Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 550 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 5124 Week
» 24857 Month
» 321871 Year
» 398458 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

33 Bo-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D6500 33001 30/01/1960 BC Hither Green 17/03/1988 28.17 Cut Vic Berry (at Eastleigh MPD) 31/03/1989 29.19
D6501 33002 27/02/1960 BC Hither Green 01/09/1996 36.58 Prs Preserved 57.13
D6502 12/03/1960 BC Hither Green 17/05/1964 4.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) 01/07/1964 4.31
D6503 33003 19/03/1960 BC Hither Green 05/08/1987 27.42 Cut Vic Berry (at Eastleigh MPD) 06/11/1990 30.65
D6504 33004 26/03/1960 BC Hither Green 21/06/1991 31.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) 28/08/1992 32.45
D6505 33005 09/04/1960 BC Hither Green 25/06/1987 27.17 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 26/09/1990 30.48
D6506 33006 23/04/1960 BC Hither Green 06/08/1991 31.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 21/06/1994 34.18
D6507 33007 04/05/1960 BC Hither Green 10/12/1986 26.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) 01/05/1987 27.01
D6508 33008 21/05/1960 BC Hither Green 01/02/1996 35.75 Prs Preserved 56.90
D6509 33009 21/05/1960 BC Hither Green 13/03/1993 32.83 Cut MRJ Philips (at Eastleigh Works) 05/04/1997 36.90
D6510 33010 04/06/1960 BC Hither Green 18/04/1988 27.83 Cut Vic Berry (at Eastleigh MPD) 01/03/1989 28.76
D6511 33101 04/06/1960 BC Hither Green 24/05/1993 32.92 Cut MRJ Philips (at Eastleigh MPD) 25/02/1997 36.75
D6512 33011 18/06/1960 BC Hither Green 23/03/1989 28.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/11/1990 30.39
D6513 33102 25/06/1960 BC Hither Green 06/11/1992 32.42 Prs Preserved 33.37
D6514 33103 02/07/1960 BC Hither Green Prs Preserved 56.79
D6515 33012 08/07/1960 BC Hither Green 01/02/1997 36.58 Prs Preserved 56.77
D6516 33104 15/07/1960 BC Hither Green 16/12/1985 25.42 Cut British Rail (at Slade Green MPD) 31/03/1986 25.73
D6517 33105 22/07/1960 BC Hither Green 27/10/1987 27.25 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 06/11/1990 30.31
D6518 33013 19/08/1960 BC Hither Green 14/03/1989 28.58 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 03/06/1991 30.81
D6519 33106 27/08/1960 BC Hither Green 16/11/1990 30.25 Cut Coopers Metals (at Eastleigh MPD) 07/09/1992 32.05
D6520 33107 03/09/1960 BC Hither Green 16/05/1989 28.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 17/05/1991 30.72
D6521 33108 11/09/1960 BC Hither Green Prs Preserved 56.59
D6522 33014 17/09/1960 BC Hither Green 17/02/1986 25.42 Cut British Rail (at Eastleigh MPD) 01/09/1986 25.97
D6523 33015 24/09/1960 BC Hither Green 28/07/1989 28.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/11/1990 30.12
D6524 33016 01/10/1960 BC Hither Green 04/10/1989 29 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 13/01/1992 31.30
D6525 33109 08/10/1960 BC Hither Green Prs Preserved 56.52
D6526 33017 15/10/1960 BC Hither Green 05/01/1988 27.25 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/11/1990 30.07
D6527 33110 22/10/1960 BC Hither Green 01/09/1992 31.92 Prs Preserved 56.48
D6528 33111 29/10/1960 BC Hither Green 24/06/1991 30.67 Prs Preserved 32.28
D6529 33112 05/11/1960 BC Hither Green 11/11/1988 28 Cut Coopers Metals (at Eastleigh MPD) 11/09/1992 31.87
D6530 33018 12/11/1960 BC Hither Green 01/02/1988 27.25 Prs Preserved 56.42
D6531 33113 22/11/1960 BC Hither Green 09/10/1992 31.92 Cut MRJ Philips (at Stewarts Lane MPD) 17/01/1997 36.18
D6532 33114 19/11/1960 BC Hither Green 01/02/1993 32.25 Cut MRJ Philips (at Eastleigh Yard) 16/08/1996 35.76
D6533 33115 03/12/1960 BC Hither Green 10/05/1989 28.42 Cut St Leonards Railway Engineering (St Leonards) 13/10/1994 33.88
D6534 33019 03/12/1960 BC Hither Green Prs Preserved 56.36
D6535 33116 10/12/1960 BC Hither Green Prs Preserved 56.35
D6536 33117 17/12/1960 BC Hither Green 01/05/1993 32.42 Prs Preserved 56.33
D6537 33020 31/12/1960 BC Hither Green 20/04/1993 32.33 Cut MRJ Philips (at Stewarts Lane MPD) 17/01/1997 36.07
D6538 33118 07/01/1961 BC Hither Green 16/04/1993 32.25 Cut MRJ Philips (at Eastleigh MPD) 25/02/1997 36.16
D6539 33021 14/01/1961 BC Hither Green Prs Preserved 56.25
D6540 33022 21/01/1961 BC Hither Green 24/12/1989 28.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 24/09/1991 30.69
D6541 33023 28/01/1961 BC Hither Green 31/05/2005 44.33 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 18/11/2005 44.84
D6542 33024 04/02/1961 BC Hither Green 17/02/1986 25 Cut British Rail (at Eastleigh MPD) 31/08/1986 25.59
D6543 33025 10/02/1961 BC Hither Green 56.18
D6544 33026 25/02/1961 BC Hither Green 31/08/2003 42.5 Cut Raxstar (at Eastleigh MPD) 20/09/2003 42.59
D6545 33027 08/03/1961 BC Hither Green 05/07/1991 30.33 Cut Coopers Metals (at Eastleigh MPD) 15/09/1992 31.55
D6546 33028 18/03/1961 BC Hither Green 05/10/1988 27.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) 01/09/1989 28.48
D6547 33029 25/03/1961 BC Hither Green 56.06
D6548 33030 01/04/1961 BC Hither Green 56.04
D6549 33031 01/04/1961 BC Hither Green 06/02/1989 27.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 10/06/1991 30.21
D6550 33032 13/04/1961 BC Hither Green 25/03/1987 25.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) 31/07/1987 26.32
D6551 33033 20/04/1961 BC Hither Green 17/05/1993 32.08 Cut MRJ Philips (at Stewarts Lane MPD) 17/01/1997 35.77
D6552 33034 24/04/1961 BC Hither Green 25/01/1988 26.75 Prs Preserved 29.56
D6553 33035 06/05/1961 BC Hither Green 01/10/1996 35.42 Prs Preserved 55.94
D6554 33036 13/05/1961 BC Hither Green 28/02/2007 45.75 Cut British Rail (at Slade Green MPD) 01/10/1979 18.40
D6555 33037 20/05/1961 BC Hither Green 23/09/1987 26.33 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 08/08/1991 30.24
D6556 33038 01/06/1961 BC Hither Green 05/10/1988 27.33 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 30/06/2001 40.11
D6557 33039 03/06/1961 BC Hither Green 18/05/1989 27.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 03/05/1991 29.93
D6558 33040 10/06/1961 BC Hither Green 14/05/1993 31.92 Cut MRJ Philips (at Stewarts Lane MPD) 17/01/1997 35.63
D6559 33041 24/06/1961 BC Hither Green 30/11/1975 14.42 Cut British Rail (at Selhurst MPD) 01/03/1976 14.70
D6560 33042 15/07/1961 BC Hither Green 08/10/1996 35.25 Cut MRJ Philips (at Stewarts Lane MPD) 17/01/1997 35.53
D6561 33043 08/07/1961 BC Hither Green 23/09/1987 26.17 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 10/05/1991 29.86
D6562 33044 15/07/1961 BC Hither Green 11/09/1987 26.17 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 26/09/1990 29.22
D6563 33045 22/07/1961 BC Hither Green 30/10/1987 26.25 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 06/11/1990 29.31
D6564 33046 29/07/1961 BC Hither Green 31/03/2007 45.67 Prs Preserved 55.71
D6565 33047 19/08/1961 BC Hither Green 12/02/1993 31.5 Cut MRJ Philips (at Eastleigh MPD) 25/02/1997 35.55
D6566 33048 26/08/1961 BC Hither Green 13/02/1997 35.5 Prs Preserved 55.64
D6567 33049 09/09/1961 BC Hither Green 28/03/1988 26.5 Cut Vic Berry (at Eastleigh MPD) 01/03/1989 27.49
D6568 33050 09/09/1961 BC Hither Green 14/05/1993 31.67 Cut MRJ Philips (at Stewarts Lane MPD) 17/01/1997 35.38
D6569 33051 16/09/1961 BC Hither Green 31/08/2003 41.92 Cut Raxstar (at Eastleigh MPD) 31/10/2003 42.15
D6570 33052 30/09/1961 BC Hither Green 13/02/1997 35.42 Prs Preserved 55.54
D6571 33053 14/10/1961 BC Hither Green 01/01/1995 33.25 Prs Preserved 55.50
D6572 33054 14/10/1961 BC Hither Green 17/12/1986 25.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) 30/08/1987 25.89
D6573 33055 04/11/1961 BC Hither Green 24/12/1989 28.08 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 08/08/1991 29.78
D6574 33056 28/10/1961 BC Hither Green 04/02/1991 29.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 27/07/2006 44.78
D6575 33057 04/11/1961 BC Hither Green 31/08/2005 43.75 Prs Preserved 55.44
D6576 11/11/1961 BC Hither Green 03/11/1968 7 Cut Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) 01/03/1969 7.31
D6577 33058 18/11/1961 BC Hither Green 21/06/1991 29.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 17/06/1994 32.60
D6578 33059 25/11/1961 BC Hither Green 27/09/1988 26.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 02/07/1991 29.62
D6579 33060 02/12/1961 BC Hither Green 29/10/1990 28.83 Cut Coopers Metals (at Eastleigh MPD) 02/09/1992 30.77
D6580 33119 09/12/1961 BC Hither Green 26/10/1989 27.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 08/04/1992 30.35
D6581 33061 16/12/1961 BC Hither Green 25/06/1987 25.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) 30/11/1987 25.97
D6582 33062 23/12/1961 BC Hither Green 23/09/1987 25.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 06/11/1990 28.89
D6583 33063 06/01/1962 BC Hither Green 13/02/1997 35.08 Prs Preserved 35.63
D6584 33064 13/01/1962 BC Hither Green 15/10/1994 32.75 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 29/08/1997 35.65
D6585 33065 13/01/1962 BC Hither Green 13/02/1997 35.08 Prs Preserved 35.61
D6586 33201 02/02/1962 BC Hither Green 01/10/1993 31.67 Prs Preserved 55.20
D6587 33202 09/02/1962 BC Hither Green 01/09/2007 45.58 Prs Preserved 55.18
D6588 33203 16/02/1962 BC Hither Green 19/04/1991 29.17 Cut Halliday Skip Hire (Newton Stewart) 30/06/2006 44.40
D6589 33204 23/02/1962 BC Hither Green 13/02/1997 35 Cut Raxstar (at Mid Hants Railway, Ropley) 02/02/2002 39.97
D6590 33205 23/02/1962 BC Hither Green 27/07/1992 30.42 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Barrow Hill) 31/08/2003 41.55
D6591 33206 09/03/1962 BC Hither Green 08/10/1996 34.58 Cut MRJ Philips (at Eastleigh MPD) 25/02/1997 34.99
D6592 33207 16/03/1962 BC Hither Green 55.08
D6593 33208 23/03/1962 BC Hither Green 01/02/1997 34.92 Prs Preserved 55.06
D6594 33209 30/03/1962 BC Hither Green 02/12/1988 26.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) 31/10/1989 27.61
D6595 33210 13/04/1962 BC Hither Green 05/08/1987 25.33 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 26/09/1990 28.47
D6596 33211 27/04/1962 BC Hither Green 01/10/1993 31.5 Cut MRJ Philips (at Stewarts Lane MPD) 17/01/1997 34.75
D6597 33212 11/05/1962 BC Hither Green 11/09/1987 25.33 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 10/05/1991 29.02