Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 549 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 5123 Week
» 24856 Month
» 321870 Year
» 398457 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

42 B-B


BR (Pre Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D800 11/08/1958 SW Swindon 05/10/1968 10.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 31/07/1969 10.98 SIR BRIAN ROBERTSON
D801 07/11/1958 SW Laira 03/08/1968 9.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 24/10/1970 11.97 VANGUARD
D802 16/12/1958 SW Laira 05/10/1968 9.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/11/1970 11.96 FORMIDABLE
D803 16/03/1959 SW Laira 01/01/1972 12.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 06/10/1972 13.57 ALBION
D804 23/04/1959 SW Laira 03/10/1971 12.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 24/03/1972 12.93 AVENGER
D805 13/05/1959 SW Laira 24/10/1972 13.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 16/05/1973 14.02 BENBOW
D806 03/06/1959 SW Laira 02/11/1972 13.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1975 15.92 CAMBRIAN
D807 24/06/1959 SW Laira 26/09/1972 13.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 03/11/1972 13.37 CARADOC
D808 08/07/1959 SW Laira 03/10/1971 12.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 25/02/1972 12.64 CENTAUR
D809 19/08/1959 SW Laira 03/10/1971 12.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 06/10/1972 13.14 CHAMPION
D810 16/09/1959 SW Laira 03/12/1972 13.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 26/09/1973 14.04 COCKADE
D811 14/10/1959 SW Laira 01/01/1972 12.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 13/10/1972 13.01 DARING
D812 12/11/1959 SW Laira 03/11/1972 13 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 04/07/1973 13.65 THE ROYAL NAVAL RESERVE 1859-1959
D813 09/12/1959 SW Laira 01/01/1972 12.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/09/1972 12.82 DIADEM
D814 01/01/1960 SW Laira 07/11/1972 12.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 20/02/1974 14.15 DRAGON
D815 20/01/1960 SW Laira 03/10/1971 11.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 13/10/1972 12.74 DRUID
D816 17/02/1960 SW Laira 01/01/1972 11.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 22/09/1972 12.61 ECLIPSE
D817 09/03/1960 SW Laira 03/10/1971 11.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 10/03/1972 12.01 FOXHOUND
D818 30/03/1960 SW Laira 01/11/1972 12.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/11/1985 25.69 GLORY
D819 25/04/1960 SW Laira 01/10/1971 11.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 03/03/1972 11.86 GOLIATH
D820 04/05/1960 SW Laira 02/11/1972 12.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 15/08/1973 13.29 GRENVILLE
D821 25/05/1960 SW Laira 03/12/1972 12.58 Prs Preserved 56.89 GREYHOUND
D822 15/06/1960 SW Laira 03/10/1971 11.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 18/02/1972 11.68 HERCULES
D823 06/07/1960 SW Laira 03/10/1971 11.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 19/05/1972 11.88 HERMES
D824 27/07/1960 SW Laira 03/12/1972 12.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 18/06/1975 14.90 HIGHFLYER
D825 24/08/1960 SW Laira 23/08/1972 12 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 27/10/1972 12.18 INTREPID
D826 07/09/1960 SW Laira 18/10/1971 11.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 21/01/1972 11.38 JUPITER
D827 04/10/1960 SW Laira 01/01/1972 11.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 13/10/1972 12.03 KELLY
D828 19/10/1960 SW Laira 28/05/1971 10.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 07/04/1972 11.47 MAGNIFICENT
D829 23/11/1960 SW Laira 26/08/1972 11.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/01/1974 13.19 MAGPIE
D830 19/01/1961 SW Newton Abbot 26/03/1969 8.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 22/10/1971 10.76 MAJESTIC
D831 11/01/1961 SW Laira 03/10/1971 10.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 03/06/1972 11.40 MONARCH
D832 08/02/1961 SW Laira 16/12/1972 11.83 Prs Preserved 56.18 ONSLAUGHT
D866 24/03/1961 SW Laira 01/01/1972 10.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 13/10/1972 11.56 ZEBRA
D867 26/04/1961 SW Laira 18/10/1971 10.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/09/1972 11.44 ZENITH
D868 18/05/1961 SW Laira 03/10/1971 10.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 07/04/1972 10.90 ZEPHYR
D869 12/07/1961 SW Laira 03/10/1971 10.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 23/06/1972 10.96 ZEST
D870 25/10/1961 SW Laira 28/08/1971 9.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 12/05/1972 10.55 ZULU