Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 114 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1400 Week
» 28874 Month
» 325888 Year
» 402475 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D1/1 0-4-0


BR (1955 Num) BR (Pre Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
11500 D2950 25/12/1954 HU Ipswich 30/12/1967 13 Cut Thyssen Ltd (Llanelli) 01/01/1983 28.04
11501 D2951 25/12/1954 HU Ipswich 30/12/1967 13 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1968 13.28
11502 D2952 02/01/1955 HU Ipswich 25/12/1966 11.92 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1967 12.59