Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 115 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1401 Week
» 28875 Month
» 325889 Year
» 402476 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

04 0-6-0


BR BR (1955 Num) BR (Pre Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
11100 D2200 17/05/1952 DR Ipswich 06/04/1968 15.92 Cut A Findlay (Worsborough) 01/07/1968 16.13
11101 D2201 14/06/1952 DR Yarmouth South Town 06/04/1968 15.83 Cut A Findlay (Worsborough) 01/07/1968 16.06
11102 D2202 14/06/1952 DR March 10/02/1968 15.67 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/05/1968 15.89
11103 D2203 19/07/1952 DR March 16/12/1967 15.42 Prs Preserved 64.74
11105 D2204 14/03/1953 DR West Hartlepool 31/12/1969 16.75 Cut Duport Steels (Briton Ferry) 01/09/1979 26.48
11106 D2205 14/03/1953 DR West Hartlepool 07/1969 16.33 Prs Preserved 64.09
11107 D2206 18/04/1953 DR West Hartlepool 07/1969 16.25 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 01/12/1969 16.63
11108 D2207 14/02/1953 DR Parkeston Quay 16/12/1967 14.83 Prs Preserved 64.17
11109 D2208 14/02/1953 DR Parkeston Quay 27/07/1968 15.42 Cut National Coal Board (Silverwood) 01/08/1978 25.48
11110 D2209 14/03/1953 DR Parkeston Quay 27/07/1968 15.33 Cut National Coal Board (Kiverton) 01/10/1985 32.57
11111 D2210 25/09/1954 DR Parkeston Quay 03/05/1970 15.67 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 01/07/1970 15.78
11112 D2211 25/09/1954 DR Ipswich 19/07/1970 15.83 Cut Rees Industries (Llanelli) 01/11/1980 26.12
11113 D2212 23/10/1954 DR Parkeston Quay 14/11/1970 16.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/07/1972 17.70
11114 D2213 23/10/1954 DR Kings Cross 17/08/1968 13.83 Cut National Coal Board (Manvers Main) 01/02/1978 23.29
11115 D2214 13/11/1954 DR Parkeston Quay 13/07/1968 13.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/08/1969 14.73
11121 D2215 04/07/1955 DR Stratford 15/03/1969 13.67 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/03/1970 14.67
11122 D2216 05/07/1955 DR Stratford 09/05/1971 15.83 61.78
11123 D2217 28/07/1955 DR Stratford 07/05/1972 16.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/11/1973 18.28
11124 D2218 16/08/1955 DR Norwich Thorpe 17/08/1968 13 Cut Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) 01/08/1969 13.97
11125 D2219 17/08/1955 DR Norwich Thorpe 06/04/1968 12.67 Cut Geeson Ltd (Ripley) 01/05/1977 21.72
11126 D2220 22/08/1955 DR Norwich Thorpe 03/02/1968 12.5 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/05/1968 12.70
11127 D2221 04/09/1955 DR Stratford 13/07/1968 12.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/08/1969 13.92
11128 D2222 08/09/1955 DR Stratford 28/10/1968 13.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1969 13.57
11129 D2223 26/09/1955 DR Stratford 23/05/1971 15.67 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/11/1971 16.11
11130 D2224 30/09/1955 DR Stratford 13/04/1968 12.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/08/1968 12.85
11131 D2225 15/10/1955 DR Stratford 19/04/1969 13.5 Cut National Coal Board (Wath) 01/07/1985 29.73
11132 D2226 30/10/1955 DR Stratford 13/04/1968 12.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/08/1968 12.76
11133 D2227 20/11/1955 DR Stratford 13/04/1968 12.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/08/1968 12.71
11134 D2228 27/11/1955 DR Stratford 13/07/1968 12.67 Cut Bowaters (Sittingbourne) 01/01/1979 23.11
11135 D2229 28/11/1955 DR Stratford 31/12/1969 14.08 Prs Preserved 61.38
11149 D2230 16/01/1956 DR West Hartlepool 28/03/1968 12.17 Cut Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) 01/01/1969 12.97
11150 D2231 19/01/1956 DR West Hartlepool 07/1969 13.5 Cut Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) 01/05/1970 14.29
11151 D2232 27/02/1956 DR West Hartlepool 28/03/1968 12.08 61.13
11152 D2233 10/02/1956 DR Immingham 21/09/1968 12.58 Cut Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) 01/08/1969 13.48
11153 D2234 17/02/1956 DR Immingham 13/04/1968 12.17 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/08/1968 12.46
11154 D2235 06/03/1956 DR Immingham 06/04/1968 12.08 Cut A Findlay (Worsborough) 01/07/1968 12.33
11155 D2236 27/03/1956 DR Kings Cross 03/02/1968 11.92 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/05/1968 12.10
11156 D2237 24/04/1956 DR New England 31/10/1969 13.5 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 01/03/1970 13.86
11157 D2238 10/05/1956 DR New England 27/07/1968 12.17 Cut National Coal Board (Manvers Main) 01/11/1982 26.50
11158 D2239 18/05/1956 DR New England 30/09/1971 15.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 0000
11159 D2240 03/06/1956 DR New England 20/04/1968 Birkenhead Mollington Street 11.83 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 01/10/1970 14.34
11160 D2241 15/06/1956 DR New England 23/05/1971 14.92 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/11/1976 20.39
11212 D2242 26/10/1956 DR Neville Hill 31/12/1969 13.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/08/1970 13.77
11213 D2243 26/10/1956 DR Neville Hill 07/1969 12.75 Cut Middlesbrough and Hartlepool Dock Authority (?) 01/03/1973 16.36
11214 D2244 12/11/1956 DR Neville Hill 29/06/1970 13.58 Cut A R Adams (Newport, Gwent) 01/01/1981 24.15
11215 D2245 12/11/1956 DR Neville Hill 28/12/1968 12.08 Prs Preserved 60.42
11216 D2246 06/12/1956 DR Neville Hill 08/07/1968 11.58 Prs Preserved 60.36
11217 D2247 14/12/1956 DR Percy Main 31/12/1969 13 Cut Duport Steels (Briton Ferry) 01/09/1979 22.73
11218 D2248 08/01/1957 DR Percy Main 29/06/1970 13.42 Cut Carol & Good (Rotherham) 01/04/1987 30.25
11219 D2249 17/01/1957 DR Percy Main 27/12/1970 13.92 Cut P Woods (Shipbreaking) (Queenborough) 01/09/1971 14.63
11220 D2250 10/04/1957 DR Hither Green 13/06/1968 11.17 Cut Pounds (at Fratton TMD) 01/06/1969 12.15
11221 D2251 17/04/1957 DR Hither Green 01/12/1968 11.67 Cut Pollock and Brown (Southampton) 01/09/1969 12.38
11222 D2252 17/04/1957 DR Brighton 27/10/1968 11.5 Cut Pollock and Brown (Southampton) 01/11/1969 12.55
11223 D2253 10/04/1957 DR Hither Green 28/04/1969 12 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/12/1969 12.65
11224 D2254 26/04/1957 DR Hither Green 11/06/1967 10.17 Cut British Rail (at Selhurst MPD) 01/07/1967 10.19
11225 D2255 26/04/1957 DR Hither Green 03/03/1968 10.92 Cut Pollock and Brown (Southampton) 01/08/1969 12.27
11226 D2256 20/09/1957 DR Hither Green 29/09/1968 11 Cut Pollock and Brown (Southampton) 01/08/1969 11.87
11227 D2257 28/09/1957 DR Plymouth Friary 14/01/1968 10.33 Cut Pollock and Brown (Southampton) 01/07/1968 10.76
11228 D2258 28/09/1957 DR Plymouth Friary 05/09/1970 13 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 0000
11229 D2259 28/09/1957 DR Plymouth Friary 22/12/1968 11.25 Cut Bowaters (Sittingbourne) 01/01/1978 20.27
D2260 10/12/1957 DR Bradford Hammerton Street 24/10/1970 12.83 Cut P D Fuels (Coed Bach) 01/06/1983 25.49
D2261 12/12/1957 DR Bradford Hammerton Street 15/03/1970 12.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/08/1970 12.64
D2262 21/11/1957 DR Royston 23/09/1968 10.83 Cut Ford Motors (Dagenham) 01/07/1978 20.62
D2263 21/11/1957 DR Royston 06/11/1967 10 Cut Pollock and Brown (Southampton) 01/12/1968 11.04
D2264 28/12/1957 DR Bradford Hammerton Street 31/12/1969 12 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/08/1970 12.60
D2265 28/12/1957 DR Bradford Hammerton Street 15/03/1970 12.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/09/1970 12.68
D2266 09/01/1958 DR Royston 27/11/1967 9.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1968 10.23
D2267 20/01/1958 DR Royston 31/12/1969 11.92 Prs Preserved 45.22
D2268 13/02/1958 DR Royston 10/06/1968 10.33 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 01/11/1968 10.72
D2269 13/02/1958 DR Royston 25/08/1968 10.5 Cut Pounds (at Fratton TMD) 01/06/1969 11.30
D2270 04/03/1958 DR Stourton 13/02/1968 9.92 Cut Duport Steels (Briton Ferry) 01/09/1979 21.51
D2271 14/03/1958 DR Stourton 31/12/1969 11.75 Prs Preserved 24.19
D2272 28/03/1958 DR Holbeck (MR) 24/10/1970 12.58 Prs Preserved 59.05
D2273 18/04/1958 DR Holbeck (MR) 16/10/1967 9.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/11/1968 10.55
D2274 10/07/1959 DR Bournemouth 17/05/1969 9.83 Cut National Coal Board (Maltby Main) 09/1980 21.20
D2275 29/07/1959 DR Bournemouth 29/10/1967 8.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1968 8.52
D2276 09/08/1959 DR Ashford 08/1969 10 Cut A R Adams (Newport, Gwent) 01/05/1977 17.74
D2277 21/09/1959 DR Faversham 31/05/1969 9.67 Cut G Brahams (Bury St Edmunds) 01/12/1969 10.20
D2278 11/11/1959 DR Hither Green 19/04/1970 10.42 Cut British Rail (at Stratford MPD) 01/01/1971 11.15
D2279 15/02/1960 DR Norwood Junction 23/05/1971 11.25 Prs Preserved 57.16
D2280 25/02/1960 DR Norwood Junction 14/03/1971 11.08 Prs Preserved 57.13
D2281 27/02/1960 DR Brighton 20/10/1968 8.67 Cut Duport Steels (Briton Ferry) 01/08/1971 11.43
D2282 28/02/1960 DR Brighton 27/12/1970 10.83 Cut P Woods (Shipbreaking) (Queenborough) 01/07/1972 12.35
D2283 24/03/1960 DR Ashford 31/12/1969 9.75 Cut British Rail (at Stratford MPD) 01/08/1970 10.36
D2284 25/03/1960 DR Hither Green 11/04/1971 11.08 Prs Preserved 57.05
D2285 27/03/1960 DR Ashford 30/09/1969 9.5 Cut G Brahams (Bury St Edmunds) 01/03/1970 9.93
D2286 26/03/1960 DR Brighton 12/05/1968 8.17 Cut Pounds (at Fratton TMD) 01/06/1969 9.19
D2287 09/04/1960 DR Dover Marine 23/06/1968 8.17 Cut Pounds (at Fratton TMD) 01/08/1969 9.32
D2288 30/04/1960 DR Norwood Junction 17/12/1967 7.67 Cut Pollock and Brown (Southampton) 01/07/1968 8.18
D2289 29/04/1960 DR Eastleigh 30/09/1971 11.42 56.96
D2290 06/05/1960 DR Guildford 19/11/1967 7.5 Cut Pollock and Brown (Southampton) 01/08/1968 8.24
D2291 15/05/1960 DR Eastleigh 24/12/1967 7.58 Cut Pollock and Brown (Southampton) 01/07/1968 8.13
D2292 19/05/1960 DR Hither Green 24/12/1967 7.58 Cut Pollock and Brown (Southampton) 01/08/1968 8.21
D2293 04/06/1960 DR Ashford 30/04/1971 10.83 Cut P Woods (Shipbreaking) (Queenborough) 01/03/1972 11.75
D2294 04/06/1960 DR Norwood Junction 28/02/1971 10.67 Cut P Woods (Shipbreaking) (Queenborough) 01/10/1985 25.34
D2295 24/06/1960 DR Guildford 30/04/1971 10.83 56.81
D2296 29/09/1960 DR Boston 31/12/1969 9.25 Cut G Brahams (Bury St Edmunds) 01/04/1970 9.51
D2297 07/10/1960 DR Lincoln 02/07/1970 9.75 Cut G Brahams (Bury St Edmunds) 01/09/1970 9.91
D2298 11/10/1960 DR Lincoln 28/12/1968 8.17 Prs Preserved 56.51
D2299 11/10/1960 DR Lincoln 11/01/1970 9.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/02/1984 23.32
D2300 24/10/1960 DR Lincoln 17/05/1969 8.58 Cut National Coal Board (Manton) 01/10/1985 24.95
D2301 23/10/1960 DR Colwick 21/09/1968 7.92 Cut Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) 01/12/1969 9.11
D2302 31/10/1960 DR Lincoln 07/1969 8.75 Prs Preserved 56.45
D2303 01/11/1960 DR Lincoln 05/11/1967 7 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/01/1969 8.17
D2304 04/11/1960 DR Darlington 13/02/1968 7.25 Cut Duport Steels (Llanelli) 01/05/1977 16.50
D2305 10/11/1960 DR Darlington 13/02/1968 7.25 Cut Duport Steels (Llanelli) 01/09/1981 20.82
D2306 17/11/1960 DR Darlington 13/02/1968 7.25 Cut Duport Steels (Llanelli) 01/09/1981 20.80
D2307 28/11/1960 DR Darlington 13/02/1968 7.25 Cut Duport Steels (Llanelli) 01/10/1979 18.85
D2308 06/12/1960 DR Darlington 13/02/1968 7.17 Cut Duport Steels (Llanelli) 01/05/1980 19.41
D2309 12/12/1960 DR Darlington 18/07/1968 7.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1969 8.31
D2310 22/12/1960 DR Gateshead 01/02/1969 8.17 Prs Preserved 56.31
D2311 30/12/1960 DR Gateshead 13/02/1968 7.17 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1968 7.59
D2312 05/01/1961 DR Gateshead 13/02/1968 7.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/12/1968 7.91
D2313 17/01/1961 DR Gateshead 13/02/1968 7.08 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1968 7.54
D2314 27/01/1961 DR Gateshead 13/02/1968 7.08 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1968 7.52
D2315 06/02/1961 DR Tyne Dock 10/02/1968 7 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 01/08/1968 7.49
D2316 14/02/1961 DR Darlington 10/02/1968 7 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/11/1968 7.72
D2317 22/02/1961 DR Darlington 30/09/1969 8.58 Cut National Coal Board (Cortonwood) 01/09/1986 25.54
D2318 01/03/1961 DR Darlington 10/02/1968 6.92 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 01/05/1968 7.17
D2319 07/03/1961 DR Darlington 10/02/1968 6.92 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 01/12/1968 7.74
D2320 14/03/1961 DR Darlington 10/02/1968 6.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/01/1969 7.81
D2321 22/03/1961 DR Percy Main 22/07/1968 7.33 Cut Cohens (South Bank, Middlesbrough) 01/12/1968 7.70
D2322 28/03/1961 DR Heaton 08/08/1968 7.42 Cut National Coal Board (Kiverton) 01/10/1985 24.53
D2323 05/04/1961 DR Normanton 08/07/1968 7.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1969 7.99
D2324 26/04/1961 DR Normanton 08/07/1968 7.25 Prs Preserved 55.97
D2325 29/04/1961 DR Gateshead 08/07/1968 7.25 Prs Preserved 55.96
D2326 02/06/1961 DR Tyne Dock 20/08/1968 7.17 Cut National Coal Board (Manvers Main) 01/02/1976 14.68
D2327 29/05/1961 DR Tyne Dock 14/08/1968 7.25 Cut Coopers Metals (Sheffield) 01/12/1983 22.52
D2328 06/06/1961 DR Tyne Dock 16/09/1968 7.25 Cut National Coal Board (Cortonwood) 01/07/1986 25.08
D2329 21/06/1961 DR Heaton 29/07/1968 7.08 Cut British Rail (at York Layerthorpe) 01/02/1970 8.62
D2330 29/06/1961 DR Gateshead 07/1969 8.08 Cut M Turnbull (at Thornaby MPD) 01/08/1970 9.10
D2331 01/07/1961 DR Darlington 01/07/1968 7 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 01/11/1968 7.34
D2332 10/07/1961 DR Heaton 06/1969 7.92 Cut National Coal Board (Dinnington) 01/07/1986 24.99
D2333 20/07/1961 DR Gateshead 30/09/1969 8.17 Cut Ford Motors (Dagenham) 0000
D2334 25/07/1961 DR Heaton 08/07/1968 7 Prs Preserved 55.72
D2335 27/07/1961 DR Blaydon 08/07/1968 7 Cut National Coal Board (Maltby Main) 01/02/1980 18.53
D2336 24/08/1961 DR Darlington 15/07/1968 6.92 Cut National Coal Board (Manvers Main) 01/02/1978 16.45
D2337 30/08/1961 DR Darlington 15/07/1968 6.92 Prs Preserved 55.62
D2338 21/09/1961 DR Darlington 01/07/1968 6.83 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 01/11/1968 7.12
D2339 27/10/1961 DR Heaton 16/10/1967 6 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 01/05/1968 6.52
D2340 09/03/1962 DR Darlington 13/10/1968 6.58 Cut Duport Steels (Briton Ferry) 01/09/1979 17.49
DS1173 D2341 06/1947 22/12/1968 21.5 Cut Pollock and Brown (Southampton) 01/08/1969 22.15
11104 52 01/01/1950 HI 01/03/1967 17.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/03/1967 17.17