Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 550 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 5124 Week
» 24857 Month
» 321871 Year
» 398458 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

48 Co-Co


BR (Pre Tops) BR (1973) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D1702 47114 04/11/1965 BH Tinsley 30/09/2004 23/12/1969
to 47
38.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 14/03/2005 39.38
D1703 47115 17/09/1965 BH Tinsley 09/04/1991 06/11/1970
to 47
25.58 Cut MRJ Philips (at Frodingham Depot) 01/12/1995 30.22
D1704 47116 21/07/1966 BH Tinsley 27/07/1990 05/06/1971
to 47
24 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 17/06/1994 27.93
D1705 47117 04/11/1965 BH Tinsley 17/07/1991 03/04/1971
to 47
25.67 Prs Preserved 51.44
D1706 47118 31/12/1965 BH Tinsley 01/03/1991 28/11/1970
to 47
25.25 Cut MRJ Philips (at Doncaster MPD) 01/04/1995 29.27