Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 13 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 4935 Week
» 27916 Month
» 391161 Year
» 467748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Metropolitan Vickers 28 Co-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D5700 25/07/1958 MV Derby 30/12/1967 9.42 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 09/1968 10.15
D5701 01/09/1958 MV Derby 07/09/1968 10 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1969 11.13
D5702 29/09/1958 MV Derby 07/09/1968 10 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1969 11.05
D5703 20/10/1958 MV Derby 30/12/1967 9.17 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1968 9.66
D5704 05/11/1958 MV Derby 30/12/1967 9.08 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 08/1968 9.78
D5705 05/12/1958 MV Derby 07/09/1968 9.75 Prs Preserved 58.37
D5706 05/12/1958 MV Derby 07/09/1968 9.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1969 10.87
D5707 19/12/1958 MV Derby 07/09/1968 9.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1969 10.83
D5708 10/01/1959 MV Derby 07/09/1968 9.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1969 10.77
D5709 10/01/1959 MV Derby 30/12/1967 8.92 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 10/1968 9.77
D5710 14/02/1959 MV Derby 30/12/1967 8.83 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 09/1968 9.59
D5711 14/02/1959 MV Derby 07/09/1968 9.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1969 10.67
D5712 07/03/1959 MV Derby 07/09/1968 9.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1969 10.78
D5713 07/03/1959 MV Derby 30/12/1967 8.75 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 10/1968 9.62
D5714 14/03/1959 MV Derby 07/09/1968 9.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1969 10.52
D5715 11/04/1959 MV Derby 04/05/1968 Carlisle Kingmoor 9.08 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 09/1968 9.44
D5716 16/05/1959 MV Derby 07/09/1968 9.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1969 10.59
D5717 19/06/1959 MV Derby 07/09/1968 9.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1969 10.33
D5718 11/07/1959 MV Derby 04/05/1968 Carlisle Kingmoor 8.83 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 09/1968 9.19
D5719 17/10/1959 MV Derby 07/09/1968 8.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1969 9.92