Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 722 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 2008 Week
» 29482 Month
» 326496 Year
» 403083 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D2/7 0-6-0


BR (1955 Num) BR (Pre Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
11116 D2500 31/12/1955 HC Birkenhead Mollington Street 13/05/1967 11.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/1968 12.18
11117 D2501 17/01/1956 HC Birkenhead Mollington Street 18/02/1967 11.08 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/07/1967 11.46
11118 D2502 25/01/1956 HC Birkenhead Mollington Street 07/10/1967 11.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/1968 12.11
11119 D2503 31/01/1956 HC Birkenhead Mollington Street 05/08/1967 11.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/1968 12.09
11120 D2504 22/02/1956 HC Birkenhead Mollington Street 18/03/1967 11.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/1968 12.03
11144 D2505 27/03/1956 HC Birkenhead Mollington Street 19/08/1967 11.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/1968 11.94
11145 D2506 12/04/1956 HC Birkenhead Mollington Street 25/11/1967 Barrow in Furness 11.58 Cut Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) 01/06/1970 14.15
11146 D2507 30/04/1956 HC Birkenhead Mollington Street 25/03/1967 10.92 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/07/1967 11.18
11147 D2508 31/05/1956 HC Birkenhead Mollington Street 13/05/1967 11 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/1968 11.76
11148 D2509 18/06/1956 HC Birkenhead Mollington Street 05/08/1967 11.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/1968 11.71