Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 550 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 5124 Week
» 24857 Month
» 321871 Year
» 398458 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

56 Co-Co


BR (Tops) BR (Prv) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
56001 28/02/1977 EL 18/09/1996 19.58 Cut MRJ Philips (at Cardiff Canton MPD) 05/1997 20.22
56002 28/02/1977 EL 08/05/1992 15.25 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (at Doncaster Carr MPD) 03/1994 17.05
56003 56312 28/02/1977 EL 40.12
56004 28/02/1977 EL 06/2005 28.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 07/2006 29.39
56005 14/03/1977 EL 02/07/1996 19.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 08/1996 19.44
56006 25/02/1977 EL 40.12
56007 13/04/1977 EL 39.99
56008 13/04/1977 EL 14/07/2000 23.25 Cut Raxstar (at Immingham MPD) 04/2000 23.02
56009 27/05/1977 EL 29/08/1996 19.25 39.87
56010 28/07/1977 EL 28/02/2004 26.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 04/2004 26.73
56011 29/06/1977 EL 06/2008 31 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 04/2009 31.82
56012 18/04/1977 EL 14/07/2000 23.25 Cut Raxstar (at Immingham MPD) 04/2000 23.01
56013 01/08/1977 EL 17/12/1993 16.33 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 09/2001 24.14
56014 28/03/1977 EL 14/07/2000 23.33 Cut Raxstar (at Immingham MPD) 04/2000 23.07
56015 21/03/1977 EL 26/11/1993 16.67 Cut MRJ Philips (at Doncaster Works) 03/1996 19.00
56016 27/05/1977 EL 18/09/1996 19.33 Cut MRJ Philips (at Cardiff Canton MPD) 06/1997 20.07
56017 13/05/1977 EL 08/05/1992 15 Cut Birds (at Toton MPD) 05/1994 17.02
56018 23/08/1977 EL 39.63
56019 13/05/1977 EL 10/2003 26.42 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Immingham MPD) 11/2003 26.53
56020 20/05/1977 EL 16/06/1997 20.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/1998 20.67
56021 17/06/1977 EL Tinsley 06/2008 31 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 07/2009 32.10
56022 24/05/1977 EL 11/1999 22.5 39.88
56023 11/07/1977 EL 17/12/1993 16.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 08/2004 27.12
56024 15/06/1977 EL Tinsley 29/10/1996 19.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 08/1996 19.18
56025 15/07/1977 EL 09/2008 31.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 03/2009 31.69
56026 15/07/1977 EL 02/07/1996 19 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 06/1996 18.93
56027 19/09/1977 EL 09/2008 31 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 05/2009 31.67
56028 14/09/1977 EL 26/11/1993 16.17 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 09/1998 21.02
56029 12/09/1977 EL 06/2005 27.75 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 04/2007 29.61
56030 21/10/1977 EL 26/11/1993 16.08 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 09/1998 20.92
56031 24/05/1977 DO Toton 39.88
56032 19/07/1977 DO 39.73
56033 02/08/1977 DO 10/2003 26.17 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 06/2010 32.89
56034 25/08/1977 DO 06/2005 27.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 11/2007 30.24
56035 13/10/1977 DO 14/07/2000 22.75 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 06/2000 22.69
56036 16/08/1978 DO 06/2005 26.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 03/2006 27.60
56037 20/01/1978 DO 39.22
56038 19/02/1978 DO 39.14
56039 07/02/1978 DO 01/2004 25.92 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 03/2004 26.12
56040 15/02/1978 DO 08/2005 27.5 Prs Preserved 39.15
56041 15/02/1978 DO 02/2003 Immingham 25 Cut EMR (Attercliffe) 21/01/2011 32.95
56042 14/05/1979 DO 27/09/1991 12.33 Cut Birds (at Toton MPD) 04/1994 14.93
56043 31/03/1978 DO 09/2008 30.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 02/2009 30.90
56044 14/05/1978 DO 08/2005 27.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 09/2007 29.36
56045 56301 01/06/1978 DO 04/2009 30.83 Prs Preserved 38.86
56046 18/07/1978 DO 07/2002 24 38.73
56047 28/07/1978 DO 10/2003 25.25 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Immingham MPD) 12/2003 25.40
56048 19/09/1978 DO 08/2002 23.92 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 38.56
56049 11/10/1978 DO 38.50
56050 25/10/1978 DO 04/2004 25.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 06/2004 25.66
56051 04/11/1978 DO 38.43
56052 06/12/1978 DO 09/2008 29.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 04/2009 30.38
56053 19/12/1978 DO 07/1999 20.58 Cut EMR (Attercliffe) 38.31
56054 26/01/1979 DO 12/2003 24.92 38.21
56055 01/02/1979 DO 03/2003 24.08 Cut EMR (Attercliffe) 38.19
56056 12/03/1979 DO 02/2004 24.92 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 38.08
56057 56311 27/03/1979 DO 38.04
56058 29/04/1979 DO 37.95
56059 16/05/1979 DO 11/2006 27.5 37.90
56060 09/06/1979 DO 37.84
56061 09/08/1979 DO 11/2006 27.25 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 12/2006 27.37
56062 29/08/1979 DO 02/2004 24.5 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 37.62
56063 06/09/1979 DO 08/2005 25.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 11/2007 28.21
56064 17/09/1979 DO 09/2008 29 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 03/2009 29.51
56065 17/10/1979 DO 37.48
56066 11/12/1979 DO 12/2005 26 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 12/2005 26.03
56067 11/12/1979 DO 12/2003 24 37.33
56068 11/12/1979 DO 07/2003 23.58 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 05/2010 30.45
56069 11/12/1979 DO 37.33
56070 21/12/1979 DO 02/2004 24.17 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 37.30
56071 21/12/1979 DO 11/2006 26.92 37.30
56072 07/01/1980 DO 02/2004 24.08 Cut EMR (Attercliffe) 37.26
56073 29/02/1980 DO 06/2002 22.33 37.11
56074 29/03/1980 DO 37.03
56075 06/04/1980 DO 04/2004 24 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 06/2004 24.21
56076 20/04/1980 DO 09/2008 28.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 02/2009 28.84
56077 18/05/1980 DO 36.90
56078 25/05/1980 DO 36.88
56079 22/06/1980 DO 12/1999 19.5 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 05/2010 29.92
56080 13/07/1980 DO 07/2002 22 Cut Raxstar (at Cardiff Cathays) 12/2003 23.44
56081 24/08/1980 DO 36.63
56082 24/08/1980 DO 09/2008 28.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 04/2009 28.66
56083 07/09/1980 DO 12/2003 23.25 36.59
56084 26/10/1980 DO 09/2008 27.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 03/2009 28.40
56085 21/01/1981 DO 07/2002 21.5 36.22
56086 07/12/1980 DO 09/2008 27.75 Prs Preserved 36.34
56087 21/12/1980 DO 36.30
56088 25/01/1981 DO 02/2004 23.08 Cut EMR (Hartlepool) 36.21
56089 25/01/1981 DO 09/2008 27.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 02/2009 28.08
56090 08/03/1981 DO 36.09
56091 21/06/1981 DO 35.80
56092 21/06/1981 DO 03/1999 17.75 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 07/2001 20.08
56093 28/06/1981 DO 07/1999 18.08 Cut EMR (Attercliffe) 35.78
56094 09/08/1981 DO 35.67
56095 16/08/1981 DO 10/2006 25.17 35.65
56096 13/09/1981 DO 35.57
56097 04/10/1981 DO 23/03/2002 20.42 Prs Preserved 35.52
56098 18/10/1981 DO 08/2005 23.83 Prs Preserved 35.48
56099 08/11/1981 DO 11/2003 22 Cut EMR (Attercliffe) 35.42
56100 15/11/1981 DO 12/2003 22.08 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 35.40
56101 21/12/1981 DO 09/2008 26.75 Prs Preserved 35.30
56102 20/12/1981 DO 09/2003 21.75 Cut EMR (Hartlepool) 35.30
56103 27/12/1981 DO 35.28
56104 21/02/1982 DO 35.13
56105 28/03/1982 DO 35.04
56106 25/04/1982 DO 34.96
56107 16/05/1982 DO 01/2004 21.67 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 34.90
56108 20/06/1982 DO 06/1999 17 34.81
56109 15/08/1982 DO 12/2003 21.33 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 34.65
56110 03/10/1982 DO 07/2002 Thornaby 19.75 Cut EMR (Attercliffe) 21/01/2011 28.32
56111 24/10/1982 DO 04/2003 20.5 Cut EMR (Hartlepool) 34.46
56112 21/11/1982 DO 01/2003 20.17 34.38
56113 12/12/1982 DO 34.33
56114 23/01/1983 DO 09/2008 25.67 34.21
56115 30/01/1983 DO 34.19
56116 13/03/1983 CW 02/2003 19.92 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 34.08
56117 13/03/1983 CW 34.08
56118 17/04/1983 CW 01/06/2006 23.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 12/2009 26.68
56119 15/05/1983 CW 03/2004 20.83 Cut EMR (Attercliffe) 33.90
56120 29/05/1983 CW 12/2003 20.58 33.87
56121 19/06/1983 CW 06/2005 22 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 12/2005 22.51
56122 03/07/1983 CW 09/10/1992 9.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 05/1998 14.88
56123 31/07/1983 CW 08/2003 20.08 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Immingham MPD) 08/2003 20.05
56124 56302 25/09/1983 CW 04/2009 25.58 Prs Preserved 33.54
56125 56303 20/10/1983 CW 33.47
56126 15/11/1983 CW 04/05/2001 17.5 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 10/1999 15.93
56127 13/12/1983 CW 02/2002 18.17 Cut EMR (Hartlepool) 33.32
56128 18/12/1983 CW 08/2005 21.67 33.31
56129 08/01/1984 CW 07/2003 19.5 33.25
56130 01/04/1984 CW 04/2004 20 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 10/2004 20.55
56131 29/04/1984 CW 08/2005 21.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 12/2007 23.64
56132 10/06/1984 CW 06/2005 21 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 06/2006 22.03
56133 29/07/1984 CW 02/2004 19.58 32.70
56134 09/09/1984 CW 07/2002 17.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 02/2010 25.45
56135 04/11/1984 CW 07/2003 18.67 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Immingham MPD) 08/2003 18.79