Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 265 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5843 Week
» 25576 Month
» 322590 Year
» 399177 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

27 Bo-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) BR (27/2) BR (27/1 Renum) BR (27/0) BR (Dept) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D5347 27001 30/06/1961 BC Thornton Junction 08/07/1987 26.08 Prs Preserved 55.79
D5348 27002 17/07/1961 BC Thornton Junction 06/01/1986 24.5 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 29/02/1988 26.64
D5349 27003 28/07/1961 BC Eastfield 16/01/1987 25.5 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 21/12/1987 26.42
D5350 27004 23/08/1961 BC Eastfield 12/05/1986 24.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/09/1987 26.12
D5351 27005 30/08/1961 BC Eastfield 10/07/1987 25.92 Prs Preserved 55.62
D5352 27006 06/09/1961 BC Eastfield 21/01/1976 14.33 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/01/1977 15.33
D5353 27007 13/09/1961 BC Eastfield 28/01/1985 23.33 Prs Preserved 24.06
D5354 27008 20/09/1961 BC Eastfield 18/08/1987 25.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 26/11/1987 26.20
D5355 27009 28/09/1961 BC Eastfield 27/07/1980 18.83 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/01/1982 20.27
D5356 27010 11/10/1961 BC Eastfield 20/04/1986 24.5 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/10/1987 25.99
D5357 27011 18/10/1961 BC Eastfield 30/03/1981 19.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/09/1982 20.88
D5358 27012 25/10/1961 BC Eastfield 11/05/1986 24.58 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/04/1988 26.53
D5359 27013 01/11/1961 BC Eastfield 13/07/1976 14.67 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/07/1977 15.67
D5360 27014 18/11/1961 BC Eastfield 08/09/1986 24.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/10/1987 25.88
D5361 27015 22/11/1961 BC Eastfield 27/01/1977 15.17 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/04/1977 15.37
D5362 27016 30/11/1961 BC Eastfield 09/04/1984 22.42 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/07/1987 25.68
D5363 27017 07/12/1961 BC Eastfield 12/05/1986 24.42 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/04/1988 26.33
D5364 27018 13/12/1961 BC Eastfield 12/05/1986 24.42 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 13/07/1989 27.60
D5365 27019 30/12/1961 BC Eastfield 28/05/1984 22.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 27/07/1985 23.59
D5366 27020 04/01/1962 BC Eastfield 20/04/1986 24.25 Cut Vic Berry (at Thornton Yard) 01/02/1987 25.09
D5367 27021 04/01/1962 BC Eastfield 03/06/1985 23.42 Cut Vic Berry (at Thornton Yard) 30/04/1987 25.33
D5368 27022 11/01/1962 BC Eastfield 28/01/1985 23 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/09/1987 25.73
D5369 27023 17/01/1962 BC Eastfield 12/05/1986 24.33 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/03/1989 27.14
D5370 27024 ADB968028 17/01/1962 BC Thornaby 01/07/1987 25.5 Prs Preserved 55.24
D5371 27025 29/01/1962 BC Thornaby 18/06/1987 25.42 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/03/1989 27.10
D5372 27026 24/01/1962 BC Thornaby 06/07/1987 25.5 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 29/02/1988 26.12
D5373 27027 31/01/1962 BC Thornaby 13/06/1983 21.42 Cut Vic Berry (at Thornton Yard) 31/05/1987 25.35
D5374 27101 27045 07/02/1962 BC Thornaby 01/05/1986 24.25 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/01/1989 26.92
D5375 27028 14/02/1962 BC Thornaby 19/08/1984 22.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 14/09/1985 23.60
D5376 27029 21/02/1962 BC Thornaby 09/01/1986 23.92 Cut Vic Berry (at Thornton Yard) 30/04/1987 25.20
D5377 27030 28/02/1962 BC Thornaby 20/04/1986 24.17 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/10/1987 25.69
D5378 27031 07/03/1962 BC Thornaby 06/05/1978 16.17 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/08/1978 16.41
D5379 27032 27/03/1962 BC Cricklewood East 27/05/1985 23.17 Cut Vic Berry (at Thornton Yard) 31/03/1987 25.03
D5380 27102 27046 06/04/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/07/1987 25.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 01/06/1988 26.17
D5381 27033 06/04/1962 BC Cricklewood East 24/02/1986 23.83 Cut Vic Berry (at Thornton Yard) 28/02/1987 24.92
D5382 27034 18/04/1962 BC Cricklewood East 22/07/1984 22.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 04/01/1986 23.73
D5383 26/04/1962 BC Cricklewood East 15/01/1966 3.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/06/1967 5.10
D5384 27035 01/05/1962 BC Cricklewood East 29/09/1976 14.33 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/03/1977 14.84
D5385 27036 07/05/1962 BC Cricklewood East 20/04/1986 23.92 Cut Vic Berry (at Thornton Yard) 31/03/1987 24.92
D5386 27103 27212 27066 18/05/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/07/1987 25.17 Prs Preserved 54.91
D5387 27104 27048 21/05/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/05/1986 24 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/09/1987 25.30
D5388 27105 27049 28/05/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/04/1987 24.92 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/03/1988 25.78
D5389 27037 28/05/1962 BC Cricklewood East 24/03/1986 23.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/04/1989 26.86
D5390 27038 04/06/1962 BC Cricklewood East 10/02/1987 24.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/09/1987 25.34
D5391 27119 27201 04/06/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/01/1979 16.58 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/02/1982 19.68
D5392 27120 27202 12/06/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/08/1980 18.17 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/01/1982 19.57
D5393 27121 27203 27057 12/06/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/05/1983 20.92 Cut Vic Berry (at Derby Etches Park) 01/02/1986 23.66
D5394 27106 27050 20/06/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/07/1987 25.08 Prs Preserved 54.82
D5395 27107 27051 20/06/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/07/1987 25.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/10/1987 25.30
D5396 27108 27052 27/06/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/07/1987 25.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/09/1987 25.20
D5397 27109 27053 10/08/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/05/1987 24.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/04/1989 26.66
D5398 27039 03/07/1962 BC Cricklewood East 05/10/1975 13.25 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/05/1977 14.84
D5399 27110 27054 03/07/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/07/1987 25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 01/06/1988 25.93
D5400 27111 27055 10/07/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/07/1987 25 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/04/1988 25.75
D5401 27112 27056 10/07/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/02/1987 24.58 Prs Preserved 54.76
D5402 27040 12/07/1962 BC Cricklewood East 27/01/1986 23.5 Cut Vic Berry (at Thornton Yard) 01/04/1987 24.74
D5403 27122 27204 27058 17/07/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/05/1986 23.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/08/1987 25.06
D5404 27113 27207 27061 19/07/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/05/1986 23.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/02/1988 25.56
D5405 27041 24/07/1962 BC Cricklewood East 11/05/1986 23.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/09/1987 25.20
D5406 27042 31/07/1962 BC Cricklewood East 06/07/1987 25 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/11/1987 25.35
D5407 27114 27208 27062 02/08/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/02/1986 23.5 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/01/1989 26.44
D5408 27115 27209 27063 15/08/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/07/1987 24.92 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/03/1989 26.56
D5409 27116 27210 27064 10/08/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/05/1986 23.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/08/1987 24.99
D5410 27123 27205 27059 30/08/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/07/1987 24.92 Prs Preserved 54.62
D5411 27117 27211 27065 10/09/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/05/1986 23.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/08/1987 24.91
D5412 27124 27206 27060 03/09/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/03/1986 23.5 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/10/1987 25.09
D5413 27118 27103 27047 13/09/1962 BC Cricklewood East 01/04/1986 23.58 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/09/1987 24.98
D5414 27043 18/09/1962 BC Cricklewood East 21/04/1980 17.58 Cut Paterson's Tip (at Mount Vernon) 30/11/1985 23.22
D5415 27044 06/10/1962 BC Cricklewood East 14/07/1980 17.75 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/02/1982 19.34