Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 722 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 2008 Week
» 29482 Month
» 326496 Year
» 403083 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D3/6 0-6-0


LMS BR (1955 Num) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
7074 12000 04/1936 DE Crewe North 29/04/1961 Crewe South 25 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 07/1962 26.27
7076 12001 30/09/1936 DE 03/02/1962 25.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Horwich) 01/04/1962 25.52
7079 12002 30/04/1934 DE 16/06/1956 22.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Horwich) 01/09/1956 22.36