29 Bo-Bo
BR (Pre Tops) | Date To Service | Bld | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D6100 | 02/12/1958 | NB | 08/12/1967 from 21 |
Hornsey | 06/10/1971 | Eastfield | 12.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 11/1972 | 13.96 | |
D6101 | 09/12/1958 | NB | 24/12/1965 from 21 |
Hornsey | 03/08/1971 | Eastfield | 12.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 10/1972 | 13.86 | |
D6102 | 23/12/1958 | NB | 11/06/1966 from 21 |
Hornsey | 06/10/1971 | Eastfield | 12.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 08/1972 | 13.65 | |
D6103 | 05/05/1959 | NB | 15/10/1965 from 21 |
Hornsey | 05/10/1971 | Eastfield | 12.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 11/1972 | 13.54 | |
D6106 | 24/03/1959 | NB | 22/10/1965 from 21 |
Hornsey | 18/07/1971 | Eastfield | 12.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 07/1972 | 13.32 | |
D6107 | 24/03/1959 | NB | 05/06/1967 from 21 |
Hornsey | 05/10/1971 | Eastfield | 12.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 10/1972 | 13.57 | |
D6108 | 14/04/1959 | NB | 20/10/1967 from 21 |
Hornsey | 01/05/1969 | Eastfield | 10.08 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 06/1971 | 12.18 | |
D6112 | 20/05/1959 | NB | 10/09/1966 from 21 |
Stratford | 31/12/1971 | Eastfield | 12.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 06/1972 | 13.08 | |
D6113 | 27/05/1959 | NB | 23/12/1966 from 21 |
Stratford | 06/10/1971 | Eastfield | 12.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 01/1972 | 12.65 | |
D6114 | 27/05/1959 | NB | 25/02/1966 from 21 |
Stratford | 05/10/1971 | Eastfield | 12.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 09/1972 | 13.32 | |
D6116 | 09/06/1959 | NB | 14/07/1966 from 21 |
Stratford | 31/12/1971 | Eastfield | 12.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 05/1972 | 12.94 | |
D6119 | 30/06/1959 | NB | 28/12/1967 from 21 |
Stratford | 31/12/1971 | Eastfield | 12.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 08/1972 | 13.14 | |
D6121 | 18/08/1959 | NB | 26/02/1966 from 21 |
Ipswich | 06/10/1971 | Eastfield | 12.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 09/1972 | 13.09 | |
D6123 | 22/09/1959 | NB | 05/1963 from 21 |
Ipswich | 21/09/1971 | Eastfield | 12 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 10/1972 | 13.07 | |
D6124 | 29/09/1959 | NB | 08/12/1967 from 21 |
Ipswich | 06/10/1971 | Eastfield | 12.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 09/1972 | 12.97 | |
D6129 | 27/10/1959 | NB | 31/10/1967 from 21 |
Ipswich | 06/10/1971 | Eastfield | 12 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 06/1972 | 12.64 | |
D6130 | 27/10/1959 | NB | 09/04/1966 from 21 |
Ipswich | 05/10/1971 | Eastfield | 12 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 10/1972 | 12.98 | |
D6132 | 17/11/1959 | NB | 02/12/1966 from 21 |
Ipswich | 06/10/1971 | Eastfield | 11.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 09/1972 | 12.84 | |
D6133 | 24/11/1959 | NB | 15/05/1966 from 21 |
Ipswich | 31/12/1971 | Eastfield | 12.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 07/1972 | 12.65 | |
D6137 | 22/12/1959 | NB | 07/11/1967 from 21 |
Ipswich | 24/04/1971 | Eastfield | 11.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 08/1972 | 12.66 |