Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 722 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 2008 Week
» 29482 Month
» 326496 Year
» 403083 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D3/1 0-4-0


BR (Pre Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D2900 15/04/1958 NB Devons Road (Bow) 11/02/1967 8.83 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 9.39
D2901 18/04/1958 NB Devons Road (Bow) 11/02/1967 8.83 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 9.38
D2902 24/04/1958 NB Devons Road (Bow) 11/02/1967 8.83 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 9.36
D2903 25/04/1958 NB Devons Road (Bow) 11/02/1967 8.83 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 9.36
D2904 19/05/1958 NB Devons Road (Bow) 11/02/1967 8.75 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 9.29
D2905 11/06/1958 NB Devons Road (Bow) 11/02/1967 8.67 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 9.23
D2906 19/07/1958 NB Devons Road (Bow) 11/02/1967 8.58 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 9.13
D2907 15/08/1958 NB Devons Road (Bow) 11/02/1967 8.5 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 9.05
D2908 29/08/1958 NB Rugby 11/02/1967 8.5 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 9.01
D2909 11/09/1958 NB Rugby 11/02/1967 8.42 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 8.98
D2910 12/09/1958 NB Rugby 11/02/1967 8.42 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 8.98
D2911 15/12/1959 NB Nuneaton 11/02/1967 7.17 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 7.72
D2912 28/12/1959 NB Edge Hill 11/02/1967 7.17 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 7.68
D2913 31/12/1959 NB Edge Hill 11/02/1967 7.17 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/09/1967 7.67