Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 550 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 5124 Week
» 24857 Month
» 321871 Year
» 398458 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

47 Co-Co


BR (Pre Tops) BR (1973) BR (ETH) BR (56 TB) BR (Push/Pull) BR (58 TB) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D1100 47298 01/08/1966 CW York (North) 30/04/2007 40.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 18/05/2007 40.82
D1101 47518 12/08/1966 CW York (North) 14/11/1991 25.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 13/10/1994 28.19
D1102 47519 09/09/1966 CW York (North) 30/06/2005 38.75 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 08/10/2005 39.11
D1103 47520 02/10/1966 CW York (North) 25/08/1998 31.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 15/07/1998 31.81
D1104 47521 19/10/1966 CW York (North) 21/04/1995 28.5 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/07/1995 28.72
D1105 47522 09/11/1966 CW York (North) 12/12/1998 32.08 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/07/2000 33.67
D1106 47523 25/11/1966 CW York (North) 01/06/1999 32.58 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/05/2000 33.45
D1107 47524 23/12/1966 CW York (North) Prs Preserved 50.31
D1108 47525 28/01/1967 CW York (North) 31/10/2007 40.75 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 50.21
D1109 47526 28/01/1967 CW York (North) 31/10/2007 40.75 50.21
D1110 47527 28/01/1967 CW York (North) 27/11/1992 25.83 Cut MRJ Philips (at Bristol Bath Road TMD) 01/11/1995 28.78
D1111 47528 25/02/1967 CW York (North) 29/02/2008 41 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 31/05/2008 41.29
D1500 47401 28/09/1962 BH Finsbury Park 05/06/1992 29.75 Prs Preserved 54.55
D1501 47402 13/11/1962 BH Finsbury Park 01/06/1992 29.58 Prs Preserved 54.42
D1502 47403 30/11/1962 BH Finsbury Park 28/09/1986 23.83 Cut J&S Metals (at Crewe Gresty Lane) 16/07/1993 30.65
D1503 47404 31/12/1962 BH Finsbury Park 05/06/1987 24.5 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/09/1990 27.69
D1504 47405 03/01/1963 BH Finsbury Park 02/03/1986 23.17 Cut A Hampton (at Crewe Works) 01/12/1988 25.93
D1505 47406 11/01/1963 BH Finsbury Park 13/08/1990 27.58 Cut MRJ Philips (at Frodingham Depot) 01/12/1995 32.91
D1506 47407 18/01/1963 BH Finsbury Park 13/08/1990 27.58 Cut MRJ Philips (at Frodingham Depot) 01/12/1995 32.89
D1507 47408 18/01/1963 BH Finsbury Park 20/07/1986 23.5 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/07/1989 26.47
D1508 47409 23/01/1963 BH Finsbury Park 31/08/1986 23.58 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/05/1989 26.29
D1509 47410 04/02/1963 BH Finsbury Park 05/06/1987 24.33 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/02/1990 27.01
D1510 47411 26/02/1963 BH Finsbury Park 30/06/1989 26.33 Cut Eurofriend (at Frodingham MPD) 10/12/1994 31.81
D1511 47412 28/02/1963 BH Finsbury Park 12/05/1987 24.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 13/03/1992 29.06
D1512 47413 08/03/1963 BH Finsbury Park 09/08/1991 28.42 Cut MRJ Philips (at Frodingham Depot) 01/12/1995 32.76
D1513 47414 15/03/1963 BH Finsbury Park 07/03/1986 23 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/06/1989 26.23
D1514 47415 22/03/1963 BH Finsbury Park 30/04/1987 24.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/07/1990 27.30
D1515 47416 29/03/1963 BH Finsbury Park 07/03/1986 23 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 30/05/1987 24.19
D1516 47417 10/04/1963 BH Finsbury Park 24/02/1992 28.83 Prs Preserved 54.01
D1517 47418 19/04/1963 BH Finsbury Park 04/02/1991 27.83 Cut MRJ Philips (at Frodingham Depot) 01/12/1995 32.64
D1518 47419 10/05/1963 BH Finsbury Park 11/02/1987 23.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/07/1990 27.16
D1519 47420 26/04/1963 BH Finsbury Park 05/06/1987 24.17 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/07/1989 26.20
D1520 47421 05/06/1963 BH Finsbury Park 27/09/1991 28.25 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/03/1997 33.76
D1521 47001 07/06/1963 BH Finsbury Park 25/11/1986 23.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 21/01/1994 30.65
D1522 47002 14/06/1963 BH Finsbury Park 24/06/1991 28 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 17/06/1994 31.03
D1523 47003 12/06/1963 BH Finsbury Park 05/07/1991 28.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 17/07/1992 29.12
D1524 47004 14/06/1963 BH Finsbury Park 31/08/2006 43.17 Prs Preserved 53.84
D1525 47422 14/06/1963 BH Finsbury Park 01/08/1991 28.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 11/06/1993 30.01
D1526 47005 21/06/1963 BH Finsbury Park 04/11/1991 28.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 27/05/1994 30.95
D1527 47423 03/07/1963 BH Finsbury Park 27/07/1992 29 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 01/04/1997 33.77
D1528 47006 05/07/1963 BH Finsbury Park 27/09/1991 28.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 14/05/1993 29.88
D1529 47007 05/07/1963 BH Finsbury Park 27/09/1991 28.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 11/07/1994 31.04
D1530 47008 15/07/1963 BH Finsbury Park 17/10/1989 26.25 Cut Birds (at Stratford MPD) 31/03/1993 29.73
D1531 47424 15/07/1963 BH Finsbury Park 18/01/1991 27.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 05/01/1994 30.50
D1532 47009 26/07/1963 BH Finsbury Park 01/03/1991 27.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 10/04/1992 28.73
D1533 47425 06/08/1963 BH Finsbury Park 15/12/1992 29.33 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 01/04/1997 33.68
D1534 47426 16/08/1963 BH Sheffield Darnall 15/12/1992 29.33 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 01/05/1997 33.73
D1535 47427 22/08/1963 BH Sheffield Darnall 05/02/1990 26.5 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 03/04/1992 28.64
D1536 47428 22/08/1963 BH Sheffield Darnall 25/01/1989 25.42 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/08/1990 26.96
D1537 47010 31/08/1963 BH Sheffield Darnall 11/12/1992 29.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 03/12/1994 31.28
D1538 47011 07/09/1963 BH Sheffield Darnall 03/04/1987 23.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 21/01/1994 30.39
D1539 47012 07/09/1963 BH Sheffield Darnall 15/12/1989 26.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 23/04/1992 28.65
D1540 47013 14/09/1963 BH Sheffield Darnall 25/02/1987 23.42 Cut C F Booth (at Doncaster Works) 30/09/1988 25.06
D1541 47429 27/09/1963 BH Sheffield Darnall 26/01/1987 23.33 Cut A Hampton (at Crewe Works) 01/01/1989 25.28
D1542 47430 20/09/1963 BH Sheffield Darnall 21/02/1992 28.42 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 01/05/1997 33.64
D1543 47014 27/09/1963 BH Sheffield Darnall 05/07/1991 27.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 10/04/1992 28.56
D1544 47015 05/10/1963 BH Sheffield Darnall 11/05/1987 23.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 28/01/1994 30.34
D1545 47431 05/10/1963 BH Sheffield Darnall 27/07/1992 28.75 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 01/04/1997 33.51
D1546 47016 18/10/1963 BH Sheffield Darnall 12/12/1998 35.17 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 04/04/2000 36.49
D1547 47432 24/10/1963 BH Finsbury Park 14/04/1992 28.5 Cut C F Booth (at Bristol Bath Road MPD) 18/10/1995 32.01
D1548 47433 17/10/1963 BH Sheffield Darnall 03/05/1993 29.58 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/08/1996 32.81
D1549 47434 26/10/1963 BH Sheffield Darnall 31/12/1992 29.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 11/11/1993 30.07
D1550 47435 25/01/1964 CW Sheffield Darnall 15/03/1990 26.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 22/12/1993 29.93
D1551 47529 31/01/1964 CW Sheffield Darnall 02/02/1987 23.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 30/04/1987 23.26
D1552 47436 25/01/1964 CW Sheffield Darnall 09/12/1991 27.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 12/08/1993 29.57
D1553 47437 28/01/1964 CW Sheffield Darnall 07/04/1987 23.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 09/07/1989 25.46
D1554 47438 28/01/1964 CW Sheffield Darnall 08/05/1992 28.33 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 29/08/1997 33.61
D1555 47439 27/02/1964 CW Sheffield Darnall 06/04/1993 29.17 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/03/1997 33.03
D1556 47440 08/02/1964 CW Sheffield Darnall 23/07/1991 27.42 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 01/04/1997 33.17
D1557 47441 29/02/1964 CW Sheffield Darnall 15/12/1992 28.83 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 29/08/1997 33.52
D1558 47442 26/02/1964 CW Sheffield Darnall 12/03/1993 29.08 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/04/1997 33.12
D1559 47443 14/03/1964 CW Sheffield Darnall 01/10/1993 29.58 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 30/11/1996 32.74
D1560 47444 11/03/1964 CW Sheffield Darnall 05/11/1990 26.67 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/07/1995 31.33
D1561 47445 05/03/1964 CW Sheffield Darnall 24/06/1991 27.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 18/03/1994 30.05
D1562 14/03/1964 CW Sheffield Darnall 20/06/1971 7.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/09/1971 7.47
D1563 47446 04/04/1964 CW Tinsley 24/02/1992 27.83 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 01/05/1997 33.10
D1564 47447 14/03/1964 CW Sheffield Darnall 01/03/1991 27 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 18/03/1994 30.03
D1565 47448 23/03/1964 CW Sheffield Darnall 17/05/1991 27.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 14/03/1996 32.00
D1566 47449 23/03/1964 CW Sheffield Darnall 14/05/1993 29.17 Prs Preserved 29.69
D1567 47450 28/03/1964 CW Sheffield Darnall 03/05/1991 27.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 28/05/1993 29.19
D1568 47451 28/03/1964 CW Sheffield Darnall 24/06/1991 27.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 04/02/1994 29.88
D1569 47452 31/03/1964 CW Sheffield Darnall 16/08/1991 27.42 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 01/04/1997 33.02
D1570 47017 31/03/1964 CW Holbeck (MR) 01/03/1991 27 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 06/03/1992 27.95
D1571 47453 04/04/1964 CW Holbeck (MR) 15/12/1992 28.67 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 01/04/1997 33.01
D1572 47018 13/04/1964 CW Holbeck (MR) 22/11/1991 27.58 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 04/03/1994 29.91
D1573 47019 11/04/1964 CW Holbeck (MR) Cut MRJ Philips (at Eastleigh Works) 01/03/1997 32.91
D1574 47454 25/04/1964 CW Gateshead 01/03/1991 26.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 25/02/1994 29.86
D1575 47455 20/04/1964 CW Gateshead 15/03/1990 25.92 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/06/1995 31.13
D1576 47456 25/04/1964 CW Gateshead 21/10/1991 27.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 21/05/1993 29.09
D1577 47457 25/04/1964 CW Gateshead 21/02/1992 27.83 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 01/05/1997 33.04
D1578 47458 02/05/1964 CW Gateshead 27/05/1993 29 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 19/03/1996 31.90
D1579 47459 01/05/1964 CW Gateshead 25/03/1992 27.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 07/05/1993 29.04
D1580 47460 08/05/1964 CW Gateshead 07/02/1992 27.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 27/05/1994 30.07
D1581 47461 16/05/1964 CW Gateshead 28/03/1991 26.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 17/12/1993 29.61
D1582 47462 16/05/1964 CW Gateshead 31/01/1999 34.67 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Toton Training Compound) 01/03/2003 38.82
D1583 47020 47556 23/05/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 01/05/2002 38 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Crewe Works) 01/10/2004 40.39
D1584 47021 47531 16/05/1964 CW Landore 01/07/2001 37.17 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Crewe DMD) 01/04/2006 41.90
D1585 47022 47542 16/05/1964 CW Landore 03/04/1989 24.92 Cut Birds (at Stratford MPD) 31/03/1994 29.89
D1586 47463 25/05/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 21/04/1995 30.92 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 02/12/1996 32.55
D1587 47464 27/05/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 02/10/1986 22.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/11/1987 23.45
D1588 47023 47543 29/05/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 25/08/1998 34.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 23/04/1998 33.92
D1589 47465 29/05/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 22/11/1991 27.5 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 01/04/1997 32.86
D1590 47466 30/05/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 01/08/1991 27.25 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/03/1997 32.78
D1591 47024 47557 05/06/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 01/04/2002 37.83 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/05/2007 42.93
D1592 47025 47544 06/06/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 05/02/1990 25.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 02/07/1991 27.09
D1593 47467 09/06/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 12/12/1998 34.5 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/04/2000 35.84
D1594 47468 16/06/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 01/08/1995 31.17 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 01/05/2002 37.90
D1595 47469 16/06/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 19/03/1989 24.75 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 16/11/1989 25.44
D1596 47470 22/06/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 11/11/1991 27.42 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/06/1995 30.96
D1597 47026 47597 22/06/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 01/01/2003 38.58 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/05/2008 43.89
D1598 47471 29/06/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 31/12/2004 40.5 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 05/02/2005 40.63
D1599 47027 47558 29/06/1964 CW Landore 01/03/2002 37.75 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/05/2007 42.87
D1600 47472 30/06/1964 CW Landore 19/04/1991 26.83 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 01/05/1997 32.86
D1601 47473 06/07/1964 CW Landore 01/06/1998 33.92 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 31/03/1998 33.76
D1602 47474 07/07/1964 CW Landore 30/06/2005 40.92 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/11/2005 41.35
D1603 47475 17/07/1964 CW Landore 31/01/2003 38.5 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 31/03/2008 43.73
D1604 47476 20/07/1964 CW Landore 28/02/2004 39.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/05/2004 39.81
D1605 47028 47559 29/07/1964 CW Landore 01/01/2003 38.5 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 01/01/2008 43.45
D1606 47029 29/07/1964 CW Landore 01/02/2004 39.58 Prs Preserved 52.71
D1607 47477 31/07/1964 CW Landore 28/10/1992 28.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 23/07/1993 29.00
D1608 47478 31/07/1964 CW Landore 31/12/2005 41.42 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 30/04/2006 41.78
D1609 47030 47618 11/08/1964 CW Landore 01/04/2003 38.67 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/08/2007 43.00
D1610 47031 47560 13/08/1964 CW Landore 52.67
D1611 47032 18/08/1964 CW Landore 52.65
D1612 47479 21/08/1964 CW Landore 11/12/1992 28.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 06/08/1993 28.98
D1613 47033 25/08/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 31/12/2007 43.33 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 31/03/2008 43.63
D1614 47034 47561 25/08/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 01/08/1996 32 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/03/1997 32.54
D1615 47035 47594 29/08/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 52.62
D1616 47480 29/08/1964 CW Toton 01/03/1998 33.58 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 01/11/2001 37.20
D1617 47036 47562 04/09/1964 CW Toton 52.61
D1618 47037 47563 05/09/1964 CW Toton 52.61
D1619 47038 47564 12/09/1964 CW Toton 01/11/2003 39.17 Prs Preserved 52.59
D1620 47039 47565 17/09/1964 CW Toton 01/01/2000 35.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/02/2004 39.40
D1621 47040 19/09/1964 CW Toton 01/03/2000 35.5 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Toton Training Compound) 02/07/2004 39.81
D1622 47041 26/09/1964 CW Toton 01/03/2001 36.5 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 01/08/2005 40.87
D1623 47042 47586 02/10/1964 CW Toton 01/10/1994 30 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1998 33.52
D1624 47043 47566 04/10/1964 CW Toton 01/11/1996 32.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/2006 41.43
D1625 47044 47567 03/10/1964 CW Toton 01/02/2003 38.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/06/2006 41.69
D1626 47045 47568 10/10/1964 CW Toton 01/10/2002 38 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/04/2007 42.50
D1627 47481 10/10/1964 CW Toton 30/04/2003 38.5 Cut Sims Metals (Beeston) 31/07/2003 38.83
D1628 47046 47601 47901 17/10/1964 CW Toton 01/02/1990 25.33 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 01/02/1992 27.31
D1629 47047 47569 17/10/1964 CW Toton 52.49
D1630 47048 47570 23/10/1964 CW Toton 01/12/2001 37.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/05/2002 37.55
D1631 47049 31/10/1964 CW Crewe North 21/01/2000 35.25 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 31/01/2000 35.27
D1632 47050 07/11/1964 CW Crewe North 11/11/1994 30 Cut C F Booth (at Tinsley MPD) 19/04/1996 31.47
D1633 47051 14/11/1964 CW Crewe North 12/12/1998 34.08 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/05/2000 35.48
D1634 47052 10/11/1964 CW Crewe North 30/04/2003 38.42 Cut R Garrett (at Crewe Basford Hall) 25/05/2003 38.56
D1635 47053 21/11/1964 CW Crewe North 28/02/2007 42.25 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 31/03/2007 42.38
D1636 47482 10/12/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 20/10/1993 28.83 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/06/1995 30.49
D1637 47483 07/12/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 11/06/1993 28.5 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/07/1996 31.59
D1638 47054 08/12/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 17/07/1992 27.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 19/11/1993 28.97
D1639 47055 14/12/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 52.33
D1640 47056 16/12/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 01/06/2002 37.5 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 01/10/2007 42.82
D1641 47057 47532 17/12/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 01/11/1996 31.92 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/02/2001 36.15
D1642 47058 47547 19/12/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 01/03/1996 31.25 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 01/03/2005 40.22
D1643 47059 19/12/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 01/03/2000 35.25 Prs Preserved 52.32
D1644 47060 23/12/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 52.31
D1645 47061 24/12/1964 CW Cardiff Canton 52.30
D1646 47062 47545 31/12/1964 CW Cardiff Canton Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 52.28
D1647 47063 02/01/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 22/09/1995 30.67 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 04/12/1996 31.94
D1648 47064 22/01/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 52.22
D1649 47065 47535 02/01/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 01/02/1999 34.08 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Old Oak Common MPD) 01/04/2004 39.27
D1650 47066 09/01/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 52.26
D1651 47067 47533 09/01/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 01/06/1991 26.42 Cut Eurofriend (at Old Oak Common MPD) 01/02/1995 30.08
D1652 47068 16/01/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 52.24
D1653 47069 16/01/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 52.24
D1654 47070 47620 23/01/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 52.22
D1655 47071 47536 30/01/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 01/11/1996 31.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/10/2005 40.70
D1656 47072 47609 01/02/1965 CW Landore 01/02/2004 39 Prs Preserved 52.20
D1657 47073 47537 01/02/1965 CW Landore 52.20
D1658 47074 12/02/1965 CW Landore 01/03/1991 26.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/1993 28.07
D1659 47075 06/02/1965 CW Landore 01/02/1990 25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 01/04/1992 27.17
D1660 47076 47625 13/02/1965 CW Landore 52.16 CITY OF TRURO
D1661 47077 47613 13/02/1965 CW Landore 01/05/2007 42.25 Prs Preserved 52.16 NORTH STAR
D1662 47484 20/02/1965 CW Landore 01/06/1998 33.33 Prs Preserved 52.15 ISAMBARD KINGDOM BRUNEL
D1663 47078 47628 20/02/1965 CW Landore 01/05/1997 32.25 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 01/03/2006 41.05 SIR DANIEL GOOCH
D1664 47079 27/02/1965 CW Landore 52.13 GEORGE JACKSON CHURCHWARD
D1665 47080 47612 05/03/1965 CW Landore 01/08/1999 34.42 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 01/03/2006 41.02 TITAN
D1666 47081 47606 05/03/1965 CW Landore 01/02/2004 38.92 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 01/03/2006 41.02 ODIN
D1667 47082 47626 06/03/1965 CW Landore 01/06/2004 39.25 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/05/2008 43.18 ATLAS
D1668 47083 13/03/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 01/11/1990 25.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 01/06/1994 29.24 ORION
D1669 47084 47538 20/03/1965 CW Landore 01/09/1990 25.5 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/03/1997 31.97 PYTHON
D1670 47085 20/03/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 18/02/2000 34.92 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/09/1999 34.47 MAMMOTH
D1671 27/03/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 18/04/1966 1.08 Cut Hayes (Bridgend) 01/06/1966 1.18 THOR
D1672 47086 27/03/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 01/07/2003 38.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/07/2009 44.29 COLOSSUS
D1673 47087 47624 03/04/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 01/11/1998 33.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/09/2006 41.44 CYCLOPS
D1674 47088 05/04/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 01/09/2003 38.42 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/04/2007 42.02 SAMSON
D1675 47089 10/04/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 21/06/1987 22.17 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 01/03/1989 23.91 AMAZON
D1676 47090 47623 16/04/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 51.99 VULCAN
D1677 47091 24/04/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 51.97 THOR
D1678 47092 47534 24/04/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 01/06/1991 26.17 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/06/1995 30.12
D1679 47093 01/05/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 05/01/1988 22.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 22/10/1990 25.49
D1680 47094 11/05/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 24/02/1992 26.75 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 05/12/1994 29.59
D1681 47095 08/05/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 30/11/2004 39.5 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth) 31/12/2004 39.68
D1682 47096 31/10/1963 BH Old Oak Common 22/09/1995 31.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/01/2000 36.19
D1683 47485. 31/10/1963 BH Old Oak Common 06/10/1993 30 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/03/1997 33.36
D1684 47097 11/11/1963 BH Old Oak Common 04/04/1990 26.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 10/04/1992 28.43
D1685 47098 08/11/1963 BH Oxley 22/06/1991 27.58 Cut Gwent Demolition (at Cardiff Canton MPD) 11/09/1993 29.86
D1686 47099 08/11/1963 BH Oxley 12/11/1991 28 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1994 30.42
D1687 47100 16/11/1963 BH Oxley 17/07/1991 27.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 18/02/1994 30.28
D1688 47101 21/11/1963 BH Oxley 13/03/1989 25.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 14/01/1994 30.17
D1689 47486 21/11/1963 BH Bristol Bath Road 06/07/1987 23.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/06/1989 25.55
D1690 47102 29/11/1963 BH Cardiff Canton 22/09/1995 31.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 04/08/1998 34.70
D1691 47103 29/11/1963 BH Cardiff Canton 14/07/1987 23.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/07/1989 25.61
D1692 47104 30/11/1963 BH Bristol Bath Road 10/06/1988 24.58 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 22/10/1990 26.91
D1693 47105 06/12/1963 BH Bristol Bath Road 13/12/1993 30 Prs Preserved 53.36
D1694 47106 11/12/1963 BH Old Oak Common 29/02/1988 24.17 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/06/1989 25.49
D1695 47107 11/12/1963 BH Oxley 22/06/1991 27.5 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 04/03/1994 30.25
D1696 47108 12/12/1963 BH Derby 17/03/1994 30.25 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 01/05/1997 33.41
D1697 47109 21/12/1963 BH Cardiff Canton 10/08/1987 23.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 16/11/1989 25.92
D1698 47110 13/01/1964 BH Old Oak Common 02/05/1989 25.33 Cut Gwent Demolition (at Eastleigh Yard) 24/09/1993 29.72
D1699 47111 28/12/1963 BH Old Oak Common 28/02/1986 22.17 Cut British Rail (at Cardiff Canton MPD) 31/03/1987 23.27
D1700 47112 13/01/1964 BH Old Oak Common 22/11/1991 27.83 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 01/05/1997 33.32
D1701 47113 11/01/1964 BH Old Oak Common 19/01/1988 24 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/09/1990 26.66
D1702 47114 04/11/1965 BH Tinsley 30/09/2004 38.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 14/03/2005 39.38
D1703 47115 17/09/1965 BH Tinsley 09/04/1991 25.58 Cut MRJ Philips (at Frodingham Depot) 01/12/1995 30.22
D1704 47116 21/07/1966 BH Tinsley 27/07/1990 24 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 17/06/1994 27.93
D1705 47117 04/11/1965 BH Tinsley 17/07/1991 25.67 Prs Preserved 51.44
D1706 47118 31/12/1965 BH Tinsley 01/03/1991 25.25 Cut MRJ Philips (at Doncaster MPD) 01/04/1995 29.27
D1707 47487 11/01/1964 BH Old Oak Common 07/12/1988 24.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 13/06/1989 25.44
D1708 47119 18/01/1964 BH Old Oak Common 15/05/1992 28.33 Cut MRJ Philips (at Frodingham Depot) 01/12/1995 31.89
D1709 47120 17/01/1964 BH Oxley 01/03/1991 27.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1994 30.22
D1710 47121 20/01/1964 BH Old Oak Common 24/09/1996 32.67 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 01/04/1997 33.22
D1711 47122 20/01/1964 BH Old Oak Common 03/09/1987 23.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 06/10/1989 25.73
D1712 47123 28/01/1964 BH Oxley 07/07/1991 27.5 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 13/05/1994 30.31
D1713 47488 28/01/1964 BH Oxley 30/06/2008 44.42 53.21
D1714 47124 01/02/1964 BH Old Oak Common 05/06/1989 25.33 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 24/10/1990 26.75
D1715 47125 47548 08/02/1964 BH Old Oak Common Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 22/05/2002 38.31
D1716 47489 18/02/1964 BH Oxley 31/10/2007 43.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 53.15
D1717 47126 47555 28/02/1964 BH Old Oak Common 01/01/1999 34.92 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/10/1999 35.61
D1718 47127 47539 18/02/1964 BH Cardiff Canton 01/09/1996 32.58 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 02/02/2002 37.98
D1719 47128 25/02/1964 BH Cardiff Canton 53.13
D1720 47129 06/03/1964 BH Bristol Bath Road 53.11
D1721 47130 06/03/1964 BH Landore 04/03/1988 24 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 24/10/1990 26.65
D1722 47131 13/03/1964 BH Bristol Bath Road 23/02/1987 22.92 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 30/06/1988 24.32
D1723 47132 47540 17/03/1964 BH Bristol Bath Road 01/05/1998 34.17 Prs Preserved 53.08
D1724 47133 47549 17/03/1964 BH Bristol Bath Road 01/08/1991 27.42 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/07/1995 31.31
D1725 47490 24/03/1964 BH Bristol Bath Road 01/07/2000 36.33 Prs Preserved 53.06
D1726 47134 47622 24/03/1964 BH Cardiff Canton 53.06
D1727 47135 09/04/1964 BH Old Oak Common 01/02/2004 39.83 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 01/12/2007 43.67
D1728 47136 47621 21/04/1964 BH Cardiff Canton 52.98
D1729 47137 09/04/1964 BH Landore 03/08/1987 23.33 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 23/03/1992 27.97
D1730 47138 47607 28/04/1964 BH Cardiff Canton 52.96
D1731 47139 47550 16/06/1964 BH Cardiff Canton Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 52.83
D1732 47140 28/04/1964 BH Cardiff Canton 29/02/1988 23.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/07/1989 25.19
D1733 47141 47614 12/06/1964 BH Old Oak Common 52.84
D1734 23/05/1964 BH Bristol Bath Road 19/03/1965 0.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/04/1965 0.86
D1735 47142 23/05/1964 BH Landore 28/04/1998 33.92 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester (Marlowe Road)) 01/09/1999 35.30
D1736 47143 22/04/1964 BH Cardiff Canton 01/12/1989 25.67 Cut D Higgs (at Doncaster MPD) 01/06/1994 30.13
D1737 47144 25/05/1964 BH Cardiff Canton 25/08/1998 34.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 29/07/1998 34.20
D1738 47145 28/05/1964 BH Cardiff Canton 01/02/2007 42.75 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/08/2009 45.21
D1739 47146 04/06/1964 BH Neath (Court Sart) 30/06/2005 41 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 23/06/2006 42.08
D1740 47147 12/06/1964 BH Old Oak Common 28/04/1998 33.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester (Marlowe Road)) 01/03/1999 34.74
D1741 47148 09/06/1964 BH Cardiff Canton 22/07/1987 23.08 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 06/10/1989 25.34
D1742 47149 47617 29/05/1964 BH Cardiff Canton 01/01/1998 33.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/02/1998 33.70
D1743 47150 19/06/1964 BH Old Oak Common 31/07/2008 44.08 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 52.82
D1744 47151 19/06/1964 BH Cardiff Canton 01/10/1995 31.33 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/07/1997 33.05
D1745 47152 01/07/1964 BH Old Oak Common 31/07/2003 39 Cut Southampton Steel (at Southampton Maritime) 18/08/2003 39.16
D1746 47153 47551 03/07/1964 BH Old Oak Common 01/06/2002 37.92 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Crewe DMD) 01/03/2006 41.69
D1747 47154 47546 03/07/1964 BH Old Oak Common 01/06/1999 34.92 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/04/2000 35.77
D1748 47155 01/07/1964 BH Old Oak Common 52.79
D1749 47156 10/07/1964 BH Bristol Bath Road 31/01/2005 40.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 03/03/2005 40.67
D1750 47157 07/07/1964 BH Bristol Bath Road 30/09/2004 40.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 14/12/2004 40.47
D1751 47158 14/07/1964 BH Landore 01/03/2001 36.67 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 01/10/2004 40.24
D1752 47159 21/07/1964 BH Landore 17/05/1988 23.83 Cut Gwent Demolition (at Eastleigh Yard) 24/09/1993 29.20
D1753 47491 21/07/1964 BH Oxley 52.73
D1754 47160 47605 19/08/1964 BH Landore 01/12/2003 39.33 Prs Preserved 52.65
D1755 47161 47541 14/08/1964 BH Landore 01/02/2004 39.5 Prs Preserved 52.67
D1756 47162 04/09/1964 BH Landore 14/01/1987 22.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 31/05/1987 22.75
D1757 47163 47610 17/09/1964 BH Cardiff Canton 52.57
D1758 47164 47571 23/05/1964 BH Tinsley 52.89
D1759 47165 47590 25/08/1964 BH Tinsley 52.64
D1760 47492 08/09/1964 BH Tinsley 01/02/1999 34.42 Prs Preserved 52.60
D1761 47166 47611 01/09/1964 BH Tinsley 01/11/1991 27.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/07/1993 28.85
D1762 47167 47580 01/09/1964 BH Tinsley 01/04/2004 39.58 Prs Preserved 52.62
D1763 47168 47572 12/09/1964 BH Tinsley 01/06/1999 34.75 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/08/1999 34.91
D1764 47169 47581 08/09/1964 BH Tinsley 01/11/2000 36.17 Cut Sandbach Car and Commercial Dismantlers (at Motherwell MPD) 01/09/2003 39.01 GREAT EASTERN
D1765 47170 47582 05/10/1964 BH Tinsley 01/02/2004 39.33 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/05/2008 43.60
D1766 47171 47592 22/09/1964 BH Tinsley 01/12/2000 36.25 Cut S Norton (Liverpool) 01/03/2003 38.46
D1767 47172 47583 29/10/1964 BH Tinsley 01/02/2004 39.33 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/05/2008 43.53
D1768 47173 47573 30/10/1964 BH Tinsley 01/05/2001 36.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/10/2005 40.95
D1769 47174 47574 22/10/1964 BH Tinsley 01/12/1996 32.17 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 01/06/2005 40.64
D1770 47175 47575 05/10/1964 BH Tinsley Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 52.52
D1771 47176 47576 14/10/1964 BH Tinsley 01/11/1996 32.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/11/2005 41.08
D1772 47177 47599 05/10/1964 BH Tinsley 01/08/1995 30.83 Cut British Rail (at Skelton Junction Sidings) 01/10/1995 31.01
D1773 47178 47588 15/09/1965 BH Research Department (Toton) 01/02/2004 38.42 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/08/2008 42.91
D1774 47179 47577 19/10/1964 BH Tinsley 52.48
D1775 47180 47584 23/10/1964 BH Tinsley 01/03/2000 35.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/10/2002 37.96
D1776 47181 47578 22/10/1964 BH Tinsley 52.48
D1777 47182 47598 06/11/1964 BH Tinsley 01/11/2001 37 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/05/2007 42.51
D1778 47183 47579 23/10/1964 BH Tinsley 01/02/2004 39.33 Prs Preserved 52.47
D1779 47184 47585 29/10/1964 BH Tinsley 01/02/2004 39.33 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/03/2006 41.36
D1780 47185 47602 30/10/1964 BH Tinsley 01/09/2003 38.92 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/04/2007 42.45
D1781 47186 07/11/1964 BH Tinsley 28/02/2007 42.25 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 31/12/2007 43.18
D1782 47301 14/11/1964 BH Tinsley 31/01/2003 38.17 Cut R Garrett (at Crewe Basford Hall) 01/02/2003 38.24
D1783 47302 14/11/1964 BH Tinsley 28/02/2007 42.25 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 31/08/2007 42.82
D1784 47303 07/11/1964 BH Tinsley 28/02/2007 42.25 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 31/12/2007 43.18
D1785 47304 09/12/1964 BH Tinsley 16/06/2000 35.5 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 25/05/2000 35.48
D1786 47305 26/11/1964 BH Tinsley 31/01/2003 38.17 Cut R Garrett (at Crewe Basford Hall) 01/03/2003 38.28
D1787 47306 26/11/1964 BH Tinsley 31/05/2006 41.5 Prs Preserved 52.38
D1788 47307 09/12/1964 BH Tinsley 28/02/2007 42.17 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 31/05/2008 43.50
D1789 47308 27/11/1964 BH Tinsley 31/01/2004 39.17 Cut Sims Metals (Beeston) 18/03/2004 39.33
D1790 47309 10/12/1964 BH Tinsley 28/02/2007 42.17 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/02/2009 44.18
D1791 47310 10/12/1964 BH Tinsley 28/02/2004 39.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 30/04/2004 39.41
D1792 47311 14/01/1965 BH Tinsley 22/11/1991 26.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 21/05/1993 28.37
D1793 47312 11/12/1964 BH Tinsley 28/02/2003 38.17 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 29/03/2003 38.32
D1794 47313 11/12/1964 BH Tinsley 28/02/2007 42.17 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 15/11/2007 42.96
D1795 47314 08/01/1965 BH Tinsley 28/02/2007 42.08 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 30/04/2008 43.34
D1796 47315 08/01/1965 BH Tinsley Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/05/2000 35.33
D1797 47316 06/01/1965 BH Tinsley 31/12/2007 42.92 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 30/04/2008 43.34
D1798 47317 29/01/1965 BH Tinsley 52.21
D1799 47318 21/01/1965 BH Tinsley 30/07/1993 28.5 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 31/07/2004 39.55
D1800 47319 14/01/1965 BH Tinsley 14/07/2000 35.5 Cut Raxstar (at Immingham MPD) 01/05/2000 35.32
D1801 47320 14/01/1965 BH Tinsley 10/08/1993 28.58 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 04/12/1996 31.91
D1802 47321 22/01/1965 BH Tinsley 22/09/1995 30.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 06/07/1998 33.47
D1803 47322 21/01/1965 BH Tinsley 52.23
D1804 47323 16/02/1965 BH Tinsley 30/06/2003 38.33 Cut R Garrett (at Crewe Basford Hall) 31/07/2003 38.48
D1805 47324 21/01/1965 BH Tinsley 17/07/1992 27.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 07/01/1994 28.98
D1806 47325 26/01/1965 BH Tinsley 07/03/1996 31.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 21/05/1998 33.34
D1807 47326 25/01/1965 BH Nottingham Division 31/08/2006 41.58 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/10/2006 41.71
D1808 47327 30/01/1965 BH Nottingham Division 19/02/1993 28.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 12/11/1993 28.80
D1809 47328 27/01/1965 BH Nottingham Division 30/06/2005 40.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 17/09/2005 40.67
D1810 47329 09/02/1965 BH Nottingham Division 52.18
D1811 47330 09/02/1965 BH Nottingham Division 52.18
D1812 47331 02/02/1965 BH Nottingham Division 31/07/2005 40.42 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 08/09/2005 40.62
D1813 47332 22/02/1965 BH Nottingham Division 52.14
D1814 47333 25/02/1965 BH Nottingham Division 21/01/2000 34.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/06/1998 33.28
D1815 47334 18/02/1965 BH Nottingham Division 30/09/2004 39.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 04/01/2005 39.90
D1816 47335 09/02/1965 BH Nottingham Division 28/02/2007 42 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 30/06/2007 42.41
D1817 47336 01/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 28/06/1993 28.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 26/11/1993 28.76
D1818 47337 18/02/1965 BH Nottingham Division 52.15
D1819 47338 12/02/1965 BH Nottingham Division 30/04/2007 42.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/07/2006 41.49
D1820 47339 17/02/1965 BH Nottingham Division 21/01/2000 34.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 12/02/2005 40.01
D1821 47340 10/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 01/06/1998 33.25 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 31/03/1998 33.08
D1822 47341 05/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Toton Training Compound) 01/02/2003 37.94
D1823 47342 05/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 25/11/1988 23.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 17/03/1992 27.05
D1824 47343 10/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 29/06/1992 27.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 10/11/1992 27.69
D1825 47344 22/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 01/07/1999 34.33 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 01/02/2002 36.89
D1826 47345 11/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 30/06/2006 41.25 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 28/02/2007 42.00
D1827 47346 18/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 28/01/1998 32.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 24/02/1998 32.96
D1828 47347 10/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 52.10
D1829 47348 05/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 30/11/2006 41.67 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 31/12/2006 41.85
D1830 47349 18/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 52.07
D1831 47350 27/04/1965 BH Nottingham Division 51.96
D1832 47351 07/04/1965 BH Nottingham Division Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/02/2001 35.85
D1833 47352 27/04/1965 BH Nottingham Division 14/07/2000 35.25 Cut Raxstar (at Frodingham MPD) 24/05/2000 35.10
D1834 47353 31/03/1965 BH Nottingham Division 30/09/2004 39.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 18/02/2005 39.92
D1835 47354 30/04/1965 BH Nottingham Division 31/03/2003 37.92 Cut R Garrett (at Crewe Basford Hall) 10/04/2003 37.97
D1836 47355 07/04/1965 BH Nottingham Division 52.02
D1837 47187 04/05/1965 BH Crewe North 51.95
D1838 47188 10/05/1965 BH Crewe North 31/08/2005 40.25 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Crewe DMD) 30/09/2005 40.42
D1839 47189 21/04/1965 BH Crewe North 16/03/1989 23.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 20/03/1992 26.93
D1840 47190 29/06/1965 BH Crewe Diesel 11/11/1994 29.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 08/04/1998 32.80
D1841 47191 27/04/1965 BH Crewe North 25/06/1987 22.17 Cut Gwent Demolition (at Thornaby MPD) 20/09/1993 28.42
D1842 47192 14/05/1965 CW Crewe North 18/05/1988 23 Prs Preserved 51.92
D1843 47193 21/05/1965 CW Crewe North 30/09/2004 39.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 04/12/2004 39.57
D1844 47194 22/05/1965 CW Crewe North 51.90
D1845 47195 26/05/1965 CW Crewe Diesel 15/11/1991 26.5 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 15/03/1994 28.82
D1846 47196 29/05/1965 CW Crewe Diesel 24/02/1994 28.75 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 28/02/1994 28.77
D1847 47197 05/06/1965 CW Crewe Diesel 28/02/2007 41.67 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 31/01/2008 42.68
D1848 47198 05/06/1965 CW Crewe Diesel 20/04/1989 23.83 Cut Coopers Metals (at Cardiff Canton MPD) 01/07/1994 29.09
D1849 47199 12/06/1965 CW Crewe Diesel 20/07/1987 22.08 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 07/12/1993 28.51
D1850 47200 19/06/1965 CW Crewe Diesel 31/12/2007 42.5 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 31/05/2008 42.98
D1851 47201 12/06/1965 CW Crewe Diesel 28/02/2007 41.67 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 27/07/2007 42.15
D1852 47202 25/07/1965 CW Crewe Diesel 25/03/1987 21.67 Cut Maize Metals (at Bristol Bath Road MPD) 23/09/1991 26.18
D1853 47203 26/07/1965 CW Crewe Diesel 27/03/1989 23.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/06/1990 24.87
D1854 47204 02/07/1965 CW Crewe Diesel 51.78
D1855 47205 24/08/1965 CW Crewe Diesel 30/09/2004 39.08 Prs Preserved 39.38
D1856 47206 06/08/1965 CW Crewe Diesel 51.69
D1857 47207 06/08/1965 CW Crewe Diesel 30/09/2004 39.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 22/01/2005 39.49
D1858 47208 13/08/1965 CW Crewe Diesel 27/01/1980 14.42 Cut Kennedy & Co, Ltd. (at Dundee MPD) 01/04/1980 14.64
D1859 47209 21/08/1965 CW Crewe Diesel 51.65
D1860 47210 28/08/1965 CW Crewe Diesel Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/08/2000 34.95
D1861 47211 28/08/1965 CW Crewe Diesel 31/05/2003 37.75 Cut Raxstar (at Eastleigh MPD) 31/07/2003 37.95
D1862 47212 13/05/1965 BH Tinsley 31/01/2004 38.67 Cut R Garrett (at Crewe LNWR) 28/02/2004 38.82
D1863 47213 11/06/1965 BH Tinsley 31/08/2005 40.17 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Crewe DMD) 30/09/2005 40.33
D1864 47214 11/05/1965 BH Tinsley 11/11/1994 29.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 22/07/1998 33.22
D1865 47215 28/05/1965 BH Tinsley 01/03/1991 25.83 Cut Gwent Demolition (at Cardiff Canton MPD) 14/09/1994 29.32
D1866 47216 47299 28/05/1965 BH Tinsley 01/04/1999 33.92 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/01/2000 34.62
D1867 47217 02/07/1965 BH Tinsley 30/06/2005 39.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 23/08/2005 40.17
D1868 47218 28/05/1965 BH Tinsley Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 01/02/2002 36.71
D1869 47219 17/06/1965 BH Tinsley 28/02/2007 41.67 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 31/07/2007 42.15
D1870 47220 11/06/1965 BH Tinsley 02/07/1993 28.08 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 01/04/1994 28.82
D1871 47221 18/06/1965 BH Tinsley Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 01/01/2002 36.56
D1872 47222 17/06/1965 BH Tinsley 25/08/1998 33.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 06/08/1998 33.16
D1873 47223 28/05/1965 BH Tinsley 31/01/2005 39.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 26/02/2005 39.78
D1874 47224 18/06/1965 BH Tinsley 31/10/2007 42.33 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Crewe LNWR) 31/10/2007 42.40
D1875 47356 02/07/1965 BH Immingham 01/01/2000
to 57
51.78
D1876 47357 18/06/1965 BH Tinsley 11/05/2001 35.92 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 30/04/2001 35.89
D1877 47358 11/06/1965 BH Tinsley 28/02/2007 41.67 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/03/2009 43.75
D1878 47359 11/06/1965 BH Tinsley 28/01/1998 32.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 11/03/1998 32.77
D1879 47360 07/07/1965 BH Immingham 28/02/2007 41.58 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 31/12/2007 42.51
D1880 47361 10/02/1966 BH Tinsley 31/08/2004 38.5 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 30/09/2004 38.66
D1881 47362 18/06/1965 BH Tinsley Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/12/2000 35.48
D1882 47363 02/07/1965 BH Immingham 31/10/2007 42.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 51.78
D1883 47364 09/07/1965 BH Immingham 01/12/1998 33.42 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/06/2000 34.92
D1884 47365 06/07/1965 BH Immingham Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/10/2007 42.35
D1885 47366 09/07/1965 BH Immingham 28/01/1999 33.5 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 30/04/1999 33.83
D1886 47367 26/08/1965 BH Immingham 31/12/2002 37.33 Prs Preserved 37.37
D1887 47368 17/08/1965 BH Immingham 31/10/2007 42.17 51.66
D1888 47369 30/07/1965 BH Tinsley Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/05/1998 32.78
D1889 47370 23/07/1965 BH Tinsley 01/01/2003 37.5 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/08/2009 44.05
D1890 47371 23/07/1965 BH Tinsley 51.73
D1891 47372 06/08/1965 BH Tinsley 51.69
D1892 47373 06/08/1965 BH Tinsley 05/06/1992 26.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 30/11/1994 29.34
D1893 47374 13/08/1965 BH Immingham 31/07/1992 26.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 09/09/1994 29.09
D1894 47375 03/12/1965 BH Immingham 51.36
D1895 47376 01/09/1965 BH Tinsley 31/12/2002 37.25 Prs Preserved 37.36
D1896 47377 07/09/1965 BH Tinsley 31/07/2003 37.83 Cut R Garrett (at Crewe Basford Hall) 09/09/2003 38.03
D1897 47378 02/09/1965 BH Tinsley 25/08/1998 32.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/09/1998 33.02
D1898 47379 24/08/1965 BH Immingham 14/01/2000 34.42 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 31/12/1999 34.38
D1899 47380 26/08/1965 BH Immingham 30/07/1992 26.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 18/10/1994 29.16
D1900 47381 02/09/1965 BH Immingham 05/06/1992 26.75 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 18/11/1994 29.23
D1901 47225 20/09/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 51.56
D1902 47226 06/10/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 28/02/2007 41.33 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 30/04/2008 42.59
D1903 47227 09/09/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 06/05/1993 27.67 Cut Coopers Metals (Attercliffe) 25/03/1994 28.56
D1904 47228 09/09/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 28/02/2007 41.42 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 31/07/2007 41.92
D1905 47229 23/09/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 31/12/2006 41.25 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 31/03/2007 41.55
D1906 47230 07/10/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 14/01/1987 21.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 11/03/1989 23.44
D1907 47231 17/09/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 51.57
D1908 07/10/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 12/08/1969 3.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/10/1969 3.99
D1909 47232 19/10/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 01/09/2003 37.92 Prs Preserved 51.48
D1910 47233 22/10/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 04/02/1991 25.33 Cut MRJ Philips (at Frodingham Depot) 01/12/1995 30.13
D1911 47234 26/10/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 51.47
D1912 47235 26/10/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 25/11/1988 23.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/06/1990 24.61
D1913 47236 28/10/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 31/05/2006 40.58 51.46
D1914 47237 01/11/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 51.45
D1915 47238 03/12/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 05/10/2001 35.83 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 31/12/2001 36.10
D1916 47239 18/11/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 51.40
D1917 47240 03/12/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 51.36
D1918 47241 16/11/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 30/06/2005 39.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/01/2006 40.24
D1919 47242 22/11/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 51.39
D1920 47243 30/11/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 01/03/2000 34.33 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Toton Training Compound) 01/08/2004 38.70
D1921 47244 03/12/1965 BH Cardiff Canton Prs Preserved 51.36
D1922 47245 09/12/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 51.35
D1923 47246 16/12/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 01/10/2003 37.83 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 01/05/2006 40.40
D1924 47247 20/12/1965 BH Cardiff Canton 51.32
D1925 47248 47616 22/12/1965 BH Bristol Bath Road 01/01/2004 38.08 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/05/2007 41.38
D1926 47249 01/01/1966 BH Bristol Bath Road 07/03/1996 30.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/03/1998 32.27
D1927 47250 47600 31/01/1966 BH Bristol Bath Road 51.20
D1928 47251 47589 21/01/1966 BH Bristol Bath Road 51.23
D1929 47252 47615 07/02/1966 BH Bristol Bath Road 51.18
D1930 47253 47530 12/02/1966 BH Bristol Bath Road 01/11/1996 30.75 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/01/2001 34.91
D1931 47254 21/02/1966 BH Bristol Bath Road 51.14
D1932 47493 47701 24/02/1966 BH Bristol Bath Road 01/12/2003 37.83 Prs Preserved 51.13
D1933 47255 47596 02/03/1966 BH Bristol Bath Road 01/04/1999 33.08 Prs Preserved 51.12
D1934 47256 18/03/1966 BH Bristol Bath Road 28/01/1999 32.83 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Doncaster Carr MPD) 30/09/2002 36.56
D1935 47257 18/03/1966 BH Bristol Bath Road 51.07
D1936 47494 47706 26/03/1966 BH Cardiff Canton 01/04/1995 29.08 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/08/1995 29.37
D1937 47495 47704 07/04/1966 BH Cardiff Canton 01/05/1997 31.08 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 01/12/2006 40.68
D1938 47258 27/04/1966 BH Cardiff Canton 30/09/2004 38.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 05/02/2005 38.81
D1939 47496 47710 15/04/1966 BH Western Lines (LMR) 01/06/1999 33.17 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/03/2007 40.90
D1940 47497 16/06/1966 BH Western Lines (LMR) 01/09/1996 30.25 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/03/2007 40.73
D1941 47498 47711 27/07/1966 BH Western Lines (LMR) 01/06/2000 33.92 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Toton Training Compound) 01/09/2004 38.13
D1942 47499 47709 16/06/1966 BH Western Lines (LMR) 50.83
D1943 47500 27/06/1966 BH Western Lines (LMR) 50.80
D1944 47501 29/06/1966 BH Western Lines (LMR) 50.79
D1945 47502 47715 30/06/1966 BH Nottingham Division 01/03/1997 30.75 Prs Preserved 50.79
D1946 47503 06/07/1966 BH Nottingham Division 01/03/2000 33.67 Prs Preserved 50.77
D1947 47504 47702 04/07/1966 BH Nottingham Division 01/04/2000 33.75 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Toton Training Compound) 01/01/2005 38.52
D1948 47505 47712 01/08/1966 BH Western Lines (LMR) 50.70
D1949 47506 47707 25/08/1966 BH Western Lines (LMR) Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 50.64
D1950 47259 47552 09/09/1966 BH Western Lines (LMR) 50.59
D1951 47507 47716 14/10/1966 BH Western Lines (LMR) Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 50.50
D1952 47508 27/10/1966 BH Western Lines (LMR) 14/05/1993 26.58 Cut MRJ Philips (at Bristol Bath Road TMD) 01/11/1995 29.03
D1953 47509 16/11/1966 BH Western Lines (LMR) 27/11/1992 26 Cut MRJ Philips (at Bristol Bath Road TMD) 01/11/1995 28.98
D1954 47510 47713 11/11/1966 BH Western Lines (LMR) 01/07/1988 21.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/07/1990 23.65
D1955 47511 47714 29/11/1966 BH Western Lines (LMR) 50.37
D1956 47260 47553 22/12/1966 BH Western Lines (LMR) 01/04/1995 28.33 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 01/02/2007 40.14
D1957 47261 47554 47705 28/01/1967 BH Western Lines (LMR) 50.21
D1958 47512 25/02/1967 BH Western Lines (LMR) 01/10/1991 24.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 20/05/1994 27.25
D1959 47513 25/02/1967 BH Western Lines (LMR) 28/02/2004 37 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 13/05/2004 37.24
D1960 47514 47703 11/11/1967 BH Western Lines (LMR) 49.42
D1961 47515 03/05/1968 BH Western Lines (LMR) 28/03/1991 22.83 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Crewe DMD) 31/05/2006 38.10
D1962 47262 47608 27/09/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 01/07/2000 34.83 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/10/2000 35.04
D1963 47263 47587 17/09/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 01/08/2003 37.92 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 01/11/2007 42.15
D1964 47264 47619 24/09/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 51.55
D1965 47265 47591 02/10/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 51.53
D1966 47266 02/10/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 51.53
D1967 47267 47603 16/10/1965 CW Cardiff Canton 01/04/2000 34.5 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Toton Training Compound) 01/08/2004 38.82
D1968 47516 47708 16/10/1965 CW Haymarket 01/04/1995 29.5 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/08/1995 29.81
D1969 47268 47595 22/10/1965 CW Haymarket 51.48
D1970 47269 22/10/1965 CW Haymarket 01/04/1991 25.5 Prs Preserved 51.48
D1971 47270 30/10/1965 CW Haymarket 28/02/2007 41.33 Prs Preserved 51.45
D1972 47271 47604 06/11/1965 CW Haymarket 51.44
D1973 47272 47593 10/11/1965 CW Haymarket 51.42
D1974 47273 47627 13/11/1965 CW Haymarket 01/03/2000 34.33 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/07/2000 34.65
D1975 47517 20/11/1965 CW Haymarket 01/09/2003 37.83 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 01/04/2008 42.39
D1976 47274 24/11/1965 CW Haymarket 51.39
D1977 47275 11/12/1965 CW Gateshead 07/09/1986 20.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 11/03/1989 23.26
D1978 47276 04/12/1965 CW Gateshead 13/04/2001 35.33 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 30/04/2001 35.43
D1979 47277 11/12/1965 CW Gateshead 14/07/2000 34.58 Cut Raxstar (at Immingham MPD) 01/04/2000 34.33
D1980 47278 16/12/1965 CW Gateshead 28/01/1999 33.08 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 31/12/1999 34.06
D1981 47279 18/12/1965 CW Gateshead 28/02/2007 41.17 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 31/08/2007 41.73
D1982 47280 23/12/1965 CW Gateshead 28/02/2007 41.17 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 31/12/2007 42.05
D1983 47281 30/12/1965 CW Gateshead 17/12/1998 33 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/08/2000 34.61
D1984 47282 08/01/1966 CW Gateshead 17/09/1986 20.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/08/1989 23.66
D1985 47283 17/01/1966 CW Gateshead 31/08/2004 38.58 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 30/09/2004 38.73
D1986 47284 21/01/1966 CW Gateshead 14/01/2000 34 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 30/11/1999 33.88
D1987 47285 29/01/1966 CW Gateshead 31/12/2004 38.92 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 05/02/2005 39.05
D1988 47286 26/02/1966 CW Gateshead Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/09/2000 34.54
D1989 47287 26/02/1966 CW Gateshead 30/09/2004 38.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 13/01/2005 38.91
D1990 47288 26/02/1966 CW York (North) 22/09/1995 29.58 Cut C F Booth (at Tinsley MPD) 31/05/1996 30.28
D1991 47289 02/03/1966 CW York (North) Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 51.12
D1992 47290 15/03/1966 CW York (North) 51.08
D1993 47291 26/03/1966 CW York (North) 25/08/1998 32.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 17/06/2004 38.25
D1994 47292 16/04/1966 CW York (North) 28/02/2007 40.83 Prs Preserved 50.99
D1995 47293 23/04/1966 CW York (North) 28/02/2007 40.83 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 31/07/2007 41.30
D1996 47294 01/06/1966 CW York (North) 31/10/2002 36.33 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Toton Training Compound) 01/11/2002 36.44
D1997 47295 03/06/1966 CW York (North) 31/01/2003 36.58 Prs Preserved 36.69
D1998 47296 14/06/1966 CW York (North) 31/07/2003 37.08 Cut Southampton Steel (at Southampton Maritime) 19/08/2003 37.21
D1999 47297 25/06/1966 CW York (North) 01/02/1999 32.67 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 01/05/2002 35.87