Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 550 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 5124 Week
» 24857 Month
» 321871 Year
» 398458 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

55 Co-Co


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D9000 55022 28/02/1961 EE Haymarket 02/01/1982 20.92 Prs Preserved 56.12 ROYAL SCOTS GREY
D9001 55001 23/02/1961 EE Finsbury Park 05/01/1980 18.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 23/02/1980 19.01 ST PADDY
D9002 55002 19/03/1961 EE Gateshead 02/01/1982 20.83 Prs Preserved 56.07 THE KING'S OWN YORKSHIRE LIGHT INFANTRY
D9003 55003 27/03/1961 EE Finsbury Park 31/12/1980 19.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1981 19.94 MELD
D9004 55004 10/05/1961 EE Haymarket 28/10/1981 20.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 23/07/1983 22.22 QUEENS OWN HIGHLANDER
D9005 55005 25/05/1961 EE Gateshead 08/02/1981 19.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 22/02/1983 21.76 THE PRINCE OF WALES'S OWN REGIMENT OF YORKSHIRE
D9006 55006 29/06/1961 EE Haymarket 08/02/1981 19.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/07/1981 20.02 THE FIFE & FORFAR YEOMANRY
D9007 55007 22/06/1961 EE Finsbury Park 31/12/1981 20.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/08/1982 21.12 PINZA
D9008 55008 07/07/1961 EE Gateshead 31/12/1981 20.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/08/1982 21.08 THE GREEN HOWARDS
D9009 55009 21/07/1961 EE Finsbury Park 02/01/1982 20.5 Prs Preserved 55.73 ALYCIDON
D9010 55010 21/07/1961 EE Haymarket 24/12/1981 20.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/05/1982 20.79 THE KING'S OWN SCOTTISH BORDERER
D9011 55011 24/08/1961 EE Gateshead 08/11/1981 20.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 04/11/1982 21.21 THE ROYAL NORTHUMBERLAND FUSILIERS
D9012 55012 04/09/1961 EE Finsbury Park 18/05/1981 19.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/09/1981 20.01 CREPELLO
D9013 55013 14/09/1961 EE Haymarket 20/12/1981 20.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/12/1982 21.23 THE BLACK WATCH
D9014 55014 29/09/1961 EE Gateshead 22/11/1981 20.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/02/1982 20.36 THE DUKE OF WELLINGTON'S REGIMENT
D9015 55015 13/10/1961 EE Finsbury Park 02/01/1982 20.25 Prs Preserved 55.50 TULYAR
D9016 55016 27/10/1961 EE Haymarket 30/12/1981 20.17 Prs Preserved 55.46 GORDON HIGHLANDER
D9017 55017 09/11/1961 EE Gateshead 31/12/1981 20.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 29/01/1983 21.24 THE DURHAM LIGHT INFANTRY
D9018 55018 24/11/1961 EE Finsbury Park 12/10/1981 19.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/01/1982 20.12 BALLYMOSS
D9019 55019 11/12/1961 EE Haymarket 31/12/1981 20 Prs Preserved 55.34 ROYAL HIGHLAND FUSILIER
D9020 55020 12/02/1962 EE Finsbury Park 06/01/1980 17.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 02/02/1980 17.98 NIMBUS
D9021 55021 16/03/1962 EE Haymarket 31/12/1981 19.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 18/09/1982 20.52 ARGYLL & SUTHERLAND HIGHLANDER