Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 113 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1399 Week
» 28873 Month
» 325887 Year
» 402474 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D2/12 0-6-0


BR (Pre Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D2510 28/08/1961 HC Birkenhead Mollington Street 26/08/1967 6 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/1968 6.51
D2511 28/08/1961 HC Barrow in Furness 30/12/1967 6.33 Prs Preserved 55.63
D2512 11/09/1961 HC Barrow in Furness 13/05/1967 5.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/1968 6.47
D2513 05/10/1961 HC Barrow in Furness 19/08/1967 5.83 Cut National Coal Board (Cadeby) 01/10/1975 14.00
D2514 16/10/1961 HC Barrow in Furness 05/08/1967 5.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/1968 6.38
D2515 18/10/1961 HC Barrow in Furness 05/08/1967 5.83 Cut W Hatton Ltd (at Bolton MPD) 01/05/1968 6.54
D2516 10/11/1961 HC Barrow in Furness 05/08/1967 5.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/03/1968 6.31
D2517 10/11/1961 HC Barrow in Furness 25/02/1967 5.25 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/07/1967 5.64
D2518 22/11/1961 HC Watford 25/02/1967 5.25 Cut National Coal Board (Hatfield Main) 01/06/1973 11.53
D2519 30/11/1961 HC Crewe South 29/07/1967 5.67 Cut Marples and Gillot (Sheffield) 01/03/1985 23.27