Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 549 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 5123 Week
» 24856 Month
» 321870 Year
» 398457 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

English Electric / RSH Ltd 40 1Co-Co1


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) BR (Dept) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D200 40122 14/03/1958 EE Stratford 18/04/1988 30.08 Prs Preserved 59.09
D201 40001 03/04/1958 EE Stratford 23/07/1984 26.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1987 28.85
D202 40002 30/04/1958 EE Stratford 24/05/1984 26.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1985 26.85
D203 40003 16/05/1958 EE Stratford 12/09/1982 24.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/01/1984 25.65
D204 40004 30/05/1958 EE Stratford 02/09/1984 26.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/09/1986 28.28
D205 40005 25/06/1958 EE Stratford 24/01/1976 17.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/02/1977 18.62
D206 40006 09/07/1958 EE Hornsey 13/03/1983 24.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/08/1984 26.08
D207 40007 23/07/1958 EE Hornsey 27/02/1983 24.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/01/1984 25.46
D208 40008 27/08/1958 EE Hornsey 14/11/1982 24.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/06/1988 29.78
D209 40009 15/09/1958 EE Hornsey 07/11/1984 26.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1985 26.48
D210 40010 11/05/1959 EE Willesden 12/07/1981 22.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/07/1983 24.16
D211 40011 20/05/1959 EE Willesden 05/10/1980 21.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1980 21.47
D212 40012 97407 25/05/1959 EE Willesden 04/04/1986 26.92 Prs Preserved 57.89 AUREOL
D213 40013 01/06/1959 EE Willesden 18/10/1984 25.33 Prs Preserved 57.87 ANDANIA
D214 40014 08/06/1959 EE Willesden 08/11/1981 22.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1983 24.42 ANTONIA
D215 40015 15/06/1959 EE Willesden 13/11/1984 25.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1986 27.40 AQUITANIA
D216 40016 22/06/1959 EE Crewe North 31/05/1981 21.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1983 24.38 CAMPANIA
D217 40017 09/06/1959 EE Crewe North 01/02/1981 21.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1981 22.16 CARINTHIA
D218 40018 07/07/1959 EE Crewe North 13/09/1981 22.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/08/1983 24.08 CARMANIA
D219 40019 10/07/1959 EE Crewe North 20/12/1981 22.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/02/1984 24.58 CARONIA
D220 40020 13/07/1959 EE Crewe North 29/08/1982 23.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/07/1987 27.99 FRANCONIA
D221 40021 20/07/1959 EE Crewe North 17/07/1976 17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/05/1977 17.79 IVERNIA
D222 40022 27/07/1959 EE Crewe North 09/03/1984 24.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/10/1984 25.20 LACONIA
D223 40023 05/08/1959 EE Crewe North 31/05/1981 21.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/12/1984 25.34 LANCASTRIA
D224 40024 10/08/1959 EE Crewe North 13/06/1984 24.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/09/1985 26.08 LUCANIA
D225 40025 17/08/1959 EE Crewe North 17/10/1982 23.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/05/1985 25.72 LUSITANIA
D226 40026 21/08/1959 EE Crewe North 24/08/1980 21 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1983 24.05
D227 40027 24/08/1959 EE Longsight 24/04/1983 23.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/04/1984 24.62 PARTHIA
D228 40028 28/08/1959 EE Longsight 18/10/1984 25.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/02/1988 28.45 SAMARIA
D229 40029 31/08/1959 EE Carlisle Upperby 25/04/1984 24.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/11/1984 25.19 SAXONIA
D230 40030 07/09/1959 EE Carlisle Upperby 29/04/1983 23.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/04/1984 24.58 SCYTHIA
D231 40031 11/09/1959 EE Crewe North 31/05/1981 21.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/05/1983 23.65 SYLVANIA
D232 40032 14/09/1959 EE Crewe North 01/02/1981 21.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1983 23.56 EMPRESS OF CANADA
D233 40033 21/09/1959 EE Crewe North 03/09/1984 25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1985 25.46 EMPRESS OF ENGLAND
D234 40034 25/09/1959 EE Crewe North 06/01/1984 24.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1984 24.45 ACCRA
D235 40035 28/09/1959 EE Crewe North 13/08/1984 24.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/06/1985 25.69 APAPA
D236 40036 05/10/1959 EE Crewe North 31/01/1982 22.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1982 22.84
D237 40037 09/10/1959 EE Gateshead 16/08/1981 21.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1983 24.08
D238 40038 12/10/1959 EE Gateshead 28/12/1980 21.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1982 22.40
D239 40039 19/10/1959 EE Gateshead 24/01/1976 16.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/08/1976 16.80
D240 40040 23/10/1959 EE Gateshead 27/07/1980 20.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/11/1980 21.04
D241 40041 26/10/1959 EE Gateshead 18/01/1976 16.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/11/1978 19.03
D242 40042 02/11/1959 EE Gateshead 14/12/1980 21.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/03/1981 21.34
D243 40043 06/11/1959 EE Gateshead 31/01/1976 16.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/04/1977 17.41
D244 40044 09/11/1959 EE Gateshead 22/01/1985 25.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/02/1988 28.25
D245 40045 16/11/1959 EE Gateshead 01/08/1976 16.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/03/1977 17.30
D246 40046 20/11/1959 EE Gateshead 20/02/1983 23.25 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/06/1987 27.55
D247 40047 23/11/1959 EE Gateshead 13/11/1984 25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/01/1986 26.13
D248 40048 27/11/1959 EE Gateshead 27/10/1977 17.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/06/1980 20.53
D249 40049 30/11/1959 EE Gateshead 23/01/1983 23.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/10/1985 25.85
D250 40050 07/12/1959 EE Gateshead 08/08/1983 23.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/11/1983 23.92
D251 40051 30/12/1959 EE York (North) 29/01/1978 18.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/12/1978 18.93
D252 40052 21/12/1959 EE York (North) 17/06/1983 23.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/10/1983 23.79
D253 40053 08/01/1960 EE York (North) 18/06/1976 16.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/11/1976 16.83
D254 40054 31/12/1959 EE York (North) 31/12/1977 18 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/09/1978 18.68
D255 40055 11/01/1960 EE Derby 14/11/1982 22.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/05/1983 23.32
D256 40056 29/01/1960 EE York (North) 06/09/1984 24.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/04/1985 25.19
D257 40057 01/02/1960 EE York (North) 23/07/1984 24.42 Cut A Hampton (at Crewe Works) 01/11/1988 28.77
D258 40058 03/02/1960 EE York (North) 02/09/1984 24.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/10/1987 27.68
D259 40059 05/02/1960 EE York (North) 08/08/1977 17.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/10/1978 18.67
D260 40060 97405 19/02/1960 EE Haymarket 09/03/1987 27.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/03/1988 28.05
D261 40061 26/02/1960 EE Haymarket 12/06/1983 23.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/03/1985 25.03
D262 40062 04/03/1960 EE Haymarket 21/11/1981 21.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1983 23.26
D263 40063 07/03/1960 EE Haymarket 16/04/1984 24.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/06/1987 27.25
D264 40064 11/03/1960 EE Haymarket 11/04/1982 22.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/06/1983 23.24
D265 40065 14/03/1960 EE Haymarket 09/11/1981 21.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/02/1985 24.90
D266 40066 21/03/1960 EE Haymarket 05/04/1981 21.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1981 21.55
D267 40067 25/03/1960 EE Camden 12/07/1981 21.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/04/1982 22.03
D268 40068 28/03/1960 EE Crewe North 24/07/1983 23.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/10/1983 23.53
D269 40069 04/04/1960 EE Camden 18/09/1983 23.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/09/1984 24.43
D270 40070 11/04/1960 EE Gateshead 14/06/1981 21.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1982 21.90
D271 40071 20/04/1960 EE Gateshead 07/09/1980 20.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1981 21.46
D272 40072 25/04/1960 EE Gateshead 17/08/1977 17.33 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/06/1978 18.11
D273 40073 02/05/1960 EE Gateshead 10/06/1983 23.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/09/1984 24.35
D274 40074 09/05/1960 EE Gateshead 09/03/1984 23.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/12/1984 24.58
D275 40075 16/05/1960 EE York (North) 13/12/1981 21.58 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/02/1987 26.73
D276 40076 23/05/1960 EE York (North) 18/04/1983 22.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/11/1983 23.46
D277 40077 30/05/1960 EE York (North) 17/06/1983 23.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/04/1984 23.85
D278 40078 08/06/1960 EE Gateshead 23/08/1981 21.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1983 23.33
D279 40079 13/06/1960 EE Gateshead 21/01/1985 24.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/02/1985 24.65
D280 40080 17/06/1960 EE Gateshead 12/09/1983 23.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/08/1984 24.14
D281 40081 20/06/1960 EE York (North) 13/02/1983 22.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/09/1983 23.21
D282 40082 27/06/1960 EE York (North) 08/11/1984 24.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/01/1986 25.53
D283 40083 04/07/1960 EE York (North) 05/11/1981 21.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1985 25.18
D284 40084 11/07/1960 EE York (North) 30/05/1983 22.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/05/1984 23.82
D285 40085 18/07/1960 EE York (North) 30/03/1984 23.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/01/1985 24.47
D286 40086 25/07/1960 EE Gateshead 23/01/1985 24.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/02/1985 24.54
D287 40087 03/08/1960 EE Carlisle Upperby 16/08/1982 22 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/10/1985 25.18
D288 40088 08/08/1960 EE Crewe North 14/02/1982 21.5 Cut A Hampton (at Crewe Works) 01/11/1988 28.25
D289 40089 15/08/1960 EE Crewe North 18/07/1976 15.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/10/1978 18.14
D290 40090 22/08/1960 EE Crewe North 08/11/1983 23.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/11/1984 24.21
D291 40091 29/08/1960 EE Crewe North 02/09/1984 24.08 Cut A Hampton (at Crewe Works) 01/12/1988 28.28
D292 40092 05/09/1960 EE Crewe North 05/12/1982 22.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1986 25.50
D293 40093 12/09/1960 EE Crewe North 02/12/1983 23.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/05/1984 23.65
D294 40094 23/09/1960 EE Crewe North 03/10/1982 22.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/08/1985 24.87
D295 40095 26/09/1960 EE Crewe North 14/09/1981 21 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1983 23.03
D296 40096 03/10/1960 EE Crewe North 19/12/1983 23.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/06/1984 23.68
D297 40097 10/10/1960 EE Crewe North 24/06/1983 22.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1984 23.41
D298 40098 17/10/1960 EE Crewe North 12/04/1981 20.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1983 22.47
D299 40099 24/10/1960 EE Crewe North 22/10/1984 24 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/04/1985 24.45
D300 40100 31/10/1960 EE Crewe North 05/10/1980 20 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1981 20.60
D301 40101 04/11/1960 EE Crewe North 09/08/1982 21.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/11/1984 24.01
D302 40102 07/11/1960 EE Crewe North 24/01/1976 15.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/01/1977 16.16
D303 40103 18/11/1960 EE Crewe North 07/02/1982 21.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/04/1983 22.38
D304 40104 28/11/1960 EE Crewe North 22/01/1985 24.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/05/1988 27.44
D305 40105 06/10/1960 RS Crewe North 01/12/1980 20.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1981 20.41
D306 40106 13/10/1960 RS Crewe North 21/04/1983 22.5 Prs Preserved 56.50
D307 40107 27/10/1960 RS Crewe North 20/12/1981 21.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/09/1984 23.86
D308 40108 07/11/1960 RS Crewe North 24/08/1980 19.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1980 20.08
D309 40109 16/11/1960 RS Crewe North 01/12/1980 20.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1984 23.30
D310 40110 29/11/1960 RS Crewe North 28/12/1980 20.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1983 22.77
D311 40111 06/12/1960 RS Crewe North 03/05/1981 20.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1982 21.17
D312 40112 13/12/1960 RS Crewe North 28/12/1980 20 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1985 24.82
D313 40113 20/12/1960 RS Crewe North 18/10/1981 20.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/01/1984 23.05
D314 40114 29/12/1960 RS Crewe North 05/10/1980 19.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1982 21.60
D315 40115 13/01/1961 RS Crewe North 14/03/1982 21.17 Cut A Hampton (at Crewe Works) 01/11/1988 27.82
D316 40116 20/01/1961 RS Crewe North 01/02/1981 20.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/07/1981 20.46
D317 40117 06/02/1961 RS Crewe North 07/09/1981 20.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1983 22.75
D318 40118 97408 20/02/1961 RS Crewe North 26/02/1986 25 Prs Preserved 56.15
D319 40119 09/03/1961 RS Crewe North 14/12/1980 19.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1982 21.58
D320 40120 22/03/1961 RS Crewe North 31/05/1981 20.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1983 22.54
D321 40121 10/04/1961 RS Crewe North 13/03/1983 21.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/12/1983 22.66
D322 21/04/1961 RS Crewe North 28/10/1967 6.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/09/1967 6.37
D323 40123 19/05/1961 RS Crewe North 07/07/1980 19.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/02/1983 21.72
D324 40124 23/06/1961 RS Crewe North 06/01/1984 22.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1984 22.70
D325 40125 09/12/1960 EE Crewe North 31/05/1981 20.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1983 22.99
D326 40126 21/12/1960 EE Crewe North 15/02/1984 23.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/04/1984 23.29
D327 40127 29/12/1960 EE Crewe North 14/02/1982 21.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1983 22.77
D328 40128 11/01/1961 EE Crewe North 20/09/1982 21.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/07/1983 22.48
D329 40129 18/01/1961 EE Crewe North 24/05/1984 23.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/08/1984 23.55
D330 40130 30/01/1961 EE Crewe North 14/03/1982 21.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1983 22.26
D331 40131 06/02/1961 EE Crewe North 03/10/1983 22.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/10/1984 23.67
D332 40132 16/02/1961 EE Crewe North 07/03/1982 21.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/02/1987 25.98
D333 40133 22/02/1961 EE Crewe North 23/01/1984 22.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1984 23.04
D334 40134 08/03/1961 EE Crewe North 31/05/1981 20.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1983 22.67
D335 40135 97406 10/03/1961 EE Crewe North 16/12/1986 25.75 Prs Preserved 56.10
D336 40136 21/03/1961 EE Crewe North 09/05/1982 21.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/10/1983 22.55
D337 40137 24/03/1961 EE Crewe North 04/01/1981 19.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1981 20.70
D338 40138 29/03/1961 EE Crewe North 03/09/1982 21.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/02/1984 22.86
D339 40139 11/04/1961 EE Crewe North 14/02/1982 20.83 Cut A Hampton (at Crewe Works) 01/11/1988 27.58
D340 40140 19/04/1961 EE Crewe North 07/03/1982 20.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/08/1983 22.30
D341 40141 26/04/1961 EE Crewe North 09/10/1983 22.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/08/1984 23.28
D342 40142 05/05/1961 EE Crewe North 21/04/1980 18.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/09/1983 22.34
D343 40143 10/05/1961 EE Edge Hill 22/01/1985 23.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/09/1986 25.33
D344 40144 18/05/1961 EE Edge Hill 31/05/1981 20 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1983 22.30
D345 40145 17/05/1961 EE Neville Hill 10/06/1983 22.08 Prs Preserved 55.91
D346 40146 24/05/1961 EE Neville Hill 05/10/1980 19.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1983 22.54
D347 40147 31/05/1961 EE Neville Hill 07/09/1980 19.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1983 22.18
D348 40148 07/06/1961 EE Neville Hill 04/08/1982 21.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/07/1985 24.08
D349 40149 14/06/1961 EE York (North) 23/08/1981 20.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1986 24.90
D350 40150 21/06/1961 EE York (North) 22/01/1985 23.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/03/1987 25.71
D351 40151 28/06/1961 EE York (North) 01/02/1981 19.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1982 21.27
D352 40152 05/07/1961 EE York (North) 21/01/1985 23.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1985 23.67
D353 40153 12/07/1961 EE York (North) 12/09/1983 22.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/05/1984 22.82
D354 40154 19/07/1961 EE York (North) 10/01/1982 20.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1985 24.30
D355 40155 16/08/1961 EE York (North) 22/01/1985 23.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/01/1988 26.39
D356 40156 23/08/1961 EE York (North) 27/07/1980 18.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1980 19.29
D357 40157 30/08/1961 EE Haymarket 26/07/1983 21.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/10/1983 22.10
D358 40158 06/09/1961 EE Haymarket 19/12/1983 22.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/09/1984 23.00
D359 40159 13/09/1961 EE Haymarket 21/03/1983 21.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1984 22.40
D360 40160 20/09/1961 EE Haymarket 26/11/1984 23.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/02/1987 25.38
D361 40161 03/10/1961 EE Haymarket 29/12/1980 19.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1981 19.67
D362 40162 11/10/1961 EE Haymarket 14/12/1982 21.17 Cut J McWilliams (at Millerhill Yard) 01/04/1986 24.49
D363 40163 18/10/1961 EE Haymarket 06/06/1982 20.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/02/1987 25.31
D364 40164 25/10/1961 EE Haymarket 04/07/1983 21.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/12/1983 22.12
D365 40165 01/11/1961 EE Haymarket 06/07/1981 19.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/06/1983 21.59
D366 40166 18/11/1961 EE Haymarket 14/02/1982 20.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/05/1983 21.46
D367 40167 22/11/1961 EE Haymarket 09/02/1984 22.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/05/1984 22.45
D368 40168 01/12/1961 EE Haymarket 29/11/1984 22.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/07/1986 24.60
D369 40169 07/12/1961 EE Crewe North 02/12/1983 22 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/10/1984 22.83
D370 40170 13/12/1961 EE Crewe North 02/12/1983 22 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/10/1984 22.82
D371 40171 20/12/1961 EE Crewe North 13/12/1981 20 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1982 20.88
D372 40172 03/01/1962 EE Longsight 12/09/1983 21.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/02/1984 22.09
D373 40173 05/01/1962 EE Camden 24/08/1981 19.58 Cut James A White, Jamiestown Bay (at Inverkeithing) 01/04/1985 23.25
D374 40174 17/01/1962 EE Camden 24/05/1984 22.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/11/1984 22.81
D375 40175 31/01/1962 EE Camden 31/05/1981 19.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1983 21.02
D376 40176 05/02/1962 EE Camden 23/08/1981 19.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1985 23.84
D377 40177 09/02/1962 EE Camden 09/07/1984 22.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/04/1986 24.16
D378 40178 16/02/1962 EE Camden 21/06/1981 19.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1983 21.55
D379 40179 21/02/1962 EE Camden 01/02/1981 19 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1982 20.04
D380 40180 05/03/1962 EE Camden 01/06/1983 21.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/01/1984 21.84
D381 40181 12/03/1962 EE Camden 21/01/1985 22.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/10/1986 24.57
D382 40182 14/03/1962 EE Camden 23/06/1982 20.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/02/1984 21.90
D383 40183 21/03/1962 EE Camden 01/06/1983 21.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/06/1986 24.21
D384 40184 19/03/1962 EE Camden 21/12/1982 20.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/12/1983 21.72
D385 40185 28/03/1962 EE York (North) 08/08/1983 21.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/12/1983 21.69
D386 40186 04/04/1962 EE York (North) 21/12/1982 20.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1983 20.92
D387 40187 11/04/1962 EE York (North) 15/08/1982 20.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/06/1985 23.16
D388 40188 18/04/1962 EE York (North) 31/08/1983 21.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/07/1984 22.22
D389 40189 02/05/1962 EE York (North) 04/01/1976 13.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/04/1976 13.93
D390 40190 09/05/1962 EE York (North) 31/01/1976 13.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/04/1976 13.91
D391 40191 16/05/1962 EE York (North) 16/09/1983 21.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/07/1984 22.14
D392 40192 30/05/1962 EE Gateshead 21/01/1985 22.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1985 22.77
D393 40193 07/06/1962 EE Gateshead 24/10/1981 19.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/07/1986 24.08
D394 40194 13/06/1962 EE Gateshead 23/01/1985 22.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/02/1985 22.65
D395 40195 27/06/1962 EE Gateshead 22/06/1984 22 Cut A Hampton (at Crewe Works) 01/12/1988 26.45
D396 40196 04/07/1962 EE Gateshead 17/05/1984 21.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/01/1985 22.51
D397 40197 18/07/1962 EE Gateshead 18/09/1983 21.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/05/1984 21.80
D398 40198 15/08/1962 EE Gateshead 11/01/1983 20.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/02/1984 21.48
D399 40199 05/09/1962 EE Gateshead 13/06/1982 19.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/05/1983 20.67