Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 206 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 6262 Week
» 20839 Month
» 384084 Year
» 460671 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

43 B-B


BR (Pre Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D833 06/07/1960 NB Laira 03/10/1971 11.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 05/02/1972 11.59 PANTHER
D834 26/07/1960 NB Laira 03/10/1971 11.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 18/02/1972 11.57 PATHFINDER
D835 05/08/1960 NB Laira 03/10/1971 11.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 11/12/1971 11.36 PEGASUS
D836 13/09/1960 NB Laira 22/05/1971 10.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 10/03/1972 11.50 POWERFUL
D837 08/11/1960 NB Laira 22/05/1971 10.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 23/06/1972 11.63 RAMILLIES
D838 03/10/1960 NB Laira 27/03/1971 10.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 29/07/1972 11.83 RAPID
D839 12/11/1960 NB Laira 03/10/1971 10.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 04/08/1972 11.73 RELENTLESS
D840 03/02/1961 NB Laira 26/04/1969 8.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 26/05/1971 10.31 RESISTANCE
D841 14/12/1960 NB Laira 03/10/1971 10.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 25/02/1972 11.21 ROEBUCK
D842 20/12/1960 NB Laira 03/10/1971 10.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 17/03/1972 11.25 ROYAL OAK
D843 02/01/1961 NB Laira 22/05/1971 10.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 21/04/1972 11.31 SHARPSHOOTER
D844 16/03/1961 NB Laira 03/10/1971 10.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 26/05/1972 11.20 SPARTAN
D845 07/04/1961 NB Laira 03/10/1971 10.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 19/05/1972 11.12 SPRIGHTLY
D846 12/04/1961 NB Laira 22/05/1971 10.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 24/12/1971 10.71 STEADFAST
D847 22/04/1961 NB Laira 27/03/1971 9.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 17/03/1972 10.91 STRONGBOW
D848 27/04/1961 NB Laira 26/03/1969 7.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 26/05/1971 10.08 SULTAN
D849 29/05/1961 NB Laira 22/05/1971 10 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 07/07/1972 11.12 SUPERB
D850 08/06/1961 NB Laira 22/05/1971 9.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 03/03/1972 10.74 SWIFT
D851 10/07/1961 NB Laira 22/05/1971 9.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 09/06/1972 10.92 TEMERAIRE
D852 24/07/1961 NB Laira 03/10/1971 10.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 02/06/1972 10.87 TENACIOUS
D853 30/08/1961 NB Laira 03/10/1971 10.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 16/06/1972 10.80 THRUSTER
D854 26/09/1961 NB Laira 03/10/1971 10.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 05/05/1972 10.61 TIGER
D855 25/10/1961 NB Laira 03/10/1971 10 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 28/04/1972 10.52 TRIUMPH
D856 16/11/1961 NB Laira 22/05/1971 9.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 07/01/1972 10.15 TROJAN
D857 11/12/1961 NB Laira 03/10/1971 9.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 28/04/1972 10.39 UNDAUNTED
D858 15/12/1961 NB Laira 03/10/1971 9.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 09/06/1972 10.49 VALOROUS
D859 09/01/1962 NB Laira 27/03/1971 9.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/06/1972 10.48 VANQUISHER
D860 22/01/1962 NB Laira 27/03/1971 9.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 04/12/1971 9.87 VICTORIOUS
D861 14/02/1962 NB Laira 03/10/1971 9.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 29/07/1972 10.46 VIGILANT
D862 13/03/1962 NB Laira 03/10/1971 9.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 12/05/1972 10.17 VIKING
D863 07/04/1962 NB Laira 26/03/1969 6.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 31/07/1969 7.32 WARRIOR
D864 10/05/1962 NB Laira 27/03/1971 8.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 19/11/1971 9.53 ZAMBESI
D865 28/06/1962 NB Laira 22/05/1971 8.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 09/06/1972 9.96 ZEALOUS