Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 719 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 2005 Week
» 29479 Month
» 326493 Year
» 403080 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

05 0-6-0


BR (1955 Num) BR (Pre Tops) BR BR (Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
11177 D2400 23/07/1956 AB Kings Cross 29/10/1967 11.25 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/04/1968 11.70
11178 D2401 25/07/1956 AB Kings Cross 28/12/1968 12.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/05/1969 12.78
11179 D2402 29/09/1956 AB Lincoln 10/09/1967 11 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1968 11.51
11180 D2403 12/10/1956 AB Lincoln 01/02/1969 12.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/05/1969 12.56
11181 D2404 06/11/1956 AB Lincoln 01/02/1969 12.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/05/1969 12.49
11182 D2405 06/12/1956 AB Lincoln 28/12/1968 12 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/1970 13.24
11183 D2406 24/12/1956 AB Lincoln 07/05/1967 10.42 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 01/12/1967 10.94
11184 D2407 14/01/1957 AB Lincoln 01/02/1969 12.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/05/1969 12.30
11185 D2408 11/02/1957 AB Lincoln 07/05/1967 10.25 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 01/12/1967 10.81
11186 D2409 04/03/1957 AB Lincoln 28/12/1968 11.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/1970 13.00
11136 D2550 07/10/1955 HU Ipswich 23/10/1966 11 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/11/1966 11.08
11137 D2551 08/10/1955 HU Ipswich 06/01/1968 12.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/06/1968 12.66
11138 D2552 07/02/1956 HU Ipswich 24/06/1967 11.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1968 12.16
11139 D2553 08/02/1956 HU Ipswich 06/01/1968 11.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/06/1968 12.32
11140 D2554 05001 13/05/1956 HU Parkeston Quay 01/01/1981 24.67 Prs Preserved 60.92
11141 D2555 05/06/1956 HU Norwich Thorpe 13/01/1968 11.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/06/1968 12.00
11142 D2556 25/07/1956 HU Ipswich 01/07/1967 11 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/03/1968 11.61
11143 D2557 16/08/1956 HU Ipswich 15/04/1967 10.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1968 11.63
11161 D2558 11/10/1956 HU Norwich Thorpe 15/07/1967 10.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1968 11.48
11162 D2559 11/10/1956 HU Norwich Thorpe 01/07/1967 10.75 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/03/1968 11.39
11163 D2560 01/02/1957 HU Ipswich 25/11/1967 Speke Junction 10.75 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/06/1968 11.34
11164 D2561 19/02/1957 HU Sheffield Darnall 26/08/1967 10.5 Cut Duport Steels (Llanelli) 01/10/1972 15.62
11165 D2562 17/03/1957 HU Sheffield Darnall 20/01/1968 10.83 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/07/1968 11.30
11166 D2563 15/06/1957 HU Norwich Thorpe 05/08/1967 10.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1968 10.80
11167 D2564 15/06/1957 HU Norwich Thorpe 05/08/1967 10.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1968 10.80
11168 D2565 15/06/1957 HU Norwich Thorpe 25/03/1967 9.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/1968 10.72
11169 D2566 04/08/1957 HU Norwich Thorpe 06/01/1968 10.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/06/1968 10.83
11170 D2567 04/08/1957 HU Norwich Thorpe 11/11/1967 Speke Junction 10.25 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/07/1968 10.92
11171 D2568 20/09/1957 HU Norwich Thorpe 26/08/1967 9.92 Cut Duport Steels (Briton Ferry) 01/05/1969 11.62
11172 D2569 20/09/1957 HU Norwich Thorpe 26/08/1967 9.92 Cut Duport Steels (Briton Ferry) 01/01/1970 12.29
11173 D2570 09/11/1957 HU Norwich Thorpe 22/07/1967 9.67 Cut Duport Steels (Briton Ferry) 01/06/1971 13.57
11174 D2571 30/10/1957 HU Norwich Thorpe 20/01/1968 10.25 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/10/1968 10.93
11175 D2572 28/12/1957 HU Norwich Thorpe 19/02/1967 9.17 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1967 9.60
11176 D2573 13/01/1958 HU Norwich Thorpe 13/01/1968 10 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 09/1969 11.68
D2574 18/07/1958 HU Stranraer 08/06/1968 9.92 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/12/1968 10.38
D2575 30/07/1958 HU Stranraer 08/06/1968 9.92 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/12/1968 10.35
D2576 30/07/1958 HU Thornton Junction 08/06/1968 9.92 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 01/08/1968 10.01
D2577 30/07/1958 HU Thornton Junction 24/06/1967 8.92 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 01/09/1967 9.10
D2578 18/11/1958 HU Thornton Junction 07/07/1967 8.67 Prs Preserved 58.41
D2579 25/11/1958 HU Thornton Junction 08/06/1968 9.58 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/01/1969 10.11
D2580 01/12/1958 HU Thornton Junction 08/06/1968 9.5 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/12/1968 10.01
D2581 09/12/1958 HU Thornton Junction 08/06/1968 9.5 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/12/1968 9.99
D2582 30/01/1959 HU Thornton Junction 08/06/1968 9.42 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/01/1969 9.93
D2583 30/01/1959 HU Thornton Junction 08/06/1968 9.42 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/01/1969 9.93
D2584 28/02/1959 HU Thornton Junction 07/07/1967 8.42 Cut Hunslet (Leeds) 01/08/1968 9.43
D2585 13/04/1959 HU Thornton Junction 08/06/1968 9.17 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/01/1969 9.73
D2586 05/11/1959 HU Ardsley 12/03/1967 7.33 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 15/10/1967 7.95
D2587 10/11/1959 HU Wakefield 30/12/1967 8.08 Prs Preserved 57.43
D2588 24/11/1959 HU Wakefield 12/03/1967 7.33 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/07/1967 7.61
D2589 01/12/1959 HU Wakefield 30/12/1967 8 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/12/1968 9.01
D2590 14/12/1959 HU Wakefield 08/06/1968 8.5 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/01/1969 9.06
D2591 08/12/1959 HU Wakefield 12/03/1967 7.25 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 15/10/1969 9.86
D2592 18/12/1959 HU Wakefield 02/03/1968 8.25 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/02/1969 9.13
D2593 30/12/1959 HU Wakefield 30/12/1967 8 Cut Hunslet (Leeds) 01/10/1968 8.76
D2594 19/01/1960 HU Percy Main 12/03/1967 7.17 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/07/1967 7.45
D2595 30/01/1960 HU York (North) 08/06/1968 8.42 Prs Preserved 57.21
D2596 15/02/1960 HU Holbeck (MR) 08/06/1968 8.33 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/01/1969 8.88
D2597 28/06/1960 HU Holbeck (MR) 30/12/1967 7.5 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/01/1969 8.52
D2598 30/06/1960 HU York (North) 30/12/1967 7.5 Cut National Coal Board (Philadelphia) 01/05/1975 14.84
D2599 08/07/1960 HU York (North) 30/12/1967 7.42 Cut National Coal Board (Askern) 01/05/1981 20.83
D2600 13/07/1960 HU York (North) 30/12/1967 7.42 Cut Duport Steels (Briton Ferry) 01/06/1971 10.89
D2601 20/07/1960 HU York (North) 30/12/1967 7.42 Cut Duport Steels (Llanelli) 01/09/1979 19.13
D2602 28/07/1960 HU York (North) 06/07/1967 7 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/12/1967 7.35
D2603 16/09/1960 HU Ardsley 12/08/1967 6.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/1968 7.46
D2604 30/09/1960 HU Ardsley 30/12/1967 7.25 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 01/06/1968 7.67
D2605 24/09/1960 HU Ardsley 30/12/1967 7.25 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 01/06/1968 7.69
D2606 08/10/1960 HU Ardsley 11/02/1967 6.33 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/12/1967 7.15
D2607 18/10/1960 HU Ardsley 30/12/1967 7.17 Cut Coopers Metals (Sheffield) 01/06/1984 23.64
D2608 09/12/1960 HU Ardsley 30/12/1967 7 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/01/1969 8.07
D2609 13/12/1960 HU Goole 30/12/1967 7 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/05/1968 7.39
D2610 21/12/1960 HU Goole 04/12/1967 7 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/08/1968 7.62
D2611 16/01/1961 HU Goole 30/12/1967 6.92 Cut National Coal Board (Yorkshire Main) 01/11/1976 15.80
D2612 88 30/01/1961 HU Darlington 23/09/1967 6.67 Cut Argosy Salvage (Shettleston) 01/12/1967 6.84
D2613 21/02/1961 HU Goole 30/12/1967 6.83 Cut National Coal Board (Bentley) 01/06/1977 16.28
D2614 27/02/1961 HU Goole 12/03/1967 6.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/06/1967 6.26
89 D2615 08/03/1961 HU Percy Main 30/12/1967 6.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/08/1968 7.41
D2616 17/03/1961 HU Percy Main 30/12/1967 6.75 Cut National Coal Board (Hatfield Main) 01/06/1973 12.22
D2617 28/03/1961 HU Darlington 30/12/1967 6.75 Cut Hunslet (Leeds) 01/04/1976 15.02
D2618 11/04/1961 HU Darlington 08/06/1968 7.17 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/01/1969 7.73