Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 208 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 6264 Week
» 20841 Month
» 384086 Year
» 460673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

60 Co-Co


BR (Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
60001 29/08/1991 BH Stewarts Lane 25.61
60002 08/12/1992 BH Immingham 24.33
60003 30/01/1992 BH Immingham 25.19
60004 08/06/1991 BH 25.84
60005 25/04/1991 BH Thornaby 25.96
60006 23/04/1991 BH Toton 25.96
60007 05/02/1992 BH Thornaby 25.17
60008 08/12/1992 BH Immingham 24.33
60009 11/02/1993 BH Stewarts Lane 24.15
60010 21/01/1991 BH Cardiff Canton 26.21
60011 11/10/1991 BH Toton 25.49
60012 22/11/1991 BH Toton 25.38
60013 29/01/1993 BH Immingham 24.19
60014 06/01/1993 BH Immingham 24.25
60015 24/03/1993 BH Immingham 24.04
60016 09/02/1993 BH Stewarts Lane 24.16
60017 30/10/1990 BH Thornaby 26.44
60018 30/10/1990 BH Thornaby 26.44
60019 03/12/1990 BH Immingham 26.35
60020 31/01/1991 BH Thornaby 26.19
60021 14/12/1991 BH Thornaby 25.32
60022 21/01/1991 BH Thornaby 26.21
60023 08/11/1990 BH Thornaby 26.42
60024 17/12/1990 BH Thornaby 26.31
60025 12/12/1990 BH Thornaby 26.32
60026 12/12/1990 BH Cardiff Canton 26.32
60027 07/02/1991 BH Immingham 26.17
60028 09/11/1990 BH Thornaby 26.41
60029 26/11/1990 BH Thornaby 26.37
60030 21/11/1990 BH Thornaby 26.38
60031 02/05/1991 BH Thornaby 25.94
60032 03/12/1990 BH Immingham 26.35
60033 22/02/1991 BH Cardiff Canton 26.13
60034 12/12/1990 BH Thornaby 26.32
60035 23/04/1991 BH Toton 25.96
60036 25/06/1991 BH Thornaby 25.79
60037 04/04/1991 BH Thornaby 26.01
60038 04/03/1991 BH Thornaby 26.10
60039 09/05/1991 BH Cardiff Canton 25.92
60040 06/02/1992 BH Stewarts Lane 25.17
60041 20/06/1991 BH Toton 25.80
60042 29/05/1991 BH Toton 25.86
60043 26/06/1991 BH Toton 25.79
60044 03/07/1991 BH Toton 25.77
60045 25/03/1991 BH Stewarts Lane 26.04
60046 04/04/1991 BH Stewarts Lane 26.01
60047 04/04/1991 BH Stewarts Lane 26.01
60048 03/04/1991 BH Toton 26.02
60049 07/05/1991 BH Immingham 25.92
60050 08/03/1991 BH Thornaby 26.09
60051 10/04/1991 BH Cardiff Canton 26.00
60052 09/05/1991 BH Immingham 25.92
60053 25/04/1991 BH Toton 25.96
60054 03/05/1991 BH Cardiff Canton 25.93
60055 06/06/1991 BH Toton 25.84
60056 24/05/1991 BH Immingham 25.88
60057 01/06/1991 BH Toton 25.85
60058 07/05/1991 BH Immingham 25.92
60059 05/07/1991 BH Thornaby 25.76
60060 28/06/1991 BH Toton 25.78
60061 06/06/1991 BH Toton 25.84
60062 17/06/1991 BH Cardiff Canton 25.81
60063 13/06/1991 BH Cardiff Canton 25.82
60064 28/08/1991 BH Immingham 25.61
60065 17/09/1991 BH Cardiff Canton 25.56
60066 22/08/1991 BH Immingham 25.63
60067 20/09/1991 BH Immingham 25.55
60068 16/10/1991 BH Toton 25.48
60069 02/09/1991 BH Toton 25.60
60070 28/10/1991 BH Toton 25.45
60071 19/09/1991 BH Toton 25.55
60072 21/10/1991 BH Toton 25.47
60073 22/11/1991 BH Toton 25.38
60074 25/11/1991 BH Toton 25.37
60075 04/12/1991 BH Toton 25.35
60076 22/11/1991 BH Toton 25.38
60077 22/11/1991 BH Toton 25.38
60078 26/11/1991 BH Immingham 25.37
60079 17/01/1992 BH Cardiff Canton 25.22
60080 23/11/1991 BH Immingham 25.38
60081 03/12/1991 BH Immingham 25.35
60082 03/12/1991 BH Immingham 25.35
60083 27/03/1992 BH Toton 25.03
60084 11/01/1993 BH Immingham 24.24
60085 13/12/1991 BH Immingham 25.32
60086 16/01/1992 BH Stewarts Lane 25.23
60087 18/12/1991 BH Toton 25.31
60088 20/01/1992 BH Toton 25.22
60089 08/01/1992 BH Cardiff Canton 25.25
60090 03/02/1992 BH Toton 25.18
60091 03/02/1992 BH Toton 25.18
60092 31/01/1992 BH Toton 25.19
60093 21/02/1992 BH Stewarts Lane 25.13
60094 20/02/1991 BH Immingham 26.13
60095 13/03/1992 BH Immingham 25.07
60096 13/05/1992 BH Immingham 24.90
60097 22/12/1992 BH Immingham 24.29
60098 22/12/1992 BH Immingham 24.29
60099 18/01/1992 BH Toton 25.22
60100 09/12/1992 BH Toton 24.33