Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 720 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 2006 Week
» 29480 Month
» 326494 Year
» 403081 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D3/5 0-6-0


BR (1955 Num) BR (Pre Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
13152 D3152 02/02/1955 DA Immingham 30/09/1967 12.58 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/02/1968 13.01
13153 D3153 07/02/1955 DA Immingham 15/07/1967 12.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/02/1968 12.99
13154 D3154 17/02/1955 DA Immingham 15/07/1967 12.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/02/1968 12.96
13155 D3155 17/02/1955 DA Immingham 17/09/1967 12.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/01/1968 12.88
13156 D3156 02/03/1955 DA Immingham 15/07/1967 12.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1968 13.09
13157 D3157 18/03/1955 DA Immingham 30/09/1967 12.5 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/07/1968 13.30
13158 D3158 25/03/1955 DA Immingham 19/02/1967 11.92 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/08/1967 12.36
13159 D3159 12/08/1955 DA Immingham 17/09/1967 12.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/01/1968 12.40
13160 D3160 16/08/1955 DA Immingham 14/10/1967 12.17 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/04/1968 12.64
13161 D3161 07/09/1955 DA Immingham 17/09/1967 12 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/01/1968 12.33
13162 D3162 16/09/1955 DA Immingham 18/11/1967 Colwick 12.17 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/07/1968 12.80
13163 D3163 20/09/1955 DA Kings Cross 17/09/1967 12 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/01/1968 12.29
13164 D3164 27/09/1955 DA Kings Cross 18/11/1967 Colwick 12.17 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 01/07/1968 12.77
13165 D3165 06/10/1955 DA Kings Cross 08/07/1967 11.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1968 12.50
13166 D3166 12/10/1955 DA Kings Cross 15/07/1967 11.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/02/1968 12.32