Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 204 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 6260 Week
» 20837 Month
» 384082 Year
» 460669 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Derby 44 1Co-Co1


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D1 44001 15/08/1959 DE Camden 30/10/1976 17.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 02/1977 17.52 SCAFELL PIKE
D2 44002 03/10/1959 DE Camden 01/02/1979 19.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 10/1979 20.05 HELVELLYN
D3 44003 19/09/1959 DE Camden 17/07/1976 16.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 08/1976 16.92 SKIDDAW
D4 44004 26/09/1959 DE Camden 30/11/1980 21.17 Prs Preserved 57.55 GREAT GABLE
D5 44005 17/10/1959 DE Camden 30/04/1978 18.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 11/1978 19.09 CROSS FELL
D6 44006 14/11/1959 DE Camden 25/01/1977 17.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 02/1977 17.27 WHERNSIDE
D7 44007 28/11/1959 DE Camden 30/11/1980 21 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 11/1981 21.98 INGLEBOROUGH
D8 44008 15/12/1959 DE Camden 30/11/1980 20.92 Prs Preserved 57.33 PENYGHENT
D9 44009 02/01/1960 DE Camden 01/03/1979 19.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 07/1980 20.55 SNOWDON
D10 44010 20/02/1960 DE Camden 12/05/1977 17.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 07/1978 18.41 TRYFAN