Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 550 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 5124 Week
» 24857 Month
» 321871 Year
» 398458 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

50 Co-Co


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D400 50050 07/10/1967 EE Western Lines (LMR) 01/03/1994 26.42 Prs Preserved 49.52 Fearless
D401 50001 09/12/1967 EE Western Lines (LMR) 19/04/1991 23.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 12/12/2002 35.03 Dreadnought
D402 50002 23/12/1967 EE Western Lines (LMR) 09/09/1991 23.75 Prs Preserved 49.30 Superb
D403 50003 12/01/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 15/07/1991 23.5 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 30/04/1992 24.32 Temeraire
D404 50004 23/12/1967 EE Western Lines (LMR) 22/06/1990 22.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/05/1992 24.37 St Vincent
D405 50005 15/01/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 11/12/1990 22.92 Cut Coopers Metals (at Old Oak Common) 26/03/1991 23.21 Collingwood
D406 50006 28/03/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 16/07/1987 19.33 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/03/1988 20.02 Neptune
D407 50007 12/03/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 31/03/1994 26 Prs Preserved 26.16 Hercules
D408 50008 22/03/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 05/06/1992 24.25 Prs Preserved 25.12 Thunderer
D409 50009 19/03/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 11/01/1991 22.83 Cut Coopers Metals (at Old Oak Common) 26/03/1991 23.03 Conqueror
D410 50010 23/02/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 27/09/1988 20.58 Cut Coopers Metals (at Laira MPD) 22/05/1992 24.26 Monarch
D411 50011 19/03/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 23/02/1987 18.92 Cut Texas Metals (at Crewe Works) 11/09/1992 24.50 Centurion
D412 50012 27/03/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 16/01/1989 20.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/07/1989 21.28 Benbow
D413 50013 05/03/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 13/03/1988 20 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/06/1989 21.25 Agincourt
D414 50014 24/04/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 13/12/1987 19.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/07/1989 21.20 Warspite
D415 50015 02/04/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 05/06/1992 24.17 Prs Preserved 25.01 Valiant
D416 50016 24/04/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 10/07/1990 22.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 05/06/1992 24.13 Barham
D417 50017 06/04/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 01/09/1991 23.42 Prs Preserved 49.02 Royal Oak
D418 50018 11/04/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 22/07/1991 23.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 14/07/1992 24.27 Resolution
D419 50019 23/04/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 19/09/1990 22.42 Prs Preserved 48.97 Ramillies
D420 50020 29/04/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 27/07/1990 22.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 12/06/1992 24.14 Revenge
D421 50021 01/05/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 17/04/1990 21.92 Prs Preserved 24.48 Rodney
D422 50022 07/05/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 20/09/1988 20.33 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/06/1989 21.08 Anson
D423 50023 08/05/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 15/10/1990 22.42 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Barrow Hill) 30/04/2003 35.00 Howe
D424 50024 21/05/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 01/02/1991 22.75 Cut Coopers Metals (at Old Oak Common) 06/07/1991 23.14 Vanguard
D425 50025 31/05/1968 EE Western Lines (LMR) 14/08/1989 21.25 Cut Vic Berry (at Old Oak Common) 01/10/1989 21.35 Invincible
D426 50026 12/06/1968 EE Stoke Division 11/12/1990 22.5 Prs Preserved 25.87 Indomitable
D427 50027 10/06/1968 EE Stoke Division 23/07/1991 23.08 Prs Preserved 23.90 Lion
D428 50028 18/06/1968 EE Stoke Division 01/02/1991 22.67 Cut Coopers Metals (at Old Oak Common) 06/07/1991 23.06 Tiger
D429 50029 21/06/1968 EE Stoke Division 25/03/1992 23.75 Prs Preserved 34.05 Renown
D430 50030 25/06/1968 EE Stoke Division 08/04/1992 23.83 Prs Preserved 34.04 Repulse
D431 50031 01/07/1968 EE Stoke Division 01/08/1991 23.08 Prs Preserved 48.78 Hood
D432 50032 12/07/1968 EE Stoke Division 15/10/1990 22.25 Cut Coopers Metals (at Old Oak Common) 26/03/1991 22.72 Courageous
D433 50033 19/07/1968 EE Stoke Division 25/03/1994 25.67 Prs Preserved 48.73 Glorious
D434 50034 24/07/1968 EE Stoke Division 29/06/1990 21.92 Cut Coopers Metals (at Old Oak Common) 26/03/1991 22.68 Furious
D435 50035 30/09/1968 EE Stoke Division 01/08/1990 21.92 Prs Preserved 48.53 Ark Royal
D436 50036 12/08/1968 EE Stoke Division 12/04/1991 22.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 03/07/1992 23.91 Victorious
D437 50037 20/09/1968 EE Stoke Division 09/09/1991 23 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 05/12/1992 24.22 Illustrious
D438 50038 16/09/1968 EE Stoke Division 27/09/1988 20 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/06/1989 20.72 Formidable
D439 50039 09/09/1968 EE Stoke Division 04/06/1989 20.75 Cut Coopers Metals (at Old Oak Common) 06/07/1991 22.84 Implacable
D440 50040 25/09/1968 EE Stoke Division 03/08/1990 21.92 Prs Preserved 39.87 Centurion
D441 50041 03/10/1968 EE Stoke Division 17/04/1990 21.5 Cut Coopers Metals (at Old Oak Common) 06/07/1991 22.77 Bulwark
D442 50042 30/09/1968 EE Stoke Division 01/10/1990 22.08 Prs Preserved 48.53 Triumph
D443 50043 04/10/1968 EE Stoke Division 01/02/1991 22.33 Cut Raxstar (at Blaenavon & Pontypool Railway) 01/01/2002 33.27 Eagle
D444 50044 11/10/1968 EE Stoke Division 01/01/1991 22.25 Prs Preserved 48.50 Exeter
D445 50045 18/10/1968 EE Stoke Division 11/12/1990 22.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1900 -68.59 Achilles
D446 50046 25/11/1968 EE Stoke Division 25/03/1992 23.33 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 19/06/1992 23.58 Ajax
D447 50047 05/11/1968 EE Stoke Division 13/04/1988 19.42 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/05/1989 20.50 Swiftsure
D448 50048 05/12/1968 EE Stoke Division 15/07/1991 22.58 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 29/04/1992 23.41 Dauntless
D449 50049 11/12/1968 EE Stoke Division 01/08/1991 22.67 Prs Preserved 48.33 Defiance