Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 722 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 2008 Week
» 29482 Month
» 326496 Year
» 403083 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D2/10 0-4-0


BR (1955 Num) BR (Pre Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
11708 D2708 16/07/1957 NB Dundee Tay Bridge 11/02/1967 9.58 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 10.13
11709 D2709 16/08/1957 NB Dundee Tay Bridge 11/02/1967 9.5 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 10.05
11710 D2710 27/08/1957 NB Dundee Tay Bridge 04/03/1967 9.58 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 08/1967 9.97
11711 D2711 31/08/1957 NB Dundee Tay Bridge 11/02/1967 9.5 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 10.01
11712 D2712 31/08/1957 NB Dundee Tay Bridge 04/03/1967 9.58 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1967 9.92
11713 D2713 13/09/1957 NB Dundee Tay Bridge 04/03/1967 9.5 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1967 9.89
11714 D2714 20/09/1957 NB Dundee Tay Bridge 04/03/1967 9.5 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1967 9.87
11715 D2715 03/10/1957 NB Dundee Tay Bridge 04/03/1967 9.42 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1967 9.83
11716 D2716 11/10/1957 NB Dundee Tay Bridge 04/03/1967 9.42 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1967 9.81
11717 D2717 23/10/1957 NB Dundee Tay Bridge 03/08/1967 9.83 Cut Argosy Salvage (Shettleston) 01/12/1967 10.11
11718 D2718 30/10/1957 NB Dunfermline Upper 03/08/1967 9.83 Cut Argosy Salvage (Shettleston) 01/12/1967 10.09
11719 D2719 11/11/1957 NB St Margarets 11/02/1967 9.25 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 9.81
D2720 24/06/1958 NB St Margarets 03/08/1967 9.17 Cut Connels (Coatbridge) 01/07/1971 13.03
D2721 27/06/1958 NB St Margarets 03/08/1967 9.17 Cut Argosy Salvage (Shettleston) 01/12/1967 9.44
D2722 04/07/1958 NB St Margarets 11/02/1967 8.58 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 9.17
D2723 30/06/1958 NB St Margarets 03/08/1967 9.17 Cut Connels (Coatbridge) 01/11/1967 9.35
D2724 11/07/1958 NB St Margarets 04/03/1967 8.67 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1967 9.06
D2725 17/07/1958 NB St Margarets 24/06/1967 8.92 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 01/09/1967 9.13
D2726 30/07/1958 NB St Margarets 11/02/1967 8.58 Cut P Woods (Shipbreaking) (Queenborough) 01/10/1971 13.18
D2727 08/08/1958 NB St Margarets 04/03/1967 8.58 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1967 8.99
D2728 20/08/1958 NB St Margarets 03/08/1967 9 Cut Argosy Salvage (Shettleston) 01/12/1967 9.29
D2729 17/09/1958 NB St Margarets 04/03/1967 8.5 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1967 8.88
D2730 19/09/1958 NB St Margarets 09/10/1967 9.08 Cut Argosy Salvage (Shettleston) 01/06/1968 9.71
D2731 18/09/1958 NB St Margarets 09/10/1967 9.08 Cut Argosy Salvage (Shettleston) 01/06/1968 9.71
D2732 03/10/1958 NB St Margarets 11/02/1967 8.33 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 8.92
D2733 08/10/1958 NB Yoker 11/02/1967 8.33 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 8.90
D2734 17/10/1958 NB Yoker 16/09/1967 8.92 Cut Argosy Salvage (Shettleston) 01/12/1967 9.13
D2735 13/11/1958 NB Yoker 04/03/1967 8.33 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/07/1967 8.64
D2736 20/11/1958 NB Yoker 04/03/1967 8.33 Cut Birds (Cardiff) 01/02/1968 9.21
D2737 21/11/1958 NB Yoker 04/03/1967 8.33 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/07/1967 8.61
D2738 28/11/1958 NB Yoker 24/06/1967 8.58 Cut Alex Smith Metals (Ayr) 01/08/1979 20.69
D2739 11/12/1958 NB Stirling 04/03/1967 8.25 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/07/1967 8.56
D2740 16/12/1958 NB Stirling 04/03/1967 8.25 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1967 8.63
D2741 16/01/1959 NB Stirling 11/02/1967 8.08 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 8.63
D2742 30/01/1959 NB Stirling 11/02/1967 8.08 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 8.59
D2743 20/03/1959 NB Dunfermline Upper 11/02/1967 7.92 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 8.46
D2744 29/04/1959 NB Dunfermline Upper 03/08/1967 8.33 Cut Argosy Salvage (Shettleston) 01/11/1967 8.52
D2745 29/01/1960 NB St Margarets 04/04/1967 7.25 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1967 7.51
D2746 15/02/1960 NB St Margarets 04/03/1967 7.08 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1967 7.46
D2747 15/02/1960 NB St Margarets 02/08/1967 7.5 Cut Argosy Salvage (Shettleston) 01/12/1967 7.80
D2748 19/02/1960 NB St Margarets 03/08/1967 7.5 Cut Argosy Salvage (Shettleston) 01/12/1967 7.79
D2749 26/02/1960 NB St Margarets 03/08/1967 7.5 Cut Argosy Salvage (Shettleston) 01/12/1967 7.77
D2750 29/02/1960 NB St Margarets 03/08/1967 7.5 Cut Connels (Coatbridge) 01/11/1967 7.68
D2751 25/03/1960 NB St Margarets 03/08/1967 7.42 Cut Connels (Coatbridge) 01/11/1967 7.61
D2752 31/03/1960 NB Haymarket 04/03/1967 7 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1967 7.34
D2753 21/04/1960 NB Haymarket 24/06/1967 7.17 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 01/09/1967 7.37
D2754 29/04/1960 NB Dalry Road 03/08/1967 7.33 Cut Connels (Coatbridge) 01/06/1968 8.10
D2755 11/05/1960 NB Dalry Road 03/08/1967 7.25 Cut Argosy Salvage (Shettleston) 01/12/1967 7.56
D2756 19/05/1960 NB Eastfield 03/02/1968 Eastfield 7.75 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/11/1968 8.46
D2757 24/05/1960 NB Eastfield 03/07/1967 7.17 Cut Birds (Cardiff) 01/02/1968 7.70
D2758 31/05/1960 NB Eastfield 03/02/1968 Eastfield 7.75 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/10/1968 8.34
D2759 06/06/1960 NB Eastfield 09/10/1967 7.33 Cut Argosy Salvage (Shettleston) 01/05/1968 7.91
D2760 16/06/1960 NB Eastfield 03/02/1968 Eastfield 7.67 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/11/1968 8.38
D2761 23/06/1960 NB Eastfield 09/10/1967 7.33 Cut Argosy Salvage (Shettleston) 01/05/1968 7.86
D2762 24/06/1960 NB Eastfield 04/03/1967 6.75 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/07/1967 7.02
D2763 04/07/1960 NB Eastfield 24/06/1967 6.92 Cut British Steel Corporation (Landore) 01/04/1977 16.75
D2764 08/07/1960 NB Eastfield 03/02/1968 Eastfield 7.58 Cut Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) 01/05/1968 7.82
D2765 11/07/1960 NB Eastfield 04/03/1967 6.67 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/07/1967 6.98
D2766 15/07/1960 NB Eastfield 04/03/1967 6.67 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/07/1967 6.96
D2767 17/08/1960 NB Eastfield 24/06/1967 6.83 Prs Preserved 56.66
D2768 25/08/1960 NB Parkhead 03/02/1968 Eastfield 7.5 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 01/05/1968 7.69
D2769 05/09/1960 NB Parkhead 03/02/1968 Eastfield 7.42 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/10/1968 8.08
D2770 05/09/1960 NB Parkhead 03/02/1968 Eastfield 7.42 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/10/1968 8.08
D2771 13/09/1960 NB Dawsholm 04/03/1967 6.5 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/07/1967 6.80
D2772 23/09/1960 NB Dawsholm 04/03/1967 6.5 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/07/1967 6.77
D2773 04/10/1960 NB Grangemouth 03/02/1968 Eastfield 7.33 Cut Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) 01/05/1968 7.58
D2774 11/10/1960 NB Grangemouth 24/06/1967 6.67 Prs Preserved 56.51
D2775 25/10/1960 NB Grangemouth 03/02/1968 Grangemouth 7.33 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/10/1968 7.94
D2776 31/10/1960 NB Polmont 09/10/1967 7 Cut Argosy Salvage (Shettleston) 01/05/1968 7.50
D2777 21/11/1960 NB Polmont 04/03/1967 6.33 Cut Birds (Cardiff) 01/05/1968 7.45
D2778 28/11/1960 NB Polmont 04/03/1967 6.33 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/07/1967 6.59
D2779 21/02/1961 NB Bathgate 03/02/1968 Eastfield 7 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/10/1968 7.61
D2780 09/03/1961 NB Eastfield 03/02/1968 Eastfield 6.92 Cut Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) 01/05/1968 7.15