Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 1059 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 7115 Week
» 21692 Month
» 384937 Year
» 461524 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D2/1 0-4-0


BR (1955 Num) BR (Pre Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
11700 D2700 25/07/1953 NB West Hartlepool 02/11/1963 10.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/11/1964 11.28
11701 D2701 19/12/1953 NB West Hartlepool 12/03/1967 13.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/06/1967 13.46
11702 D2702 21/08/1954 NB West Hartlepool 12/03/1967 12.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/06/1967 12.79
11703 D2703 29/08/1955 NB Dundee Tay Bridge 03/02/1968 Grangemouth 12.5 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 01/05/1968 12.68
11704 D2704 19/09/1955 NB St Margarets 24/06/1967 11.75 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 01/10/1967 12.04
11705 D2705 29/09/1955 NB St Margarets 03/08/1967 11.92 Cut Connels (Coatbridge) 01/11/1967 12.10
11706 D2706 29/12/1955 NB St Margarets 04/03/1967 11.25 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1967 11.60
11707 D2707 02/02/1956 NB St Margarets 04/03/1967 11.08 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1967 11.50