Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 267 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5845 Week
» 25578 Month
» 322592 Year
» 399179 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

31 A1A-A1A


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) BR (31/4) BR (Dept) Date To Service Bld Rebuilt From Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D5500 31018 10/10/1957 BH 15/03/1969
from 30
Stratford 10/07/1976 18.75 Prs Preserved 18.76
D5501 31001 25/11/1957 BH 15/03/1969
from 30
Stratford 10/07/1976 18.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/1977 19.15
D5502 31002 ADB968014 16/12/1957 BH 08/1968
from 30
Stratford 01/01/1980 22.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 05/1984 26.43
D5503 31003 09/01/1958 BH 26/10/1968
from 30
Stratford 03/02/1980 22.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 04/1980 22.28
D5504 31004 30/01/1958 BH 23/11/1968
from 30
Stratford 05/10/1980 22.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 06/1981 23.39
D5505 31005 20/02/1958 BH 23/11/1968
from 30
Stratford 03/02/1980 22 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 03/1980 22.08
D5506 31006 13/03/1958 BH Stratford 05/01/1980 21.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 12/1980 22.78
D5507 31007 19/04/1958 BH 15/03/1969
from 30
Stratford 04/11/1976 18.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/1978 20.25
D5508 31008 ADB968016 17/04/1958 BH 26/10/1968
from 30
Stratford 01/10/1980 22.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 06/1985 27.18
D5509 31009 01/05/1958 BH 28/12/1968
from 30
Stratford 10/07/1976 18.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 11/1977 19.56
D5510 31010 16/05/1958 BH 31/01/1969
from 30
Stratford 10/07/1976 18.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 12/1976 18.60
D5511 31011 05/06/1958 BH 31/01/1969
from 30
Stratford 10/07/1976 18.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/1977 18.63
D5512 31012 19/06/1958 BH 15/03/1969
from 30
Stratford 04/11/1976 18.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/1978 20.34
D5513 31013 ADB968013 13/07/1958 BH 04/1968
from 30
Stratford 01/03/1979 20.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 08/1983 25.11
D5514 31014 ADB968015 24/07/1958 BH 28/12/1968
from 30
Stratford 01/11/1976 18.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 06/1983 24.91
D5515 31015 31/07/1958 BH 07/1968
from 30
Stratford 04/05/1980 21.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 11/1980 22.31
D5516 31016 04/09/1958 BH 31/01/1969
from 30
Stratford 10/07/1976 17.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 12/1976 18.29
D5517 31017 25/09/1958 BH 26/10/1968
from 30
Stratford 04/05/1980 21.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/1983 24.32
D5518 31101 16/10/1958 BH 08/1967
from 30
Stratford 11/01/1993 34.25 Prs Preserved 35.44
D5519 31019 12/12/1958 BH 28/12/1968
from 30
Stratford 05/10/1980 21.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/1981 22.69
D5520 31102 26/02/1959 BH 04/1967
from 30
Stratford Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 04/2007 48.16
D5521 31103 05/03/1959 BH 10/1966
from 30
Ipswich 05/10/1980 21.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 02/1983 23.97
D5522 31418 12/03/1959 BH 18/11/1967
from 30
Stratford 06/10/1995 36.58 Prs Preserved 40.41
D5523 31105 19/03/1959 BH 02/1967
from 30
Stratford 01/05/1997 38.17 58.07
D5524 31106 26/03/1959 BH 06/1967
from 30
Stratford 01/11/1995 36.67 58.05
D5525 31107 09/04/1959 BH 11/09/1965
from 30
March 31/10/2008 49.5 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 05/2009 50.13
D5526 31108 16/04/1959 BH 25/05/1968
from 30
Stratford 27/09/1991 32.42 Prs Preserved 36.28
D5527 31109 23/04/1959 BH Stratford 11/03/1988 28.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 08/1989 30.33
D5528 31110 30/04/1959 BH 15/03/1969
from 30
Norwich Thorpe 31/05/2006 47.08 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 04/2007 47.99
D5529 31111 07/05/1959 BH 04/1968
from 30
March 12/06/1983 24.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 07/1986 27.21
D5530 31112 14/05/1959 BH 28/12/1968
from 30
March 01/05/1997 38 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 11/2003 44.54
D5531 31113 21/05/1959 BH 08/1968
from 30
Stratford 30/07/2004 45.17 Prs Preserved 49.27
D5532 31114 04/06/1959 BH 18/11/1967
from 30
Norwich Thorpe 01/11/1995 36.42 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 12/2001 42.56
D5533 31115 04/06/1959 BH 04/1968
from 30
Norwich Thorpe 01/02/2001 41.67 Prs Preserved 57.86
D5534 31116 11/06/1959 BH March 04/02/2000 40.67 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 07/2003 44.12
D5535 31117 18/06/1959 BH 23/11/1968
from 30
Norwich Thorpe 11/03/1987 27.75 Cut C F Booth (at Doncaster Works) 09/1988 29.27
D5536 31118 18/06/1959 BH 07/1966
from 30
Stratford 20/02/1989 29.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 01/1990 30.60
D5537 31119 25/06/1959 BH 07/1967
from 30
Stratford Prs Preserved 57.80
D5538 31120 02/07/1959 BH 03/1968
from 30
Ipswich 27/09/1991 32.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 06/1994 34.98
D5539 31121 09/07/1959 BH 28/12/1968
from 30
Ipswich 01/09/1988 29.17 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 09/1989 30.21
D5540 31122 16/07/1959 BH Ipswich 22/01/1987 27.5 Cut British Rail (at Stratford MPD) 08/1987 28.10
D5541 31123 23/07/1959 BH Ipswich 16/03/1992 32.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 02/2006 46.60
D5542 31124 30/07/1959 BH 08/1968
from 30
Ipswich 25/05/1990 30.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 11/1991 32.32
D5543 31125 30/07/1959 BH 08/1968
from 30
Ipswich Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 05/2001 41.82
D5544 31126 20/08/1959 BH 07/1968
from 30
Ipswich 14/01/2000 40.42 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 05/1999 39.76
D5545 31127 08/10/1959 BH 01/1968
from 30
Stratford 21/06/1989 29.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 12/1989 30.21
D5546 31128 27/08/1959 BH 08/1965
from 30
Ipswich Prs Preserved 57.63
D5547 31129 27/08/1959 BH 01/1968
from 30
Ipswich 57.63
D5548 31130 03/09/1959 BH 02/1967
from 30
Ipswich Prs Preserved 57.61
D5549 31131 10/09/1959 BH 24/09/1966
from 30
Ipswich 22/03/1989 29.5 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 04/1990 30.62
D5550 31132 24/09/1959 BH 04/1968
from 30
Ipswich 16/06/2000 40.75 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 11/2003 44.17
D5551 31133 10/09/1959 BH 10/1967
from 30
Ipswich 01/12/1998 39.25 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 04/1999 39.62
D5552 31134 17/09/1959 BH 04/1968
from 30
Ipswich 14/01/2000 40.33 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 07/1999 39.85
D5553 31135 24/09/1959 BH 13/11/1965
from 30
Ipswich 04/02/2000 40.42 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/2000 40.34
D5554 31136 01/10/1959 BH 23/11/1968
from 30
Ipswich 24/08/1980 20.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 11/1980 21.14
D5555 31137 01/10/1959 BH 05/1967
from 30
Ipswich 01/12/1995 36.17 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 03/2001 41.48
D5556 31138 08/10/1959 BH Ipswich 02/02/1989 29.33 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 10/1989 30.04
D5557 31139 15/10/1959 BH Ipswich 01/09/1995 35.92 Prs Preserved 57.50
D5558 31140 31421 22/10/1959 BH 02/1968
from 30
Ipswich 01/03/1997 37.42 Prs Preserved 47.85
D5559 31141 22/10/1959 BH Ipswich 25/01/1989 29.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 10/1989 30.00
D5560 31142 29/10/1959 BH 08/1968
from 30
Ipswich 05/05/2000 40.58 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 12/2003 44.16
D5561 31143 29/10/1959 BH 06/1967
from 30
Ipswich 12/12/1988 29.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 08/1989 29.82
D5562 31144 05/11/1959 BH 12/03/1966
from 30
Ipswich Prs Preserved 57.44
D5563 31145 12/11/1959 BH 03/1968
from 30
March 14/01/2000 40.17 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 06/1999 39.62
D5564 31146 12/11/1959 BH 03/1968
from 30
March 24/03/2000 40.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 07/2004 44.70
D5565 31147 19/11/1959 BH 03/1968
from 30
March Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Barrow Hill) 04/2001 41.43
D5566 31148 19/11/1959 BH 05/1967
from 30
Stratford 01/07/1995 35.67 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 06/2001 41.60
D5567 31149 26/11/1959 BH 07/1968
from 30
Hornsey 05/05/2000 40.5 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/2004 44.17
D5568 31150 03/12/1959 BH 11/09/1965
from 30
Hornsey 04/10/1975 15.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 02/1976 16.21
D5569 31151 03/12/1959 BH 03/1967
from 30
Hornsey 01/10/1986 26.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 02/1988 28.22
D5570 31152 10/12/1959 BH 26/06/1965
from 30
March 01/06/1989 29.5 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 04/1990 30.37
D5571 31153 10/12/1959 BH 08/1965
from 30
March 01/05/1996 36.42 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 06/2001 41.54
D5572 31154 17/12/1959 BH 01/1968
from 30
March 31/05/2006 46.42 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 07/2006 46.61
D5573 31155 17/12/1959 BH March 26/05/2000 40.42 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 09/2004 44.78
D5574 31156 23/12/1959 BH 13/11/1965
from 30
Norwich Thorpe 28/02/1992 32.17 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 09/1995 35.75
D5575 31157 31424 23/12/1959 BH 04/1968
from 30
Norwich Thorpe 01/05/1996 36.42 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 08/2006 46.68
D5576 31158 31/12/1959 BH 13/11/1965
from 30
Norwich Thorpe 07/07/2000 40.58 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 07/2003 43.57
D5577 31159 31/12/1959 BH 08/1968
from 30
Norwich Thorpe 12/06/1996 36.5 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 06/1996 36.48
D5578 31160 07/01/1960 BH Stratford 14/01/2000 40 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 06/1999 39.46
D5579 31161 31400 07/01/1960 BH Stratford 01/07/1991 31.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 08/1993 33.63
D5580 31162 14/01/1960 BH 11/1967
from 30
Norwich Thorpe 01/05/1992 32.33 Prs Preserved 57.25
D5581 31163 14/01/1960 BH 01/1966
from 30
Norwich Thorpe 19/01/1999 39 Prs Preserved 40.24
D5582 31164 21/01/1960 BH 02/1968
from 30
Norwich Thorpe Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 05/2000 40.34
D5583 31165 21/01/1960 BH 26/10/1968
from 30
Stratford 21/01/2000 40 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 09/1998 38.68
D5584 31166 25/01/1960 BH 01/1966
from 30
March 19/01/1999 39 Prs Preserved 49.42
D5585 31167 25/01/1960 BH 08/1967
from 30
March 27/09/1988 28.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 03/1989 29.16
D5586 31168 04/02/1960 BH 08/1967
from 30
Hornsey 20/12/1991 31.83 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 05/2001 41.30
D5587 31169 04/02/1960 BH 08/1965
from 30
Hornsey 01/02/1994 34 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 03/1994 34.13
D5588 31170 11/02/1960 BH 18/11/1967
from 30
Hornsey 08/01/1990 29.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 12/1991 31.86
D5589 31401 11/02/1960 BH Hornsey 31/03/1988 28.08 Cut C F Booth (at Doncaster Works) 09/1988 28.61
D5590 31171 18/02/1960 BH 03/1966
from 30
Hornsey 31/10/2003 43.67 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 12/2003 43.85
D5591 31172 18/02/1960 BH 13/11/1965
from 30
Hornsey 01/01/2001 40.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 07/2007 47.44
D5592 31402 25/02/1960 BH Hornsey 20/03/1992 32.08 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 11/2002 42.75
D5593 31173 25/02/1960 BH 30/11/1966
from 30
Hornsey 14/04/1989 29.17 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 09/1991 31.58
D5594 31174 03/03/1960 BH 11/09/1965
from 30
Hornsey Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 07/2001 41.39
D5595 31175 03/03/1960 BH 05/1966
from 30
Hornsey 02/03/1987 27 Cut British Rail (at Kingmoor MPD) 07/1988 28.39
D5596 31403 10/03/1960 BH 07/1966
from 30
Hornsey 04/02/2000 39.92 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 06/2003 43.29
D5597 31176 10/03/1960 BH 12/1967
from 30
Hornsey 27/04/1987 27.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 03/1988 28.03
D5598 31177 17/03/1960 BH 10/1967
from 30
Hornsey 01/07/1989 29.33 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 04/1990 30.10
D5599 31178 17/03/1960 BH 07/1968
from 30
Hornsey 23/06/2000 40.25 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 10/2003 43.61
D5600 31179 24/03/1960 BH 03/1967
from 30
Hornsey 01/11/1995 35.67 Prs Preserved 57.05
D5601 31180 24/03/1960 BH 12/1965
from 30
Hornsey 03/03/2000 40 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 06/2003 43.25
D5602 31181 31/03/1960 BH 01/1966
from 30
Hornsey 13/03/2003 43 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 05/2003 43.15
D5603 31182 31/03/1960 BH 04/1967
from 30
Hornsey 57.04
D5604 31183 07/04/1960 BH 05/1966
from 30
Hornsey 08/07/1988 28.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 07/1989 29.29
D5605 31404 07/04/1960 BH 04/1966
from 30
Hornsey 21/02/1991 30.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 03/1994 33.96
D5606 31405 14/04/1960 BH 05/1966
from 30
Hornsey Cut EMR (at Doncaster Carr MPD) 03/2000 39.95
D5607 31184 14/04/1960 BH 10/1967
from 30
Hornsey 04/02/2000 39.83 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 07/2003 43.28
D5608 31185 21/04/1960 BH 05/1966
from 30
Hornsey 31/03/2000 39.92 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 12/2001 41.68
D5609 31186 21/04/1960 BH 05/1966
from 30
Hornsey 56.98
D5610 31187 28/04/1960 BH 30/11/1966
from 30
Finsbury Park 03/03/2000 39.92 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 06/2003 43.16
D5611 31188 28/04/1960 BH 05/1966
from 30
Finsbury Park 24/01/1999 38.75 Prs Preserved 48.42
D5612 31189 05/05/1960 BH 02/1967
from 30
Finsbury Park 26/05/1989 29 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/1990 29.72
D5613 31190 05/05/1960 BH 01/1966
from 30
Finsbury Park 56.94
D5614 31191 12/05/1960 BH 05/1966
from 30
Finsbury Park 56.92
D5615 31192 12/05/1960 BH 01/1968
from 30
Finsbury Park 10/10/1982 22.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/1983 22.69
D5616 31406 19/05/1960 BH 11/12/1965
from 30
Stratford 04/01/1991 30.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 12/1991 31.59
D5617 31193 19/05/1960 BH 05/1967
from 30
Stratford 01/05/1995 35 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 11/2006 46.52
D5618 31194 26/05/1960 BH 05/1967
from 30
Stratford 01/02/1999 38.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 08/2007 47.25
D5619 31195 26/05/1960 BH Stratford 04/02/1988 27.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 09/1988 28.33
D5620 31196 02/06/1960 BH 08/1965
from 30
March 26/02/1993 32.67 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Stratford MPD) 02/2001 40.73
D5621 31197 31423 02/06/1960 BH 03/1968
from 30
March 01/09/1996 36.25 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 09/2009 49.32
D5622 31198 09/06/1960 BH 03/1966
from 30
Ipswich 16/03/1990 29.75 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 09/1991 31.29
D5623 31199 09/06/1960 BH 11/1967
from 30
Ipswich 05/05/2000 39.92 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 12/2003 43.55
D5624 31200 16/06/1960 BH 03/1967
from 30
Ipswich 30/06/2007 47 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 06/2007 47.03
D5625 31201 16/06/1960 BH 05/1966
from 30
Ipswich 24/03/2000 39.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 05/2004 43.94
D5626 31202 23/06/1960 BH 01/1966
from 30
Ipswich 28/10/1988 28.33 Cut Vic Berry (at Cricklewood MPD) 11/1988 28.42
D5627 31203 23/06/1960 BH 07/1966
from 30
Ipswich Prs Preserved 56.81
D5628 31204 30/06/1960 BH 10/1967
from 30
Ipswich 01/03/1987 26.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 03/1988 27.73
D5629 31205 30/06/1960 BH 13/07/1968
from 30
Norwich Thorpe 18/02/2000 39.67 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 07/2002 42.07
D5630 31206 07/07/1960 BH 01/1966
from 30
Norwich Thorpe 30/11/2006 46.33 Prs Preserved 56.77
D5631 31207 07/07/1960 BH 10/1966
from 30
Norwich Thorpe Prs Preserved 56.77
D5632 31208 14/07/1960 BH 06/1965
from 30
Stratford 13/03/1990 29.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 12/1991 31.44
D5633 31209 14/07/1960 BH 11/12/1965
from 30
Stratford 15/05/2003 42.83 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 05/2003 42.86
D5634 31210 21/07/1960 BH 04/1968
from 30
Stratford Prs Preserved 56.73
D5635 31211 21/07/1960 BH 04/1967
from 30
Stratford 01/01/1991 30.5 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 12/2001 41.43
D5636 31212 28/07/1960 BH 18/11/1967
from 30
Stratford 16/12/1991 31.42 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 05/1995 34.82
D5637 31213 28/07/1960 BH 08/1967
from 30
Stratford 56.71
D5638 31214 11/08/1960 BH 12/1966
from 30
Stratford 15/05/1983 22.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/1983 23.19
D5639 31215 11/08/1960 BH Finsbury Park 04/06/1993 32.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 05/1995 34.78
D5640 31407 18/08/1960 BH 24/09/1966
from 30
Finsbury Park 31/05/2006 45.75 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 10/2006 46.19
D5641 31216 18/08/1960 BH 03/1968
from 30
Finsbury Park 01/03/1998 37.58 Prs Preserved 48.02
D5642 31217 18/08/1960 BH 13/11/1965
from 30
Finsbury Park 08/07/1993 32.92 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester (Marlowe Road)) 11/1999 39.27
D5643 31218 25/08/1960 BH Finsbury Park 20/04/1988 27.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 08/1989 28.99
D5644 31219 25/08/1960 BH 12/03/1966
from 30
Finsbury Park 18/02/2000 39.5 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 06/2003 42.83
D5645 31220 01/09/1960 BH Finsbury Park 01/03/1996 35.5 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Old Oak Common MPD) 02/2002 41.48
D5646 31408 01/09/1960 BH Finsbury Park Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 03/2001 40.56
D5647 31221 01/09/1960 BH 03/1967
from 30
Finsbury Park 30/08/1991 30.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 05/1995 34.72
D5648 31222 08/09/1960 BH 07/1967
from 30
Finsbury Park 13/10/1988 28.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 02/1990 29.46
D5649 31223 08/09/1960 BH 10/1966
from 30
Finsbury Park 16/12/1991 31.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 06/1995 34.79
D5650 31224 15/09/1960 BH 11/12/1965
from 30
Finsbury Park 30/06/2000 39.75 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 11/2002 42.19
D5651 31225 15/09/1960 BH 13/11/1965
from 30
Finsbury Park 07/03/1989 28.5 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 10/1991 31.10
D5652 31226 22/09/1960 BH 03/1968
from 30
Finsbury Park 03/01/1989 28.33 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 03/1992 31.50
D5653 31227 22/09/1960 BH 05/1966
from 30
Finsbury Park 16/12/1988 28.25 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/1989 28.33
D5654 31228 29/09/1960 BH 18/11/1967
from 30
Finsbury Park 56.54
D5655 31229 29/09/1960 BH 26/10/1968
from 30
March 10/08/2001 40.92 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 08/2001 40.90
D5656 31409 06/10/1960 BH 07/1968
from 30
March 04/01/1991 30.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 03/1992 31.46
D5657 31230 06/10/1960 BH 23/11/1968
from 30
March Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 03/2000 39.47
D5658 31231 13/10/1960 BH 11/1967
from 30
March 22/01/1990 29.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 03/1991 30.44
D5659 31232 20/10/1960 BH 09/1968
from 30
March 26/05/2000 39.58 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 08/2003 42.85
D5660 31233 20/10/1960 BH 02/1967
from 30
March 56.48
D5661 31234 27/10/1960 BH 28/12/1968
from 30
March 11/06/1993 32.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 05/1994 33.57
D5662 31235 27/10/1960 BH 30/11/1966
from 30
March 26/05/2000 39.58 Prs Preserved 56.46
D5663 31236 03/11/1960 BH 03/1967
from 30
March 01/07/1995 34.67 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 09/2006 45.90
D5664 31237 03/11/1960 BH 10/1966
from 30
March 16/06/2000 39.58 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 09/2004 43.90
D5665 31238 10/11/1960 BH March 14/01/2000 39.17 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 06/1999 38.62
D5666 31239 10/11/1960 BH 10/1967
from 30
March Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 56.42
D5667 31240 17/11/1960 BH 10/1966
from 30
March 17/01/1990 29.17 Cut Birds (at Stratford MPD) 03/1994 33.35
D5668 31241 17/11/1960 BH 07/1967
from 30
March 14/03/1982 21.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 05/1982 21.50
D5669 31410 24/11/1960 BH 28/12/1968
from 30
March 30/06/2003 42.58 Prs Preserved 44.13
D5670 31242 05/01/1961 BH 09/1968
from 30
March 14/12/1998 37.92 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 06/1999 38.47
D5671 31243 13/10/1960 BH 11/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 08/04/1991 30.5 Cut Coopers Metals (at Stratford MPD) 02/1994 33.36
D5672 31244 24/11/1960 BH 01/1968
from 30
Finsbury Park 31/05/1983 22.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 09/1983 22.82
D5673 31245 01/12/1960 BH 10/1966
from 30
Finsbury Park 05/01/1987 26.08 Cut British Rail (at Stratford MPD) 03/1988 27.30
D5674 31246 01/12/1960 BH 18/11/1967
from 30
Finsbury Park 01/09/1996 35.75 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 02/2000 39.23
D5675 31247 08/12/1960 BH 12/1965
from 30
Finsbury Park 04/02/2000 39.17 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 06/2003 42.55
D5676 31248 08/12/1960 BH 07/1966
from 30
Finsbury Park 31/03/2000 39.25 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 03/2000 39.29
D5677 31249 15/12/1960 BH Finsbury Park 16/12/1991 31 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 05/1995 34.44
D5678 31250 15/12/1960 BH 05/1966
from 30
Finsbury Park 11/02/2000 39.17 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 03/2000 39.27
D5679 31251 22/12/1960 BH 01/1968
from 30
Finsbury Park 01/09/1993 32.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 09/2004 43.76
D5680 31252 22/12/1960 BH 06/1965
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 31/03/2000 39.25 Cut EMR (at Peterborough LIP) 03/2000 39.25
D5681 31253 05/01/1961 BH 08/1965
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 01/01/1995 34 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 07/2003 42.55
D5682 31254 12/01/1961 BH 09/1968
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 01/12/1979 18.92 Cut British Rail (at Old Oak Common MPD) 07/1980 19.52
D5683 31255 19/01/1961 BH 12/03/1966
from 30
Sheffield Darnall Prs Preserved 56.23
D5684 31256 26/01/1961 BH Sheffield Darnall 56.21
D5685 31257 02/02/1961 BH 12/1966
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 10/09/1990 29.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 04/1992 31.22
D5686 31258 09/02/1961 BH 11/09/1965
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 01/11/1998 37.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 04/2003 42.21
D5687 31259 16/02/1961 BH 06/1965
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 02/03/1989 28.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 06/1990 29.35
D5688 31260 23/02/1961 BH 05/1966
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 12/01/1990 28.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 09/1991 30.58
D5689 31261 02/03/1961 BH 03/1966
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 05/01/1987 25.83 Cut British Rail (at Stratford MPD) 11/1990 29.73
D5690 31262 09/03/1961 BH 05/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 29/05/1983 22.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/1983 22.36
D5691 31411 16/03/1961 BH 05/1966
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 30/11/2005 44.67 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 11/2005 44.70
D5692 31412 23/03/1961 BH 05/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 31/05/2006 45.17 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 10/2006 45.59
D5693 31263 30/03/1961 BH 03/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 10/08/2001 40.42 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 08/2001 40.41
D5694 31264 13/04/1961 BH 12/1966
from 30
Stratford 08/04/1991 30 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 04/1995 34.03
D5695 31265 20/04/1961 BH 23/11/1968
from 30
Stratford Prs Preserved 55.98
D5696 31266 04/05/1961 BH 11/1967
from 30
Stratford 01/12/1992 31.58 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/2007 45.73
D5697 31419 11/05/1961 BH 26/06/1965
from 30
Stratford 01/12/1995 34.58 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 03/2001 39.87
D5698 31268 18/05/1961 BH 02/1967
from 30
Stratford 11/02/2000 38.75 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 03/2000 38.85
D5699 31269 27/04/1961 BH 04/1967
from 30
Stratford 01/11/1991 30.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 04/1993 31.99
D5800 31270 01/06/1961 BH 07/1966
from 30
March 26/05/2000 38.92 Prs Preserved 39.02
D5801 31271 08/06/1961 BH 03/1967
from 30
Stratford 01/05/1997 35.92 Prs Preserved 55.85
D5802 31272 15/06/1961 BH 10/1966
from 30
March 15/08/1995 34.17 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 09/1995 34.27
D5803 31273 22/06/1961 BH 08/1967
from 30
March 12/04/2001 39.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 05/2004 42.93
D5804 31274 29/06/1961 BH 03/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 01/09/1991 30.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 06/1994 32.98
D5805 31275 06/07/1961 BH 24/09/1966
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 31/01/2005 43.5 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth) 02/2005 43.64
D5806 31276 13/07/1961 BH 02/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 11/02/2000 38.58 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 03/2000 38.70
D5807 31277 20/07/1961 BH 07/1966
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 01/02/1995 33.58 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 06/2003 41.93
D5808 31278 20/07/1961 BH 04/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 29/03/1989 27.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 02/1989 27.59
D5809 31279 27/07/1961 BH 07/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 55.71
D5810 31280 03/08/1961 BH 04/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 24/10/1988 27.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 02/1991 29.56
D5811 31281 24/08/1961 BH 03/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 15/05/1989 27.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 02/1990 28.50
D5812 31413 31/08/1961 BH 06/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 01/05/1997 35.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/1998 36.40
D5813 31282 07/09/1961 BH 30/11/1966
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 17/01/1994 32.33 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 12/2001 40.30
D5814 31414 14/09/1961 BH 06/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 01/02/1999 37.42 Prs Preserved 55.58
D5815 31283 21/09/1961 BH 10/1966
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 03/11/1989 28.17 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Stratford MPD) 03/2001 39.51
D5816 31284 28/09/1961 BH 03/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 30/08/1989 27.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 10/1991 30.07
D5817 31285 05/10/1961 BH 06/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 55.52
D5818 31286 12/10/1961 BH 07/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 20/12/1991 30.17 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 12/2001 40.20
D5819 31287 19/10/1961 BH 04/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 09/09/1987 25.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 10/1989 28.01
D5820 31288 26/10/1961 BH 04/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 08/04/1991 29.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 04/1992 30.49
D5821 31289 02/11/1961 BH 08/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 01/03/1992 30.33 Prs Preserved 55.44
D5822 31290 09/11/1961 BH 04/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 04/02/2000 38.25 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 07/2003 41.71
D5823 31291 16/11/1961 BH 06/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall Prs Preserved 48.20
D5824 31415 23/11/1961 BH 05/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 01/07/1995 33.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 06/2009 47.59
D5825 31292 30/11/1961 BH 10/1966
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 07/02/1990 28.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 09/1990 28.81
D5826 31293 07/12/1961 BH 08/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 09/11/1990 28.92 Cut Coopers Metals (at Stratford MPD) 02/1994 32.21
D5827 31294 14/12/1961 BH 05/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 04/02/2000 38.17 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 07/2003 41.61
D5828 31295 28/12/1961 BH 06/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 01/01/1996 34.08 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 11/2002 40.91
D5829 31296 04/01/1962 BH 02/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 01/12/1993 31.92 Cut R Garrett (at Crewe LNWR) 01/2004 42.06
D5830 31297 11/01/1962 BH 10/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 01/02/1998 36.08 Prs Preserved 55.25
D5831 31298 18/01/1962 BH 10/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 06/07/1987 25.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 11/1989 27.84
D5832 31299 01/02/1962 BH 18/11/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 10/10/1990 28.67 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Stratford MPD) 02/2001 39.07
D5833 31300 15/02/1962 BH 11/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 01/05/1997 35.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 10/2002 40.69
D5834 31301 01/03/1962 BH 10/1966
from 30
Sheffield Darnall Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 55.12
D5835 31302 26/04/1962 BH 04/1968
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 14/01/2000 37.75 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 07/1999 37.24
D5836 31303 12/04/1962 BH 01/1968
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 01/01/1996 33.75 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 12/2005 43.71
D5837 31304 19/04/1962 BH 10/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 14/01/2000 37.75 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 07/1999 37.26
D5838 31305 26/04/1962 BH 11/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 08/11/1991 29.58 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 06/1994 32.16
D5839 31306 03/05/1962 BH 02/1968
from 30
Sheffield Darnall Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Old Oak Common MPD) 11/2006 44.57
D5840 31307 10/05/1962 BH 13/11/1965
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 01/03/1996 33.83 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 02/2005 42.80
D5841 31308 17/05/1962 BH Sheffield Darnall Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Old Oak Common MPD) 12/2006 44.61
D5842 31416 24/05/1962 BH Sheffield Darnall 01/10/1995 33.42 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 10/2001 39.42
D5843 31309 31/05/1962 BH 06/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 08/04/1991 28.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 04/1992 29.90
D5844 31310 31422 07/06/1962 BH 11/09/1965
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 54.85
D5845 31311 14/06/1962 BH 08/1965
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 07/02/1989 26.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 12/1989 27.52
D5846 31312 21/06/1962 BH 13/11/1965
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 14/01/1996 33.58 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 11/1999 37.43
D5847 31313 28/06/1962 BH 18/11/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 31/05/1983 20.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 05/1983 20.89
D5848 31314 05/07/1962 BH Sheffield Darnall 19/09/1982 20.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 02/1983 20.63
D5849 31315 12/07/1962 BH 04/1965
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 01/04/1998 35.75 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 07/2006 44.04
D5850 31316 18/07/1962 BH 04/1965
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 01/11/1995 33.33 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 04/2003 40.77
D5851 31317 26/07/1962 BH 09/1968
from 30
Sheffield Darnall Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 05/2000 37.83
D5852 31318 02/08/1962 BH 11/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 01/03/1996 33.58 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 09/1998 36.15
D5853 31319 23/08/1962 BH 01/1968
from 30
Stratford 30/04/2007 44.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 06/2007 44.84
D5854 31320 23/08/1962 BH 10/1967
from 30
Stratford 28/04/1990 27.67 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Stratford MPD) 03/2001 38.59
D5855 31321 30/08/1962 BH 08/1965
from 30
March 54.62
D5856 31417 30/08/1962 BH 01/1966
from 30
March 30/11/2005 43.25 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 01/2006 43.41
D5857 31322 06/09/1962 BH 08/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 28/07/1989 26.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 12/1989 27.29
D5858 31323 20/09/1962 BH 18/11/1967
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 08/06/1989 26.75 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 09/1991 29.01
D5859 31324 04/10/1962 BH 13/11/1965
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 16/04/1993 30.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 05/1994 31.63
D5860 31325 11/10/1962 BH 02/1968
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 01/01/1991 28.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 10/1991 29.03
D5861 31326 18/10/1962 BH 04/1965
from 30
Sheffield Darnall 01/09/1991 28.92 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 03/1997 34.43
D5862 31327 25/10/1962 BH 03/1966
from 30
Sheffield Darnall Prs Preserved 54.47