Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 722 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 2008 Week
» 29482 Month
» 326496 Year
» 403083 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D3/3 0-6-0


BR (1955 Num) BR (Pre Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
13117 D3117 03/06/1955 DE Toton 24/06/1967 Toton 12 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/10/1967 12.34
13118 D3118 10/06/1955 DE Toton 08/07/1967 12.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/07/1967 12.07
13119 D3119 16/06/1955 DE Toton 08/07/1967 12.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/07/1967 12.05
13120 D3120 08/07/1955 DE Toton 08/07/1967 12 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/05/1968 12.82
13121 D3121 05/08/1955 DE Toton 15/04/1967 11.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/05/1968 12.75
13122 D3122 03/09/1955 DE Toton 12/11/1966 11.17 Cut Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) 01/07/1967 11.83
13123 D3123 03/09/1955 DE Toton 12/11/1966 11.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/06/1967 11.75
13124 D3124 03/09/1955 DE Toton 12/11/1966 11.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/06/1967 11.75
13125 D3125 21/06/1957 DE Toton 08/07/1967 10.08 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/02/1968 10.62
13126 D3126 29/06/1957 DE Toton 12/11/1966 9.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/06/1967 9.93