D3/7 0-6-0
LMS | BR (1955 Num) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
7080 | 12003 | 26/05/1939 | DE | 18/11/1967 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 28.5 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 08/1968 | 29.24 | ||
7081 | 12004 | 26/05/1939 | DE | 09/12/1967 | 28.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1968 | 28.99 | |||
7082 | 12005 | 27/05/1939 | DE | 09/09/1967 | 28.33 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1968 | 28.91 | |||
7083 | 12006 | 27/05/1939 | DE | Toton | 30/09/1967 | 28.33 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 06/1968 | 29.07 | ||
7084 | 12007 | 27/05/1939 | DE | 14/10/1967 | 28.42 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 04/1968 | 28.91 | |||
7085 | 12008 | 11/09/1939 | DE | 15/07/1967 | 27.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 02/1968 | 28.45 | |||
7086 | 12009 | 09/11/1939 | DE | 30/09/1967 | 27.83 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 09/1968 | 28.87 | |||
7087 | 12010 | 02/12/1939 | DE | 30/09/1967 | 27.75 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 09/1968 | 28.81 | |||
7088 | 12011 | 12/1939 | DE | 12/03/1966 | 26.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 05/1966 | 26.43 | |||
7089 | 12012 | 30/12/1939 | DE | 30/12/1967 | 28 | Cut | W Hatton Ltd (at Bolton MPD) | 07/1968 | 28.56 | |||
7090 | 12013 | 20/01/1940 | DE | 18/11/1967 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 27.83 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 08/1968 | 28.59 | ||
7091 | 12014 | 09/03/1940 | DE | 21/10/1967 | 27.58 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 04/1968 | 28.12 | |||
7092 | 12015 | 21/03/1940 | DE | 28/10/1967 | 27.58 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 04/1968 | 28.09 | |||
7093 | 12016 | 13/04/1940 | DE | 30/09/1967 | 27.42 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 10/1968 | 28.53 | |||
7094 | 12017 | 20/04/1940 | DE | 28/10/1967 | 27.5 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 04/1968 | 28.01 | |||
7095 | 12018 | 07/05/1940 | DE | 28/10/1967 | 27.42 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 02/04/1968 | 27.92 | |||
7096 | 12019 | 25/05/1940 | DE | 14/10/1967 | 27.42 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 03/04/1968 | 27.88 | |||
7097 | 12020 | 15/06/1940 | DE | 18/11/1967 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 27.42 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 08/1968 | 28.19 | ||
7098 | 12021 | 07/07/1940 | DE | 28/10/1967 | 27.25 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 04/1968 | 27.79 | |||
7099 | 12022 | 07/1940 | DE | 12/11/1966 | 26.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 08/1967 | 27.10 | |||
7110 | 12023 | 23/01/1942 | DE | 23/12/1967 | 25.92 | Cut | W Hatton Ltd (at Bolton MPD) | 07/1968 | 26.49 | |||
7111 | 12024 | 31/01/1942 | DE | 16/12/1967 | 25.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 26.14 | |||
7112 | 12025 | 07/02/1942 | DE | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 25.75 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 10/1968 | 26.70 | ||
7113 | 12026 | 14/02/1942 | DE | 21/10/1967 | 25.67 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 02/04/1968 | 26.15 | |||
7114 | 12027 | 19/02/1942 | DE | 04/11/1967 | 25.75 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 03/04/1968 | 26.14 | |||
7115 | 12028 | 11/03/1942 | DE | 24/06/1967 | 25.25 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/04/1968 | 26.08 | |||
7116 | 12029 | 03/1942 | DE | 21/05/1966 | 24.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 07/1966 | 24.35 | |||
7117 | 12030 | 28/03/1942 | DE | Willesden | 08/08/1964 | 22.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 09/1964 | 22.48 | ||
7118 | 12031 | 29/04/1942 | DE | 30/12/1967 | 25.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 07/1968 | 26.23 | |||
7119 | 12032 | 09/06/1942 | DE | 16/12/1967 | 25.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 07/1968 | 26.12 |