Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 115 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1401 Week
» 28875 Month
» 325889 Year
» 402476 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

06 0-4-0


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D2410 19/06/1958 AB Inverness 02/1969 10.67 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/06/1969 10.96
D2411 31/07/1958 AB Inverness 15/06/1968 9.92 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/01/1969 10.43
D2412 18/09/1958 AB Inverness 15/06/1968 9.75 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/01/1969 10.30
D2413 06001 08/10/1958 AB Inverness 06/09/1976 17.92 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 31/12/1977 19.24
D2414 06002 24/10/1958 AB Keith 06/09/1981 22.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/04/1982 23.53
D2415 06/11/1958 AB Keith 15/06/1968 9.58 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/10/1968 9.91
D2416 29/11/1958 AB Kittybrewster 19/11/1972 14 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/11/1973 14.93
D2417 11/12/1958 AB Kittybrewster 15/06/1968 9.5 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/01/1969 10.07
D2418 09/01/1959 AB Kittybrewster 15/12/1968 9.92 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/12/1968 9.90
D2419 26/01/1959 AB Kittybrewster 25/01/1969 10 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/01/1969 9.94
D2420 06003 14/02/1959 AB Kittybrewster 01/02/1981 22 Prs Preserved 58.16
D2421 06004 24/02/1959 AB Kittybrewster 19/03/1979 20.08 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 28/02/1980 21.02
D2422 06005 20/03/1959 AB Kittybrewster 06/10/1980 21.58 Cut British Rail (at Dundee MPD) 31/07/1983 24.38
D2423 06006 09/04/1959 AB Kittybrewster 09/06/1980 21.17 Cut British Rail (at Dundee MPD) 31/07/1983 24.33
D2424 29/04/1959 AB Kittybrewster 19/11/1972 13.58 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/01/1974 14.69
D2425 11/11/1959 AB Greenock Ladyburn 08/06/1968 8.58 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/10/1968 8.90
D2426 06007 25/11/1959 AB Motherwell 26/09/1977 17.83 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 31/08/1979 19.78
D2427 07/12/1959 AB Motherwell 30/09/1969 9.75 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 10/1971 11.86
D2428 21/12/1959 AB Motherwell 15/06/1968 8.5 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/02/1969 9.12
D2429 13/01/1960 AB Motherwell 26/04/1969 9.25 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 10/1971 11.76
D2430 25/01/1960 AB Hamilton (West) 15/06/1968 8.42 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/01/1969 8.94
D2431 09/02/1960 AB Hamilton (West) 26/11/1971 11.75 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/03/1972 12.07
D2432 22/02/1960 AB Hamilton (West) 15/12/1968 8.83 Cut Unknown (Trieste, Italy) 0000
D2433 07/03/1960 AB Hamilton (West) 18/06/1972 12.25 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/05/1973 13.16
D2434 28/03/1960 AB Ayr 07/1969 9.33 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 10/1971 11.56
D2435 06/04/1960 AB Ayr 26/11/1971 11.58 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/09/1974 14.41
D2436 20/04/1960 AB Ayr 26/11/1971 11.58 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/11/1973 13.54
D2437 06008 11/05/1960 AB Ayr 06/10/1980 20.42 Cut Campbells (at Polmadie MPD) 31/08/1983 23.32
D2438 30/05/1960 AB Ayr 19/11/1972 12.5 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/08/1974 14.18
D2439 21/06/1960 AB Corkerhill 26/11/1971 11.42 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/03/1972 11.70
D2440 06009 11/07/1960 AB Corkerhill 30/08/1975 15.08 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 31/12/1977 17.48
D2441 17/08/1960 AB Corkerhill 01/03/1967 6.58 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/10/1967 7.13
D2442 05/09/1960 AB Corkerhill 01/11/1972 12.17 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/08/1974 13.91
D2443 28/09/1960 AB Corkerhill 18/06/1972 11.75 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/05/1973 12.60
D2444 06010 31/10/1960 AB Corkerhill 14/06/1975 14.67 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 31/12/1979 19.18