Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 204 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 6260 Week
» 20837 Month
» 384082 Year
» 460669 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

46 1Co-Co1


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D138 46001 21/10/1961 DE Derby 14/12/1980 19.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/07/1982 20.71
D139 46002 03/11/1961 DE Derby 20/09/1981 19.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 22/09/1984 22.90
D140 46003 25/11/1961 DE Derby 05/10/1978 16.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/03/1980 18.28
D141 46004 17/11/1961 DE Derby 26/06/1983 21.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 23/03/1985 23.36
D142 46005 05/12/1961 DE Derby 04/12/1977 16 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/03/1978 16.25
D143 46006 01/12/1961 DE Derby 31/01/1982 20.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 24/08/1985 23.75
D144 46007 09/12/1961 DE Derby 07/02/1982 20.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 22/06/1985 23.55
D145 46008 09/12/1961 DE Derby 11/10/1981 19.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 25/12/1982 21.06
D146 46009 15/12/1961 DE Derby 01/10/1983 21.83 Cut Vic Berry (at Old Dalby (Nuclear Crash Test Site)) 01/07/1984 22.56
D147 46010 16/12/1961 DE Derby 04/11/1984 22.92 Prs Preserved 55.33
D148 46011 22/12/1961 DE Derby 25/11/1984 22.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/01/1986 24.13
D149 46012 30/12/1961 DE Derby 27/07/1980 18.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1980 18.77
D150 46013 30/12/1961 DE Derby 01/11/1981 19.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 04/05/1985 23.36
D151 46014 17/01/1962 DE Derby 06/05/1984 22.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 28/02/1986 24.13
D152 46015 01/02/1962 DE Derby 14/12/1980 18.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 19/01/1985 22.98
D153 46016 25/01/1962 DE Derby 31/12/1983 21.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 15/09/1984 22.65
D154 46017 16/02/1962 DE Derby 22/04/1984 22.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/06/1986 24.38
D155 46018 16/02/1962 DE Derby 18/12/1983 21.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 20/04/1985 23.19
D156 46019 23/02/1962 DE Derby 14/12/1980 18.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1983 21.45
D157 46020 03/03/1962 DE Derby 14/12/1980 18.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 29/12/1984 22.84
D158 46021 15/03/1962 DE Derby 16/01/1983 20.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 15/06/1985 23.27
D159 46022 23/03/1962 DE Derby 28/03/1982 20 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/10/1983 21.56
D160 46023 31/03/1962 DE Derby 01/11/1983 21.67 Cut J&S Metals (at Crewe Basford Hall) 01/03/1994 31.94
D161 46024 31/03/1962 DE Derby 16/04/1978 16.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/10/1978 16.52
D162 46025 09/04/1962 DE Derby 25/11/1984 22.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 23/11/1985 23.64
D163 46026 18/04/1962 DE Derby 25/11/1984 22.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 23/03/1985 22.95 LEICESTERSHIRE AND DERBYSHIRE YEOMANRY
D164 46027 19/04/1962 DE Derby 25/11/1984 22.58 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/12/1986 24.72
D165 46028 04/05/1962 DE Derby 27/05/1984 22 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/01/1986 23.76
D166 46029 09/05/1962 DE Gateshead 30/01/1983 20.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/09/1986 24.41
D167 46030 31/05/1962 DE Gateshead 01/11/1981 19.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 27/11/1982 20.51
D168 46031 31/05/1962 DE Gateshead 24/04/1983 20.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1983 21.18
D169 46032 07/06/1962 DE Gateshead 29/04/1984 21.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 20/07/1985 23.13
D170 46033 21/06/1962 DE Gateshead 19/06/1983 21 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 03/11/1984 22.39
D171 46034 06/07/1962 DE Gateshead 02/11/1980 18.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 13/11/1982 20.37
D172 46035 02/07/1962 DE Gateshead 01/11/1984 22.33 Prs Preserved 54.79
D173 46036 13/07/1962 DE Gateshead 02/05/1982 19.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/01/1983 20.48
D174 46037 13/07/1962 DE Gateshead 24/06/1984 21.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 03/02/1985 22.58
D175 46038 03/08/1962 DE Gateshead 28/03/1982 19.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 16/11/1985 23.30
D176 46039 14/08/1962 DE Gateshead 23/10/1983 21.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 03/08/1985 22.99
D177 46040 24/08/1962 DE Gateshead 26/10/1980 18.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/04/1982 19.62
D178 46041 14/09/1962 DE Gateshead 01/11/1981 19.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1983 20.89
D179 46042 21/09/1962 DE Gateshead 01/11/1981 19.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 18/12/1982 20.25
D180 46043 14/09/1962 DE Gateshead 09/11/1981 19.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 19/05/1984 21.69
D181 46044 22/09/1962 DE Gateshead 08/04/1984 21.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/10/1986 24.12
D182 46045 27/09/1962 DE Gateshead 01/11/1984 22.17 Prs Preserved 54.55
D183 46046 04/10/1962 DE Gateshead 06/05/1984 21.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 30/11/1985 23.17
D184 46047 15/10/1962 DE Gateshead 02/09/1984 21.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/01/1986 23.23
D185 46048 16/10/1962 DE Gateshead 13/09/1981 18.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 10/09/1983 20.92
D186 46049 09/11/1962 DE Gateshead 12/12/1982 20.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/10/1985 22.99
D187 46050 23/11/1962 DE Gateshead 26/10/1982 19.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 24/02/1985 22.27
D188 46051 17/12/1962 DE Gateshead 04/12/1983 21 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 14/04/1984 21.34
D189 46052 26/01/1963 DE Gateshead 30/09/1984 21.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/03/1986 23.19
D190 46053 26/01/1963 DE Gateshead 22/02/1981 18.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 31/07/1981 18.52
D191 46054 26/01/1963 DE Gateshead 10/01/1982 19 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1983 20.53
D192 46055 26/01/1963 DE Gateshead 31/10/1982 19.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/12/1984 21.88
D193 46056 26/01/1963 DE Gateshead 31/10/1982 19.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 09/11/1985 22.80