
D5259 25109 25/03/1964 DE Toton 11/03/1987 23 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/12/1987 23.70
D5260 25110 26/03/1964 DE Toton 02/11/1980 16.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1982 17.94
D5261 25111 02/04/1964 DE Toton 30/03/1980 15.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1980 16.51
D5262 25112 10/04/1964 DE Toton 02/11/1980 16.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1982 17.90
D5263 25113 14/04/1964 DE Toton 26/06/1983 19.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 22/10/1983 19.53
D5264 25114 17/04/1964 DE Toton 01/02/1981 16.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/07/1981 17.22
D5265 25115 22/04/1964 DE Toton 02/10/1983 19.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/12/1985 21.71
D5266 25116 29/04/1964 DE Toton 02/11/1980 16.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/07/1982 18.18
D5267 25117 29/04/1964 DE Toton 22/01/1984 19.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 02/06/1984 20.11
D5268 25118 08/05/1964 DE Toton 04/01/1981 16.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 06/08/1983 19.26
D5269 25119 06/05/1964 DE Toton 14/06/1985 21.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/07/1986 22.25
D5270 25120 14/05/1964 DE Toton 27/11/1983 19.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 09/06/1984 20.08
D5271 25121 15/05/1964 DE Toton 02/11/1980 16.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1982 18.22
D5272 25122 22/05/1964 DE Toton 02/11/1980 16.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1983 18.95
D5273 25123 22/05/1964 DE Toton 01/05/1983 19 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/07/1987 23.21
D5274 25124 29/05/1964 DE Toton 20/10/1983 19.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/12/1986 22.61
D5275 25125 03/06/1964 DE Toton 06/12/1981 17.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1983 18.84
D5276 25126 05/06/1964 DE Toton 28/11/1982 18.42 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 16/04/1983 18.87
D5277 25127 11/06/1964 DE Toton 02/11/1980 16.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1983 18.90
D5278 12/06/1964 DE Toton 02/05/1971 6.92 Cut Cohens (at Peak Forest) 01/10/1971 7.31
D5279 25129 18/06/1964 DE Toton 07/02/1982 17.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/03/1985 20.79
D5280 25130 20/06/1964 DE Toton 05/12/1982 18.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/03/1987 22.79
D5281 25131 26/06/1964 DE Toton 01/01/1984 19.58 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/06/1987 22.95
D5282 25132 10/07/1964 DE Toton 19/12/1982 18.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 27/10/1984 20.31
D5283 25133 02/07/1964 DE Toton 28/08/1983 19.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/06/1987 23.01
D5284 25134 09/07/1964 DE Toton 19/12/1982 18.42 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 29/02/1988 23.66
D5285 25135 09/07/1964 DE Toton 16/01/1983 18.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/08/1986 22.16
D5286 25136 29/07/1964 DE Toton 27/03/1983 18.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/09/1986 22.19
D5287 25137 29/07/1964 DE Toton 02/11/1980 16.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 04/06/1983 18.86
D5288 25138 30/07/1964 DE Toton 11/12/1983 19.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/12/1986 22.44
D5289 25139 13/08/1964 DE Toton 07/11/1982 18.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1986 22.15
D5290 25140 17/08/1964 DE Toton 18/12/1983 19.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/09/1986 22.13
D5291 25141 24/08/1964 DE Toton 19/09/1982 18.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/01/1987 22.45
D5292 25142 26/08/1964 DE Toton 18/10/1981 17.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 04/11/1982 18.20
D5293 25143 02/09/1964 DE Toton 14/11/1982 18.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 10/11/1984 20.20
D5294 25144 07/09/1964 DE Toton 17/04/1983 18.58 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/09/1986 22.08
D5295 25145 10/09/1964 DE Toton 02/01/1986 21.33 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/05/1987 22.73
D5296 25146 18/09/1964 DE Toton 07/08/1983 18.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 11/05/1985 20.66
D5297 25147 18/09/1964 DE Toton 30/03/1980 15.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1980 15.96
D5298 25148 28/09/1964 DE Toton 07/09/1981 17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1983 19.19
D5299 25149 15/10/1965 DE Nottingham Division 10/01/1982 16.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1983 17.55
D7500 25150 02/10/1964 DE Toton 13/06/1982 17.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 07/07/1985 20.78
D7501 25151 06/10/1964 DE Toton 12/09/1982 17.92 Cut Vic Berry (at Toton MPD) 01/11/1987 23.08
D7502 25152 08/10/1964 DE Toton 26/01/1984 19.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 17/02/1985 20.38
D7503 25153 14/10/1964 DE Toton 03/04/1983 18.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 28/02/1987 22.39
D7504 25154 17/10/1964 DE Toton 27/03/1985 20.42 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/11/1987 23.13
D7505 25155 22/10/1964 DE Toton 01/12/1980 16.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1981 16.87
D7506 25156 27/10/1964 DE Toton 20/12/1981 17.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1982 17.52
D7507 25157 29/10/1964 DE Toton 24/10/1982 18 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/03/1987 22.43
D7508 25158 05/11/1964 DE Toton 22/05/1983 18.5 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/06/1987 22.66
D7509 25159 05/11/1964 DE Toton 02/11/1980 16 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1981 16.33
D7510 25160 10/11/1964 DE Toton 10/10/1982 Crewe Diesel 17.92 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/07/1987 22.65
D7511 25161 17/11/1964 DE Toton 28/11/1984 20 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/03/1988 23.38
D7512 25162 20/11/1964 DE Toton 31/05/1981 16.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1982 17.54
D7513 25163 25/11/1964 DE Toton 09/11/1980 16 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 26/03/1983 18.34
D7514 25164 25/11/1964 DE Toton 21/08/1983 18.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/07/1987 22.69
D7515 25165 02/12/1964 DE Toton 03/11/1978 13.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/09/1979 14.76
D7516 25166 04/12/1964 DE Toton 02/11/1980 15.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/07/1981 16.58
D7517 25167 09/12/1964 DE Toton 29/05/1983 18.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 28/04/1984 19.40
D7518 25168 12/12/1964 DE Toton 22/05/1983 18.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 21/04/1984 19.37
D7519 25169 06/01/1965 DE 08/09/1981 16.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1982 17.08
D7520 25170 22/12/1964 DE Toton 08/08/1982 17.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/04/1983 18.28
D7521 25171 07/01/1965 DE 15/10/1978 13.75 Cut British Rail (at Arbroath Goods Yard) 01/1979 14.03
D7522 25172 08/01/1965 DE 01/02/1981 16.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1983 18.32
D7523 25173 12/01/1965 DE 19/03/1987 22.17 Prs Preserved 52.25
D7524 25174 18/01/1965 DE Nottingham Division 20/09/1976 11.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/06/1978 13.38
D7525 25175 27/01/1965 DE Nottingham Division 05/12/1985 20.92 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/04/1987 22.27
D7526 25176 28/01/1965 DE Nottingham Division 09/03/1987 22.17 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/07/1988 23.52
D7527 25177 30/01/1965 DE Nottingham Division 28/11/1982 17.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1986 21.26
D7528 25178 02/02/1965 DE Nottingham Division 03/04/1985 20.17 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/03/1989 24.09
D7529 25179 12/02/1965 DE Nottingham Division 28/11/1982 17.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 28/02/1987 22.06
D7530 25180 12/02/1965 DE Nottingham Division 28/11/1982 17.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 29/02/1988 23.06
D7531 25181 17/02/1965 DE Nottingham Division 11/08/1986 21.5 Cut Vic Berry (at Eastleigh MPD) 31/07/1988 23.47
D7532 25182 18/02/1965 DE Nottingham Division 21/01/1985 19.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 21/09/1985 20.60
D7533 25183 24/02/1965 DE Nottingham Division 01/12/1980 15.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1981 16.53
D7534 25184 03/03/1965 DE Nottingham Division 28/08/1983 18.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 11/02/1984 18.96
D7535 25185 03/03/1965 DE Nottingham Division 05/11/1984 19.67 Prs Preserved 20.59
D7536 25186 12/03/1965 DE Nottingham Division 28/11/1982 17.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/01/1987 21.90
D7537 25187 12/03/1965 DE Nottingham Division 28/11/1982 17.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/03/1987 22.07
D7538 25188 19/03/1965 DE Nottingham Division 15/08/1982 17.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/03/1987 22.05
D7539 25189 25/03/1965 DE Nottingham Division 09/07/1985 20.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/05/1986 21.20
D7540 25190 29/03/1965 DE Nottingham Division 28/01/1987 21.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/06/1987 22.27
D7541 25191 29/03/1965 DE Nottingham Division 01/03/1987 22 Prs Preserved 52.04
D7542 25192 09/04/1965 DE Nottingham Division 07/05/1986 21.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/11/1987 22.66
D7543 25193 15/04/1965 DE Nottingham Division 12/11/1984 19.58 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/10/1987 22.56
D7544 25194 13/05/1965 DE Nottingham Division 03/06/1985 20.08 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 06/05/1994 29.00
D7545 25195 06/05/1965 DE Nottingham Division 14/06/1985 20.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/12/1986 21.67
D7546 25196 07/05/1965 DE Nottingham Division 17/03/1986 20.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/07/1987 22.16
D7547 25197 14/05/1965 DE Nottingham Division 01/12/1980 15.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1983 17.81
D7548 25198 20/05/1965 DE Nottingham Division 21/02/1986 20.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 28/02/1987 21.79
D7549 25199 28/05/1965 DE Nottingham Division 09/02/1987 21.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/04/1989 23.86
D7550 25200 04/06/1965 DE Nottingham Division 11/02/1986 20.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/03/1987 21.84
D7551 25201 16/06/1965 DE Nottingham Division 28/01/1987 21.58 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/01/1988 22.56
D7552 25202 23/06/1965 DE Nottingham Division 25/06/1986 21 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/05/1989 23.87
D7553 25203 24/06/1965 DE Nottingham Division 01/12/1980 15.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/03/1986 20.78
D7554 25204 03/07/1965 DE Nottingham Division 06/07/1980 15 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1980 15.26
D7555 25205 09/07/1965 DE Nottingham Division 09/05/1986 20.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 29/06/1995 29.99
D7556 25206 09/07/1965 DE Nottingham Division 21/03/1986 20.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 21/06/1995 29.97
D7557 25207 04/08/1965 DE Nottingham Division 12/11/1984 19.25 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 29/02/1988 22.59
D7558 25208 13/08/1965 DE Nottingham Division 06/05/1984 18.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/07/1987 21.98
D7559 25209 28/08/1965 DE Nottingham Division 17/12/1985 20.33 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 06/03/1992 26.54
D7560 25210 18/09/1965 DE Nottingham Division 29/04/1985 19.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/03/1986 20.55
D7561 25211 20/10/1965 DE Nottingham Division 25/07/1986 20.75 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 04/07/1995 29.72
D7562 25212 03/12/1965 DE Nottingham Division 21/05/1985 19.42 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/10/1987 21.92
D7563 25213 12/11/1965 DE Nottingham Division 19/03/1987 21.33 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/12/1990 25.07
D7564 25214 12/12/1965 DE Nottingham Division 14/11/1982 16.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/09/1986 20.81
D7565 25215 03/12/1965 DE Nottingham Division 19/06/1983 17.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 12/11/1983 17.95
D7566 25216 19/01/1966 DE Nottingham Division 28/12/1980 14.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/02/1983 17.05
D7567 25217 20/01/1966 DE Nottingham Division 01/02/1981 15.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/01/1982 15.96
D7568 25218 27/09/1963 DE Toton 25/01/1985 21.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/06/1985 21.71
D7569 25219 08/10/1963 DE Cricklewood East 03/04/1983 19.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 28/02/1987 23.41
D7570 25220 04/10/1963 DE Toton 13/06/1982 18.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 18/05/1985 21.64
D7571 25221 09/10/1963 DE Cricklewood East 31/01/1984 20.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/12/1986 23.24
D7572 25222 17/10/1963 DE Cricklewood East 14/12/1980 17.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1981 18.14
D7573 25223 23/10/1963 DE Cricklewood East 05/10/1980 17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1980 17.04
D7574 25224 23/10/1963 DE Cricklewood East 08/05/1986 22.58 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/03/1987 23.45
D7575 25225 30/11/1963 DE Toton 05/10/1980 16.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1980 16.93
D7576 25226 09/11/1963 DE Toton 10/06/1985 21.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 30/09/1986 22.91
D7577 25227 09/11/1963 DE Toton 26/06/1983 19.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 24/12/1983 20.14
D7578 25228 30/11/1963 DA Toton 20/03/1984 20.33 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/06/1987 23.60
D7579 25229 13/12/1963 DA Toton 20/05/1985 21.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 30/09/1986 22.81
D7580 25230 14/12/1963 DA Toton 06/08/1986 22.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/10/1987 23.90
D7581 25231 27/12/1963 DA Toton 23/08/1985 21.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/04/1987 23.36
D7582 25232 07/01/1964 DA Toton 01/12/1980 16.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 28/05/1983 19.40
D7583 25233 21/01/1964 DA Toton 13/03/1983 19.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1985 21.38
D7584 25234 01/02/1964 DA Toton 27/02/1985 21 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/06/1987 23.42
D7585 25235 13/02/1964 DA Toton 01/03/1985 21.08 Prs Preserved 53.16
D7586 25236 25/02/1964 DA Toton 05/12/1984 20.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/10/1986 22.70
D7587 25237 09/03/1964 DA Toton 10/06/1985 21.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 30/04/1986 22.16
D7588 25238 10/03/1964 DA Toton 13/10/1980 16.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 23/07/1983 19.38
D7589 25239 13/04/1964 DA Toton 05/11/1984 20.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1986 22.40
D7590 25240 15/04/1964 DA Toton 28/08/1983 19.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 17/12/1983 19.68
D7591 25241 25/04/1964 DA Toton 06/05/1981 17.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1981 17.36
D7592 25242 13/05/1964 DA Toton 06/05/1984 20 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 17/11/1984 20.53
D7593 25243 27/06/1964 DA Toton 11/09/1983 19.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 14/01/1984 19.56
D7594 25244 03/06/1964 DA Toton 21/07/1986 22.08 Prs Preserved 52.86
D7595 25245 20/06/1964 DA Toton 25/06/1985 21 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/08/1986 22.21
D7596 25246 07/07/1964 DA Toton 05/10/1981 17.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 05/03/1983 18.67
D7597 25247 12/08/1964 DA Toton 24/07/1983 18.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 03/12/1983 19.32
D7598 25248 05/02/1966 DE Tinsley 28/11/1982 16.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/04/1986 20.24
D7599 25249 05/02/1966 DE Tinsley 29/01/1987 20.92 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/03/1989 23.08
D7600 25250 15/02/1966 DE Tinsley 13/05/1984 18.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 03/02/1985 18.98
D7601 25251 16/02/1966 DE Tinsley 15/01/1985 18.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/11/1986 20.80
D7602 25252 21/02/1966 DE Tinsley 30/03/1980 14.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1980 14.54
D7603 25253 25/02/1966 DE Tinsley 25/09/1983 17.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 05/10/1985 19.62
D7604 25254 11/03/1966 DE Tinsley 04/09/1986 20.5 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/06/1989 23.24
D7605 12/03/1966 DE Tinsley 31/03/1972 6 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/04/1972 6.06
D7606 25256 19/03/1966 DE Tinsley 01/04/1985 19.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/10/1986 20.63
D7607 25257 24/03/1966 DE Tinsley 02/12/1985 19.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/01/1987 20.87
D7608 25258 02/04/1966 DE Tinsley 21/12/1984 18.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 28/02/1986 19.92
D7609 25259 02/04/1966 DE Tinsley 03/09/1986 20.42 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 27/06/1995 29.25
D7610 25260 07/04/1966 DE Tinsley 12/12/1982 16.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/11/1987 21.66
D7611 25261 16/04/1966 DE Eastfield 04/01/1981 14.75 Cut Vic Berry (at Derby Works) 31/12/1985 19.72
D7612 25262 23/04/1966 DE Eastfield 01/03/1987 20.92 Prs Preserved 50.97
D7613 25263 30/04/1966 DE Eastfield 16/11/1980 14.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 21/05/1983 17.07
D7614 25264 07/06/1966 DE Eastfield 14/12/1980 14.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1983 16.91
D7615 25265 12/06/1966 DE Eastfield 18/03/1987 20.75 Prs Preserved 50.83
D7616 25266 19/06/1966 DE Eastfield 18/09/1986 20.25 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/02/1989 22.64
D7617 25267 12/08/1966 DE Eastfield 01/02/1981 14.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/02/1982 15.48
D7618 25268 18/08/1966 DE Eastfield 01/03/1987 20.58 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/11/1987 21.22
D7619 25269 20/08/1966 DE Eastfield 02/04/1986 19.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 28/02/1987 20.54
D7620 25270 26/08/1966 DE Eastfield 28/11/1982 16.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/06/1986 19.86
D7621 25271 29/08/1966 DE Eastfield 11/10/1981 15.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/09/1982 16.02
D7622 25272 02/09/1966 DE Eastfield 12/07/1981 14.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/08/1982 15.92
D7623 25273 08/09/1966 DE Eastfield 01/02/1981 14.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1982 15.57
D7624 25274 30/07/1965 BP Tinsley 02/05/1982 16.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 27/04/1985 19.76
D7625 25275 30/07/1965 BP Tinsley 18/04/1982 16.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 10/08/1985 20.04
D7626 25276 05/08/1965 BP Tinsley 01/03/1987 21.58 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/06/1989 23.84
D7627 25277 12/08/1965 BP Tinsley 15/04/1984 18.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 26/10/1985 20.22
D7628 25278 12/08/1965 BP Tinsley 01/03/1987 21.58 Prs Preserved 51.67
D7629 25279 07/09/1965 BP Tinsley 18/03/1987 21.5 Prs Preserved 51.59
D7630 25280 16/09/1965 BP Tinsley 01/11/1981 16.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/07/1983 17.88
D7631 25281 29/09/1965 BP Tinsley 01/02/1981 15.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1981 15.60
D7632 25282 08/10/1965 BP Tinsley 10/03/1986 20.42 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/03/1989 23.41
D7633 25283 30/10/1965 BP Tinsley 01/03/1987 21.42 Prs Preserved 51.45
D7634 25284 19/10/1965 BP Tinsley 21/01/1985 19.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1986 20.96
D7635 25285 05/11/1965 BP Tinsley 17/03/1986 20.33 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/10/1987 22.00
D7636 25286 15/11/1965 BP Tinsley 01/09/1986 20.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 01/11/1989 23.98
D7637 25287 22/12/1965 BP Tinsley 02/12/1985 20 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 28/02/1987 21.20
D7638 25288 30/01/1965 BP Tinsley 19/02/1987 22.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/03/1988 23.18
D7639 25289 23/12/1965 BP Tinsley 17/01/1984 18.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 20/10/1984 18.84
D7640 25290 31/12/1965 BP Tinsley 04/10/1981 15.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/04/1983 17.26
D7641 25291 14/01/1966 BP Tinsley 03/05/1981 15.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 11/11/1982 16.84
D7642 25292 28/01/1966 BP Tinsley 18/10/1981 15.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1983 17.10
D7643 25293 08/02/1966 BP Tinsley 01/02/1981 15 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1981 15.49
D7644 25294 23/03/1966 BP Tinsley 10/10/1982 16.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/06/1985 19.22
D7645 25295 15/03/1966 BP Tinsley 10/06/1978 12.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/08/1981 15.39
D7646 25296 25/03/1966 BP Tinsley 01/10/1986 20.58 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/12/1987 21.70
D7647 25297 30/03/1966 BP Tinsley 01/09/1986 20.5 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/06/1989 23.19
D7648 25298 07/04/1966 BP Tinsley 19/03/1985 18.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 30/09/1986 20.50
D7649 25299 15/04/1966 BP Tinsley 04/10/1981 15.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/05/1982 16.05
D7650 25300 07/05/1966 BP Nottingham Division 02/12/1985 19.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/07/1986 20.25
D7651 25301 09/05/1966 BP Nottingham Division 11/12/1983 17.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/09/1984 18.35
D7652 25302 21/05/1966 BP Nottingham Division 14/06/1985 19.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/07/1986 20.21
D7653 25303 24/06/1966 BP Line Power Controller, Derby 19/02/1986 19.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/05/1987 20.95
D7654 25304 24/06/1966 BP Line Power Controller, Derby 28/11/1982 16.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 17/08/1985 19.16
D7655 25305 01/07/1966 BP Line Power Controller, Derby 01/07/1983 17 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 01/08/1994 28.10
D7656 25306 05/07/1966 BP Line Power Controller, Derby 25/02/1985 18.58 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 29/02/1988 21.67
D7657 25307 04/07/1966 BP Line Power Controller, Derby 01/11/1986 20.33 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/08/1988 22.09
D7658 25308 19/07/1966 BP Line Power Controller, Derby 16/10/1983 17.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1984 18.38
D7659 25309 21/07/1966 BP Line Power Controller, Derby 01/09/1986 20.17 Prs Preserved 50.73
D7660 25310 31/12/1966 DE London Division 10/10/1982 15.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 31/08/1994 27.68
D7661 25311 08/11/1966 DE London Division 19/03/1986 19.33 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/03/1989 22.33
D7662 25312 17/11/1966 DE London Division 13/06/1982 15.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 28/09/1985 18.88
D7663 25313 23/11/1966 DE London Division 18/03/1987 20.33 Prs Preserved 50.38
D7664 25314 23/11/1966 DE London Division 01/03/1983 16.33 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 01/08/1994 27.71
D7665 25315 07/12/1966 DE London Division 01/03/1987 20.25 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/09/1987 20.75
D7666 25316 16/12/1966 DE London Division 01/09/1986 19.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/03/1989 22.22
D7667 25317 28/01/1967 DE London Division 24/04/1983 16.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/04/1986 19.27
D7668 25318 28/01/1967 DE London Division 01/07/1982 15.5 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/06/1987 20.35
D7669 25319 25/03/1967 DE London Division 20/03/1983 16 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/12/1985 18.78
D7670 25320 28/01/1967 DE London Division 11/12/1983 16.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 10/08/1985 18.55
D7671 25321 25/02/1967 DE London Division 29/09/1986 19.58 Prs Preserved 50.13
D7672 25322 25/02/1967 DE Nottingham Division 01/09/1991 24.58 Prs Preserved 50.13
D7673 25323 25/03/1967 DE Nottingham Division 19/03/1987 20 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/10/1987 20.62
D7674 25324 25/03/1967 DE Nottingham Division 23/12/1985 18.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/10/1987 20.62
D7675 25325 22/04/1967 DE Nottingham Division 23/12/1985 18.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 06/02/1990 22.81
D7676 25326 22/04/1967 DE Nottingham Division 23/01/1985 17.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 28/02/1986 18.87
D7677 25327 29/04/1967 DE Nottingham Division 02/02/1984 16.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 29/02/1988 20.85