Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 720 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 2006 Week
» 29480 Month
» 326494 Year
» 403081 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

03 0-6-0


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Dept) BR (Tops) (Dept) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D2000 12/12/1957 SW Kings Cross 07/05/1969 11.42 Cut Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) 01/08/1969 11.64
D2001 12/12/1957 SW Kings Cross 31/05/1969 11.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/10/1970 12.81
D2002 12/12/1957 SW Kings Cross 31/05/1969 11.42 Cut Ingot Metals (Kentish Town) 01/09/1969 11.73
D2003 12/12/1957 SW Kings Cross 07/05/1969 11.42 Cut Ingot Metals (Kentish Town) 01/09/1969 11.73
D2004 03004 09/01/1958 SW Cambridge 10/05/1976 Cambridge 18.33 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 30/11/1976 18.90
D2005 03005 09/01/1958 SW Cambridge 05/11/1976 18.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/03/1977 19.24
D2006 09/01/1958 SW Cambridge 08/10/1972 14.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1973 15.40
D2007 03007 09/01/1958 SW Cambridge 10/05/1976 18.33 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/11/1976 18.82
D2008 03008 09/01/1958 SW Cambridge 30/12/1978 20.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1979 21.15
D2009 03009 12/02/1958 SW Cambridge 11/07/1976 18.42 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/12/1977 19.81
D2010 03010 12/02/1958 SW Cambridge 10/11/1974 16.75 Cut Unknown (Trieste, Italy) 31/05/1976 18.31
D2011 12/02/1958 SW Kings Lynn 08/10/1972 14.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1973 15.48
D2012 03012 12/02/1958 SW Kings Lynn 15/12/1975 17.83 Cut Mayer Parry (Snailwell) 01/01/1991 32.91
D2013 03013 18/03/1958 SW Cambridge 18/07/1976 18.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/03/1977 19.05
D2014 03014 18/03/1958 SW Cambridge 30/06/1974 16.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 30/04/1976 18.13
D2015 18/03/1958 SW Cambridge 13/07/1971 13.33 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/06/1972 14.22
D2016 03016 18/03/1958 SW Cambridge 30/12/1978 20.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/05/1979 21.22
D2017 03017 01/04/1958 SW Cambridge 14/02/1982 23.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/09/1982 24.52
D2018 03018 14/04/1958 SW Hitchin (GNR) 09/11/1975 17.58 Prs Preserved 59.00
D2019 06/05/1958 SW Hitchin (GNR) 25/07/1971 13.17 58.94
D2020 03020 06/05/1958 SW Immingham 03/12/1975 17.58 Prs Preserved 58.94
D2021 03021 27/05/1958 SW Immingham 07/11/1982 24.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 12/03/1983 24.81
D2022 03022 27/05/1958 SW Immingham 07/11/1982 24.5 Prs Preserved 25.48
D2023 12/08/1958 SW Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 04/07/1971 12.92 Prs Preserved 58.67
D2024 19/08/1958 SW Lincoln 04/07/1971 12.92 Prs Preserved 58.65
D2025 03025 26/08/1958 SW Lincoln 29/09/1977 19.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1978 19.53
D2026 03026 05/09/1958 SW Lincoln 06/02/1983 24.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 30/04/1984 25.67
D2027 03027 16/09/1958 SW Lincoln 31/01/1976 17.33 Prs Preserved 58.58
D2028 02/10/1958 SW Cambridge 31/12/1969 11.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/02/1972 13.34
D2029 03029 16/10/1958 SW Cambridge 03/09/1979 20.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/11/1979 21.06
D2030 28/10/1958 SW March 08/1969 10.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/11/1970 12.02
D2031 13/11/1958 SW Cambridge 07/05/1969 10.5 Cut Pollock and Brown (Southampton) 01/09/1969 10.81
D2032 25/11/1958 SW Norwich Thorpe 25/07/1971 12.67 58.39
D2033 31/12/1958 SW Norwich Thorpe 18/12/1971 13 58.29
D2034 03034 21/01/1959 SW Norwich Thorpe 06/02/1983 24.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 06/08/1983 24.56
D2035 03035 30/01/1959 SW Norwich Thorpe 15/06/1976 17.42 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/08/1977 18.52
D2036 09/02/1959 SW Norwich Thorpe 16/12/1971 12.83 58.18
D2037 03037 09/02/1959 SW Norwich Thorpe 29/09/1976 17.58 Prs Preserved 58.18
D2038 25/02/1959 SW Norwich Thorpe 05/03/1972 13.08 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 01/09/1972 13.53
D2039 13/03/1959 SW Norwich Thorpe 13/02/1972 12.92 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 01/05/1977 18.15
D2040 31/03/1959 SW Ipswich 31/05/1969 10.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/10/1970 11.51
D2041 13/04/1959 SW Ipswich 01/02/1970 10.83 Prs Preserved 58.01
D2042 27/04/1959 SW Ipswich 07/1969 10.25 Cut Ingot Metals (Kentish Town) 01/09/1969 10.36
D2043 06/05/1959 SW Ipswich 30/09/1971 12.33 Cut P Woods (Shipbreaking) (Queenborough) 01/09/1973 14.33
D2044 03044 29/11/1958 DO Blyth (North) 21/01/1976 17.17 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/08/1976 17.68
D2045 03045 06/12/1958 DO Blyth (North) 04/02/1979 20.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/09/1979 20.75
D2046 13/12/1958 DO Blyth (North) 03/10/1971 12.83 Prs Preserved 58.34
D2047 03047 19/12/1958 DO Heaton 30/07/1979 20.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/10/1979 20.80
D2048 23/12/1958 DO Gateshead 08/10/1972 13.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1973 14.36
D2049 24/12/1958 DO Blaydon 17/08/1971 12.67 Cut Wath Skip Hire (at NCB British Oak) 01/11/1985 26.87
D2050 03050 17/01/1959 DO Blaydon 07/08/1978 19.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/05/1979 20.30
D2051 27/01/1959 DO Hull Dairycoates 14/12/1972 13.92 Prs Preserved 58.21
D2052 04/02/1959 DO Hull Dairycoates 07/05/1972 13.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/10/1973 14.67
D2053 11/04/1959 DO Hull Dairycoates 07/05/1972 13.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/10/1973 14.48
D2054 11/04/1959 DO Hull Dairycoates 19/11/1972 13.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/09/1982 23.41
D2055 03055 01/05/1959 DO Gateshead 30/06/1974 15.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/11/1974 15.52
D2056 03056 09/05/1959 DO Gateshead 15/06/1980 21.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1981 21.83
D2057 15/05/1959 DO Gateshead 03/10/1971 12.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1986 26.90
D2058 03058 23/05/1959 DO Gateshead 17/06/1975 16.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/02/1977 17.71
D2059 03059 29/05/1959 DO Gateshead 05/07/1987 28.17 Prs Preserved 31.43
D2060 03060 10/06/1959 DO Gateshead 19/12/1982 23.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 23/07/1983 24.13
D2061 03061 20/06/1959 DO Gateshead 12/10/1980 21.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/07/1983 24.13
D2062 03062 03/07/1959 DO Selby 12/10/1980 21.25 Prs Preserved 57.78
D2063 03063 14/07/1959 DO York (North) 26/11/1987 28.33 Prs Preserved 57.75
D2064 03064 23/07/1959 DO York (North) 21/06/1981 21.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/08/1981 22.04
D2065 11/08/1959 DO York (North) 31/12/1972 13.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/07/1973 13.90
D2066 03066 17/08/1959 DO York (North) 08/01/1988 28.42 Prs Preserved 57.66
D2067 03067 25/08/1959 DO Thornaby 09/08/1981 22 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/04/1982 22.62
D2068 03068 02/09/1959 DO West Hartlepool 05/04/1976 16.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/09/1976 17.01
D2069 03069 19/09/1959 DO West Hartlepool 27/11/1983 24.17 Prs Preserved 24.22
D2070 02/10/1959 DO West Hartlepool 28/11/1971 12.08 Prs Preserved 41.78
D2071 13/10/1959 DO Bradford Hammerton Street 07/05/1972 12.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/10/1973 13.98
D2072 03072 31/10/1959 DO Bradford Hammerton Street 08/03/1981 21.42 Prs Preserved 57.45
D2073 03073 05/11/1959 DO Bradford Hammerton Street 23/05/1989 29.5 Prs Preserved 57.44
D2074 11/11/1959 DO Bradford Hammerton Street 07/05/1972 12.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/10/1973 13.90
D2075 03075 24/11/1959 DO Bradford Hammerton Street 18/07/1976 16.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/01/1979 19.12
D2076 03076 04/12/1959 DO Darlington 05/04/1976 16.33 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/09/1976 16.76
D2077 07/12/1959 DO West Hartlepool 01/10/1972 12.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1973 13.33
D2078 03078 24/12/1959 DO Thornaby 08/01/1988 28.08 Prs Preserved 57.31
D2079 03079 97805 07/01/1960 DO Thornaby 03/06/1996 36.42 Prs Preserved 57.27
D2080 03080 22/01/1960 DO Darlington 09/11/1980 20.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1981 21.12
D2081 03081 05/02/1960 DO Bradford Hammerton Street 12/10/1980 20.67 Prs Preserved 57.19
D2082 19/02/1959 DO Brighton 31/12/1969 10.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/09/1971 12.54
D2083 06/03/1959 DO Hither Green 31/05/1969 10.17 Cut Pollock and Brown (Southampton) 01/11/1969 10.67
D2084 03084 19/03/1959 DO Ashford 05/07/1987 28.33 Prs Preserved 58.07
D2085 03/04/1959 DO Eastleigh 31/12/1969 10.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1972 12.92
D2086 03086 05/06/1959 SW Swindon 13/11/1983 24.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/03/1984 24.84
D2087 24/06/1959 SW Swindon 13/06/1971 12 Cut Pounds (at Fratton TMD) 01/03/1973 13.70
D2088 01/07/1959 SW Swindon 08/06/1972 12.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/1973 13.68
D2089 03089 05/05/1960 DO Bradford Hammerton Street 06/11/1987 27.5 Prs Preserved 56.94
D2090 03090 05/05/1960 DO Bradford Hammerton Street 18/07/1976 16.17 Prs Preserved 56.94
D2091 03091 26/05/1960 DO Bradford Hammerton Street 21/03/1974 13.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1977 16.78
D2092 03092 27/05/1960 DO Percy Main 31/08/1977 17.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/01/1978 17.61
D2093 28/05/1960 DO Percy Main 03/10/1971 11.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1986 25.86
D2094 03094 28/06/1960 DO York (North) 08/01/1988 27.58 Prs Preserved 56.79
D2095 03095 15/06/1960 DO York (North) 03/12/1975 15.5 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/08/1976 16.14
D2096 03096 16/06/1960 DO York (North) 02/12/1976 16.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1977 16.72
D2097 03097 18/06/1960 DO York (North) 16/06/1976 16 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1979 18.71
D2098 03098 02/07/1960 DO York (North) 08/11/1975 15.33 Cut Unknown (Russia) 0000
D2099 03099 15/07/1960 DO York (North) 10/02/1976 15.58 Prs Preserved 56.75
D2100 27/07/1960 DO York (North) 22/11/1971 11.33 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/06/1972 11.85
D2101 09/08/1960 DO York (North) 21/11/1971 11.25 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 01/07/1972 11.90
D2102 03102 17/08/1960 DO York (North) 10/02/1976 15.5 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/08/1976 15.97
D2103 03103 27/08/1960 DO York (North) 04/02/1979 18.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/05/1979 18.69
D2104 03104 24/09/1960 DO York (North) 17/06/1975 14.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/02/1976 15.36
D2105 03105 06/10/1960 DO York (North) 16/02/1976 15.33 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/08/1976 15.83
D2106 03106 15/10/1960 DO York (North) 17/09/1975 14.92 Cut Hesslewoods (Attercliffe) 01/05/1976 15.55
D2107 03107 22/10/1960 DO York (North) 09/08/1981 20.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/10/1982 21.96
D2108 03108 29/10/1960 DO Darlington 18/11/1976 16.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1977 16.35
D2109 03109 05/11/1960 DO Darlington 13/07/1975 14.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/04/1976 15.41
D2110 03110 18/11/1960 DO York (North) 02/02/1976 15.25 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/08/1976 15.71
D2111 03111 25/11/1960 DO York (North) 27/07/1980 19.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1981 20.20
D2112 03112 09/12/1960 DO York (North) 05/07/1987 26.58 Prs Preserved 56.35
D2113 03113 23/12/1960 DO York (North) 03/08/1975 14.67 Prs Preserved 56.31
D2114 02/07/1959 SW Danygraig 11/05/1968 8.83 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/01/1975 15.51
D2115 13/08/1959 SW Danygraig 11/05/1968 8.75 Cut Cohens (Kingsbury) 01/09/1968 9.06
D2116 21/08/1959 SW Danygraig 09/10/1971 12.17 Cut Marples and Gillot (Sheffield) 01/07/1973 13.87
D2117 04/09/1959 SW Danygraig 09/10/1971 12.08 Prs Preserved 57.61
D2118 17/09/1959 SW Danygraig 18/06/1972 12.75 Prs Preserved 57.58
D2119 03119 25/09/1959 SW Danygraig 23/02/1986 26.42 Prs Preserved 57.55
D2120 03120 08/10/1959 SW Danygraig 23/02/1986 26.33 Prs Preserved 57.52
D2121 03121 16/10/1959 SW Danygraig 03/05/1981 21.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 28/09/1985 25.97
D2122 30/10/1959 SW Danygraig 26/11/1972 13.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/08/1975 15.76
D2123 12/11/1959 SW Danygraig 28/12/1968 9.08 Cut Birds (Bristol) 01/11/1978 18.98
D2124 23/11/1959 SW Danygraig 28/02/1970 10.25 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Barrow) 01/08/1970 10.70
D2125 27/11/1959 SW Danygraig 28/12/1968 9.08 Cut Birds (Cardiff) 01/06/1976 16.52
D2126 16/12/1959 SW Danygraig 09/10/1971 11.83 Cut P Woods (Shipbreaking) (Queenborough) 0000
D2127 24/12/1959 SW Danygraig 11/05/1968 8.42 Cut Cohens (Kingsbury) 01/09/1968 8.70
D2128 03128 07/01/1960 SW Laira 04/07/1976 16.5 Prs Preserved 57.27
D2129 03129 18/01/1960 SW Newton Abbot 20/12/1981 21.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 16/03/1983 23.17
D2130 27/01/1960 SW Newton Abbot 20/08/1972 12.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/1973 13.10
D2131 02/02/1960 SW Taunton 06/07/1968 8.42 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/11/1968 8.75
D2132 12/02/1960 SW Taunton 24/06/1969 9.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/11/1984 24.74
D2133 23/02/1960 SW Taunton 07/1969 9.42 Prs Preserved 57.14
D2134 03134 29/02/1960 SW Taunton 04/07/1976 16.42 Prs Preserved 57.12
D2135 03135 21/03/1960 SW Bristol Barrow Road 31/01/1976 15.83 Cut P Woods (Shipbreaking) (Queenborough) 01/07/1976 16.29
D2136 21/03/1960 SW Gloucester Horton Road 01/01/1972 11.83 Cut Robinson and Hanon (Blaydon) 01/10/1972 12.54
D2137 03137 30/03/1960 SW Gloucester Horton Road 11/07/1976 16.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/12/1977 17.68
D2138 05/04/1960 SW Gloucester Horton Road 24/06/1969 9.17 Prs Preserved 57.02
D2139 11/04/1960 SW Gloucester Horton Road 11/05/1968 8.08 Prs Preserved 57.01
D2140 22/04/1960 SW Taunton 04/04/1970 10 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1972 11.79
D2141 03141 04/05/1960 SW Taunton 07/07/1985 25.17 Prs Preserved 56.95
D2142 03142 12/05/1960 SW Taunton 02/10/1983 23.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 26/10/1985 25.47
D2143 13/01/1961 SW Swindon 06/07/1968 7.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/12/1968 7.89
D2144 03144 19/01/1961 SW Swindon 23/02/1986 25.08 Prs Preserved 56.23
D2145 03145 12/02/1961 SW Swindon 07/07/1985 24.42 Prs Preserved 56.17
D2146 14/02/1961 SW Swindon 21/09/1968 7.58 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/07/1978 17.39
D2147 03147 19/05/1960 SW York (North) 05/09/1975 15.33 Cut C F Booth (Doncaster) 30/04/1976 15.96
D2148 24/05/1960 SW York (North) 19/11/1972 12.5 Prs Preserved 56.89
D2149 03149 30/05/1960 SW Percy Main 28/11/1982 22.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 09/07/1983 23.12
D2150 10/06/1960 SW York (North) 19/11/1972 12.42 Cut Cotswold Rail (at Gloucester) 01/07/2001 41.08
D2151 03151 16/06/1960 SW York (North) 07/07/1985 25.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/12/1985 25.56
D2152 03152 22/06/1960 SW York (North) 02/10/1983 23.33 Prs Preserved 56.81
D2153 03153 27/06/1960 SW York (North) 08/11/1975 15.42 Cut Unknown (Trieste, Italy) 0000
D2154 03154 01/07/1960 SW York (North) 11/09/1983 23.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 05/11/1983 23.36
D2155 03155 26/07/1960 SW York (North) 11/06/1975 14.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/04/1976 15.69
D2156 03156 08/08/1960 SW York (North) 22/11/1975 15.25 Cut Unknown (Trieste, Italy) 0000
D2157 03157 16/08/1960 SW York (North) 29/12/1975 15.33 Cut Chiari Steelworks, Italy (Chiari) 01/05/1997 36.73
D2158 03158 22/08/1960 SW York (North) 05/07/1987 26.92 Prs Preserved 56.64
D2159 03159 29/08/1960 SW York (North) 03/10/1977 17.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1978 18.10
D2160 03160 05/09/1960 SW York (North) 13/12/1981 21.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 22/04/1983 22.64
D2161 03161 13/09/1960 SW York (North) 13/12/1981 21.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 18/04/1983 22.61
D2162 03162 21/09/1960 SW York (North) 23/05/1989 28.67 Prs Preserved 56.56
D2163 03163 03/10/1960 SW York (North) 14/01/1976 15.25 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/08/1976 15.84
D2164 03164 07/10/1960 SW York (North) 23/01/1976 15.25 Cut Chiari Steelworks, Italy (Chiari) 01/05/1997 36.59
D2165 03165 17/10/1960 SW York (North) 21/08/1975 14.83 Cut C F Booth (Doncaster) 24/03/1976 15.44
D2166 03166 25/10/1960 SW Darlington 29/11/1975 15.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 30/06/1976 15.69
D2167 03167 01/11/1960 SW Darlington 20/07/1975 14.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/06/1976 15.59
D2168 03168 08/11/1960 SW Hull Dairycoates 09/08/1981 20.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/04/1982 21.41
D2169 03169 15/11/1960 SW Hull Dairycoates 02/11/1975 15 Cut Drapers (Hull Botanic Gardens MPD) 01/06/1976 15.55
D2170 03170 21/11/1960 SW Hull Dairycoates 03/1989 28.33 Prs Preserved 56.39
D2171 03171 28/11/1960 SW Hull Dairycoates 24/10/1977 16.92 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/03/1978 17.27
D2172 03172 06/12/1960 SW Hull Dairycoates 26/05/1976 15.42 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/07/1977 16.58
D2173 14/12/1960 SW Hull Dairycoates 01/11/1973 12.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1977 16.22
D2174 03174 31/12/1960 SW Hull Dairycoates 29/11/1975 14.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/05/1976 15.42
D2175 03175 06/12/1961 SW Ashford Chart Leacon 11/09/1983 21.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 05/11/1983 21.93
D2176 15/12/1961 SW Ashford Chart Leacon 11/05/1968 6.42 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/11/1971 9.88
D2177 27/12/1961 SW Ashford Chart Leacon 21/09/1968 6.75 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/06/1970 8.43
D2178 09/01/1962 SW Ashford Chart Leacon 30/09/1969 7.67 Prs Preserved 55.26
D2179 03179 20/01/1962 SW Hither Green 31/07/2002 40.5 55.23
D2180 03180 01/02/1962 SW Hither Green 31/03/1984 22.08 Prs Preserved 55.20
D2181 21/02/1962 SW Swindon 11/05/1968 6.25 Cut Marples and Gillot (Sheffield) 01/01/1987 24.88
D2182 05/03/1962 SW Taunton 11/05/1968 6.17 Prs Preserved 55.11
D2183 20/03/1962 SW Taunton 21/09/1968 6.5 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/03/1969 6.95
D2184 09/04/1962 SW Llanelly 28/12/1968 6.67 Prs Preserved 55.01
D2185 03/05/1962 SW Danygraig 28/12/1968 6.58 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/06/1978 16.09
D2186 23/05/1962 SW Swindon 30/09/1969 7.33 Cut A R Adams (Newport, Gwent) 01/01/1981 18.62
D2187 08/03/1961 SW Swindon 11/05/1968 7.17 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/06/1978 17.24
D2188 20/03/1961 SW Swindon 11/05/1968 7.17 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/02/1978 16.88
D2189 03189 31/03/1961 SW Swindon 16/03/1986 25 Prs Preserved 56.04
D2190 14/04/1961 SW Swindon 28/12/1968 7.67 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/05/1969 8.05
D2191 27/04/1961 SW Swindon 11/05/1968 7.08 Cut Cohens (Kingsbury) 01/09/1968 7.35
D2192 05/05/1961 SW Swindon 25/01/1969 7.67 Prs Preserved 55.94
D2193 15/05/1961 SW Swindon 25/01/1969 7.67 Cut A R Adams (Newport, Gwent) 01/01/1981 19.65
D2194 23/05/1961 SW Swindon 21/09/1968 7.33 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/06/1978 17.04
D2195 05/06/1961 SW Swindon 01/09/1968 7.25 Cut Duport Steels (Llanelli) 01/09/1981 20.25
D2196 03196 08/06/1961 SW Swindon 12/06/1983 22 Prs Preserved 55.85
D2197 03197 15/06/1961 SW To Western Region / GWR 05/07/1987 26.08 Prs Preserved 55.83
D2198 22/06/1961 SW Edge Hill 22/11/1970 9.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1972 10.70
D2199 29/06/1961 SW Speke Junction 18/06/1972 11 Prs Preserved 55.79
D2370 91 03370 06/1958 SW Lowestoft 19/12/1982 24.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 16/07/1983 25.10
D2371 92 03371 31/12/1958 SW Lowestoft 26/11/1987 28.92 Prs Preserved 58.29
D2372 26/07/1961 SW Widnes 22/11/1970 9.33 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/10/1971 10.19
D2373 02/08/1961 SW Edge Hill 11/05/1968 Newton Heath 6.75 Cut National Coal Board (Manvers Main) 01/03/1982 20.59
D2374 11/08/1961 SW Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 11/05/1968 Birkenhead Mollington Street 6.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/11/1968 7.23
D2375 22/08/1961 SW Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 11/05/1968 Birkenhead Mollington Street 6.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/11/1968 7.20
D2376 07/09/1961 SW Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 11/05/1968 Springs Branch (Wigan) 6.67 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/11/1968 7.16
D2377 11/09/1961 SW Derby 11/05/1968 Springs Branch (Wigan) 6.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1970 8.40
D2378 22/09/1961 SW Derby 13/06/1971 9.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1972 11.03
D2379 11/10/1961 SW Derby 11/05/1968 Springs Branch (Wigan) 6.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1970 8.32
D2380 19/10/1961 SW Derby 11/05/1968 Rugby 6.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/11/1968 7.04
D2381 27/10/1961 SW Derby 18/06/1972 10.67 Prs Preserved 55.46
D2382 03382 08/11/1961 SW Derby 02/10/1983 21.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 28/02/1986 24.32
D2383 16/11/1961 SW Derby 18/04/1971 9.42 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 01/02/1972 10.22
D2384 27/11/1961 SW Derby 11/05/1968 Crewe Diesel 6.5 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/11/1968 6.93
D2385 24/03/1961 DO Birkenhead Mollington Street 15/02/1970 8.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/08/1970 9.36
D2386 03386 24/03/1961 DO Bidston 27/03/1976 15 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/11/1976 15.62
D2387 29/03/1961 DO Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 30/12/1972 11.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1973 12.02
D2388 06/04/1961 DO Birkenhead Mollington Street 30/07/1972 11.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/1973 11.91
D2389 03389 26/04/1961 DO Gorton 06/02/1983 21.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 23/07/1983 22.25
D2390 16/05/1961 DO Gorton 11/05/1968 Carnforth 7 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/11/1968 7.47
D2391 15/06/1961 DO Gorton 22/11/1970 9.42 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/10/1971 10.30
D2392 16/06/1961 DO Gorton 19/06/1971 10 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/02/1972 10.64
D2393 03/07/1961 DO Edge Hill 31/12/1969 8.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/05/1971 9.83
D2394 21/07/1961 DO Widnes 23/11/1968 7.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/08/1969 8.04
D2395 12/08/1961 DO Bushbury 11/05/1968 Crewe Diesel 6.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/09/1968 7.06
D2396 23/08/1961 DO Monument Lane 11/05/1968 Speke Junction 6.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/11/1968 7.20
D2397 03397 15/09/1961 DO Norwood Junction 05/07/1987 25.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/01/1991 29.32
D2398 30/09/1961 DO Hither Green 31/10/1971 10.08 Cut Pounds (at Fratton TMD) 01/08/1972 10.84
D2399 03399 21/10/1961 DO Ashford Chart Leacon 05/07/1987 25.75 Prs Preserved 55.48