Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 208 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 6264 Week
» 20841 Month
» 384086 Year
» 460673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

37 Co-Co


BR (Pre Tops) BR (37/0) BR (37/4) BR (37/5) BR (37/7) BR (37/6a) BR (37/9a) BR (Renum) BR (37/9b) BR (37/6b) BR (Dept) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D6600 37300 37429 26/08/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 01/10/2002 37.17 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/02/2008 42.46
D6601 37301 37412 06/09/1965 EE Landore 51.61
D6602 37302 37416 09/09/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 51.60
D6603 37303 37271 16/09/1965 EE Landore 01/08/1997 31.92 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/07/1997 31.81
D6604 37304 37272 22/09/1965 EE Landore 01/03/1997 31.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/08/2005 39.88
D6605 37305 37407 06/10/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 01/03/2000 34.42 Prs Preserved 51.52
D6606 37306 37273 11/10/1965 EE Landore 01/09/1991 25.92 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 01/05/1993 27.57
D6607 37307 37403 22/10/1965 EE Landore 01/03/2000 34.42 Prs Preserved 51.48
D6608 37308 37308 09/11/1965 EE Landore 01/01/2005 39.17 Prs Preserved 51.43
D6700 37119 37350 02/12/1960 EE Stratford 01/12/1999 39 Prs Preserved 56.37
D6701 37001 37707 12/12/1960 EE Stratford 56.34
D6702 37002 37351 19/12/1960 EE Stratford 01/12/1999 39 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/11/2007 46.90
D6703 37003 28/12/1960 EE Stratford 21/01/2000 39.08 Prs Preserved 56.30
D6704 37004 06/01/1961 EE Stratford 12/06/1996 35.42 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 04/06/1996 35.43
D6705 37005 37501 37601 12/01/1961 EE Stratford 56.26
D6706 37006 37798 20/01/1961 EE March 01/01/2005 44 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/07/2009 48.48
D6707 37007 37506 37604 03/02/1961 EE March 56.20
D6708 37008 37008 10/02/1961 EE Ipswich 24/02/1992 31 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/07/1996 35.41
D6709 37009 37340 17/02/1961 EE Stratford 01/03/1995 34.08 Prs Preserved 56.16
D6710 37010 24/02/1961 EE Stratford 30/06/2005 44.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 26/07/2007 46.45
D6711 37011 03/03/1961 EE Stratford 03/08/1987 26.42 Cut J Rollason (Wellington) 31/08/1989 28.52
D6712 37012 10/03/1961 EE Stratford 31/03/2003 42 Cut Sims Metals (Beeston) 31/08/2003 42.50
D6713 37013 20/03/1961 EE Stratford 16/11/2001 40.67 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 01/02/2007 45.90
D6714 37014 37709 24/03/1961 EE Stratford 56.06
D6715 37015 37341 19/05/1961 EE Stratford 01/09/1994 33.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/02/2003 41.73
D6716 37016 37706 16/06/1961 EE Stratford 55.83
D6717 37017 37503 30/05/1961 EE Stratford 55.88
D6718 37018 37517 05/06/1961 EE Stratford 55.86
D6719 37019 27/06/1961 EE Stratford 31/01/2004 42.58 Cut Sims Metals (Beeston) 31/07/2004 43.12
D6720 37020 37702 30/06/1961 EE Stratford 55.79
D6721 37021 37715 06/07/1961 EE Norwich Thorpe 01/06/1999 37.92 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 01/11/2005 44.35
D6722 37022 37512 37608 13/07/1961 EE Norwich Thorpe 55.76
D6723 37023 20/07/1961 EE March 31/12/2007 46.42 Prs Preserved 55.74
D6724 37024 37714 25/08/1961 EE March 55.64
D6725 37025 31/08/1961 EE Stratford 01/02/1999 37.5 Prs Preserved 55.62
D6726 37026 37320 08/09/1961 EE Stratford 28/01/1999 37.33 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/07/2000 38.84
D6727 37027 37519 15/09/1961 EE Stratford 01/11/1999 38.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/2008 46.49
D6728 37028 37505 22/09/1961 EE Stratford 01/12/2000 39.25 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/02/2008 46.39
D6729 37029 03/10/1961 EE Stratford 31/12/2007 46.17 Prs Preserved 55.53
D6730 37030 37701 16/10/1961 EE Hull Dairycoates 01/12/1999 38.17 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/01/2008 46.24
D6731 37031 23/10/1961 EE Hull Dairycoates 14/01/1994 32.25 Cut MRJ Philips (at Cardiff Canton MPD) 01/05/1997 35.55
D6732 37032 37032 09/03/1962 EE Hull Dairycoates 04/03/1994 32 Prs Preserved 55.10
D6733 37033 37719 20/03/1962 EE Hull Dairycoates 01/12/1999 37.75 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/01/2008 45.82
D6734 37034 37704 26/03/1962 EE Hull Dairycoates 01/10/2003 41.58 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/06/2009 47.22
D6735 37035 01/04/1962 EE Hull Dairycoates 21/01/2000 37.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 14/01/2000 37.81
D6736 37036 37507 37605 25/04/1962 EE Hull Dairycoates 54.98
D6737 37037 37037 04/05/1962 EE Hull Dairycoates 01/08/2000 38.25 Prs Preserved 54.95
D6738 37038 11/05/1962 EE Hull Dairycoates 01/03/1999 36.83 Prs Preserved 54.93
D6739 37039 37504 37603 18/05/1962 EE Hull Dairycoates 54.91
D6740 37040 01/06/1962 EE Hull Dairycoates 30/06/2005 43 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 30/04/2006 43.94
D6741 37041 37520 07/06/1962 EE Hull Dairycoates 01/06/2002 40 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/10/2007 45.35
D6742 37042 15/06/1962 EE Sheffield Darnall Prs Preserved 54.84
D6743 37043 37043 22/06/1962 EE Sheffield Darnall 31/03/2003 40.75 Cut Sims Metals (Beeston) 13/05/2003 40.92
D6744 37044 37710 29/06/1962 EE Sheffield Darnall 54.80
D6745 37045 37045 06/07/1962 EE Sheffield Darnall 31/10/2003 41.25 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Toton Training Compound) 20/11/2003 41.40
D6746 37046 13/07/1962 EE Sheffield Darnall 30/09/2008 46.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/09/2009 47.17
D6747 37047 20/07/1962 EE Sheffield Darnall 31/10/2007 45.25 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 31/05/2008 45.90
D6748 37048 10/08/1962 EE Sheffield Darnall 31/03/2003 40.58 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Toton Training Compound) 15/04/2003 40.71
D6749 37049 37343 17/08/1962 EE Sheffield Darnall 01/02/1995 32.5 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Toton Training Compound) 01/12/2003 41.32
D6750 37050 37717 24/08/1962 EE Sheffield Darnall 01/12/2004 42.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/2009 46.64
D6751 37051 31/08/1962 EE Sheffield Darnall 31/12/2007 45.33 Cut Sims Metals (Beeston) 31/01/2008 45.45
D6752 37052 37713 06/09/1962 EE Sheffield Darnall 01/03/2000 37.5 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Crewe DMD) 01/06/2007 44.76
D6753 37053 37344 14/09/1962 EE Sheffield Darnall 01/07/1996 33.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/2006 43.49
D6754 37054 19/09/1962 EE Sheffield Darnall 31/08/2003 40.92 Cut Sandbach Car and Commercial Dismantlers (at Motherwell MPD) 27/09/2003 41.05
D6755 37055 21/09/1962 EE Thornaby 31/12/2007 45.25 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 30/04/2008 45.64
D6756 37056 37513 28/09/1962 EE Thornaby 01/11/2000 38.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/02/2008 45.38
D6757 37057 05/10/1962 EE Thornaby 54.53
D6758 37058 10/10/1962 EE Thornaby 30/09/2008 45.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/2009 46.51
D6759 37059 12/10/1962 EE Thornaby 54.51
D6760 37060 37705 19/10/1962 EE Thornaby 01/12/1999 37.17 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/08/2007 44.81
D6761 37061 37799 24/10/1962 EE Thornaby 54.48
D6762 37062 26/10/1962 EE Thornaby 13/03/1989 26.42 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 27/04/1990 27.52
D6763 37063 07/11/1962 EE Thornaby 31/01/1999 36.17 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 31/12/2001 39.18
D6764 37064 37515 07/11/1962 EE Thornaby Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 54.44
D6765 37065 14/11/1962 EE Thornaby 31/10/2007 44.92 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 31/12/2007 45.16
D6766 37066 16/11/1962 EE Thornaby 15/08/1997 34.75 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 15/08/1997 34.77
D6767 37067 37703 21/11/1962 EE Thornaby 54.40
D6768 37068 37356 23/11/1962 EE Thornaby 31/05/2005 42.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 19/08/2005 42.77
D6769 37069 17/07/1962 RS Thornaby 54.75
D6770 37070 17/08/1962 RS Thornaby 19/05/1996 33.75 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Toton Training Compound) 14/07/2004 41.94
D6771 37071 22/08/1962 RS Thornaby 30/06/2004 41.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/10/2005 43.14
D6772 37072 04/09/1962 RS Thornaby 31/01/1999 36.33 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 31/10/2004 42.19
D6773 37073 10/09/1962 RS Thornaby 31/03/2003 40.5 Cut Ian Riley Engineering (at ELR, Bury) 01/04/2003 40.58
D6774 37074 17/09/1962 RS Thornaby 30/06/2005 42.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 02/11/2005 43.16
D6775 37075 24/09/1962 RS Thornaby 26/11/1999 37.17 Prs Preserved 37.29
D6776 37076 37518 08/10/1962 RS Thornaby 01/12/2000 38.17 Prs Preserved 54.52
D6777 37077 12/10/1962 RS Thornaby 30/09/2008 45.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 54.51
D6778 37078 29/10/1962 RS Thornaby 31/01/2004 41.25 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 26/02/2004 41.36
D6779 37079 37079 06/11/1962 RS Hull Dairycoates 30/06/2008 45.58 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 31/08/2008 45.85
D6780 37080 14/11/1962 RS Hull Dairycoates 18/09/1996 33.83 Cut MRJ Philips (at Cardiff Canton MPD) 31/05/1997 34.57
D6781 37081 37797 22/11/1962 RS Hull Dairycoates 01/02/2003 40.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/02/2006 43.22
D6782 37082 37502 37602 29/11/1962 RS Hull Dairycoates 54.38
D6783 37083 05/12/1962 RS Hull Dairycoates 14/07/2000 37.58 Cut Raxstar (at Immingham MPD) 01/04/2000 37.35
D6784 37084 37718 12/12/1962 RS Gateshead 54.34
D6785 37085 37711 19/12/1962 RS Gateshead 01/12/1999 37 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 01/03/2006 43.23
D6786 37086 37516 28/12/1962 RS Gateshead 54.30
D6787 37087 31/12/1962 RS Gateshead 54.29
D6788 37088 37088 14/01/1963 RS Gateshead 30/09/2002 39.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 03/10/2002 39.75
D6789 37089 37708 18/01/1963 RS Gateshead 01/10/2002 39.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/2008 45.15
D6790 37090 37508 37606 28/01/1963 RS Gateshead 54.21
D6791 37091 37358 31/01/1963 RS Gateshead 01/03/1997 34.17 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/05/2007 44.28
D6792 37092 13/02/1963 RS Gateshead Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/10/2001 38.66
D6793 37093 37509 20/02/1963 RS Gateshead 01/12/2001 38.83 Cut Unknown (at Cardiff Canton MPD) 01/08/2005 42.47
D6794 37094 37716 27/02/1963 RS Gateshead 54.13
D6795 37095 08/03/1963 RS Gateshead 31/01/1999 35.83 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth) 28/02/2005 42.01
D6796 37096 30/11/1962 EE Sheffield Darnall 27/02/1991 28.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 17/09/1991 28.82
D6797 37097 07/12/1962 EE Sheffield Darnall Prs Preserved 54.36
D6798 37098 12/12/1962 EE Sheffield Darnall 01/05/2002 39.42 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Old Oak Common MPD) 27/05/2002 39.48
D6799 37099 37324 14/12/1962 EE Sheffield Darnall 17/06/1997 34.5 Prs Preserved 54.34
D6800 37100 97301 20/12/1962 EE Sheffield Darnall 54.32
D6801 37101 37345 28/12/1962 EE Sheffield Darnall 01/02/1994 31.17 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Immingham MPD) 01/08/2003 40.62
D6802 37102 37712 04/01/1963 EE Sheffield Darnall 54.28
D6803 37103 37511 37607 09/01/1963 EE Sheffield Darnall 54.27
D6804 37104 11/01/1963 EE Sheffield Darnall 14/07/2000 37.5 Cut Raxstar (at Immingham MPD) 01/04/2000 37.25
D6805 37105 37796 16/01/1963 EE Sheffield Darnall 01/10/2000 37.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/02/2009 46.08
D6806 37106 18/01/1963 EE Sheffield Darnall Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/08/2000 37.56
D6807 37107 23/01/1963 EE Sheffield Darnall 28/01/1999 36 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 31/12/1998 35.96
D6808 37108 37108 25/01/1963 EE Sheffield Darnall 01/09/1996 33.67 Prs Preserved 54.22
D6809 37109 01/02/1963 EE Sheffield Darnall 01/01/2005 41.92 Prs Preserved 54.20
D6810 37110 06/02/1963 EE Sheffield Darnall 14/07/2000 37.42 Cut Raxstar (at Immingham MPD) 01/05/2000 37.26
D6811 37111 37326 08/02/1963 EE Sheffield Darnall 18/09/1998 35.58 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 03/07/2003 40.42
D6812 37112 37510 13/02/1963 EE Sheffield Darnall 54.17
D6813 37113 15/02/1963 EE Sheffield Darnall 14/09/1995 32.58 Cut MC Metals (at Portobello Yard, Edinburgh) 31/08/1995 32.56
D6814 37114 20/02/1963 EE Sheffield Darnall 31/12/2007 44.83 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/01/2008 44.89
D6815 37115 37514 37609 22/02/1963 EE Sheffield Darnall 54.15
D6816 37116 01/03/1963 EE Sheffield Darnall 28/02/2007 43.92 Prs Preserved 54.13
D6817 37117 37521 06/03/1963 EE Sheffield Darnall 54.11
D6818 37118 37359 15/03/1963 EE Sheffield Darnall 01/11/1994 31.67 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth) 01/01/2005 41.83
D6819 37283 37895 27/03/1963 RS Cardiff Canton 54.05
D6820 37120 37887 29/03/1963 RS Cardiff Canton 01/10/1999 36.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/2008 45.04
D6821 37121 37677 08/04/1963 RS Cardiff Canton 01/12/2002 39.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/10/2008 45.52
D6822 37122 37692 10/04/1963 RS Cardiff Canton 01/12/2004 41.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/07/2009 46.26
D6823 37123 37679 25/04/1963 RS Cardiff Canton 01/12/2000 37.67 Prs Preserved 53.98
D6824 37124 37894 29/04/1963 RS Cardiff Canton 01/10/2000 37.5 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/08/2008 45.29
D6825 37125 37904 08/05/1963 RS Cardiff Canton 01/04/1996 32.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/11/2004 41.52
D6826 37126 37676 14/05/1963 RS Cardiff Canton 53.92
D6827 37127 37370 28/05/1963 RS Cardiff Canton 01/11/2000 37.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/09/2005 42.29
D6828 37128 37330 07/06/1963 RS Cardiff Canton 01/02/1997 33.67 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/11/2001 38.43
D6829 37129 37669 20/03/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 54.07
D6830 37130 37681 25/03/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 01/08/1992 29.42 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/08/1995 32.38
D6831 37131 29/03/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 30/06/2005 42.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 13/04/2007 44.07
D6832 37132 37673 03/04/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 01/12/2000 37.67 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/05/2008 45.11
D6833 37133 05/04/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 31/10/2004 41.5 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth) 30/11/2004 41.68
D6834 37134 37684 10/04/1963 EE Cardiff Canton Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 54.02
D6835 37135 37888 10/04/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 54.02
D6836 37136 37905 19/04/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 01/12/1998 35.67 Prs Preserved 53.99
D6837 37137 37312 24/04/1963 EE Landore 31/05/2006 43.08 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 31/07/2006 43.30
D6838 37138 26/04/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 19/05/1996 33.08 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Toton Training Compound) 16/07/2004 41.25
D6839 37139 03/05/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 31/10/2003 40.42 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 28/02/2004 40.85
D6840 37140 08/05/1963 EE Cardiff Canton Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/07/2001 38.18
D6841 37141 10/05/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 31/01/2005 41.67 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth) 28/02/2005 41.84
D6842 37142 17/05/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 01/05/1997 34 Prs Preserved 53.92
D6843 37143 37800 29/05/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 53.88
D6844 37144 05/06/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 31/08/2003 40.17 Cut Sims Metals (Beeston) 17/10/2003 40.39
D6845 37145 37145 06/06/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 01/01/1994 30.58 Cut Raxstar (at Immingham MPD) 01/04/2000 36.85
D6846 37146 10/06/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 28/02/2007 43.67 Prs Preserved 53.85
D6847 37147 37371 13/06/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 01/11/1999 36.42 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/06/2001 37.99
D6848 37148 37902 19/06/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 01/12/1998 35.5 Cut Sims Metals (Beeston) 01/04/2005 41.81
D6849 37149 37892 21/06/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 01/01/2000 36.58 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/01/2008 44.56
D6850 37150 37901 01/07/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 01/11/1998 35.33 Prs Preserved 53.79
D6851 37151 37667 02/07/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 53.79
D6852 37152 37152 08/07/1963 EE Landore 01/12/1999 36.42 Prs Preserved 53.77
D6853 37153 10/07/1963 EE Landore 15/01/2003 39.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/01/2003 39.51
D6854 37154 11/07/1963 EE Landore Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/07/2000 37.00
D6855 37155 37897 18/07/1963 EE Landore 01/03/2000 36.67 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/02/2008 44.57
D6856 37156 37156 25/07/1963 EE Landore 01/06/1999 35.92 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/01/2000 36.46
D6857 37157 37695 25/07/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 01/03/2004 40.67 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 01/04/2008 44.72
D6858 37158 15/08/1963 EE Landore 30/04/2008 44.67 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth) 30/04/2008 44.74
D6859 37159 37372 26/06/1963 RS Cardiff Canton 01/12/2004 41.5 Prs Preserved 53.81
D6860 37160 37373 05/07/1963 RS Cardiff Canton 01/12/1993 30.42 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 01/07/1997 34.01
D6861 37161 37899 19/07/1963 RS Landore 01/04/2002 38.75 Cut Unknown (at Vias Y Construcciones Madrid Spain) 01/07/2003 39.98
D6862 37162 23/07/1963 RS Landore 30/06/2005 41.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/12/2005 42.47
D6863 37163 37802 06/08/1963 RS Landore 01/01/2003 39.42 Cut Unknown (at Calatayud, Spain) 01/07/2003 39.93
D6864 37164 37675 22/08/1963 RS Landore Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 53.65
D6865 37165 37165 29/08/1963 RS Landore 30/06/2008 44.83 53.63
D6866 37166 37891 09/09/1963 RS Cardiff Canton Cut EMR (Attercliffe) 53.60
D6867 37167 37383 16/09/1963 RS Cardiff Canton 01/02/1999 35.42 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Crewe LNWR) 01/01/2008 44.32
D6868 37168 37890 04/10/1963 RS Cardiff Canton Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 53.53
D6869 37169 37674 23/08/1963 EE Landore 01/01/2005 41.42 Prs Preserved 53.65
D6870 37170 97302 30/08/1963 EE Landore 30/06/2005 41.83 53.63
D6871 37171 37690 37611 17/09/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 53.58
D6872 37172 37686 06/09/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 01/07/2000 36.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/2006 42.60
D6873 37173 37801 12/09/1963 EE Landore 53.59
D6874 37174 15/09/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 31/10/2007 44.08 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 30/04/2008 44.65
D6875 37175 20/09/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 31/08/2006 42.92 Prs Preserved 53.57
D6876 37176 37883 14/10/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 53.50
D6877 37177 37885 03/10/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 01/04/2002 38.5 Cut Unknown (at Vias Y Construcciones Madrid Spain) 01/07/2003 39.77
D6878 37178 97303 09/10/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 53.52
D6879 37179 37691 37612 02/10/1963 RS Cardiff Canton 53.54
D6880 37180 37886 24/10/1963 RS Landore 53.48
D6881 37181 37687 37610 21/10/1963 RS Cardiff Canton 53.48
D6882 37182 37670 28/10/1963 RS Cardiff Canton 53.47
D6883 37183 37884 07/11/1963 RS Landore 53.44
D6884 37184 14/11/1963 RS Landore 19/05/2000 36.5 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 30/09/2001 37.90
D6885 37185 28/12/1963 RS Landore 30/06/2005 41.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 21/01/2006 42.10
D6886 37186 37898 29/11/1963 RS Landore 53.38
D6887 37187 37683 31/01/1964 RS Landore 53.21
D6888 37188 16/01/1964 RS Landore 31/03/2006 42.17 Prs Preserved 53.25
D6889 37189 37672 09/01/1964 RS Cardiff Canton Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 53.27
D6890 37190 37190 21/01/1964 RS Landore 01/07/1993 29.5 Prs Preserved 53.23
D6891 37191 21/01/1964 RS Landore 09/02/2001 37.08 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 27/01/2001 37.04
D6892 37192 37694 20/02/1964 RS Landore 01/06/2004 40.33 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/01/2008 43.89
D6893 37193 37375 20/02/1964 RS Landore 01/01/2004 39.92 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 02/01/2008 43.90
D6894 37194 16/03/1964 RS Landore 53.08
D6895 37195 37689 17/03/1964 RS Landore Cut EMR (Attercliffe) 53.08
D6896 37196 06/04/1964 RS Landore 30/09/2008 44.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/05/2009 45.10
D6897 37197 15/04/1964 RS Landore 53.00
D6898 37198 05/05/1964 RS Landore 31/07/2004 40.17 40.27
D6899 37199 37376 10/10/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 01/10/2000 37 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 02/02/2006 42.35
D6900 37200 37377 15/10/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 01/12/2001 38.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/10/2009 45.99
D6901 37201 18/10/1963 EE Cardiff Canton Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/2009 45.40
D6902 37202 37331 23/10/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 01/03/1995 31.42 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Barrow Hill) 01/08/2003 39.80
D6903 37203 29/10/1963 EE Cardiff Canton Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 53.46
D6904 37204 37378 05/11/1963 EE Cardiff Canton 01/05/1996 32.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/06/1996 32.59
D6905 37205 37688 05/11/1963 EE Landore 53.44
D6906 37206 37906 08/11/1963 EE Landore 01/01/1999 35.17 Prs Preserved 53.44
D6907 37207 15/11/1963 EE Landore Prs Preserved 53.42
D6908 37208 37803 20/11/1963 EE Landore 01/10/2000 36.92 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/07/2007 43.64
D6909 37209 24/12/1963 EE Landore 07/07/2002 38.58 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Doncaster Carr MPD) 31/07/2002 38.63
D6910 37210 37693 26/11/1963 EE Landore Cut EMR (Attercliffe) 53.39
D6911 37211 02/12/1963 EE Landore 31/08/2003 39.67 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 22/07/2007 43.67
D6912 37212 06/01/1964 EE Landore 31/01/2004 40 Cut Raxstar (at Eastleigh MPD) 01/02/2004 40.10
D6913 37213 07/01/1964 EE Landore 23/04/2003 39.25 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 04/05/2003 39.35
D6914 37214 13/01/1964 EE Cardiff Canton 53.25
D6915 37215 01/01/1964 EE Landore 16/07/1993 29.5 Prs Preserved 30.50
D6916 37216 02/01/1964 EE Landore 28/02/2007 43.08 Prs Preserved 53.28
D6917 37217 97304 02/01/1964 EE Landore 53.28
D6918 37218 03/01/1964 EE Landore 53.28
D6919 37219 16/01/1964 EE Cardiff Canton 31/08/2005 41.58 Prs Preserved 53.25
D6920 37220 16/01/1964 EE Cardiff Canton 31/08/2005 41.58 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 10/09/2007 43.68
D6921 37221 17/01/1964 EE Landore 30/09/2008 44.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/05/2009 45.32
D6922 37222 24/01/1964 EE Landore 31/07/2008 44.5 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 31/08/2008 44.63
D6923 37223 03/02/1964 EE Landore 31/01/2003 38.92 Cut Sims Metals (Beeston) 01/03/2003 39.10
D6924 37224 37680 30/01/1964 EE Landore Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 53.21
D6925 37225 07/02/1964 EE Landore 28/02/2004 40 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 10/06/2004 40.37
D6926 37226 37379 14/02/1964 EE Landore 01/12/2001 37.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/01/2008 43.91
D6927 37227 19/02/1964 EE Landore 31/01/2004 39.92 Prs Preserved 40.22
D6928 37228 37696 28/02/1964 EE Landore 53.13
D6929 37229 28/02/1964 EE Landore 53.13
D6930 37230 06/03/1964 EE Landore 31/08/2005 41.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/01/2006 41.93
D6931 37231 37896 12/03/1964 EE Landore Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 53.09
D6932 37232 20/03/1964 EE Landore Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/03/2000 35.97
D6933 37233 37889 01/04/1964 EE Landore 01/06/1999 35.17 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Crewe DMD) 01/03/2007 42.94
D6934 37234 37685 10/04/1964 EE Landore 53.01
D6935 37235 20/04/1964 EE Landore 31/03/2008 43.92 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth) 30/04/2008 44.06
D6936 37236 37682 29/04/1964 EE Landore 10/2014 50.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 04/11/2016 52.55
D6937 37237 37893 13/05/1964 EE Cardiff Canton 52.92
D6938 37238 12/06/1964 EE Bristol Bath Road 30/09/2008 44.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/2009 44.75
D6939 37239 37332 21/08/1964 EE Cardiff Canton 01/12/1998 34.33 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Old Oak Common MPD) 01/06/2000 35.80
D6940 37240 27/08/1964 EE Cardiff Canton Prs Preserved 37.87
D6941 37241 03/09/1964 EE Cardiff Canton Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/09/2001 37.02
D6942 37242 10/09/1964 EE Cardiff Canton 31/01/2006 41.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 28/02/2006 41.50
D6943 37243 37697 17/09/1964 EE Cardiff Canton 01/04/1999 34.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/2006 41.48
D6944 37244 24/09/1964 EE Cardiff Canton Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/11/2000 36.13
D6945 37245 01/10/1964 EE Cardiff Canton Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/09/2000 35.94
D6946 37246 37698 08/10/1964 EE Cardiff Canton Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 52.52
D6947 37247 37671 22/10/1964 EE Cardiff Canton Cut EMR (Attercliffe) 52.48
D6948 37248 30/10/1964 EE Cardiff Canton 01/02/2009 44.33 Prs Preserved 52.46
D6949 37249 37903 09/12/1964 EE Cardiff Canton 01/12/1998 34 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Crewe DMD) 01/10/2005 40.84
D6950 37250 10/12/1964 EE Cardiff Canton 31/12/2007 43 Prs Preserved 52.35
D6951 37251 30/12/1964 EE Cardiff Canton 07/12/2001 37 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 30/09/2001 36.78
D6952 37252 07/01/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 24/03/1995 30.17 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Doncaster Carr MPD) 01/07/2002 37.50
D6953 37253 37699 05/01/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 01/08/1997 32.58 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/07/1997 32.51
D6954 37254 05/01/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 31/01/1999 34 Prs Preserved 52.27
D6955 37255 06/01/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 01/12/1999 34.92 Prs Preserved 52.27
D6956 37256 37678 08/01/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 01/12/2000 35.92 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/06/2007 42.42
D6957 37257 37668 12/01/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 52.25
D6958 37258 37384 15/01/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 01/12/1999 34.92 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 01/11/2005 40.82
D6959 37259 37259 13/01/1965 EE Tinsley 52.25
D6960 37260 15/01/1965 EE Tinsley 21/08/1989 24.58 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 04/09/1991 26.65
D6961 37261 21/01/1965 EE Tinsley 52.23
D6962 37262 22/01/1965 EE Tinsley 31/10/2003 38.75 Cut Sims Metals (Beeston) 02/02/2004 39.05
D6963 37263 27/01/1965 EE Tinsley 31/01/2004 39 Prs Preserved 39.04
D6964 37264 29/01/1965 EE Tinsley 01/12/1999 34.92 Prs Preserved 52.21
D6965 37265 37430 03/02/1965 EE Tinsley 01/03/2000 35.08 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/05/2008 43.27
D6966 37266 37422 11/02/1965 EE Tinsley 52.17
D6967 37267 37421 11/02/1965 EE Tinsley 01/04/2005 40.17 Prs Preserved 52.17
D6968 37268 37401 17/02/1965 EE Tinsley 52.16
D6969 37269 37417 26/02/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 52.13
D6970 37270 37409 04/03/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 52.12
D6971 37271 37418 18/03/1965 EE Severn Tunnel Junction 01/04/2005 40.08 Prs Preserved 52.08
D6972 37272 37431 26/03/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 01/04/1999 34.08 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/08/2000 35.38
D6973 37273 37410 05/04/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 27/09/1991 26.42 28.11
D6974 37274 37402 06/04/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 52.02
D6975 37275 09/04/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 01/01/1999 33.75 Prs Preserved 52.02
D6976 37276 37413 15/04/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 01/12/2000 35.67 Prs Preserved 52.00
D6977 37277 37415 22/04/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 51.98
D6978 37278 23/04/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 16/05/2003 38.08 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 24/05/2003 38.11
D6979 37279 37424 03/05/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 01/03/2000 34.83 Prs Preserved 51.95
D6980 37280 06/05/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 15/10/1994 29.42 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 01/04/1997 31.93
D6981 37281 37428 12/05/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 51.93
D6982 37282 37405 13/05/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 51.92
D6983 13/05/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 18/04/1966 0.92 Cut Hayes (Bridgend) 01/06/1966 1.05
D6984 37284 37381 21/05/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 01/10/1993 28.42 Cut Raxstar (at Frodingham MPD) 01/05/2000 34.97
D6985 37285 37335 27/05/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 01/08/1994 29.25 Cut Raxstar (at Immingham MPD) 01/05/2000 34.95
D6986 37286 37404 01/06/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 01/02/1999 33.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/01/2002 36.61
D6987 37287 37414 06/06/1965 EE Tinsley 01/03/2000 34.75 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/03/2009 43.76
D6988 37288 37427 14/06/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 51.84
D6989 37289 37408 17/06/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 01/08/2005 40.17 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/01/2008 42.57
D6990 37290 37411 18/06/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 51.82
D6991 37291 37419 24/06/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 51.81
D6992 37292 37425 05/07/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 51.78
D6993 37293 01/07/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 30/09/2008 43.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/02/2009 43.62
D6994 37294 08/07/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 30/09/2008 43.17 Prs Preserved 51.77
D6995 37295 37406 13/07/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 51.76
D6996 37296 37423 16/07/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 51.75
D6997 37297 37420 21/07/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 01/07/2000 35 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 01/02/2008 42.56
D6998 37298 12/08/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 30/06/2005 39.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 04/02/2006 40.51
D6999 37299 37426 20/08/1965 EE Cardiff Canton 51.65