Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 722 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 2008 Week
» 29482 Month
» 326496 Year
» 403083 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D1/3 0-4-0


BR (1955 Num) BR (Pre Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
11507 D2957 06/03/1956 RH Immingham 12/03/1967 11 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1967 11.41
11508 D2958 28/05/1956 RH Immingham 14/01/1968 11.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/10/1984 28.36